Plumbers' & Pipefitters' Local #562 Supplemental Plan & Trust et al v. J.P. Morgan Acceptance Corporation I et al

Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A4, J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A3, J.P.Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A1, J.P.Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A2, J.P. Morgan Acceptance Corporation I, David M. Duzyk, J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., J.P. Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-A3, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-A4, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-A5, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-A6, J.P. Morgan Acquisition Trust 2006-A7, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-ACC1, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-CH2, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-HE2, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-HE3, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-NC1, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-RM1, J.P. Morgan Acquisition Trust 2006-S2, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WF1, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC2, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC3, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC4, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-S1, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-A1, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-A2, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-CH1, J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-CH2, J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-S4, J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A5, J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A6, J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A7, J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-S1, J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-S2, J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-S3, Louis Schioppo, Jr., Christine E. Cole and Edwin F. McMichael
Plaintiff: Plumbers' & Pipefitters' Local #562 Supplemental Plan & Trust and Plumbers' & Pipefitters' Local #562 Pension Fund
Case Number: 2:2008cv01713
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: Edward R. Korman
Referring Judge: William D. Wall
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion to Intervene; granting 105 Motion to Intervene. Because the Intervenors have established intervention as of right under Rule 24(a)(2) and their respective claims are not time-barred by Section 13s statute of limitation s or statute of repose, the motions to intervene are granted. Because an order granting a motion to intervene is not appealable, see Ionian Shipping Co. v. British Law Ins., 426 F.2d 186, 188 (1970), and because the issue is a close one in which the case law-consisting of thoughtful and well-reasoned opinions-goes both ways, I would be willing to entertain a motion to amend the opinion to include a certification pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292(b). The motion should be made within ten days of the date of this order. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 12/13/2011. (Schwenk, Andrew)
December 13, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Dismiss. The defendants motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Specifically, material misstatements and omissions regarding the appraisal standards and the underwriting gu idelines are sufficiently pled. The same is true with respect to the Section 11 claims (and corresponding Section 15 claims) based on the following Certificates: JPMMT 2006-A1 2A2; JPMMT 2006-A5 2A1; JPMMT 2007-A1 6A1; JPMALT 2006-A4 A7; JPMMAT 2006- CH2 AV2. The Section 12(a)(2) claim (and corresponding Section 15 claim) based on JPMALT 2006-A4 A7 is also sufficiently pled. The Lead Plaintiff is granted leave to replead, except as to Article III standing, tranche-based statutory standing, and economic loss based on JPMMT 2006-A3 7A1 and JPMMAT 2006-RM1 A2. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 12/13/2011. (Schwenk, Andrew)
February 7, 2012 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER temporarily denying 120 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. Defendants motion to amend that decision to include certification for interlocutory appeal pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b), filed on December 23, 2011, is stayed. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 2/7/2012. (Schwenk, Andrew)
February 23, 2012 153 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER re 118 Order on Motion to Dismiss. The Lead Plaintiff, in a letter docketed as ECF No. 152, correctly notified the court of a clerical mistake in the court's original Order on Motion to Dismiss, ECF No. 118. This Order corrects that mistake. Ordered by Senior Judge Edward R. Korman on 2/23/2012. (Schwenk, Andrew)
August 23, 2012 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 129 Motion to Intervene. IPERS' motion to intervene is granted pursuant to the limits explained in this Order. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 8/23/2012. (Schwenk, Andrew)
September 14, 2012 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 127 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. The lead plaintiff's motion is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Edward R. Korman on 9/14/2012. (Casteel, Heather)
November 5, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plaintiff filed by Iron Workers Mid-America Pension Plan, the Structural Ironworkers Local Union No. 1 Pension Trust Fund, 18 MOTION to Appoint Counsel and Lead Plainti ff filed by Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi. For the reasons set forth in the attached report, it is recommended that MPERS' motion 18 be granted and that Iron Workers Funds' motion 15 be denied. Entered by Magistrate Judge William D. Wall on 11/5/2009. c/e (Disbrow, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumbers' & Pipefitters' Local #562 Supplemental Plan & Trust et al v. J.P. Morgan Acceptance Corporation I et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A3
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P.Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P.Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Acceptance Corporation I
Represented By: Dorothy Jane Spenner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Duzyk
Represented By: Patrick M. McGuirk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities Inc.
Represented By: Patrick M. McGuirk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-A3
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-A4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-A5
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-A6
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Acquisition Trust 2006-A7
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-ACC1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-CH2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-HE2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-HE3
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-NC1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-RM1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Acquisition Trust 2006-S2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WF1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC3
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2006-WMC4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-S1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-A1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-A2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-CH1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Trust 2007-CH2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-S4
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A5
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A6
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-A7
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-S1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-S2
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Alternative Loan Trust 2006-S3
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Schioppo, Jr.
Represented By: Dorothy Jane Spenner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine E. Cole
Represented By: Dorothy Jane Spenner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin F. McMichael
Represented By: Dorothy Jane Spenner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers' & Pipefitters' Local #562 Supplemental Plan & Trust
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers' & Pipefitters' Local #562 Pension Fund
Represented By: Samuel H. Rudman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]