Halsey v. Litton Loan Servicing, L.P. et al

Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Trustee, Litton Loan Servicing, L.P. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: James Halsey
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00511
Filed: December 26, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER approving 9 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 2-3 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/2/2014. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 5/31/2013. Supplement to discovery plan due 3/29/13(mm)
March 12, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER plaintiff is directed to show cause on or before March 29, 2013, why this case should not be set for a bench trial rather than a jury trial. 10 Order on Discovery Plan. ( Follow up on Show Cause Response on 3/29/2013.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(mm)
July 13, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER approving 24 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion to Amend 1 Notice of Removal - New Case, ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/17/2013.); denying 20 Motion to Strike. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically file the amended pleading in accordance with the Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Halsey v. Litton Loan Servicing, L.P. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Trustee
Represented By: Joshua D. Shakun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Litton Loan Servicing, L.P.
Represented By: Joshua D. Shakun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Joshua D. Shakun
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Halsey
Represented By: Skinner Law PLLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]