Basis International Ltd. v. Research in Motion Ltd. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Basis International Ltd.
Defendant: Research in Motion Ltd. and Research in Motion Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv00953
Filed: October 24, 2011
 
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Albuquerque Office
County: Bernalillo
Presiding Judge: William P. Johnson
Referring Judge: Alan C. Torgerson
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2011 34 Featured Case TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by District Judge William P. Johnson (mag)
December 6, 2011 33 NOTICE by Research in Motion Corporation Notice of Supplemental Authority (Rettew, Douglas)
December 6, 2011 32 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Basis International Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Muehlenweg, Robert)
December 5, 2011 31 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before District Judge William P. Johnson: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/5/2011. (Court Reporter T. Garrett) (vv)
December 1, 2011 30 EMERGENCY MOTION for Court Teleconference by Research in Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Pound, John) Modified on 12/2/2011 TO ADD TEXT (vv).
December 1, 2011 29 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 24 Declaration, 26 Appendix/Supplement, 27 Appendix/Supplement, 25 Appendix/Supplement, 28 Appendix/Supplement Exhibit E by Basis International Ltd. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
December 1, 2011 28 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 24 Declaration, 26 Appendix/Supplement, 27 Appendix/Supplement, 25 Appendix/Supplement Exhibit D by Basis International Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement)(Muehlenweg, Robert)
December 1, 2011 27 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 24 Declaration, 26 Appendix/Supplement, 25 Appendix/Supplement Exhibit C by Basis International Ltd. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
December 1, 2011 26 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 24 Declaration, 25 Appendix/Supplement Exhibit B by Basis International Ltd. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
December 1, 2011 25 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 24 Declaration Exhibit A by Basis International Ltd. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
December 1, 2011 24 DECLARATION re 22 Brief of Bradley J. Powers in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Basis International Ltd. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
December 1, 2011 23 NOTICE of Hearing:Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/5/2011 at 01:30 PM - 640 Judge William P. Johnson Chambers. The parties are to call the "meet-me-conference line" at (505) 348-2308. (mag)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.]
November 30, 2011 22 BRIEF re 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Basis International Ltd. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
November 30, 2011 21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Basis International Ltd.. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
November 25, 2011 20 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Research in Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd.. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Basis International Ltd..(Pound, John)
November 23, 2011 19 BRIEF re 18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Research in Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. (Pound, John)
November 23, 2011 18 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Research in Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd.. (Pound, John)
November 23, 2011 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Research in Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Research in Motion Corporation for Research in Motion Corporation, Research in Motion Ltd.. (Pound, John)
November 23, 2011 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas A Rettew and Danny M Awdeh on behalf of All Defendants (Pound, John) Modified on 11/23/2011 TO ADD ATTORNEYS NAMES (vv).
November 22, 2011 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John B Pound on behalf of All Defendants (Pound, John)
November 21, 2011 14 NOTICE REGARDING DOCUMENT ENTRIES: Because this case has been reassigned to a district judge, please be advised that any documents filed by the parties under Rule 73(b) have been permanently removed from the docket. Document(s) removed: No. 11. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dc)
November 17, 2011 13 MINUTE ORDER by the Clerk of Court District Judge William P. Johnson added; District Judge Martha Vazquez no longer assigned to this case. (mjr)
November 16, 2011 12 MINUTE ORDER by Matthew J. Dykman, Clerk of Court, reassigning case to District Judge Martha Vazquez. Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia is no longer assigned to case. (jc)
November 16, 2011 10 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 9 Brief Exhibit to Affidavit of Christine Lebron-Dykeman by Basis International Ltd. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
November 16, 2011 9 BRIEF re 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Basis International Ltd. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Nico Spence, # 2 Affidavit of Christine Lebron-Dykeman)(Muehlenweg, Robert)
November 16, 2011 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Basis International Ltd.. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
November 14, 2011 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Basis International Ltd. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
November 14, 2011 6 NOTICE by Basis International Ltd. Certificate of Good Standing (Muehlenweg, Robert)
November 3, 2011 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Basis International Ltd.. Research in Motion Corporation served on 11/3/2011, answer due 11/25/2011. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
October 26, 2011 Summons Issued as to Research in Motion Corporation. (ah)
October 25, 2011 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of An Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright (jc)
October 25, 2011 3 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmcourt.fed.us for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ah)
October 25, 2011 Magistrate Judge Lorenzo F. Garcia and Magistrate Judge Alan C. Torgerson assigned. (ah)
October 25, 2011 2 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re 1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Basis International Ltd. (Muehlenweg, Robert)
October 24, 2011 Filing Fee Received: $ 350 receipt number 1084-2253183 re 1 Complaint filed by Basis International Ltd. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Muehlenweg, Robert)
October 24, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Basis International Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Muehlenweg, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Basis International Ltd. v. Research in Motion Ltd. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basis International Ltd.
Represented By: Christine Lebron-Dykeman
Represented By: Elizabeth Heaphy
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Harty
Represented By: Robert J. Muehlenweg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion Ltd.
Represented By: Danny M Awdeh
Represented By: John B Pound
Represented By: Douglas A Rettew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Research in Motion Corporation
Represented By: Danny M Awdeh
Represented By: John B Pound
Represented By: Douglas A Rettew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]