STC.UNM v. Intel Corporation Featured Case

Intel is sued for patent infringement by a University of New Mexico non-profit entity over double patterning lithography technology.

Plaintiff: STC. UNM
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 1:2010cv01077
Filed: November 15, 2010
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Brack
Referring Judge: W. Daniel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2012 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re 239 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply STC.UNM'S RESPONSE TO SANDIA CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY filed by STC. UNM. (Vogt, Keith)
August 17, 2012 242 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Intel Corporation re 228 Cross MOTION to Dismiss STC's Remaining Claims for Lack of Standing filed by Intel Corporation (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 17, 2012 241 REPLY to Response to Motion re 228 Cross MOTION to Dismiss STC's Remaining Claims for Lack of Standing filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
August 15, 2012 240 NOTICE by Intel Corporation re 239 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Statement of Non-Opposition to Sandia Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Surreply (Rodriguez, Justin)
August 15, 2012 239 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Sandia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (proposed surreply))(Dawes, Jaime)
August 9, 2012 238 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 235 Reply to Response to Motion Exhibit A to STC.UNM's Reply in Support of its Motion to Correct Standing and Request for Reconsideration by STC. UNM (Vogt, Keith)
August 9, 2012 237 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by STC. UNM re 218 MOTION for Reconsideration STC.UNM'S RULE 19 MOTION TO CORRECT STANDING AND REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by STC. UNM (Vogt, Keith)
August 7, 2012 236 FILED IN ERROR - APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 235 Reply to Response to Motion Exhibit A to STC.UNM's Reply in Support of its Motion to Correct Standing and Request for Reconsideration by STC. UNM (Vogt, Keith) Modified text to add error text on 8/9/2012 (jn).
August 3, 2012 235 REPLY to Response to Motion re 218 MOTION for Reconsideration STC.UNM'S RULE 19 MOTION TO CORRECT STANDING AND REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by STC. UNM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 27, 2012 234 NOTICE by Intel Corporation re 230 Response in Opposition to Motion Notice of Agreed Upon Extension Pursuant to D.N.M. LR-Civ. 7.4(a) (Rodriguez, Justin)
July 27, 2012 233 NOTICE by STC. UNM NOTICE OF AGREED UPON EXTENSION PURSUANT TO D.N.M.LR-Civ. 7.4(a) (Vogt, Keith)
July 25, 2012 232 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Responses to Intel's Third Set of Interrogatories (NO. 33) (Vogt, Keith)
July 25, 2012 231 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation of Intel Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff STC.UNM's Third Requests for Production No. 31 & Intel Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff STC.UNM's Fourth Set of Interrogatories No. 30 (Rodriguez, Justin)
July 24, 2012 230 RESPONSE in Opposition re 228 Cross MOTION to Dismiss STC's Remaining Claims for Lack of Standing filed by STC. UNM. (Vogt, Keith)
July 17, 2012 229 NOTICE by STC. UNM NOTICE OF AGREED UPON EXTENSION PURSUANT TO D.N.M.LR-Civ. 7.4(a) (Vogt, Keith)
July 10, 2012 228 Cross MOTION to Dismiss STC's Remaining Claims for Lack of Standing by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
July 10, 2012 227 DECLARATION re 226 Response in Opposition to Motion of Brian L. Ferrall by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Atkinson, Clifford)
July 10, 2012 226 RESPONSE in Opposition re 218 MOTION for Reconsideration STC.UNM'S RULE 19 MOTION TO CORRECT STANDING AND REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION of the Court's Summary Judgment Ruling filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
July 9, 2012 225 NOTICE by Sandia Corporation re 224 Response to Motion of Amended Exhibit (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (amended))(Dawes, Jaime)
July 3, 2012 224 RESPONSE to Motion re 218 MOTION for Reconsideration STC.UNM'S RULE 19 MOTION TO CORRECT STANDING AND REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Sandia Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Dawes, Jaime)
June 21, 2012 222 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Defendant Intel Corporation's Third Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff STC.UNM (Rodriguez, Justin)
June 18, 2012 221 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM STC's Third Request for Production No. 31 (Pedersen, Steven)
June 18, 2012 220 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM STC's Fourth Interrogatory No. 30 (Pedersen, Steven)
June 18, 2012 219 NOTICE by Intel Corporation re 218 MOTION for Reconsideration STC.UNM'S RULE 19 MOTION TO CORRECT STANDING AND REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION of Agreed Upon Extension Pursuant to D.N.M.LR-Civ. 7.4(a) (Rodriguez, Justin)
June 13, 2012 218 MOTION for Reconsideration STC.UNM'S RULE 19 MOTION TO CORRECT STANDING AND REQUEST FOR RECONSIDERATION by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Vogt, Keith)
June 4, 2012 217 Letter to the parties by District Judge Robert C. Brack (yc)
June 1, 2012 216 NOTICE by STC. UNM re 212 Letter (Pedersen, Steven)
May 24, 2012 215 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Service of Defendant Intel Corporation's Proposed Constructions for "Transferring" Steps of Claim 6 (Rodriguez, Justin)
May 18, 2012 214 NOTICE by Intel Corporation re 208 Memorandum Opinion and Order, Certification re Bill of Particulars (Atkinson, Clifford)
May 18, 2012 213 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's First Supplemental Response (to Intel's Second Amended response) to Plaintiff STC.UNM's Interrogatory No. 4 (Atkinson, Clifford)
May 18, 2012 212 Letter by the Court ref: Update on status (jac)
May 11, 2012 211 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Tutorial held on April 10, 2012, before Judge Robert C. Brack. Official Court Reporter Vanessa I. Alyce, Telephone number 575-528-1430. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at www.nmcourt.fed.us. Transcripts may be purchased from the official court reporter and/or viewed (but not copied) at the Clerk's Office public terminal within the 90-day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 5/18/2012. Redaction Request due 6/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2012.
May 11, 2012 210 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment held on April 10, 2012, before Judge Robert C. Brack. Official Court Reporter Vanessa I. Alyce, Telephone number 575-528-1430. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at www.nmcourt.fed.us. Transcripts may be purchased from the official court reporter and/or viewed (but not copied) at the Clerk's Office public terminal within the 90-day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 5/18/2012. Redaction Request due 6/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/9/2012.(va)
May 8, 2012 209 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack GRANTING 159 MOTION STC.UNMS MOTION FOR CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRANSFERRING STEPS IN CLAIM 6 (jn)
May 8, 2012 208 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack DENYING 169 MOTION to Strike 162 Answer to Counterclaim, Answer to Complaint, - Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense Nos. 1, 3, 6, 9 & 10 and to Dismiss Intel's Second Counterclaim (jn)
May 8, 2012 207 Featured Case ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack denying as moot 205 ORDER on Motion for Order (jn) Modified to add text on 5/9/2012 (yc).
May 8, 2012 206 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability and Memorandum in Support (jn)
April 25, 2012 205 MOTION for Order RULE 56(d) MOTION TO ADD TWO EXHIBITS by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11)(Pedersen, Steven)
April 18, 2012 204 Intel's RESPONSE to STC.UNM's Surreply to Intel's Motion for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability re 202 Reply, filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
April 11, 2012 202 STC.UNM'S SUR- REPLY re 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability and Memorandum in Support filed by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Keith Vogt with Exhibits_Part 1, # 2 Declaration of Keith Vogt with Exhibits_Part 2)(Pedersen, Steven)
April 10, 2012 203 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge Robert C. Brack: Motion Hearing held on 4/10/2012 re 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability and Memorandum in Support filed by Intel Corporation. (Court Reporter Vanessa Alyce) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (jjs)
April 10, 2012 201 Featured Case ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack granting 196 Motion for Leave to File (jjs)
April 10, 2012 200 NOTICE of Appearance by Raul A. Carrillo, Jr on behalf of STC. UNM (Carrillo, Raul)
April 6, 2012 199 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Sixth Supplemental Responses to Intel's First Set of Interrogatories (Vogt, Keith)
March 30, 2012 198 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum to Non-Parties (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Rodriguez, Justin)
March 16, 2012 197 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Privilege Log (02/17/12 Production) (Rodriguez, Justin)
March 6, 2012 196 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A Two Page Surreply by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A_Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A_Part 2)(Pedersen, Steven)
February 24, 2012 195 NOTICE of Hearing: Tutorial Session set for 4/10/2012 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (jac)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
February 16, 2012 194 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Intel Corporation re 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability and Memorandum in Support filed by Intel Corporation (Atkinson, Clifford)
February 16, 2012 193 DECLARATION re 192 Reply to Response to Motion of Brian L. Ferrall in Support of Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EE, # 2 Exhibit FF)(Atkinson, Clifford)
February 16, 2012 192 REPLY to Response to Motion re 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability and Memorandum in Support filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
February 16, 2012 191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Fifth Supplemental Responses to Intel's First Set of Interrogatories (Pedersen, Steven)
February 8, 2012 190 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Amended Privilege Log (11/4/11 Production) (Rodriguez, Justin)
February 7, 2012 189 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM (Vogt, Keith)
February 2, 2012 187 RESPONSE in Opposition re 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability and Memorandum in Support filed by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
February 1, 2012 186 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by STC. UNM re 169 MOTION to Strike 162 Answer to Counterclaim,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,, - Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense Nos. 1, 3, 6, 9 & 10 and to Dismiss Intel's Second Counterclaim MOTION to Strike 162 Answer to Counterclaim,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,, - Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense Nos. 1, 3, 6, 9 & 10 and to Dismiss Intel's Second Counterclaim filed by STC. UNM (Pedersen, Steven)
February 1, 2012 185 REPLY to Response to Motion re 169 MOTION to Strike 162 Answer to Counterclaim,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,, - Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense Nos. 1, 3, 6, 9 & 10 and to Dismiss Intel's Second Counterclaim MOTION to Strike 162 Answer to Counterclaim,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,, - Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense Nos. 1, 3, 6, 9 & 10 and to Dismiss Intel's Second Counterclaim filed by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
January 23, 2012 184 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER VACATING TUTORIAL HEARING set on January 27, 2012 at 9:00 am re 172 Notice of Hearing by District Judge Robert C. Brack. "THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED."(jac)
January 20, 2012 183 NOTICE by STC. UNM of Letter to Judge Robert C. Brack (Knoner, Deron)
January 20, 2012 182 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Amended Responses to Plaintiff STC.UNM's Interrogatory Nos. 22-23 (Rodriguez, Justin)
January 20, 2012 181 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Second Amended Response to Plaintiff STC.UNM's Interrogatory No. 4 (Rodriguez, Justin)
January 19, 2012 180 NOTICE by Intel Corporation Letter to the Honorable Judge Brack (Atkinson, Clifford)
January 19, 2012 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Unenforceability and Memorandum in Support by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
January 19, 2012 177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff STC.UNM's Third Set of Interrogatories Nos. 25-29 (Rodriguez, Justin)
January 18, 2012 176 DECLARATION re 175 Response in Opposition to Motion,, of Brian L. Ferrall in Support of Intel's Opposition to STC's Motion to Strike and Dismiss Intel's Invalidity Affirmative Defense and Counterclaim by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K - part 1, # 12 Exhibit K - part 2, # 13 Exhibit L)(Atkinson, Clifford)
January 18, 2012 175 RESPONSE in Opposition re 169 MOTION to Strike 162 Answer to Counterclaim,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,, - Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense Nos. 1, 3, 6, 9 & 10 and to Dismiss Intel's Second Counterclaim MOTION to Strike 162 Answer to Counterclaim,,,,,, Answer to Complaint,,,,, - Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense Nos. 1, 3, 6, 9 & 10 and to Dismiss Intel's Second Counterclaim filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
January 18, 2012 174 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Fourth Supplemental Responses to Intel's First Set of Interrogatories (Pedersen, Steven)
January 18, 2012 173 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider (mm)
January 11, 2012 172 AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing (to change time): Technology Tutorial Session set for 1/27/2012 at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (jac)
January 6, 2012 171 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider GRANTING 67 Defendant's Motion to Amend Interim Protective Order. (sco)
January 4, 2012 170 STC.UNM'S ANSWER to 162 Answer to Counterclaim and Answer to Complaint - STCS ANSWER TO INTELS SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS by STC. UNM.(Pedersen, Steven) Modified text on 1/9/2012 (vh).
January 4, 2012 169 MOTION to Strike 162 Answer to Counterclaim and Answer to Complaint - Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense Nos. 1, 3, 6, 9 & 10 and to Dismiss Intel's Second Counterclaim by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Pedersen, Steven) Modified text on 1/9/2012 (vh).
December 22, 2011 168 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack DENYING 145 MOTION to Bifurcate and Early Trial on Damages. Related document(s): 152 Response in Opposition to Motion, 146 Memorandum in Support, (yc)
December 20, 2011 167 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Third Set of Interrogatories Nos. 25-29 (Pedersen, Steven)
December 16, 2011 166 NOTICE of Hearing: Technology Tutorial Session set for 1/27/2012 at 10:30 AM in Las Cruces - 440 Guadalupe Courtroom (North Tower) before District Judge Robert C. Brack. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit letter)(jac)
December 16, 2011 165 NOTICE by STC. UNM - JOINT NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION (Pedersen, Steven)
December 14, 2011 164 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by STC. UNM re 159 MOTION STC.UNMS MOTION FOR CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRANSFERRING STEPS IN CLAIM 6 filed by STC. UNM (Pedersen, Steven)
December 14, 2011 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re 159 MOTION STC.UNMS MOTION FOR CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRANSFERRING STEPS IN CLAIM 6 filed by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B)(Pedersen, Steven)
December 7, 2011 162 Intel Corporation's First Amended ANSWER to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 38 Answer to Counterclaim,, Answer to Complaint,,, 1 Complaint, ANSWER to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 38 Answer to Counterclaim,, Answer to Complaint,,, 1 Complaint, ANSWER to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 38 Answer to Counterclaim,, Answer to Complaint,,, 1 Complaint and Second, Amended COUNTERCLAIM to STC.UNM's Complaint against STC. UNM by Intel Corporation. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by STC. UNM, 38 Answer to Counterclaim,, Answer to Complaint,,, filed by Intel Corporation, 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Intel Corporation.(Baker, Douglas)
December 6, 2011 161 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Privilege Log (11/4/11 Production) (Rodriguez, Justin)
November 30, 2011 160 RESPONSE in Opposition re 159 MOTION STC.UNMS MOTION FOR CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRANSFERRING STEPS IN CLAIM 6 filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Atkinson, Clifford)
November 16, 2011 159 MOTION STC.UNMS MOTION FOR CONSTRUCTION OF THE TRANSFERRING STEPS IN CLAIM 6 by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from B. Smith Testimony)(Pedersen, Steven)
November 2, 2011 158 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY BRIEF ON REQUEST FOR LIVE EXPERT TESTIMONY AT THE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING re 155 Response, 147 Reply, filed by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
October 24, 2011 157 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by STC. UNM re 145 MOTION to Bifurcate and Early Trial on Damages filed by STC. UNM (Pedersen, Steven)
October 24, 2011 156 REPLY to Response to Motion re 145 MOTION to Bifurcate and Early Trial on Damages filed by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F)(Pedersen, Steven)
October 19, 2011 155 Intel's RESPONSE to STC's Request for Live Testimony re Claim Construction re 147 Reply, filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
October 13, 2011 154 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Duke Rodriguez on behalf of Intel Corporation (Rodriguez, Justin)
October 13, 2011 153 STC.UNM's REPLY /Supplemental Answer to Intel's Amended Counterclaims re 38 Answer to Counterclaim,, Answer to Complaint,,, filed by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
October 11, 2011 152 RESPONSE in Opposition re 145 MOTION to Bifurcate and Early Trial on Damages filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
October 7, 2011 151 NOTICE by Intel Corporation re 110 Brief, 135 Declaration, 133 Response, 111 Declaration, 134 Response, 148 Reply, 112 Declaration, 149 Declaration, 113 Brief, 147 Reply, of Completion of Briefing on Claim Construction (Rodriguez, Justin)
October 7, 2011 150 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation re 149 Declaration of Benedict Y. Hur in Support of Intel's Sur-Reply on Claim Construction (Rodriguez, Justin)
October 7, 2011 149 DECLARATION re 148 Reply of Benedict Y. Hur in Support of Intel's Sur-Reply on Claim Construction by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Atkinson, Clifford)
October 7, 2011 148 Intel's Sur- REPLY on Claim Construction re 110 Brief, 133 Response, 111 Declaration, 112 Declaration, filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
October 7, 2011 147 STC.UNM'S REPLY BRIEF ON THE ISSUE OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION re 113 Brief, filed by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 8 - [Excerpts from] Smith Deposition, # 2 Exhibit 9 - Smith Dep Exh 2, # 3 Exhibit 10 - RIT Website, # 4 Exhibit 11 - Smith Dep Exh 9, # 5 Exhibit 12 - Smith Dep Exh 10, # 6 Exhibit 13 - Smith Dep Exh 11, # 7 Exhibit 14 - Smith Dep Exh 12, # 8 Exhibit 15 - Smith Dep Exh 5)(Pedersen, Steven)
September 27, 2011 146 MEMORANDUM in Support re 145 MOTION to Bifurcate and Early Trial on Damages by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Article, Reverse Bifurcation, # 2 Exhibit B - Litigation Handbook, # 3 Exhibit C - AIPLA Report 2009, # 4 Exhibit D - Intel Amended Resp_ STC First Set of Interr Nos. 1-21)(Pedersen, Steven)
September 27, 2011 145 MOTION to Bifurcate and Early Trial on Damages by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
September 26, 2011 144 Featured Case ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack denying 45 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and adopting Report and Recommendations re 140 Report and Recommendations. (bc)
September 23, 2011 143 Intel's RESPONSE to STC's Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations on STC's Motion to Dismiss and Strike Intel's Inequitable Conduct Allegations re 140 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability filed by STC. UNMREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability filed by STC. UNM, 141 Objections to Report and Recommendations, filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Atkinson, Clifford)
September 21, 2011 142 NOTICE by STC. UNM - JOINT NOTICE OF AGREED EXTENSION (Pedersen, Steven)
September 8, 2011 141 OBJECTIONS to 140 Report and Recommendations, filed by STC. UNM. Related document: 140 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability filed by STC. UNMREPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability filed by STC. UNM.(Pedersen, Steven)
August 25, 2011 140 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability filed by STC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit: timeline(sco)
August 25, 2011 139 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for DR. CHRIS MACKS OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES TO INTEL CORPORATIONS SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM (Pedersen, Steven)
July 29, 2011 138 NOTICE of Change of Address by Clifford K. Atkinson (Atkinson, Clifford)
July 28, 2011 137 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff STC.UNM's Second Set of Interrogatories Nos. 22-24 and Second Set of Requests for Production Nos. 20-30 (Rodriguez, Justin)
July 25, 2011 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation re 135 Declaration of Dr. Bruce Smith in Support of Intel's Response Brief on Claim Construction (Rodriguez, Justin)
July 25, 2011 135 DECLARATION re 134 Response Supplemenal Declaration of Dr. Bruce Smith in Support of Intel's Response Brief on Claim Construction by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Atkinson, Clifford)
July 25, 2011 134 Intel's RESPONSE to STC's Opening Brief on Claim Construction re 113 Brief, filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
July 25, 2011 133 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re 110 Brief filed by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3 - IEDM Article, # 2 Exhibit 4 - Semiconductor International Article, # 3 Exhibit 5 - 998 Response and Amendment 01141999, # 4 Exhibit 6 - 998 Response and Amendment 05181999, # 5 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Dr. Chris Mack)(Pedersen, Steven)
July 21, 2011 132 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE by District Judge Robert C. Brack to U.S. Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider to conduct hearings, perform legal analysis, and ultimate disposition; Objections shall be filed within fourteen (14) days of entry of the proposed disposition. (bc)
July 21, 2011 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM (Vogt, Keith)
July 20, 2011 129 NOTICE by Intel Corporation Letter to The Honorable Robert C. Brack (Baker, Douglas)
July 15, 2011 128 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 126 Motion to Amend/Correct (mm)
July 14, 2011 127 NOTICE by Intel Corporation Letter to The Honorable Robert C. Brack (Baker, Douglas)
July 14, 2011 126 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 100 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct - Unopposed Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order [Doc. No. 100] by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
July 11, 2011 125 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for STC's Third Supplemental Responses to Intel's First Set of Interrogatories (Pedersen, Steven)
July 8, 2011 124 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 123 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 7/29/2011 (mm)
July 7, 2011 123 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 109 Order to Discovery Objections Under D.N.M. LR-Civ.26.6 by Intel Corporation. (Rodriguez, Justin)
June 30, 2011 122 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 120 ORDER on Motion to Extend. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm)
June 29, 2011 120 Joint MOTION to Extend (other) Time to Respond to Discovery Objections Under D.N.M. LR-CIV.26.6 by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven) Modified text on 6/30/2011, taking the Motion to Expedite off due to error, per attorneys request (gr).
June 27, 2011 119 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM (Vogt, Keith)
June 27, 2011 118 ERRATA re 112 Declaration, Notice of Errata Regarding Declaration of Brian Ferrall [Doc. No. 112] by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2A)(Rodriguez, Justin)
June 24, 2011 117 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Second Set of Interrogatories Nos. 22-24 (Pedersen, Steven)
June 24, 2011 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Second Set of Requests for Production Nos. 20-30 (Pedersen, Steven)
June 23, 2011 115 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation re 111 Declaration, 112 Declaration, mailing of Declarations of Bruce Smith and Brian Ferrall on June 21, 2011 (Rodriguez, Justin)
June 22, 2011 114 NOTICE by STC. UNM re 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 63 Order on Motion for Protective Order - Notice of Stipulation (Pedersen, Steven)
June 21, 2011 113 BRIEF - STC'S INITIAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by STC. UNM (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - (Part 1) Annotated '998 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 1 - (Part 2) Annotated '998 Patent, # 3 Exhibit 1 - (Part 3) Annotated '998 Patent, # 4 Exhibit 1 - (Part 4) Annotated '998 Patent, # 5 Exhibit 2 - (Part 1) Declaration of Dr. Chris Mack, # 6 Exhibit 2 - (Part 2) Declaration of Dr. Chris Mack)(Pedersen, Steven)
June 21, 2011 112 DECLARATION re 110 Brief of Brian Ferrall by Intel Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Atkinson, Clifford)
June 21, 2011 111 DECLARATION re 110 Brief of Bruce Smith by Intel Corporation (Atkinson, Clifford)
June 21, 2011 110 BRIEF on Claim Construction by Intel Corporation (Atkinson, Clifford)
June 17, 2011 109 Featured Case ORDER by District Judge Robert C. Brack re 106 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Discovery Objections Under D.N.M. LR-Civ.26.6 filed by Intel Corporation (yc)
June 17, 2011 108 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC NO. 106) AND EXTEND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES by District Judge Robert C. Brack re 106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (yc)
June 16, 2011 107 NOTICE by STC. UNM REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT (Pedersen, Steven)
June 15, 2011 106 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Discovery Objections Under D.N.M. LR-Civ.26.6 by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
June 10, 2011 105 BRIEF re 102 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 103 Response, by STC. UNM (Pedersen, Steven)
June 9, 2011 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for Brueck Privileged Document List Version II (Vogt, Keith)
June 9, 2011 103 Intel's RESPONSE to STC's Submission of Supplemental Authority Regarding STC's Motion to Dismiss Intel's Inequitable Conduct Allegations re 101 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A Submission of Supplemental Authority filed by Intel Corporation. (Rodriguez, Justin)
June 9, 2011 102 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 101 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (sco)
June 3, 2011 101 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File A Submission of Supplemental Authority by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 STC'S SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY OF AN EN BANC FEDERAL CIRCUIT DECISION IN SUPPORT OF ITS 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS INTEL'S COUNTERCLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FOR INEQUITABLE CONDUCT)(Pedersen, Steven)
June 1, 2011 100 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 97 Motion to Amend/Correct (mm)
May 31, 2011 99 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider denying 54 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery (sco)
May 31, 2011 98 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 95 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (sco)
May 31, 2011 97 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct 75 Order on Motion to Extend (other) : Unopposed Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Doc. No. 75) and Extend Claim Construction Deadlines by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
May 26, 2011 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re 95 MOTION for Leave to File To File A Supplemental Submission In Support of Motion to Compel filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Atkinson, Clifford)
May 25, 2011 95 MOTION for Leave to File To File A Supplemental Submission In Support of Motion to Compel by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 STC's Supplemental Submission In Support of Motion to Compel, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Pedersen, Steven)
May 23, 2011 94 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on May 18, 2011, before Judge W. Daniel Schneider. Court Reporter/Transcriber Julie Goehl, Telephone number 505-348-2209. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that each party now has seven (7) calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of any personal identifiers from this transcript. If no notice is filed during this seven-day period, the court will assume that redaction of personal data is not necessary and will make the transcript electronically available, as is, to the public after 90 days. For additional guidance, PLEASE REVIEW the complete policy, located in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures Manual at www.nmcourt.fed.us. Transcripts may be purchased from the court reporter and/or viewed (but not copied) at the Clerk's Office public terminal within the 90-day period. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction set for 5/31/2011. Redaction Request due 6/13/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/23/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2011.(jg)
May 19, 2011 93 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider: Discovery Hearing was held on 5/18/2011. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm)
May 16, 2011 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Its Response and Objection to Plaintiff STC.UNM's Request for Entry onto Land (Rodriguez, Justin)
May 4, 2011 91 Featured Case ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 54 MOTION to Compel : by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2011 at 09:00 AM in Albuquerque - 420 Mimbres Courtroom before Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider. (mm)
May 3, 2011 90 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for STC'S CORRECTED SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO INTEL'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (Pedersen, Steven)
May 2, 2011 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM (Vogt, Keith)
May 2, 2011 88 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM For STC's Second Supplemental Responses to Intel's First Set of Interrogatories (Pedersen, Steven)
April 29, 2011 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Preliminary Construction Claim Terms (Rodriguez, Justin)
April 29, 2011 86 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for STC'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTIONS (Pedersen, Steven)
April 28, 2011 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM (Vogt, Keith)
April 26, 2011 84 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by STC. UNM re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability filed by STC. UNM (Pedersen, Steven)
April 26, 2011 83 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by Intel Corporation re 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 63 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Intel Corporation (Rodriguez, Justin)
April 26, 2011 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 63 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
April 26, 2011 81 NOTICE of Briefing Complete by STC. UNM re 54 MOTION to Compel filed by STC. UNM (Pedersen, Steven)
April 25, 2011 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for STC'S RESPONSES TO INTEL CORPORATION'S SECOND SET OF INTERROGRATORIES AND STC'S RESPONSES TO INTEL CORPORATION'S SECOND SET OF REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION (Pedersen, Steven)
April 22, 2011 79 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for STC.UNM's Amended Response to Intel Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production (Vogt, Keith)
April 21, 2011 78 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Defendant Intel Corporation's Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action issued to Saleem H. Zaide and Amended Notice to Take Videotaped Deposition of Saleem H. Zaidi (Rodriguez, Justin)
April 18, 2011 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re 54 MOTION to Compel filed by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
April 18, 2011 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 63 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Pedersen, Steven)
April 18, 2011 75 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 74 ORDER on Motion to Extend (mm)
April 15, 2011 74 Unopposed MOTION to Extend (other) Scheduling Order and Extend Claim Construction Deadlines by Intel Corporation. (Rodriguez, Justin)
April 15, 2011 73 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM - STC's Request for Entry Onto Land (Pedersen, Steven)
April 14, 2011 72 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Subpoenas to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action issued to Sandia Corporation and Sandia National Laboratories (Atkinson, Clifford)
April 14, 2011 71 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Notices of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) issued to Sandia Corporation and Sandia National Laboratories (Atkinson, Clifford)
April 5, 2011 70 DECLARATION re 66 Response in Opposition to Motion, 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 63 Order on Motion for Protective Order of Malcom Harkins by Intel Corporation (Atkinson, Clifford)
April 5, 2011 69 DECLARATION re 66 Response in Opposition to Motion, 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 63 Order on Motion for Protective Order of Steven Lund by Intel Corporation (Atkinson, Clifford)
April 5, 2011 68 DECLARATION re 66 Response in Opposition to Motion, 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 63 Order on Motion for Protective Order of Mark T. Bohr by Intel Corporation (Atkinson, Clifford)
April 5, 2011 67 MOTION to Amend/Correct 63 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
April 5, 2011 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re 54 MOTION to Compel filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Atkinson, Clifford)
April 1, 2011 65 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Amended Responses to Plaintiff STC.UNM's First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 1-21 and Amended Responses to Plaintiff STC.UNM's First Set of Requests for Production Nos. 1-19 (Rodriguez, Justin)
April 1, 2011 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for Its SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSES TO INTEL'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES (NOS. 1, 2, 4-7, 10, 11, 13-16, 20-23, & 26-28) (Pedersen, Steven)
March 30, 2011 63 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 61 Motion for Protective Order (mm)
March 30, 2011 62 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM - AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for its Objections and Responses to Intel Corporations' Subpoena Duces Tecum (Vogt, Keith)
March 30, 2011 61 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2)(Atkinson, Clifford)
March 30, 2011 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for service of Subpoenas to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action (Rodriguez, Justin)
March 29, 2011 59 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Objections and Responses to Intel Corporations' Subpoena Duces Tecum (Vogt, Keith)
March 28, 2011 58 REPLY to Response to Motion re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability filed by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pedersen, Steven)
March 24, 2011 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation of Its Second Set of Interrogatories and Second Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff STC.UNM (Atkinson, Clifford)
March 24, 2011 56 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM (Vogt, Keith)
March 22, 2011 55 MEMORANDUM in Support re 54 MOTION to Compel filed by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Pedersen, Steven)
March 22, 2011 54 MOTION to Compel by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
March 21, 2011 53 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 52 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Discovery Motions (sco)
March 21, 2011 52 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Discovery Objections Under D.N.M. LR-Civ.26.6 by Intel Corporation. (Atkinson, Clifford)
March 14, 2011 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability filed by Intel Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Atkinson, Clifford)
March 7, 2011 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM - STC'S Responses to Intel's First Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 1-29) (Pedersen, Steven)
March 4, 2011 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Intel Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 1-21 and Intel Corporation's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production Nos. 1-19 (Atkinson, Clifford)
March 3, 2011 48 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Response to Intel Corporation's First Set of Requests for Production (Vogt, Keith)
March 2, 2011 47 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider (mm)
February 28, 2011 46 MEMORANDUM in Support re 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability filed by STC. UNM. (Knoner, Deron)
February 28, 2011 45 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Amended Counterclaim and Strike Intel's Affirmative Defense for Unenforceability by STC. UNM. (Knoner, Deron)
February 28, 2011 44 STC.UNM's REPLY /Answer to Intel's Amended Counterclaim re 38 Answer to Counterclaim, Answer to Complaint filed by STC. UNM. (Knoner, Deron) Modified text on 3/1/2011 (yc).
February 23, 2011 43 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider: Scheduling Conference was held on 2/23/2011. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (mm)
February 16, 2011 42 Joint Status Report by STC. UNM (Knoner, Deron)
February 16, 2011 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM For Joint Status Report (Knoner, Deron)
February 15, 2011 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for Initial Disclosures of Defendant Intel Corporation (Baker, Douglas)
February 14, 2011 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Counterclaim For Unenforceability as Moot filed by Intel Corporation. (Baker, Douglas)
February 14, 2011 38 Intel Corporation's ANSWER to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 1 Complaint, ANSWER to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, 1 Complaint, Amended COUNTERCLAIM against STC. UNM by Intel Corporation. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by STC. UNM, 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Intel Corporation.(Baker, Douglas)
February 14, 2011 37 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Request for Entry Onto Land to Defendant, Intel Corporation (Pedersen, Steven)
February 14, 2011 36 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its Plaintiff's Rule 26(a) Disclosure to Defendant, Intel Corporation (Pedersen, Steven)
February 4, 2011 35 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY FOR ATTORNEY STEVEN PEDERSON re 32 Certificate of Service, 33 Certificate of Service (yc)
February 3, 2011 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for its First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff STC.UNM (Baker, Douglas)
February 3, 2011 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its First Set of Interrogatories Nos. 1-21 to Defendant, Intel Corporation (Pedersen, Steven)
February 3, 2011 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by STC. UNM for its First Set of Requests for Production Nos. 1-19 to Defendant, Intel Corporation (Pedersen, Steven)
February 1, 2011 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Intel Corporation for its First Set of Requests for Production to Plaintiff STC.UNM (Baker, Douglas)
January 31, 2011 30 STC.UNM's Answer To Intel's Counterclaims... ANSWER to 26 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by STC. UNM.(Pedersen, Steven)
January 31, 2011 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re 28 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Counterclaim For Unenforceability filed by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
January 31, 2011 28 MOTION to Dismiss Intel's Counterclaim For Unenforceability by STC. UNM. (Pedersen, Steven)
January 24, 2011 27 Featured Case INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider Joint Status Report due by 2/16/2011. Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2011 at 09:10 AM in Albuquerque - 720 Judge W. Daniel Schneider Chambers before Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider. (mm)
January 10, 2011 26 ANSWER to 1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against STC. UNM by Intel Corporation. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by STC. UNM.(Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 25 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Appearance of Jonathan L. McFarland and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 24 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Appearance of Mark E. Strickland and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 23 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Appearance of Timothy J. Franks and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 22 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Appearance of Jonathan M. James and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 21 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Appearance of Chad S. Campbell and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 20 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Appearance of Benedict Y. Hur and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 19 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Appearance of Paven Malhotra and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 18 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Appearance of Brian L. Ferrall and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 17 NOTICE by Intel Corporation of Appearance of Robert A. Van Nest and Certificate of Good Standing (Baker, Douglas)
December 22, 2010 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford K. Atkinson on behalf of Intel Corporation (Atkinson, Clifford)
December 22, 2010 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A. Baker on behalf of Intel Corporation (Baker, Douglas)
December 9, 2010 14 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants time to answer or otherwise respond to STC.UNMs Complaint is extended to January 10, 2011. THIS IS A TEXT ENTRY ONLY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (sco)
December 8, 2010 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by STC. UNM. (Knoner, Deron)
November 24, 2010 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by STC. UNM. Intel Corporation served on 11/19/2010, answer due 12/10/2010. (Knoner, Deron)
November 17, 2010 Summons Issued as to Intel Corporation. (mr)
November 15, 2010 U.S. District Judge Robert C. Brack and U.S. Magistrate Judge W. Daniel Schneider are assigned. (jm)
November 15, 2010 11 Report re: patent/trademark/copyright (jm)
November 15, 2010 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STC. UNM (Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 9 NOTICE by STC. UNM of Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Good Standing for Keith A. Vogt (Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 8 NOTICE by STC. UNM Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Good Standing for George C. Summerfield (Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 7 NOTICE by STC. UNM Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Good Standing for Rolf O. Stadheim (Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 6 NOTICE by STC. UNM of Appearance and Certificate of Good Standing for Steven R. Pedersen (Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 5 NOTICE by STC. UNM of Entry of Appearance and Certificate of Good Standing for Joseph A. Grear (Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 4 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 3 Appendix/Supplement Addition to Civil Cover Sheet by STC. UNM (Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 3 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by STC. UNM (Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by STC. UNM (Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 Filing Fee Received: $ 350 receipt number 1084-1767601 re 1 Complaint filed by STC. UNM (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Knoner, Deron)
November 15, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Intel Corporation ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by STC. UNM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part One), # 2 Exhibit A (Part Two))(Knoner, Deron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STC.UNM v. Intel Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STC. UNM
Represented By: Joseph A. Grear
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intel Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]