Marbury v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Medical Department et al

Plaintiff: Raymond G. Marbury
Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Medical Department, Raymond Bower and Tracy Warren
 
Case Number: 1:2012fp00339
Filed: October 17, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 1, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Prohibiting Remote Electronic Access to 14 Addendum/BOP Health Services Clinical Encounter. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
May 8, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Appoint Medical Expert; denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying without prejudice 15 Motion for Court Transcript of 4/26/12 sentencing; denying without prejudice 16 Motion to Compel Discovery - Medical Records from Strafford County Medical Dept. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
June 3, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 26 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(dae)
October 17, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Financial Affidavit and Prisoner Consent Form filed by Raymond G. Marbury, initial fee of $5.50. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 12/17/2012(jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marbury v. Strafford County Department of Corrections, Medical Department et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond G. Marbury
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strafford County Department of Corrections, Medical Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Bower
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Warren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]