Mendez v. A Big International Criminal Organization and their Connected Wired Soldiers

Defendant: A Big International Criminal Organization and their Connected Wired Soldiers
Plaintiff: Ivan I. Mendez
 
Case Number: 1:2012fp00208
Filed: June 20, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiff to file Certificate of Custodial Institution by 9/14/12 or the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Notice of Compliance Deadline set for 9/14/2012. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
September 20, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER granting: 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and 4 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. No initial filing fee assessed. Going forward plaintiff responsible for monthly payments as outlined. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
February 22, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER approving 8 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mendez v. A Big International Criminal Organization and their Connected Wired Soldiers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Big International Criminal Organization and their Connected Wired Soldiers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan I. Mendez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]