Brescia v. UBS Financial Services Inc.

Third Party Defendant: The Estate of Toni Ann Brescia (Aresco)
Plaintiff: Glen Brescia and The Estate of Toni Ann Brescia (Aresco)
Counter Defendant: Glen Brescia
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Counter Claimant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Third Party Plaintiff: UBS Financial Services Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2013
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER re Amendment to proposed consent order for interpleader and other relief. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch.(ko)
June 12, 2013 24 Featured Case PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for June 19, 2013 at 11:30 a.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 12, 2014 32 Featured Case ///ORDER granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Glen Brescia; denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by The Estate of Toni Ann Brescia. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. If no appeal of the judgment is taken within the time allowed by rule, the clerk shall release the interpleader funds, together with interest, to Glen. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
January 15, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Paul J. Barbadoro recused - appearance filed by Attorney Kenneth Bartholomew. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brescia v. UBS Financial Services Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party defendant: The Estate of Toni Ann Brescia (Aresco)
Represented By: Patrick E Donovan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Brescia
Represented By: David E. Buckley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Toni Ann Brescia (Aresco)
Represented By: Patrick E Donovan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Glen Brescia
Represented By: David E. Buckley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Bartholomew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Bartholomew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third party plaintiff: UBS Financial Services Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth C. Bartholomew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]