CDR-Wantagh, Inc. et al v. Motiva Enterprises LLC

Plaintiff: CDR-Wantagh, Inc. and Christine D. Rivera
Defendant: Shell Oil Company and Motiva Enterprises LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2007cv04497
Filed: October 26, 2007
 
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: Denis R. Hurley
Referring Judge: Michael L. Orenstein
 
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 5, 2012 102 Featured Case ORDER re 100 : For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order plaintiff's request that the Court defer calculation of attorney's fees is granted. As set forth in the attached decision, the Clerk of the Court is hereby dire cted to enter judgment in accordance with the Court's December 20, 2011 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. The case is not, however, to be marked closed because the issue of attorney's fees remains to be resolved. To that end, the p arties are directed to notify the Court within fourteen (14) days of the Second Circuit's decision on plaintiffs' appeal. At that time, the Court will set a briefing schedule on any appropriate motion for attorney's fees by the prevailing party. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 1/5/2012. (Malley, Sean)
March 31, 2009 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 26 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 29 MOTION for Summary Judgment. For the reasons set forth herein, Pltffs' motion for partial summary judgment, and Defts' motion for summary judgment, are both DENIED. ( Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 3/31/09.) (Fagan, Linda)
February 28, 2011 65 Featured Case ORDER denying 54 Motion in Limine. For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order, Defendants' motion to strike the Expert Report and preclude Mr. Balin from testifying at trial is DENIED. The parties are directed to contact Magistrate Judge William D. Wall's Chambers forthwith, at (631) 712-5720, to schedule a final settlement conference. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 2/28/2011. (Monaco, Laura)
March 1, 2011 66 Featured Case ORDER: The Court will begin the Bench Trial on 3/21/2011 at 10:00 AM before Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley.. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 3/1/2011. (Best, Patricia)
December 20, 2011 98 Featured Case FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; Motions terminated: 68 MOTION in Limine is denied in part and denied as moot. Rulings on 85 Motion in Limine were made from the bench during trial and the motion is terminated. Ordered by Senior Judge Denis R. Hurley on 12/20/2011. (Best, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: CDR-Wantagh, Inc. et al v. Motiva Enterprises LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CDR-Wantagh, Inc.
Represented By: Robert M. Calica
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine D. Rivera
Represented By: Robert M. Calica
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Oil Company
Represented By: William A. Ruskin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motiva Enterprises LLC
Represented By: William A. Ruskin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]