Coach, Inc. et al v. Sapatis et al

Defendant: Peter J. Sapatis and Londonderry Marketplace, LLC
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc. and Coach Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2012cv00506
Filed: December 21, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Magistrate Judge Muirhead as the volunteer mediator in this case. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)
January 31, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
June 23, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)
June 27, 2014 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 53 Petition to Attach with Notice. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coach, Inc. et al v. Sapatis et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter J. Sapatis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Londonderry Marketplace, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela E. Berman
Represented By: Kelly Martin Malone
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Techentin
Represented By: Kyle Zambarano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coach Services, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle Zambarano
Represented By: Jeffrey K. Techentin
Represented By: Kelly Martin Malone
Represented By: Pamela E. Berman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]