SZELC v. STANGER et al

Plaintiff: RICHARD SZELC
Defendant: DAVID STANGER, WESTMARQ PROPERTY GROUP, LLC., PARKSTONE ACQUISITION, LLC, WESTMARQ LLC, WESTMARQ FUND MANAGEMENT I LLC, DAVID STONE, GABOR GOTTESMAN, BETTY J MULCH, MERIDIAN RESIDENTIAL CAPITAL LLC., MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC,, MADISON TITLE AGENCY, L.L.C., JOHN DOES 1-20 and XYZ COMPANIES 1-20
Case Number: 3:2008cv04782
Filed: September 25, 2008
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
County: Ocean
Referring Judge: John J. Hughes
Presiding Judge: Anne E. Thompson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 21, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion for Attorney Fees Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 7/21/2010. (ss, )
April 18, 2011 126 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 113 Deft Madison Title Agency's Motion for Summary Judgment; that Deft Madison Title Agency's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Counts I, V, X, and XII and DENIED as to all other Counts; granting in part and denying in part 111 Stanger Defts' Motion for Summary Judgment; that the Stanger Defts' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Counts V, X, and XII and DENIED as to all other Counts; denying 112 Deft GMAC's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 4/15/2011. (gxh)
November 21, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/21/2011. (gxh)
December 3, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER denying 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying without prejudice in part 68 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; awarding Gottesman certain declaratory relief. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/30/2009. (gxh)
February 12, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER denying 72 First American's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 74 Gabor Gottesman's Cross Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 2/11/2010. (gxh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SZELC v. STANGER et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SZELC
Represented By: EDWARD J. KELLEHER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID STANGER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMARQ PROPERTY GROUP, LLC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARKSTONE ACQUISITION, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMARQ LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMARQ FUND MANAGEMENT I LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID STONE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABOR GOTTESMAN
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BETTY J MULCH
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERIDIAN RESIDENTIAL CAPITAL LLC.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MADISON TITLE AGENCY, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ COMPANIES 1-20
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]