View 360 Solutions LLC v. Google, Inc. Featured Case

Defendant: Google, Inc.
Plaintiff: View 360 Solutions LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv01352
Filed: August 31, 2012
 
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Albany Office
County: Albany
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Presiding Judge: Glenn T. Suddaby
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2014 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 8/27/2014 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8618 once all counsel are on the line. This number is a conference line and should be used only at the time of the conference.(rjb, )
June 2, 2014 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Status Conference held on 6/2/2014. Appearances: Timothy Grochocinski, Esq. for Plaintiff; Cono Carrano, Esq., Douglas Nash, Esq. and Stephen Chow, Esq. for Defendants. Judge Dancks has reviewed Dkt. No. 113 and discusses it with counsel. Discovery on the standing issue will be permitted. Counsel are to complete discovery on the standing issue by 10/27/2014 and file any motions to dismiss on this issue by 11/17/14. A follow up conference will be scheduled. (Court Reporter Jodi Hibbard; 10:03AM-10:20AM) (rjb, )
May 23, 2014 113 LETTER BRIEF Regarding Discovery by Google, Inc.. (Carrano, Cono)
May 16, 2014 112 Grandeye Ltd.'s ANSWER to View 360's 88 Amended Complaint, and , ANSWER to Google's 91 Crossclaims, .(Chow, Stephen)
April 30, 2014 111 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Google, Inc.. Grandeye Limited waiver sent on 4/9/2014, answer due 7/8/2014. (Carrano, Cono)
April 29, 2014 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 6/2/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Defendant's attorney is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8618 once all counsel are on the line. This number is a conference line and should be used only at the time of the conference.(rjb, )
April 28, 2014 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Conference held on 4/28/2014. Appearances: Benjamin Askew, Esq., Daniel Sleasman, Esq. and Timothy Grochocinski, Esq. for Plaintiff; David Vondle, Esq., Cono Carrano, Esq. and Jason Halpin, Esq. for Defendants. Counsel report on the status of the case. Counsel anticipate Grandeye appearing 5/16/2014. A follow up conference will be scheduled to discuss the stay issues. Counsel will confer regarding the discovery on standing before the next conference. One week before the next conference Attorney Carrano will file a letter with the Court detailing what discovery on the standing issue is anticipated. (FTR Recorded; 11:04AM-11:18AM) (rjb, )
April 24, 2014 110 Minds-Eye-View, Inc.'s ANSWER to pltfs' 88 Amended Complaint, with answer to Google's 91 Crossclaims.(Grochocinski, Timothy)
April 7, 2014 109 SUMMONS Returned Executed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Grandeye Limited served on 3/24/2014, answer due 4/14/2014. (Askew, Benjamin)
April 3, 2014 108 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed letter motion (Dkt. No. 107) for extension of time for MEV to respond to Counterclaims. Letter motion granted. MEV's response to Counterclaims due 4/25/2014. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 4/3/14. (rjb, )
April 2, 2014 107 Letter Motion for Minds-Eye-View, Inc. requesting Extension of Time to Answer Crossclaim submitted to Judge Dancks . (Grochocinski, Timothy)
March 25, 2014 106 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting # 103 Plaintiff's Letter Request to terminate Aaron W. Purser from this docket. Authorized by Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/25/14. (lmw)
March 25, 2014 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy E. Grochocinski on behalf of Minds-Eye-View, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
March 25, 2014 104 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy E. Grochocinski on behalf of Ford Oxaal (Grochocinski, Timothy)
March 25, 2014 103 Letter Motion for View 360 Solutions LLC requesting Leave to Withdraw Attorney Aaron W. Purser submitted to Judge Glenn T. Suddaby . (Grochocinski, Timothy)
March 24, 2014 102 Pltf Ford Oxaal's ANSWER to deft Google's 91 Answer to Amended Complaint, affirmative defenses, counterclaims and Crossclaims. (Askew, Benjamin)
March 24, 2014 101 Pltf View 360 Solution's ANSWER to deft Google's 91 Amended answer, affirmative defenses, Crossclaims and Counterclaims. (Askew, Benjamin)
March 24, 2014 100 NOTICE by Ford Oxaal, View 360 Solutions LLC re 95 Order on Letter Request,, Plaintiffs' Notice of Service (Askew, Benjamin)
March 20, 2014 99 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Carnie on behalf of Ford Oxaal (Carnie, Kevin)
March 20, 2014 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy D. Krieger on behalf of Ford Oxaal (Krieger, Timothy)
March 20, 2014 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Kella on behalf of Ford Oxaal (Kella, Michael)
March 20, 2014 96 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony G. Simon on behalf of Ford Oxaal (Simon, Anthony)
March 20, 2014 95 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Court has reviewed letter motion (Dkt. No. 94) for extension of time for MEV to file answer. Letter motion granted as follows: MEV must answer or otherwise respond to the first amended complaint by 4/25/2014. Plaintiff to serve a copy of this text order on MEV by 3/24/2014. Conference call scheduled for 4/28/2014 at 11:00 AM. Parties should be prepared to address resetting deadlines including claim construction. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8618 once all counsel are on the line. This number is a conference line and should be used only at the time of the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/20/14. (rjb, )
March 19, 2014 94 Letter Motion from Benjamin R. Askew for Ford Oxaal, View 360 Solutions LLC requesting Extension of Defendant Minds-Eye-View, Inc.'s deadline to file an Answer or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Askew, Benjamin)
March 19, 2014 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin R. Askew on behalf of Ford Oxaal (Askew, Benjamin)
March 14, 2014 92 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Google Inc.'s 91 First Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims and Crossclaims to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint; First Amended Complaint and Summons served on Dionne Mills, Mind's-Eye-View, Inc. c/o The Company Corporation, Registered Agent on March 12, 2014, filed by Google, Inc.. (Carrano, Cono)
March 7, 2014 91 First Amended ANSWER to 88 Amended Complaint, , with CROSSCLAIM against Minds-Eye-View, Inc., Grandeye Limited, Oncam Global Group AG, and COUNTERCLAIM against Ford Oxaal, View 360 Solutions LLC by Google, Inc.(Carrano, Cono)
February 28, 2014 90 SUMMONS Returned Executed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Minds-Eye-View, Inc. served on 2/26/2014, answer due 3/19/2014. (Askew, Benjamin)
February 24, 2014 ***Answer due date updated for Google, Inc.; Answer to the 88 Amended Complaint due 3/7/2014. (amt)
February 24, 2014 89 Summons Issued as to Grandeye Limited, Minds-Eye-View, Inc., Oncam Global Group AG, Ford Oxaal. (Attachments: # 1 Grandeye Limited summons, # 2 Mind's Eye summons, # 3 Oncam Global UK summons, # 4 Oncam Global Switz summons)(amt)
February 21, 2014 88 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Grandeye Limited, Oncam Global Group AG d/b/a Oncam Grandeye, Minds-Eye-View, Inc. filed by View 360 Solutions LLC, Ford Oxaal. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1 - U.S. Patent No. 6,157,385, # 2 Exhibit(s) 2 - U.S. Patent No. 6,731,284, # 3 Exhibit(s) 3 - U.S. Patent No. 6,243,099, # 4 Exhibit(s) 4 - U.S. Patent No. 6,271,853, # 5 Exhibit(s) 5 - U.S. Patent No. 7,542,035, # 6 Exhibit(s) 6 - U.S. Patent No. 6,252,603, # 7 Exhibit(s) 7 - U.S. Patent No. 6,323,862, # 8 Exhibit(s) 8 - U.S. Patent No. 8,077,176, # 9 Proposed Summons Grandeye Limited, # 10 Proposed Summons Minds-Eye-View, Inc., # 11 Proposed Summons Oncam Global Group AG, # 12 Proposed Summons Oncam Global Group AG, # 13 Proposed Summons Ford Oxaal)(Askew, Benjamin)
February 18, 2014 87 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Telephone Conference held on 2/7/2014 before Judge Therese Wiley Dancks, Court Reporter: Jodi L. Hibbard, Telephone number: (315) 234-8547. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within 5 business days of this date. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.nynd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within 5 business days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available on the web 90 days from today's date. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2014. Notice of Intent to Redact due by 2/24/2014 (jlh, )
February 18, 2014 86 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Digitally-Recorded Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2013 before Judge Therese Wiley Dancks, Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jodi L. Hibbard, Telephone number: (315) 234-8547. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within 5 business days of this date. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.nynd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within 5 business days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available on the web 90 days from today's date. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/11/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2014. Notice of Intent to Redact due by 2/24/2014 (jlh, )
February 13, 2014 85 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST: filed by Megan A. Summerfield, on behalf of View 360 Solutions LLC for proceedings held on 10/31/2013 and 2/7/2014 telephone conferences before Judge Therese W. Dancks. (jmb)
February 11, 2014 84 Featured Case ORDER granting 72 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Amended complaint and proposed summonses to be filed within 10 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/11/14. (Attachments: # 1 Transcript) (rjb, )
February 10, 2014 83 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by View 360 Solutions LLC for proceedings held on February 7, 2014 before Judge Therese Wiley Dancks.. (Askew, Benjamin)
February 10, 2014 82 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by View 360 Solutions LLC for proceedings held on October 31, 2013 before Judge Therese Wiley Dancks.. (Askew, Benjamin)
February 7, 2014 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Motion Hearing held on 2/7/2014 re: 72 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Appearances: Anthony Simon, Esq., Benjamin Askew, Esq. and Daniel Sleasman, Esq. for Plaintiff; Cono Carrano, Esq. and Douglas Nash, Esq. for Defendant. Judge Dancks hears from Attorneys Simon and Carrano on Plaintiff's 72 Motion to Amend and gives a bench ruling. Plaintiff's motion is granted, a short order will be issued. (Court Reporter Jodi Hibbard) (rjb, )
January 30, 2014 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing CHANGE on 72 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint : The Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 is rescheduled for 2/7/2014 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8618 once all counsel are on the line. This number is a conference line and should be used only at the time of the conference.(rjb, )
December 2, 2013 TEXT NOTICE of Hearing on Plaintiff's 72 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 1/31/2014 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8618 once all counsel are on the line. This number is a conference line and should be used only at the time of the conference. (rjb, )
November 20, 2013 TEXT NOTICE: The 72 Motion to Amend will be heard on submission of the papers only. Counsel will be notified if oral argument is necessary. (rjb, )
November 5, 2013 Sealed documents attached to Dkt. No. 80. (rjb, )
November 5, 2013 81 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 79 Letter Request to file documents under seal. The Court will contact counsel with an e-mail address that they can use to submit the sealed documents. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 11/5/13. (rjb, )
November 4, 2013 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re 72 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) E, # 2 Exhibit(s) H, # 3 Exhibit(s) I)(Carrano, Cono) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2013: # 4 Response in Opposition, # 6 Exhibit(s) A - Declaration of Cono Carrano, Esq., # 7 Exhibit(s) B, # 8 Exhibit(s) C, # 9 Exhibit(s) D, # 10 Exhibit(s) F, # 11 Exhibit(s) G) (rjb, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2013: # 11 Exhibit(s) G) (rjb, ).
November 4, 2013 79 LETTER BRIEF Requesting Leave to File Under Seal by Google, Inc.. (Carrano, Cono) Modified on 11/5/2013 (rjb, ).
October 31, 2013 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2013. Appearances: Anthony Simon, Esq., Benjamin Askew, Esq., Daniel Sleasman, Esq. and Timothy Grochocinski, Esq. for Plaintiff; David Vondle, Esq., Cono Carrano, Esq. and Douglas Nash, Esq. for Defendant. Judge Dancks hears from counsel on Plaintiff's request for a stay. Judge Dancks stays discovery pending a decision on the motion to amend. A conference call will be scheduled once a decision is issued to discuss briefing on the stay issue. (FTR Recorded) (rjb, )
October 28, 2013 78 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 76 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy D. Krieger. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/28/13. (rjb, )
October 25, 2013 77 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 75 Letter Request. Telephone Conference set for 10/31/2013 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8618 once all counsel are on the line. This number is a conference line and should be used only at the time of the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/25/13. (rjb, )
October 24, 2013 76 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy D. Krieger Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-2737332. filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affirmation, # 2 Exhibit(s), # 3 Exhibit(s), # 4 Exhibit(s)) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Sleasman, Daniel)
October 22, 2013 75 Letter Motion from Anthony G. Simon for View 360 Solutions LLC requesting Telephonic Conference submitted to Judge Dancks . (Simon, Anthony)
October 21, 2013 74 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 73 Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to attach the sealed documents to the 72 Motion. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/21/13. (rjb, )
October 18, 2013 73 MOTION to Seal Motion and Exhibits filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (rjb, )
October 18, 2013 72 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2013 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks Response to Motion due by 11/4/2013 filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A - First Amended Complaint - Redline, # 2 Exhibit(s) B- First Amended Complaint - Clean, # 3 Exhibit(s) C - Askew Decl., Ex. 1, # 4 Exhibit(s) C - Askew Decl., Ex. 3, # 5 Exhibit(s) C - Askew Decl., Ex. 8, # 6 Exhibit(s) C - Askew Decl., Ex. 9) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Askew, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/21/2013: # 7 Declaration of Benjamin Askew, # 8 Exhibit(s) 2 to Askew Declaration (Exh. C), # 9 Exhibit(s) 4 to Askew Declaration (Exh. C), # 10 Exhibit(s) 5 to Askew Declaration (Exh. C), # 11 Exhibit(s) 6 to Askew Declaration (Exh. C), # 12 Exhibit(s) 7 to Askew Declaration (Exh. C), # 13 Exhibit(s) 10 to Askew Declaration (Exh. C), # 14 Exhibit(s) 11 to Askew Declaration (Exh. C), # 15 Exhibit(s) D, # 16 Memorandum of Law) (rjb, ).
October 16, 2013 71 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Digitally-Recorded Telephone Conference held on 10/1/2013 before Judge Therese Wiley Dancks, Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jodi L. Hibbard, Telephone number: (315) 234-8547. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within 5 business days of this date. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.nynd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within 5 business days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available on the web 90 days from today's date. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/18/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/14/2014. Notice of Intent to Redact due by 10/21/2013 (jlh, )
October 11, 2013 70 Featured Case TEXT ORDER approving 69 Stipulation - Motion to Amend due by 10/18/2013. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/11/13. (rjb, )
October 10, 2013 69 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by View 360 Solutions LLC submitted to Judge Dancks. (Askew, Benjamin)
October 9, 2013 68 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by View 360 Solutions LLC for proceedings held on 10/1/2013 before Judge Therese Wiley Dancks.. (Askew, Benjamin)
October 1, 2013 67 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's 58 Motion to Amend is withdrawn at the request of Plaintiff's counsel. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/1/13. (rjb, )
October 1, 2013 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Conference held on 10/1/2013. Appearances: Anthony Simon, Esq., Benjamin Askew, Esq. and Timothy Grochocinski, Esq. for Plaintiff; David Vondle, Esq., Cono Carrano, Esq. and Douglas Nash, Esq. for Defendant. Judge Dancks discusses Dkt. Nos. 64 and 66 with counsel. Plaintiff is granted leave to withdraw their 58 motion to amend and file a new motion to amend by 10/11/2013. (FTR Recorded) (rjb, )
September 25, 2013 66 RESPONSE TO LETTER BRIEF filed by Google, Inc. as to 65 Order on Letter Request, and as to View 360's Letter Motion 64 . (Carrano, Cono)
September 24, 2013 65 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 64 Letter Request. Telephone Conference set for 10/1/2013 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8618 once all counsel are on the line. This number is a conference line and should be used only at the time of the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/24/13. (rjb, )
September 23, 2013 64 Letter Motion for View 360 Solutions LLC requesting Telephonic Court Conference submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Simon, Anthony)
September 19, 2013 Sealed Response and Exhibits A-D, F, H, I, K, Q, S and T attached to Dkt. No. 62. (rjb, )
September 19, 2013 63 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 61 Letter Request to file the referenced documents under seal. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/19/13. (rjb, )
September 16, 2013 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) E, # 2 Exhibit(s) G, # 3 Exhibit(s) J, # 4 Exhibit(s) L, # 5 Exhibit(s) M, # 6 Exhibit(s) N, # 7 Exhibit(s) O, # 8 Exhibit(s) P, # 9 Exhibit(s) R)(Carrano, Cono) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2013: # 10 Response, # 11 Exhibit(s) A, # 12 Exhibit(s) B, # 13 Exhibit(s) C, # 14 Exhibit(s) D, # 15 Exhibit(s) F, # 16 Exhibit(s) H, # 17 Exhibit(s) I, # 18 Exhibit(s) K, # 19 Exhibit(s) Q, # 20 Exhibit(s) S, # 21 Exhibit(s) T) (rjb, ).
September 16, 2013 61 Letter Motion for Google, Inc. requesting Leave to File Under Seal submitted to Judge Dancks . (Carrano, Cono)
September 5, 2013 TEXT NOTICE: The 58 Motion to Amend will be heard on submission of the papers only. Counsel will be notified if oral argument is necessary. (rjb, )
August 22, 2013 60 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 59 Motion to Seal. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 8/22/13. (rjb, )
August 20, 2013 59 MOTION to Seal Motion and Exhibits filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (rjb, )
August 20, 2013 58 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2013 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks Response to Motion due by 9/16/2013 filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amended Pleading (redline version w/out exhibits), # 2 Proposed Amended Pleading (clean version w/ exhibits), # 3 Exhibit(s) 1 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski, # 4 Exhibit(s) 3 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski, # 5 Exhibit(s) 8 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2013: # 6 Memorandum of Law, # 7 Exhibit(s) C - Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski, # 8 Exhibit(s) 2 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski (Part 1), # 9 Exhibit(s) 2 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski (Part 2), # 10 Exhibit(s) 2 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski (Part 3), # 11 Exhibit(s) 4 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski, # 12 Exhibit(s) 5 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski, # 13 Exhibit(s) 6 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski, # 14 Exhibit(s) 7 to Declaration of Timothy Grochocinski) (rjb, ).
August 19, 2013 57 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Google, Inc. for proceedings held on August 5, 2013 before Judge Dancks.. (Attachments: # 1 AO 435 Order Form)(Carrano, Cono)
August 19, 2013 56 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Google, Inc. for proceedings held on June 3, 2013 before Judge Therese Wiley Dancks.. (Attachments: # 1 AO 435 Request Form)(Carrano, Cono)
August 19, 2013 55 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Digitally Recorded Telephone Conference held on 8/5/2013 before Judge Dancks, Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eileen McDonough, Telephone number: 315-234-8546. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within 5 business days of this date. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.nynd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within 5 business days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available on the web 90 days from today's date. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/9/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/19/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/18/2013. Notice of Intent to Redact due by 8/26/2013 (etm, )
August 13, 2013 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM-DECISION & ORDER denying Defendant's objections to the March 13, 2013 Order of Magistrate Dancks denying Defendant's motions to transfer venue and for a stay and affirming # 38 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court. Signed by Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 8/13/13. (lmw)
August 5, 2013 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Telephone Conference held on 8/5/2013. Appearances: Benjamin Askew, Esq. and Timothy Grochocinski, Esq. for Plaintiff; David Vondle, Esq., Cono Carrano, Esq. and Douglas Nash, Esq. for Defendant. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a motion to amend by 8/20/2013. The claim construction dates are adjourned without date pending a decision on the motion to amend. Once a decision on the motion has been issued, new claim construction dates will be set and the production issues raised in Dkt. No. 50 will be addressed. (FTR Recorded) (rjb, )
August 2, 2013 53 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Digitally-Recorded Status Conference held on June 3, 2013, before Judge Therese Wiley Dancks, Transcriber: Lisa L. Tennyson, Telephone number: (518) 257-1823. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: In order to remove personal identifier data from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within 5 business days of this date. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.nynd.uscourts.gov. Read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within 5 business days of this date, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available on the web 90 days from today's date. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/23/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/3/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2013. Notice of Intent to Redact due by 8/7/2013 (lt, )
July 23, 2013 52 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed letter motions (Dkt. Nos. 50 and 51) and grants the motions. Court conference scheduled for 8/5/2013 at 11:00 AM. Claim construction deadlines adjourned without date and will be reset at telephone conference. Parties should be prepared to discuss realistic new dates for claim construction deadlines and date for defendant to respond to plaintiff's Requests for Production as referenced in Dkt. No. 50. Plaintiff's attorney is directed to initiate the call and should contact chambers at (315) 234-8618 once all counsel are on the line. This number is a conference line and should be used only at the time of the conference. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/23/13. (rjb, )
July 19, 2013 51 Agreed Letter Motion from View 360 Solutions LLC for View 360 Solutions LLC requesting Scheduling Conference / Extension of Joint Claim Construction Deadline submitted to Judge Dancks . (Grochocinski, Timothy)
July 19, 2013 50 Letter Motion from Plaintiff View 360 Solutions, LLC for View 360 Solutions LLC requesting Conference Call Regarding Discovery Dispute submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks . (Askew, Benjamin)
July 8, 2013 49 STATUS REPORT Regarding Depositions and ESI Stipulation by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
July 2, 2013 48 Featured Case STIPULATED ORDER REGARDING THE FORMAT OF DOCUMENT PRODUCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/2/13. (rjb, )
July 2, 2013 47 Letter Motion for Google, Inc. requesting Stipulation Regarding the Format of Document Productions submitted to Judge Dancks Jointly By The Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation)(Carrano, Cono)
July 1, 2013 46 Featured Case TEXT ORDER : The Court has reviewed and appreciates Dkt. No. 44. Parties are to confer and confirm dates for depositions and ESI stipulation. Counsel for Plaintiff to file further status report on depositions and ESI stipulation by 7/8/2013. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 7/1/13. (rjb, )
June 28, 2013 CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY: Document 45 was replaced with the correct Transcript Request form. The wrong form was originally uploaded. (amt)
June 28, 2013 45 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by View 360 Solutions LLC for proceedings held on June 3, 2013 before Judge Magistrate Judge Dancks.. (Askew, Benjamin) (Main Document 45 replaced on 6/28/2013) (amt, ).
June 25, 2013 44 STATUS REPORT by Google, Inc.. (Carrano, Cono)
June 18, 2013 43 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Dkt. No. 42. Counsel for Google to file further status report on dates for depositions and ESI Stipulation by 6/25/2013. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/18/13. (rjb, )
June 17, 2013 42 STATUS REPORT Regarding Depositions and ESI Stipulation by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
June 14, 2013 41 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: approving the # 40 Stipulation to Amend Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/14/2013. (nmk) Modified Docket Text on 6/14/2013 (nmk).
June 13, 2013 40 STIPULATION Stipulation to Amend Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Infringement Contentions by View 360 Solutions LLC submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (Askew, Benjamin)
June 3, 2013 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Status Conference held on 6/3/2013. Appearances: Megan Summerfield, Esq., Daniel Sleasman, Esq. and Timothy Grochocinski, Esq. for Plaintiff; David Vondle, Esq., Cono Carrano, Esq. and Douglas Nash, Esq. for Defendant. Counsel report on the status of the case. The disclosures under the patent rules have been exchanged. Rule 33 and 34 Requests have been served. Counsel are working on scheduling depositions. Counsel raise issues regarding the ESI stipulation. Attorney Grochocinski will submit a status report on the ESI stipulation issues and a deposition schedule by 6/17/2013. (FTR Recorded) (rjb, )
April 15, 2013 39 RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Google, Inc. re 35 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion to Stay filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Grochocinski, Timothy)
April 1, 2013 COURT TEXT NOTICE scheduling Deft's 38 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION for Judge Suddaby's 5/2/2013 motion calendar. This motion will be ON SUBMIT; No appearances are necessary. Response to Motion due by 4/15/2013.(amt)
March 29, 2013 38 Featured Case APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Google, Inc. re 35 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration)(Carrano, Cono)
March 29, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Counsel is directed to refile the Appeals of Magistrate Judge Dancks # 35 Decision and Order. Since the # 35 Decision and Order encompassed both the # 25 Motion to Transfer and the # 26 Motion to Stay, only one Appeal should be filed. The Clerk is directed to terminate the # 36 and # 37 Appeals and Counsel is directed to resubmit the Appeal in accordance with Local Rules 72.1(b) and 7.1(b)(2). Authorized by Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 3/29/2013.(kee)
March 27, 2013 37 Featured Case APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Google, Inc. re 35 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration)(Carrano, Cono)
March 27, 2013 36 Featured Case APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Google, Inc. re 35 Order on Motion to Transfer Case, Order on Motion to Stay (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration)(Carrano, Cono)
March 13, 2013 35 Featured Case DECISION AND ORDER denying Defendants' 25 Motion to Transfer Case and denying Defendants' 26 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 3/13/2013. (amt)
February 28, 2013 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Transfer Case Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Google, Inc.. (Vondle, David)
February 28, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER approving the 33 Stipulation to file a reply. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/28/13. (rjb, )
February 28, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 32 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin Carnie, Jr.. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/28/13. (rjb, )
February 26, 2013 33 STIPULATION re 25 MOTION to Transfer Case Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Granting Google Inc. Leave to File a Reply Brief by Google, Inc., View 360 Solutions LLC submitted to Judge Dancks. (Vondle, David)
February 26, 2013 32 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kevin M. Carnie, Jr. Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-2469356. filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) E-Filing Registration Form, # 2 Exhibit(s) Oath, # 3 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Admission (MO), # 4 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Admission (IL)) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Sleasman, Daniel)
February 19, 2013 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by View 360 Solutions LLC re 30 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 19, 2013 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION to Transfer Case Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ford Oxaal, # 2 Declaration of Timothy E. Grochocinski)(Grochocinski, Timothy)
February 19, 2013 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by View 360 Solutions LLC re 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Askew, Benjamin)
February 19, 2013 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Stay re 25 MOTION to Transfer Case Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pe filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Benjamin R. Askew)(Askew, Benjamin)
February 1, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 27 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Aaron W. Purser. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 2/1/13. (rjb, )
January 31, 2013 27 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Aaron W. Purser Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-2444659. filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Sleasman, Daniel)
January 28, 2013 COURT TEXT NOTICE scheduling the 25 MOTION to Transfer Case and 26 MOTION to Stay for Magistrate Judge Dancks' 3/7/2013 motion calendar. This motion will be on SUBMIT; No appearances are necessary. Response to Motion due by 2/19/2013. (amt)
January 25, 2013 26 MOTION to Stay re 25 MOTION to Transfer Case Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2013 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 2/19/2013 filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on Motion to Transfer, # 2 Declaration of David C. Vondle) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Vondle, David)
January 25, 2013 25 MOTION to Transfer Case Google Inc.'s Notice of Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2013 10:00 AM in Syracuse before Judge Glenn T. Suddaby Response to Motion due by 2/19/2013 Reply to Response to Motion due by 2/25/2013. filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California, # 2 Declaration of David C. Vondle, # 3 Declaration of Allen Hutchison) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Vondle, David)
January 25, 2013 24 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/25/13. (rjb, )
January 25, 2013 23 Featured Case UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Venue motions to be filed by 1/28/2013; Mandatory disclosures to be exchanged by 3/1/2013; Initial written demands to be served by 3/29/2013; Joinder of Parties due by 8/20/2013; Amended Pleadings due by 8/20/2013; All discovery must be completed within 150 days of the Court's decision on claim construction; Dispositive motions shall be filed within 60 days after the scheduled date for the end of all discovery. Status Conference set for 6/3/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks; Defendant's counsel is directed to initiate the call in accordance with the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/25/13. (rjb, )
January 24, 2013 22 Letter Motion from Counsel for Google, Inc. requesting Entry of Stipulated Protective Order submitted to Judge Dancks Jointly By The Parties. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order/Judgment)(Vondle, David)
January 16, 2013 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/16/2013. Appearances: Timothy Grochocinski, Esq. for Plaintiff; Cono Carrano, Esq. and Douglas Nash, Esq. for Defendant. Pretrial deadlines are established, a scheduling order will be issued. Defendant anticipates filing a motion to change venue by 1/25/2013. (FTR Recorded) (rjb, )
January 11, 2013 21 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Google, Inc., View 360 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s))(Vondle, David)
January 3, 2013 Featured Case TEXT ORDER approving 20 Stipulation - Civil Case Management Plan due by 1/11/2013. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/3/13. (rjb, )
January 2, 2013 20 STIPULATION by Google, Inc., View 360 Solutions LLC submitted to Judge Hon. Glenn T. Suddaby. (Vondle, David)
November 19, 2012 19 ANSWER to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by View 360 Solutions LLC.(Kella, Michael)
November 8, 2012 18 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Vondle on behalf of Google, Inc. (Vondle, David)
October 29, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice as to David C. Vondle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 10/29/12. (rjb, )
October 26, 2012 16 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Google, Inc.. (Carrano, Cono)
October 26, 2012 15 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM GOOGLE INC.'S ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS TO COMPLAINT against View 360 Solutions LLC by Google, Inc..(Carrano, Cono)
October 25, 2012 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Cono A. Carrano on behalf of Google, Inc. (Carrano, Cono)
October 25, 2012 13 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of David C. Vondle, Esq. Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-2353602. filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Petition for Admission, # 2 Exhibit(s) eFiling Registration Form, # 3 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, # 4 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Sponsor, # 5 Exhibit(s) Oath on Admission, # 6 Exhibit(s) Proposed Order) Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Nash, Douglas)
September 26, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER approving 12 Stipulation - Answer due date updated for Google, Inc., answer due 10/26/2012. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/26/12. (rjb, )
September 25, 2012 12 STIPULATION of Extension of Time to October 26, 2012 for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Google, Inc. submitted to Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. (Nash, Douglas)
September 25, 2012 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas J. Nash on behalf of Google, Inc. (Nash, Douglas)
September 21, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 10 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Benjamin R. Askew. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/21/12. (rjb, )
September 21, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Michael P. Kella. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/21/12. (rjb, )
September 21, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 8 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony G. Simon. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/21/12. (rjb, )
September 21, 2012 Featured Case TEXT ORDER granting 7 Motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy E. Grochocinski. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 9/21/12. (rjb, )
September 13, 2012 10 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin R. Askew Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-2311239. filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Sleasman, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2012: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Oath) (amt, ).
September 13, 2012 9 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael P. Kella Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-2311233. filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Sleasman, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2012: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Oath) (amt, ).
September 13, 2012 8 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony G.Simon Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-2311232. filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Sleasman, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2012: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Oath) (amt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2012: # 4 Certificate of Good Standing) (amt, ).
September 13, 2012 7 MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice of Timothy E. Grochincinski Filing fee $100, receipt number 0206-2311223. filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. Motions referred to Therese Wiley Dancks. (Sleasman, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2012: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Oath) (amt, ). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2012: # 3 Certificate of Good Standing) (amt, ).
September 13, 2012 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by View 360 Solutions LLC. All Parties. (Sleasman, Daniel)
August 31, 2012 5 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Rule 16 Initial Conference set for 1/16/2013 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks by TELEPHONE. Civil Case Management Plan due by 1/2/2013. (sfp, )
August 31, 2012 4 Report on the Filing of an Action re a Patent. (sfp, )
August 31, 2012 3 Summons Issued as to Google, Inc.. (sfp, )
August 31, 2012 2 FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by View 360 Solutions LLC. (sfp, )
August 31, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against Google, Inc. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 2297951) filed by View 360 Solutions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet)(sfp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: View 360 Solutions LLC v. Google, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas J. Nash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: View 360 Solutions LLC
Represented By: Timothy E. Grochocinski
Represented By: Benjamin R. Askew
Represented By: Michael P. Kella
Represented By: Anthony G. Simon
Represented By: Daniel M. Sleasman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]