Federal Trade Commission v. Consumer Health Benefits Association et al

Defendant: Consumer Health Benefits Association, Louis Leo, National Association for Americans and National Benefit Consultants, LLC
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Case Number: 1:2010cv03551
Filed: August 3, 2010
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: I. Leo Glasser
Referring Judge: Roanne L. Mann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 8, 2011 194 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER/REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re Plaintiff's Response to Suggestion of Bankruptcy dated 4/25/11, DE #156, Order to Show Cause; Order to Show Cause dated 5/6/11,DE #168, Defendants Ronald and Rita Werner's Affirmation in Res ponse to the Order to Show Cause dated 5/11/22 and Schantz Letter, DE #169; Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause dated 5/19/11, D.E. #186. For the reasons stated in the Courts opinion, the Court rules that the b ankruptcy petitions filed by National Benefit Consultants, LLC, National Benefit Solutions, LLC, Consumer Health Benefits Consultants, LLC and Ronald and Rita Werner do not operate to stay the instant case as to any defendant. The Court recommends t hat the District Court decline to impose Rule 11 sanctions. Any objections to the rulings and/or recommendations contained in this Memorandum and Order must be filed with the Honorable I. Leo Glasser on or before June 27, 2011. Failure to file objec tions in a timely manner may waive a right to appeal the District Court order. The Clerk is directed to enter this Memorandum and Order into the ECF system and to transmit copies to the pro se defendants via Federal Express. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 6/8/2011. (Mann, Roanne)
August 18, 2011 240 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying as moot 167 Motion for Leave to File; denying as moot 167 Motion for Pre Motion Conference; granting 203 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement; denying as moot 222 Motion for Hearing. For the reasons stated in t he Memorandum and Order, this Court grants the FTC's motion to amend the complaint and add new defendants. Any objections to the ruling contained in the Memorandum and Order must be filed with the Hon. I. Leo Glasser on or before 9/6/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann on 8/18/2011. (Mann, Roanne)
November 10, 2011 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. For the reasons set forth above, the applications for fees and reimbursement of expenses are hereby GRANTED as follows:(1)Tese & Milner is allowed fees of $121,997.00 and reimbursement of ex penses of $6,870.24; and (2)EisnerAmper is allowed fees of $116,120.00 and reimbursement of expenses of $9,763.00. The Receiver's application for compensation pursuant to the Escrow Agent is hereby DENIED without prejudice to renewal. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 11/10/2011.
December 9, 2011 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 264 re 130 filed by Angela Tese-Milner. The Receiver's application is hereby GRANTED and the Receiver is hereby discharged. The Court will retain jurisdiction over the Receiver concerning any future actions relating to her appointment or authority pursuant to the Orders.Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/9/2011.
May 23, 2012 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 265 266 267 268 269 Motions to Dismiss. For all of the foregoing reasons, Tow, Schwartz, and the GTLI Defendants' motions to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and Rule 9(b) are DENIED. The GTLI Defendants' motion for a more definite statement pursuant to Rule 12(e) is also DENIED. Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 5/21/2012.
September 22, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulated Order of Preliminary Injunction as to Defendant Louis Leo. So Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser on 9/21/2010. (Lee, Tiffeny)
October 12, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER endorsed on doc.# 46 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Dawn M. Canty, Esq. is admitted to this Court, pro hac vice, as counsel for Respondents Guarantee Trust Life Insurance Company, Century Senior Services, and Vantage America Solutions, Inc . in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including rules governing discipline of attorneys. As this action is assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password. Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of Court. (Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser, on 10/5/2010) C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
October 12, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER endorsed on doc.# 57 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Gil M. Soffer, Esq. is admitted to this Court, pro hac vice, as counsel for Respondents Guarantee Trust Life Insurance Company, Century Senior Services, and Vantage America Solutions, In c. in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including rules governing discipline of attorneys. As thi s action is assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password. Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of Court. (Ordered by Senior Judge I. Leo Glasser, on 10/10/2010) C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. Consumer Health Benefits Association et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consumer Health Benefits Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Leo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association for Americans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Benefit Consultants, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Karen Anne Dahlberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]