ACRA TURF CLUB, LLC et al v. ZANZUCCKI

Plaintiff: ACRA TURF CLUB, LLC and FREEHOLD RACEWAY OFF TRACK, LLC
Defendant: FRANCESCO ZANZUCCKI
Case Number: 3:2012cv02775
Filed: May 9, 2012
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Monmouth
Referring Judge: Douglas E. Arpert
Presiding Judge: Joel A. Pisano
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 28, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Intervene. NJTHA and SBOA's Motion to Intervene under Federal Rule of CivilProcedure 24(a) is DENIED; NJTHA and SBOA's Motion to Intervene under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(b) is DENIED; NJTHA and SBOA's Motion for leave to file an Amicus Brief is GRANTED; NJTHA and SBOA may jointly file a single Amicus Brief, which complies with the requirements of Local Civil Rule 7.2, within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/28/2014. (mmh)
July 11, 2012 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 7/11/2012. (mmh)
February 27, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 2/26/2013. (mmh)
May 30, 2013 82 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/30/2013. (eaj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACRA TURF CLUB, LLC et al v. ZANZUCCKI
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACRA TURF CLUB, LLC
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL PELLECCHIA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREEHOLD RACEWAY OFF TRACK, LLC
Represented By: JOHN MICHAEL PELLECCHIA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCESCO ZANZUCCKI
Represented By: JULIE D. BARNES
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]