Schillinger v. NH State Prison, Warden

Petitioner: Greg Schillinger
Respondent: NH State Prison, Warden
Notice Only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only) and NH Attorney General - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00423
Filed: November 2, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 1, 2013 26 Featured Case ///ORDER Dismissing Claims 8-12 of the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The following parties shall be terminated from this case: a)Strafford County Superior Court and b) Judge Bruce E. Mohl. The court directs Schilli nger to file, within thirty days of the date of this order, documents that comprise part of the record before the NHSC, relating to Schillinger's conviction as outlined in this order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 3/5/13.(cmp)
February 1, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER denying 6 Motion for Hearing ; denying 7 Motion for Help with Discovery; denying 8 Motion for Hearing with Mental Competency Experts. Schillingers motions (doc. nos. 6-8) are denied as premature, without prejudice to refiling if this court directs respondent to answer the petition, and the respondent files a pleading responsive to that order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
February 12, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Amend, Add Exhibits and Arguments. Granted to the extent that court adds to the petition the claims identified as Claims A and B. Denied in all other respects. Schillinger to file documents as outlined by March 5, 2013. The February 1, 2013 order (document no. 26) remains in full force and effect. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
April 30, 2013 47 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 29 Motion to add Exhausted Claim and Correct Printed Typed Issue; granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Extend Time; denying 36 Motion for 3 Subpoena Forms; denying 39 Motion for Immediate Release; denying 45 Motion for Expansion of Record; denying 46 Motion to Add Exhibits 1, 2, 3 and Suspend Sentence Release. Counsel to be appointed. Deadline for appointed counsel to demonstrate exhaustion is 120 days from date of this order. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 3, 2014 61 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. The court directs the clerks office to serve the respondent as provided in the Agreement on Acceptance of Service. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schillinger v. NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Greg Schillinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - HC (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]