Cavanagh et al v. Northern New England Benefit Trust

Defendant: Northern New England Benefit Trust
Counter Claimant: Northern New England Benefit Trust
Plaintiff: Robert V. Cavanagh and Rhoda M. Cavanagh
Counter Defendant: Rhoda M. Cavanagh and Robert V. Cavanagh
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00394
Filed: October 17, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relatio
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Remand to State Court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
March 15, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 15 Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
May 23, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER 21 Motion for Order to Show Cause. NNEBT is entitled to summary judgment on all of the claims in this case except for its request for attorneys fees. Within twenty days of the date of this order, NNEBT shall either file a motion for attorneys fees or notify the court that it does not intend to do so. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(kad)
June 26, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER. Defendant is entitled to judgment as a matter of law on all of plaintiffs' claims, as the court has already ruled, but defendant is not entitled its costs and attorney's fees. Clerk shall enter judgment in accordance with document no. 22, and this order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cavanagh et al v. Northern New England Benefit Trust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern New England Benefit Trust
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Represented By: William R, Jr. Cahill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Northern New England Benefit Trust
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Represented By: William R, Jr. Cahill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert V. Cavanagh
Represented By: Kenneth M. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhoda M. Cavanagh
Represented By: Kenneth M. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Rhoda M. Cavanagh
Represented By: Kenneth M. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Robert V. Cavanagh
Represented By: Kenneth M. Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]