KAPLAN v. SAINT PETER'S HEALTHCARE SYSTEM et al

Movant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-20, SUSAN BALLESTERO, SAINT PETER'S HEALTHCARE SYSTEM, GARRICK STOLDT and RONALD C. RAK
Plaintiff: LAURENCE KAPLAN
Case Number: 3:2013cv02941
Filed: May 7, 2013
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Trenton Office
County: Middlesex
Referring Judge: Tonianne J. Bongiovanni
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Shipp
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2014 110 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/19/2014. (kas, )
December 12, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/12/2014. (jjc)
March 31, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 03/31/2014. (FH)
May 14, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER: Defendants' Request to stay briefing on Plaintiffs two pending motions (ECF Nos. 83, 89) is DENIED; Plaintiffs request to order Defendants' participation in a Rule 26(f) conference or for expedited discovery is DENIED. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 5/14/2014. (kas, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAPLAN v. SAINT PETER'S HEALTHCARE SYSTEM et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: MICHAEL CHARLES POLLACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN AND JANE DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN BALLESTERO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAINT PETER'S HEALTHCARE SYSTEM
Represented By: KATHERINE MARGUERITE LIEB
Represented By: JEFFREY J. GREENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GARRICK STOLDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD C. RAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURENCE KAPLAN
Represented By: DANIEL S. SOMMERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.