Mancuso v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al

Plaintiff: Paul Mancuso
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency and Lisa Jackson
 
Case Number: 5:2012cv01027
Filed: June 25, 2012
 
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Onondaga
Referring Judge: Therese Wiley Dancks
Presiding Judge: Lawrence E. Kahn
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 2, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 11 Report and Recommendations. ORDERED, that the Report-Recommendation is APPROVED and ADOPTED in its ENTIRETY; and it is further ORDERED, that all claims against Defendants Lisa Jackson, Todd H. Gleason, Kevin Miller, Matthew W. Mo rrison, and Michael R. Fisher are DISMISSED without leave to amend; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk of Court issue a summons and forward it along with a copy of the 7 Amended Complaint and a packet containing General Order 25, which sets forth the Civil Case Management Plan used by the Northern District of New York, to the United States Marshal for service upon Defendant EPA. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on 1/2/2013. (dpk) [Mailed copy of Order to pro se plaintiff]
June 26, 2012 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL: US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter recused. Case randomly reassigned to US Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks for all further proceedings. Note: the # 2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is now referred to Judge Dancks. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 6/26/2012. {Copy sent to pro se plaintiff by regular mail} (jmb)
September 22, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDERED, that Defendants Motion (Dkt. No. 39) for summary judgment is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED, that the Clerk of the Court close this case. Signed by Senior Judge Lawrence E. Kahn on September 22, 2014. ***A copy of this order was served upon the pro se plaintiff by Certified US mail. (sas) Modified on 9/22/2014 to add pro se mailing language (sas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mancuso v. United States Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Mancuso
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Jackson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]