NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS, INC. et al v. OBAMA, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS, INC., MARIO A. CRISCITO, M.D. and ROE PATIENT
Defendant: BARACK OBAMA, TIMOTHY GEITHNER and KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv01489
Filed: March 24, 2010
 
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
Referring Judge: Madeline C. Arleo
Presiding Judge: Susan D. Wigenton
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2010 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS, INC. identifying New Jersey Physicians, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (CONROY, ROBERT)
March 30, 2010 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against MARIO A. CRISCITO, M.D., NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS, INC., ROE PATIENT, filed by MARIO A. CRISCITO, M.D..(CONROY, ROBERT) (THE PARTIES AGAINST SHOULD READ AGAINST BARACK OBAMA, ERIC HOLDER , TIMOTHY GEITHNER AND KATHLEEN SEBELIUS)
March 26, 2010 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TIMOTHY GEITHNER, ERIC HOLDER, BARACK OBAMA,, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Norma Rodriguez* (nr, ) Modified on 4/9/2010 (nr, ).
March 24, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against TIMOTHY GEITHNER, BARACK OBAMA,, KATHLEEN SEBELIUS, ERIC HOLDER ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 000414.) NO JURY DEMAND, filed by NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS, INC., MARIO A. CRISCITO, M.D., ROE PATIENT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sm, ) Modified on 4/9/2010 (nr, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS, INC. et al v. OBAMA, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY PHYSICIANS, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT J. CONROY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIO A. CRISCITO, M.D.
Represented By: ROBERT J. CONROY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROE PATIENT
Represented By: ROBERT J. CONROY
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARACK OBAMA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY GEITHNER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN SEBELIUS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]