Pickens v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al

Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10, J. Masse, NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner and FNU Oliver
Notice Only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only) and NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff: Ivan Mosi Pickens
Case Number: 1:2014fp00028
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: New Hampshire District Court
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Steven J. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service defendants Judy Baker, C/O King, and a second NCF transport officer (John Doe 3) as provided in the Agreement on Acceptance of Service. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(jab)
October 2, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court /// ORDER approving 23 Report and Recommendation. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
February 3, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving 44 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part 33 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint ; granting in part and denying in part 35 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's request for leave to withdraw Complaint Addendum, doc. no. 31, is granted, and defendants' objection (doc. no. 32) is deemed moot, without prejudice. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)
April 25, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. Thecourt finds that plaintiff states cognizable claims over whichthe court has jurisdiction. The clerks office is directed to serve electronic copies of this order and the complaint (doc. 1) on the New Hampshire Office ofthe Attorney General, as provided in the Agreement onAcceptance of Service. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(jab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickens v. NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Masse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Corrections, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Attorney General - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Notice only: NH Department of Corrections - Notice Only - CV (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Mosi Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.