Cole v. Fluery et al

Plaintiff: Christopher Cole
Defendant: FNU Dube and FNU Fluery
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2013cv00274
Filed: June 18, 2013
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Referring Judge: Landya B. McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ///ORDER granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. So Ordered by Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(gla)
June 19, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis as to Christopher Cole, initial fee of $-0-. In addition, monthly payments of 20% of each preceding months income credited to the plaintiffs account shall be remitted by the Institution when the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the sum of $350.00 has been paid. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.Finance Follow Up Deadline 8/19/2013(lml)
October 25, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service upon the New Hampshire Office of the Attorney General, as provided in the Agreement on Acceptance of Service, electronic copies of: this order, the complaint (doc. no. 1), and the motion for expedited ruling (doc. no. 3); denying without prejudice 3 motion for expedited ruling. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Fluery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Dube
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Fluery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]