NEALE et al v. VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al

Plaintiff: JOANNE NEALE and KERI HAY
Defendant: VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC and VOLVO CAR CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2010cv04407
Filed: August 30, 2010
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Newark Office
County: Bergen
Presiding Judge: Dennis M. Cavanaugh
Referring Judge: Joseph A. Dickson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2013 268 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 2/28/13. (jd, )
March 1, 2013 270 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 2/28/13. (jd, )
March 1, 2013 272 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 2/28/13. (jd, )
March 4, 2013 274 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 3/4/13. (jd, )
March 26, 2013 279 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 3/26/13. (jd, )
October 16, 2013 289 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 10/16/13. (jd, )
October 16, 2013 291 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 10/16/13. (jd, )
October 16, 2013 293 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 10/16/13. (jd, )
April 11, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Dennis M. Cavanaugh on 4/11/11. (jd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NEALE et al v. VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOANNE NEALE
Represented By: DAVID A. MAZIE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KERI HAY
Represented By: DAVID A. MAZIE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOLVO CARS OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VOLVO CAR CORPORATION
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]