Runyon v. Manchester Police Department

Defendant: Manchester Police Department
Plaintiff: Fred Runyon
 
Case Number: 1:2012fp00382
Filed: October 17, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 19 Motion to Disqualify Judge Abramson. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
February 4, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within 14 days of the date of this order re: 1 complaint and addenda to the complaint (doc. nos. 8-18). ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/19/2013.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
March 25, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing US Marshal to Make Service. Clerk's office is to complete and issue summonses for the Manchester Police Department and Manchester Police Officer John Doe and forward, together with copies of the documents named in this order, to the U.S. Marshal for service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
April 19, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 31 Report and Recommendation: Claims 1 and 3 (against an unnamed MPD officer) and Claim 7 (against the same unnamed MPD officer and the Manchester Police Department) will proceed forward; all other remaining claims and defendants are hereby dismissed. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
May 29, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER mooting 40 Defendants' Proposed Discovery Plan; adopting the following deadlines: Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 9/3/2013; Discovery deadline 12/17/2013; Summary Judgment Motions due by 12/17/2013; Ready for Trial on 4/15/2014. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of the defendants' proposed discovery plan to plaintiff. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)
May 5, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by District Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
October 18, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Fred Runyon, initial fee of $-0-. Going forward the plaintiff shall be responsible for monthly payments of 20% of each preceding months income credited t o his account, which shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 12/17/2012(jeb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Runyon v. Manchester Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manchester Police Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Runyon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]