Roy v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al

Defendant: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner, Jon Fouts and NH State Prison, Warden
Notice Only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: Steven J. Roy
Case Number: 1:2012fp00303
Filed: August 13, 2012
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 14, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Reconsideration Re: 10 Report and Recommendation.Any objection to the 8/30/12 Report and Recommendation must be filed within 14 days of the date of this order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
January 29, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 10 and 19 Report and Recommendations; denying 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 4 Motion for Extraordinary Handling of Enclosed Pleadings. The federal claims are dismissed and the court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims. Clerk to enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
February 13, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 26 Motion for Reconsideration. 25 Judgment is vacated. 24 Order is vacated in part. 19 Report and Recommendation is approved and adopted denying Motion for Extraordinary Handling 4 and Motion for Preliminary Injunction 3 . Certain federal and state claims going forward; others dismissed as outlined. Clerk's office to serve NHAG pursuant to Agreement on Acceptance of Service. Defendants to answer within 21 days of service. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae) Modified on 2/13/2013 to add: ///(dae).
March 11, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion for Reconsideration Re: 27 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
May 16, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 37 Discovery Plan and 38 Discovery Plan. Discovery Order with deadlines as outlined. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/15/2014. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 9/20/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 1/15/2014.(dae)
June 25, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 40 Motion to Preserve Evidence. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(vln)
August 27, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER terminating as moot 42 Motion to Dismiss; denying 49 Motion to Amend 1 Complaint. The remaining federal claim in the case, alleging FirstAmendment retaliation based on a grievance, is dismissed for failure to s tate a claim. The court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the plaintiffs claim for intentional infliction of emotional distress, which is dismissed without prejudice. Clerk to enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
August 16, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Financial Affidavit and Prisoner Consent Form filed by Steven J. Roy, initial fee of $187.25. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 10/15/2012(jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Fouts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH State Prison, Warden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven J. Roy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]