Sykes v. RBS Citizens, N.A., et al

Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Bank of New York Mellon, CCO Mortgage Corporation, Citibank, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association and RBS Citizens, N.A.
Plaintiff: Lewis B. Sykes, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00334
Filed: July 25, 2013
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph A. DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; granting 34 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition; granting 35 Motion for Leave to File Reply to Opposition; terminating as moot 8 Motion to Dismis s for Failure to State a Claim; terminating as moot 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Sykes shall file his replies on or before March 11, 2014, and shall file the amended complaint as allowed in this order on or before March 28, 2014. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(gla)
September 9, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting in part and denying in part as outlined 50 Motion for Joinder/Amend Complaint; Plaintiff to file amended complaint; terminating as moot 46 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)
March 23, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER terminating as moot 82 Motion for Protective Order and to Continue Defendants' Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 84 Motion to Compel Responses from Fannie Mae, CCO Mortgage a nd RBS Citizens; denying 85 Motion to Compel Responses from New England Coastal Realty, Inc.; denying 86 Motion to Compel Responses from Bank of America and Bank of New York Mellon; denying 91 Motion to Compel Defendants with Court Applied Sanc tions to respond to Plaintiff's 7 served and still open Discovery sets. Motion for Summary Judgment 76 stayed pending schedule to be set upon amended discovery plan(s) - due 4/24/15. So Ordered by Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr.(dae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sykes v. RBS Citizens, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Thomas J. Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCO Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Citizens, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis B. Sykes, Jr.
Represented By: Terrie L. Harman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.