Siegel, et al v. Warner Bros., Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Joanne Siegel and Laura Siegel Larson
Defendant: Warner Bros., Inc.
Case Number: 6:2006mc00020
Filed: August 1, 2006
Court: New Mexico District Court
Office: Santa Fe Office
County: Santa Fe
Presiding Judge: Martha Vazquez
Referring Judge: Martha Vazquez
Nature of Suit: 999
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2006 11 Featured Case MEMORANDUM, OPINION, AND ORDER: by Chief Judge Martha Vazquez denying deft's mtn to compel [1-1] dismissing case (cc: all counsel) * (vv)
September 13, 2006 10 CERTIFICATE of service re defts' reply to counsel on 9/12/06 (td)
September 12, 2006 9 NOTICE of completion of briefing of mtn to compel by deft [1-1] (mjr)
September 12, 2006 8 MEMORANDUM in support of reply to mtn to compel by deft [7-1] (mjr)
September 11, 2006 7 REPLY by Patrick T. Perkins counsel for deft in support of mtn to compel [1-1] (mjr)
August 25, 2006 6 DECLARATION of Marc Toberoff re response to mtn to compel [5-1] (td)
August 25, 2006 5 RESPONSE by Mark Peary & Jean Peavy to mtn to compel (td)
August 10, 2006 4 2nd CERTIFICATE of service by deft Warner Bros of submission of mtn & memorandum to compel to counsel on 8/9/06 by mail & 8/2/06 by e-mail (td)
August 2, 2006 3 CERTIFICATE of service re mtn to compel & memo in support to counsel on 8/1/06 (td)
August 1, 2006 FILING FEE PAID: on 8/1/06 in the amount of $39.00, receipt #: 505603. (td)
August 1, 2006 2 MEMORANDUM by deft in support of mtn to compel [1-1] (td)
August 1, 2006 1 MISCELLANEOUS CASE: Motion to Compel Production of Documents pursuant to Subpoena Duces Tecum, for Contempt & for attys' fees (td)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Mexico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Siegel, et al v. Warner Bros., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Siegel
Represented By: Marc Toberoff(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Siegel Larson
Represented By: Marc Toberoff(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros., Inc.
Represented By: Patrick T Perkins(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.