Palo v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent

Plaintiff: Jacob E. Palo
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
 
Case Number: 1:2012fp00407
Filed: December 12, 2012
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Jacob E. Palo, initial fee of $7.00. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 2/11/2013(jeb)
January 7, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 7 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; approving 11 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
April 22, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff to amend his complaint as outlined within 30 days. Amended Pleadings due by 5/22/2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
April 22, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)
May 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Palo is now incarcerated at the NH State Prison for Men. Clerk's office to forward copies of Docs. 15 and 16 to Palo. Deadline to amend complaint is extended for 30 days. Amended Pleadings due by 6/21/2013. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Palo v. Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob E. Palo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Department of Corrections, Superintendent
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]