GROSSBERGER v. RUANE et al

Plaintiff: BEZALEL GROSSBERGER
Defendant: PATRICK RUANE and MARION RUANE
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv03728
Filed: June 29, 2011
 
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Presiding Judge: Anne E. Thompson
Referring Judge: Lois H. Goodman
 
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 23:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER denying 10 Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel; Ordering Plaintiff to respond to the pending Motion to Dismiss 9 in accordance with the normal briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 12/5/2011. (eaj)
December 14, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 12/14/2011. (eaj)
March 27, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Complaint. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 3/27/2012. (eaj)
May 8, 2012 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration; further Ordering that this case remains CLOSED. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 5/7/2012. (eaj)
May 14, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER that 28 Plaintiff's MOTION to Reopen Case is DENIED and that this case remains CLOSED. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 5/14/2012. (mmh)
September 25, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Reinstate the Complaint; Ordering that this case remains Closed; further Ordering that the Plaintiff is precluded from filing any further motions or pleadings in this matter without the expre ss written permission of this Court; further Ordering that the Clerk of Court be and hereby is directed not to accept for filing any submission by or on behalf of Bezalel Grossberger a/k/a Ben Gross. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 9/24/2012. (eaj)
January 2, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 12/31/2012. (eaj)
February 13, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 2/13/2013. (eaj)
November 3, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION & ORDER Denying Plaintiffs application for Pro Bono Counsel. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 11/2/2011. (eaj) Modified on 11/3/2011 (eaj).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: GROSSBERGER v. RUANE et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEZALEL GROSSBERGER
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK RUANE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARION RUANE
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]