Luo v. Baldwin Union Free School District et al

Defendant: Michelle Gallo, Susan M. Gibson, Baldwin Union Free School District and Robert Briglio
Counter Defendant: Jenn-Ching Luo
Plaintiff: Jenn-Ching Luo
Counter Claimant: Robert Briglio
Case Number: 2:2012cv03073
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: New York Eastern District Court
Office: Central Islip Office
Presiding Judge: Joanna Seybert
Referring Judge: A. Kathleen Tomlinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 18 Motion to Dismiss Case as Frivolous; denying 19 Motion to Dismiss. For the foregoing reasons, Gibson and Briglio's motions to dismiss are GRANTED. The District and Gallo's partial motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's motion to dismiss Briglio's coun terclaim is DENIED. Plaintiff's remaining claims, therefore, are his claim for IDEA administrative review, and his Section 1983 claims against Gallo and the District for (a) failing to consider information regarding B.L.'s placement in a C amphill-like setting and thus not providing Plaintiff a meaningful opportunity to recommend an educational placement, and (b) conducting administrative proceedings in which erroneous arguments were made and adopted. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Gibson and Briglio as Defendants in this action; Robert Briglio and Susan M. Gibson terminated. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this Order to the pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 3/21/2013. C/M; C/ECF (Valle, Christine)
February 12, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 37 is GRANTED and Briglio's counterclaim against Plaintiff is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff's renewed Motion to Dismiss Briglio's Counterclaim 76 is DENIED AS MO OT and Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions 73 is DENIED. On Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 63 , the Court RESERVES JUDGMENT. The District and Gallo are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE, within 30 days of the date of this Order, why Plaintiff's Moti on to Strike should not be granted. If they do no do so, the District and Gallo are in danger of being in default. The Court certifies that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and in forma pauperis status is DENIED for the purpose of an appeal. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 2/12/2014. (C/M Plaintiff) (Nohs, Bonnie)
August 12, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER - For the foregoing reasons, Judge Tomlinsons May 20, 2013 Order is AFFIRMED, and Plaintiffs motion to strike is DENIED. the Court certifies that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Ord er would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45, 82 S. Ct. 917, 8 L. Ed. 2d 21 (1962). The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to the pro se Plaintiff. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 8/12/2014. C/M to pro se Plaintiff via FCM. (Coleman, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luo v. Baldwin Union Free School District et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Gallo
Represented By: Jeltje DeJong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan M. Gibson
Represented By: Ralph A. Catalano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baldwin Union Free School District
Represented By: Jeltje DeJong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Briglio
Represented By: Martin J. Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jenn-Ching Luo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenn-Ching Luo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Robert Briglio
Represented By: Martin J. Coleman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]