Mendonsa v. Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.

Defendant: Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jared Mendonsa
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00125
Filed: March 21, 2013
 
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph N. Laplante
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re Pretrial Conference scheduled for May 13, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. before Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
May 13, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER approving 11 Discovery Plan as submitted/with changes. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 8/12/2013. Mediation Follow Up on 9/3/2013.(ko) Modified on 5/13/2013 to add: ///(ko).
March 26, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court PROCEDURAL ORDER re subject-matter jurisdiction. Defendant to respond as outlined on or before April 5, 2013. Failure to comply with this order will result in remand to Rockingham County Superior Court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mendonsa v. Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abercrombie & Fitch Stores, Inc.
Represented By: McLane Graf Raulerson & Middleton (Manchester)
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Represented By: Daniel J. Cianchetta
Represented By: Mark A. Knueve
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Mendonsa
Represented By: John T. Pendleton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]