FELLNER v. TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C. Featured Case

Plaintiff Deborah Fellner alleged that Defendant Tri-Union Seafoods, L.L.C. d/b/a Chicken of the Sea violated the New Jersey Products Liability Act, the New Jersey Consumer Fraud Act and common law fraud for failing to warn the public that consumer of Defendant\'s tuna, purportedly containing methylmercury, could result in mercury poisoning.

Plaintiff: DEBORAH FELLNER
Defendant: TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.
 
Case Number: 2:2006cv00688
Filed: February 15, 2006
 
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability Office
County: Morris
Presiding Judge: Dennis M. Cavanaugh
Referring Judge: Mark Falk
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1446pl Petition for Removal - Product Liability

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 94 Featured Case LETTER ORDER regarding discovery confidentiality order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/8/2013. (nr, )
January 8, 2013 93 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/8/2013. (nr, )
January 7, 2013 92 Letter from Edward McElroy, Esq.. (MCELROY, EDWARD)
January 4, 2013 91 Letter from John Kiernan, Esq seeking a preliminary order prohibiting the dissemination of the documents which were the subject of the January 2, 2013 court Order to plaintiff until the parties have an opportunity to address the proposed limitation by briefing or oral argument as the Court deems appropriate. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
January 3, 2013 90 Featured Case CORRECTED ORDER denying deft. Tri-Union's application for a protective order; directing deft. Tri-Union to produce the disputed documents within 5 days from this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/3/2013. (nr, ) Modified on 1/8/2013 (mn).
January 2, 2013 89 Featured Case ORDER denying pltf's application for a protective order; directing the deft. Tri-Union to produce the disputed documents within 5 days from this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/2/2013. (nr, )
December 3, 2012 88 Letter from counsel for Tri-Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Prop 65 Stipulated Protective Order)(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
November 27, 2012 87 Featured Case LETTER-ORDER directing Deft. to advise the Court & Pltf. whether it has served notice on any interested third parties in the Proposition 56 litigation &, if so, when & how; if no notice has been served, to do so w/in (5) days of this Letter-Order (by serving all defts. in that litigation who still exist & may have produced the documents in issue); & provide a copy of the previous Court Order that Deft. asserts controls the production of the documents in issue; etc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/26/12. (DD, )
November 21, 2012 86 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD MCELROY on behalf of DEBORAH FELLNER (MCELROY, EDWARD)
November 19, 2012 85 Letter from Steven Grygiel. (PACIORKOWSKI, THOMAS)
November 14, 2012 84 Letter from Defense Counsel re Reply on motion for protective order. (SCHOEN, KENNETH)
November 13, 2012 83 Letter from Thomas Paciorkowski. (PACIORKOWSKI, THOMAS)
November 8, 2012 82 Proposed MOTION for Protective Order as to certain Prop 65 documents by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
October 18, 2012 81 Letter from Defense Counsel re motion for protective order. (SCHOEN, KENNETH)
October 11, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/11/2012. (nm, )
October 2, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: The parties are advised that the telephone Status Conference set for 10/12/12 has been moved to Thursday, 10/11/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Thank you. (nm, )
September 24, 2012 80 Letter from John Kiernan to Magistrate Dickson regarding Confidentiality Order and a copy of Tri-Union's proposed Confidentiality Order. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 24, 2012 79 Letter from Barry Eichen. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(EICHEN, BARRY)
August 29, 2012 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: BARRY R. EICHEN, does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (sea, )
August 21, 2012 78 Featured Case LETTER ORDER regarding discovery disputes; any discovery production required shall be served no later than 9/14/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/20/2012. (nr, )
August 21, 2012 77 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 10/12/2012 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580.SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/21/12. (nm, )
August 17, 2012 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number TRE024788 Re Stephen G. Grygiel (nr, )
August 9, 2012 76 Featured Case ORDER admitting Stephen G. Grygiel pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 8/9/2012. (nr, )
August 8, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/8/2012. (nm, )
August 7, 2012 75 BRIEF in Reply to defendant, Tri-Union Seafood's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for the pro hac vice admission of Stephen G. Grygiel (EICHEN, BARRY)
July 23, 2012 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice opposition papers by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
July 13, 2012 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen G. Grygiel by DEBORAH FELLNER. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen G. Grygiel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(EICHEN, BARRY)
June 29, 2012 72 Letter from Defendant Tri-Union re Status Conference, 71 Letter, 70 Letter. (SCHOEN, KENNETH)
June 22, 2012 71 Letter from Plaintiff, Fellner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(PACIORKOWSKI, THOMAS)
June 15, 2012 70 Letter from Defendant Tri-Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
June 7, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/7/2012. Telephone status conference scheduled for 8/8/12 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580. (nm, )
April 17, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/17/2012. Telephone status conference scheduled for 6/7/12 at 11:30 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580. (nm, )
April 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Per the request of counsel and with consent, the Telephone Status Conference set for 4/9/12 has been adjourned to 4/17/2012 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (nm, )
March 8, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/8/2012. Telephone status conference scheduled for 4/9/12 at 3:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580. (nm, )
March 7, 2012 Remark: The parties are advised that the in person status conference scheduled for 3/8/12 at 3:30 p.m. has been converted into a TELEPHONE status conference. Kenneth Schoen, Esq., counsel for deft. is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580. (nm, )
February 15, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Per the request of counsel, the in person Status Conference set for 2/16/12 has been adjourned to 3/8/2012 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. (nm, )
December 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status Conference held on 12/7/2011. In person status conference scheduled for 2/16/12 at 10:30 a.m. (nm, )
December 6, 2011 69 Letter from Scott Goldstein re position papers. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
December 6, 2011 68 Letter from Edward McElroy. (PACIORKOWSKI, THOMAS)
December 6, 2011 Remark: Per the request of counsel, Mr. Kiernan is to participate in the status conference scheduled for 12/7/11 at 11:00 by telephone. Mr. Kiernan is to call into chambers at 973-645-2580. Thank you. (nm, )
November 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Settlement Conference held on 11/7/2011. In person status conference scheduled for 12/7/11 at 11:00 a.m. (nm, )
October 31, 2011 67 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER regarding expert reports. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/31/2011. (nr, )
October 28, 2011 66 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS PACIORKOWSKI on behalf of DEBORAH FELLNER (PACIORKOWSKI, THOMAS)
October 4, 2011 Remark: The parties are advised that the conference scheduled for 11/7/11 at 10:30 a.m. is an IN PERSON SETTLEMENT conference, not a telephone status conference. Please disregard previous text only order. Thank you. (nm, )
September 30, 2011 65 Featured Case TEXT ONLY ORDER converting the In Person Settlement Conference to a Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 11/7/2011 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call to chambers at 973-645-2580. The discovery schedule and Defendant's motion for a protective order will be reviewed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 9/30/11. (nic, )
September 13, 2011 Remark: Per the request of counsel, the in person settlement conference scheduled for 9/21/11 has been adjourned to 11/7/11 at 10:30 a.m. (nm, )
July 14, 2011 64 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Parties to meet and confer and exchange written discovery required by parties for meaningful settlement discussions. Discovery to be produced by 8/31/11. Settlement conference scheduled for 9/21/11 at 9:30 a.m. Clients and counsel with FULL settlement authority are required to attend. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 7/14/11. (nm, )
July 14, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/14/2011. (nm, )
May 19, 2011 63 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Fact discovery end date extended to 11/15/11. Telephone status conference scheduled for 7/14/11 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff to initiate the call to 973-645-2580. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/19/11. (jqb, ) Modified on 5/19/2011 (jqb, ).
May 19, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: In Person Status Conference held on 5/19/2011. (jqb, )
April 19, 2011 Remark: Per the request of counsel, the in person status conference scheduled for 4/21/11 has been adjourned to 5/19/11 at 9:30 a.m. Thank you. (nm, )
March 28, 2011 Remark: The parties are advised that the in person status conference scheduled for 4/14/11 has been adjourned to 4/21/11 at 11:00 a.m. (nm, )
March 11, 2011 62 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion for Protective Order; vacating the stay of discovery and scheduling an in-person status conference for 4/4/2011 at 11:30a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 03/11/2011. (nr, )
February 23, 2011 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: BARRY R. EICHEN, does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (sea, )
February 18, 2011 61 Featured Case ORDER granting request to extend and stay discovery until certain motions are decided. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 02/18/2011. (nr, )
January 26, 2011 60 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 57 First MOTION for Protective Order filed by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
January 18, 2011 Remark: Per the request of the parties, the telephone status conference scheduled for 1/19/11 has been adjourned without date. Thank you. (nm, )
January 11, 2011 59 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 57 First MOTION for Protective Order (format error corrected) filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. (EICHEN, BARRY)
January 10, 2011 58 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 57 First MOTION for Protective Order filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. (EICHEN, BARRY)
December 15, 2010 Set Deadlines as to 57 First MOTION for Protective Order. Motion set for 2/7/2011 10:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
December 15, 2010 57 First MOTION for Protective Order by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification in support of motion for protective order, # 2 Exhibit A to Schoen Certification, # 3 Exhibit B to Schoen Certification, # 4 Exhibit C to Schoen Certification, # 5 Exhibit D to Schoen Certification, # 6 Exhibit E to Schoen Certification, # 7 Affidavit of John Barker in support of motion for protective order, # 8 Brief in support of motion for protective order, # 9 Text of Proposed Order granting motion for protective order)(GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
December 13, 2010 56 Featured Case ORDER granting deft. a two day extension of time to file a motion seeking a protective order and resetting briefting schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/14/2010. (nr, )
November 12, 2010 55 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Defendant is to file motion for protective order by 12/13/10; responses due by 1/3/11; reply due by 1/17/11. Telephone status conference scheduled for 1/19/11 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to 973-645-2580. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/12/10. (nm, )
November 12, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/12/2010. (nm, )
November 10, 2010 Remark: The parties are advised that the TIME of the telephone status conference scheduled for 11/12/10 has been changed to 2:00 p.m. Thank you. (nm, )
October 26, 2010 54 Featured Case LETTER ORDER granting request to extend time to submit papers regarding the scope of discovery to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/26/2010. (nr, )
October 22, 2010 Remark: Please be advised that the telephone status conference scheduled for 11/5/10 has been adjourned to 11/12/10 at 1:30 p.m. Thank you. (nm, )
October 6, 2010 53 Featured Case ORDER: regarding discovery; Telephone Conference set for 11/5/2010 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 10/05/2010. (nr, )
October 5, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson: Status/Settlement Conference held on 10/5/2010. (nm, )
September 10, 2010 Remark: Due to a scheduling conflict, the in person status/settlement conference scheduled for 9/30/10 has been moved to 10/5/10 at 2:00 p.m. Thank you. (nm, )
September 8, 2010 Remark: Per the request of counsel, the in person status/settlement conference scheduled for 9/9/10 has been adjourned until 9/30/10 at 2:30 p.m. (nm, )
August 27, 2010 52 AMENDED ANSWER to 28 Amended Complaint by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
July 14, 2010 Remark: The parties are advised that the in person status/settlement conference scheduled for 8/19/10 has been adjourned until 9/9/10 at 11:30 a.m. before USMJ Joseph A. Dickson, Courtroom 5A, US Courthouse Building, 50 Walnut Street, Newark, NJ. Thank you. (nm, )
June 21, 2010 Featured Case Case Reassigned to Judge Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson. Judge Magistrate Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (tjg, )
May 21, 2010 51 Featured Case PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Status/settlement Conference set for 8/19/2010 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Amended Pleadings due by 9/1/2010. Discovery due by 3/1/2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 05/21/2010. (nr, )
May 19, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Scheduling Conference held on 5/19/2010. (drc, )
April 15, 2010 50 Featured Case LETTER ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2010 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/15/10. (LM, )
April 13, 2010 49 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 44 Motion to Strike deft's motion for judicial notice. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 04/13/2010. (nr, )
April 13, 2010 48 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 04/13/2010. (nr, )
January 12, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/12/2010. (drc, )
November 9, 2009 47 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 44 MOTION to Strike filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. (EICHEN, BARRY)
November 2, 2009 46 Featured Case BRIEF in Opposition re 44 MOTION to Strike filed by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
November 2, 2009 45 Featured Case CERTIFICATION in Opposition re 44 MOTION to Strike filed by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Certification in opposition to plaintiff's motion to strike defendant's motion for judicial notice, # 2 Exhibit B to Certification in Opposition to plaintiff's motion to strike Tri-Union's motion seeking judicial notice, # 3 Exhibit part 1 of Exhibit C to Certification in Opposition to plaintiff's motion to strike Tri-Union's motion seeking judicial notice for certain documents, # 4 Exhibit Part 2 of C to Certification in Opposition to plaintiff's motion to strike Tri-Union's motion for judicial notice of certain documents)(GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
October 20, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/20/2009. (drc, )
October 15, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER - Please be advised that there shall be a status/settlement conference via telephone on Tuesday, October 20, 2009 at 11:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. It shall be plaintiffs counsels responsibility to arrange for and initiate the conference call. Kindly mark your calendar accordingly. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 10/15/09. (LM, )
October 14, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 44 MOTION to Strike. Motion set for 11/16/2009 10:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
October 14, 2009 44 Featured Case MOTION to Strike by DEBORAH FELLNER. (EICHEN, BARRY)
October 13, 2009 Featured Case CLERKS QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Cross Motion Doc. #43 filed by B. EICHEN on 10/09/20098 was submitted incorrectly as a Response. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Cross Motion USING Motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (nr, )
October 9, 2009 43 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. (EICHEN, BARRY)
October 5, 2009 42 Featured Case LETTER ORDER withdrawing Tri-Union's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 10/05/2009. (nr, )
October 1, 2009 41 Featured Case CERTIFICATION in Support re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Reply Certification in further support of motion to dismiss, # 2 Exhibit 2 to reply certification in further support of motion to dismiss, # 3 Exhibit part 1 of Exhibit 3 to reply certification in further support of motion to dismiss, # 4 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibit 3 to reply certification in further support of motion to dismiss plaintiff's complaint., # 5 Exhibit to reply certification in further support of motion to dismiss plaintiff's Complaint.)(GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
October 1, 2009 40 Featured Case REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 35 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
October 1, 2009 39 Featured Case APPLICATION/PETITION for Judicial notice of selected documents for by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification in support of motion of judicial notice, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 in support of motion for judicial notice, # 3 Exhibit 2 in support of motion for judicial notice, # 4 Exhibit Part 1 of Exhibit 3 in support of motion for judicial notice, # 5 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibit 3 in support of motion for judicial notice, # 6 Text of Proposed Order granting judicial notice)(GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 25, 2009 38 Featured Case LETTER ORDER granting request to extend time to file response to motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 09/25/2009. (nr, )
September 25, 2009 37 Featured Case Letter from Scott Goldstein re request for extension of time to file to file reply re 35 MOTION to Dismiss. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
September 21, 2009 36 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 35 MOTION to Dismiss filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Exhibits)(EICHEN, BARRY)
August 31, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 35 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 10/5/2009 before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (mn, )
August 31, 2009 35 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. Responses due by 9/21/2009 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Certification, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
August 11, 2009 34 Featured Case Letter from Ken Schoen re withdrawal of motion to dismiss plaintiff's initial Complaint without prejudice re 28 Amended Complaint, 25 Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
August 10, 2009 33 Featured Case Letter from Ken Schoen re 28 Amended Complaint. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
August 7, 2009 Featured Case CLERKS QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter Doc. #32 filed by S. GOLDSTEIN on 8/3/2009 was submitted incorrectly as an Answer. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Letter USING Letter. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (nr, )
August 3, 2009 32 Featured Case ANSWER to Amended Complaint letter requesting that the Court excuse Tri-Union's obligation to respond to the Amended Complaint until after the motion to dismiss the original Complaint is decided by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C..(GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
August 2, 2009 Featured Case CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer - Document #31 submitted by S. GOLDSTEIN on 7/27/2009 has been DENIED. (nr, )
July 27, 2009 31 Featured Case Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
July 16, 2009 30 Featured Case REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 25 Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (SCHOEN, KENNETH)
July 13, 2009 29 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) Adjournment Request on Reply (3 days on consent) filed by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (SCHOEN, KENNETH)
July 8, 2009 28 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants all defendants., filed by DEBORAH FELLNER.(EICHEN, BARRY)
July 6, 2009 27 Featured Case BRIEF in Opposition re 25 Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. (Attachments: # 1 Certification, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(EICHEN, BARRY)
June 25, 2009 26 Featured Case ORDER adjourning the return date on deft's motion to dismiss to 7/20/2009. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 06/25/2009. (nr, )
June 5, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 25 Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Motion set for 7/6/2009 10:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, )
June 5, 2009 25 Featured Case Second MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Kenneth A. Schoen, Esq in support of motion to dismiss, # 2 Exhibit A to Schoen Certification, # 3 Exhibit B to Schoen Certification, # 4 Exhibit C to Schoen Certification, # 5 Exhibit D to Schoen Certification, # 6 Brief in support of motion to dismiss, # 7 Text of Proposed Order re motion to dismiss)(GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
May 18, 2009 24 Featured Case LETTER ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2009 at 10:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/18/09. (LM, )
May 15, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/15/2009. (drc, )
September 24, 2008 Featured Case Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 9/23/08. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (ji, )
September 23, 2008 23 Featured Case MANDATE of USCA as to 18 Notice of Appeal filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. (Attachments: # 1 Court's Opinion, # 2 Court's Mandate Letter)(ca3ai)
August 19, 2008 22 Featured Case USCA JUDGMENT as to 18 Notice of Appeal filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. The Judgment of the District Court entered January 9, 2007 is hereby Reversed and this matter is Remanded to the District Court for further proceedings. (ca3ai)
February 7, 2007 21 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by DEBORAH FELLNER re 18 Notice of Appeal (USCA), "None" selected in Section 1A. (ji, )
January 25, 2007 20 Featured Case USCA Appeal Fees received towards balance due of $ 200, receipt number 343456 re 18 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. (ji, )
January 25, 2007 19 Featured Case NOTICE OF DOCKETING FROM USCA FOR THE THIRD CIRCUIT for 18 Notice of Appeal filed by DEBORAH FELLNER. USCA Case Number: 07-1238. USCA Case Manager: Anthony Infante. (Document Restricted - Court Only)(Infante, Anthony)
January 23, 2007 18 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 17 Order by DEBORAH FELLNER. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number 343368. Balance due fof $200. USCA and counsel of record notified of appeal. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (ji, )
January 11, 2007 Featured Case ***Civil Case Terminated. (jd, )
January 8, 2007 17 Featured Case ORDER that deft's motions are granted. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 1/8/07. (jd, )
January 8, 2007 16 Featured Case OPINION . Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 1/8/07. (DD, )
June 20, 2006 Featured Case Motions No Longer Referred: 4 MOTION To Take Judicial Notice for Documents and Facts Listed Therein (LM, )
May 31, 2006 15 Featured Case Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHOEN, KENNETH)
May 16, 2006 14 Featured Case Letter from Kenneth A. Schoen. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3)(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
May 12, 2006 13 Featured Case STIPULATION of Dismissal of Class Action Allegations and Claims with prejudice by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (GOLDSTEIN, SCOTT)
April 26, 2006 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk : Telephone Conference held on 4/26/2006. (jr)
April 21, 2006 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for John Kierman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 04/21/06. (nr, )
April 10, 2006 11 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Reply Certification of Attorney Schoen# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3 (part 1 of 2)# 5 Exhibit 3 (part 2 of 2)# 6 Exhibit 4# 7 Exhibit 5 (part 1 of 3)# 8 Exhibit 5 (part 2 of 3)# 9 Exhibit 5 (part 3 of 3))(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
April 10, 2006 10 Featured Case ORDER admitting KHALID A. ELHASSAN, ESQ. pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiff. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 4/3/2006. (jr)
April 10, 2006 9 Featured Case Certification of BARRY R. EICHEN on behalf of DEBORAH FELLNER for admission of KHALID ELHASSAN pro hac vice. (jr)
April 10, 2006 8 Featured Case Certification of KHALID A. ELHASSAN on behalf of DEBORAH FELLNER in support of pro hac vice admission. (jr)
April 4, 2006 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 7 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John A. Kiernan, Esq.. Motion Hearing set for 5/8/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. (nr, ) (PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT)
April 4, 2006 7 Featured Case First MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John A. Kiernan, Esq. by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Scott H. Goldstein, Esq. in support of motion for pro hac vice admission for John Kiernan# 2 Certification of John Kiernan, Esq. in support of motion to admit pro hac vice# 3 Exhibit to certification of John Kiernan, Esq. (Certificate of Good Standing)# 4 Text of Proposed Order granting John Kiernan, Esq. pro hac vice admission)(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
March 10, 2006 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mark Falk : Telephone Conference held on 3/10/2006. (jr)
March 9, 2006 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Allegations, 5 MOTION to Dismiss, 4 MOTION To Take Judicial Notice for Documents and Facts Listed Therein. Motion Hearing set for 4/10/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh. (nr, )(PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT)
March 9, 2006 6 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Allegations by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. Responses due by 4/10/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion and Certificate of Service# 2 Certification Schoen Motion Dismiss Class Allegations# 3 Exhibit A - Schoen Certification# 4 Brief in Support of Mtn Dismiss Class Action Allegations (1 of 2)# 5 Brief in Support of Mtn Dismiss Class Action Allegations (2 of 2)# 6 Text of Proposed Order to Dismiss Class Action Allegations)(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
March 9, 2006 5 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. Responses due by 4/10/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Mtn to Dismiss Complaint (1 of 2)# 2 Brief in Support of Mtn to Dismiss Complaint (2 of 2)# 3 Notice of Motion with Certificate of Service# 4 Certification Schoen Motion to Dismiss Complaint# 5 Exhibit A - Schoen Certification# 6 Text of Proposed Order to Dismiss Complaint)(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
March 9, 2006 4 Featured Case MOTION To Take Judicial Notice for Documents and Facts Listed Therein by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Certification Schoen Mtn for Jud Ntc# 6 Text of Proposed Order Judicial Ntc# 7 Notice of Motion with Certificate of Service)(SCHOEN, KENNETH)
March 7, 2006 3 Featured Case LETTER ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 4/26/2006 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk. Signed by Judge Mark Falk on 3/6/2006. (jr)
February 22, 2006 2 Featured Case Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to answer to 3/9/06 as to Attorney KENNETH ANDREW SCHOEN for TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C. added.. (nr, )
February 15, 2006 1 Featured Case NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C. from SUPERIOR CT OF MORRIS CTY, case number L-232-06. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 336789) (Attachments: # 1 COMPLAINT# 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT# 3 CIS# 4 CIV COV SHT)(dr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: FELLNER v. TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH FELLNER
Represented By: BARRY R. EICHEN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRI-UNION SEAFOODS, L.L.C.
Represented By: KENNETH ANDREW SCHOEN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]