Mason v. TELEFUNKEN Semiconductors America LLC et al

Defendant: TELEFUNKEN Semiconductors America LLC and Does 1-10
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Mason
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00507
Filed: December 21, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd GRANTING 4 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Case. (hrllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012) [Transferred from cand on 12/21/2012.]
March 13, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for March 18, 2013 at 3:30 p.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
March 18, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 32 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3-5 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/31/2014. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/1/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 10/15/2013.(dae)
August 13, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by TELEFUNKEN; denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Mason. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mason v. TELEFUNKEN Semiconductors America LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TELEFUNKEN Semiconductors America LLC
Represented By: James McManis
Represented By: Irvin D. Gordon
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Pipkin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Mason
Represented By: Anne M. Rice
Represented By: Mark Christopher Peters
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]