East Coast Sheet Metal Fabricating Corp. v. Autodesk, Inc.

Plaintiff: East Coast Sheet Metal Fabricating Corp.
Defendant: Autodesk, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00517
Filed: December 28, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion for In Camera Review and Order Permitting Use of Document; granting 87 Motion to File its Motion for In Camera Review and Order Permitting Use of Document Under Seal ; granting 102 Motion to Seal Document. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
October 6, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 100 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
May 29, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Miscellaneous deadline set for 5/31/2013); denying as moot 7 Motion to Dismiss the Complaint; denying 17 Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion for Leave to File using the appropriate event in CMECF. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
June 11, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 11, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Patent Case Scheduling Conference scheduled for July 17, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 18, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY (signed version) re: 35 . So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
July 18, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court SIGNED PROTECTIVE ORDER. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(cmp)
July 22, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving (with changes) 34 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 14 days. Case Track: Complex. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/3/2014.(cmp)
July 30, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court SUMMARY ORDER re Proposed Protective Order. On or before August 9, 2013, the parties are directed to meet and confer and file a joint proposed protective order as outlined. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
July 24, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 69 Motion for Summary Judgment. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: East Coast Sheet Metal Fabricating Corp. v. Autodesk, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Coast Sheet Metal Fabricating Corp.
Represented By: Thomas Tracy Aquilla
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autodesk, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]