Carver et al v. Nassau County Interim Finance Authority et al

Plaintiff: Thomas R. Willdigg, James Carver and Gary Learned
Defendant: County of Nassau, Edward Mangano, George Maragos, George J. Marlin, Nassau County Interim Finance Authority, Ronald A. Stack, Christopher P. Wright, Leonard D. Steinman, Thomas W. Stokes and Robert A. Wild
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv01614
Filed: April 1, 2011
 
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
Referring Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Presiding Judge: Leonard D. Wexler
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 103 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; In accordance with the decision of the Second Circuit, this court directs Plaintiffs to inform this court, within one week of the date of this order, whether they intend to pursue their state law claim in a state forum, or aband on that claim and pursue only this federal action. In theevent that Plaintiffs elect to proceed with the statutory construction claim in state court, this court will exercise the discretion to stay this action, along with the related actions that are presently pending before this court. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 9/25/2013.) (Fagan, Linda)
October 3, 2013 105 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; For the reasons stated herein, this court willexercise its discretion to stay this federal action pending completion of the state court proceedings. Accordingly, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close the file in this case at this time. The closing of this matter is without prejudice to re-opening, upon letter application, at the conclusionof the state court proceedings. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 10/3/2013.) (Fagan, Linda)
February 14, 2013 95 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. For the reasons stated herein, the court grants Plainti ffs' motion for summary judgment and denies Defendants' motions for summary judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions docketed under docket numbers 68, 72, 79 and 83 in this matter. Plaintiffs' are directed to a submit an appropriate judgment on notice within two weeks of the date of this order. (Ordered by Judge Leonard D. Wexler on 2/14/2013.) (Fagan, Linda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carver et al v. Nassau County Interim Finance Authority et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Willdigg
Represented By: Harry Greenberg
Represented By: Seth H. Greenberg
Represented By: Alan M. Klinger
Represented By: Dina Kolker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Carver
Represented By: Seth H. Greenberg
Represented By: Harry Greenberg
Represented By: Alan M. Klinger
Represented By: Dina Kolker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Learned
Represented By: Harry Greenberg
Represented By: Seth H. Greenberg
Represented By: Alan M. Klinger
Represented By: Dina Kolker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Nassau
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Mangano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Maragos
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George J. Marlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nassau County Interim Finance Authority
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald A. Stack
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher P. Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard D. Steinman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas W. Stokes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Wild
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]