Plumbers and Gas Fitters Local Union No. 1 v. United States Department of the Interior

Plaintiff: Plumbers and Gas Fitters Local Union No. 1
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv04882
Filed: October 22, 2010
 
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Carol B. Amon
Referring Judge: Roanne L. Mann
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. The DOI is hereby ordered to produce the "hours worked" data of the payroll forms within ten (10) days of the issuance of this Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 10/26/2011. (Amon, Carol)
November 10, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this Court's Memorandum and Order 25 issued 10/26/11, and to close this case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 11/9/2011. (fwd for judgment) (Fernandez, Erica)
November 15, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT directing that the United States Department of Interior's motion for summary judgment is denied and the United States Department of Interior is ordered to produce the data in the "hours worked" columns of the Gateway Project payroll forms. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 11/14/2011. c/m with appeal pkg (Fernandez, Erica) Modified on 11/15/2011 (Fernandez, Erica).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Plumbers and Gas Fitters Local Union No. 1 v. United States Department of the Interior
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers and Gas Fitters Local Union No. 1
Represented By: Lloyd Robert Ambinder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]