Runyon v. Lee et al

Defendant: FNU Lee, John Doe, 1, John Doe #2, John Doe #1 and FNU McGuire
Plaintiff: Fred Runyon
Case Number: 1:2012fp00290
Filed: August 2, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J. Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 24 Motion to Disqualify Judge Kicher ; denying without prejudice 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 10 Motion for ARREST WARRANT ; denying 11 Motion for ARREST WARRANT ; denying 12 Motion for ARREST WARRANT ; denying 14 Motion to Compel; denying 23 Motion to Disqualify Prosecutor Brobst. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(vln)
December 14, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 1 Complaint and doc. nos. 7-9, 13 and 15-22. The court grants Runyon leave to file an amended complaint, within fourteen days of the date of this order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (vln)
February 14, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
March 8, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 32 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln)
April 9, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(vln)
May 3, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 49 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/6/2014. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 7/31/2013. Discovery deadline 3/7/2014.(mm)
May 6, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER denying 36 Motion to Amend ; denying 37 Motion to Amend ; denying 40 Motion to Amend; denying 42 Motion to Amend; denying 45 Motion to Amend ; approving 51 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(vln) Modified on 5/6/2013 to change date filed (vln).
August 6, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Fred Runyon, initial fee of $-0-. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 10/5/2012(lml)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Runyon v. Lee et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Lee
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU McGuire
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Runyon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]