Williams v. Frank Martz Coach Company et al

Defendant: FH Family LP, Frank Martz Coach Company, Patrick Graham and Liang Tian
Cross Defendant: FH Family LP and Liang Tian
Cross Claimant: FH Family LP, Frank Martz Coach Company, Patrick Graham and Liang Tian
Plaintiff: Jerold Williams
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv01860
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Brooklyn Office
Presiding Judge: Margo K. Brodie
Referring Judge: Marilyn D. Go
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2014 55 Featured Case ORDER denying 50 Motion to Change Venue. For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum and order, defendants' motion to change venue is denied. Oral argument scheduled for May 27, 2014 is canceled as moot. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/14/2014. (Ramos, Christopher)
May 29, 2014 60 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER: the plaintiff's proposed protective order (ct. doc. 43-2) is "so ordered" subject to the modifications in the attached order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marilyn D. Go on 5/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (Proujansky, Josh)
June 30, 2014 65 Featured Case ORDER denying 58 Motion for Reconsideration. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, Defendants' motion for reconsideration is denied. Ordered by Judge Margo K. Brodie on 6/30/2014. (Ramos, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Williams v. Frank Martz Coach Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FH Family LP
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Martz Coach Company
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Graham
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liang Tian
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Represented By: Jeff J. Imeri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: FH Family LP
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Liang Tian
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Represented By: Jeff J. Imeri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: FH Family LP
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Frank Martz Coach Company
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Patrick Graham
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: Liang Tian
Represented By: Adam C Calvert
Represented By: Jeff J. Imeri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerold Williams
Represented By: Nicholas I. Timko
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]