PPC Broadband, Inc. v. Corning Gilbert Inc.

Plaintiff: PPC Broadband, Inc.
Defendant: Corning Gilbert Inc.
Case Number: 5:2013cv00538
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: New York Northern District Court
Office: Syracuse Office
County: Onondaga
Presiding Judge: Mae A. D'Agostino
Referring Judge: David E. Peebles
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - That Corning Gilbert's 10 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. That the parties notify Magistrate Judge Peebles in order to schedule further proceedings in accordance with this Memorandum-Decision and Order. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 11/21/2013. (jel, )
March 17, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - That Corning Gilbert's 22 Motion for Certificate of Appealability is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/17/2014. (jel, )
March 3, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER - That Magistrate Judge David E. Peebles's September 18, 2014 35 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety. That the following meanings shall be affixed to the patent claim terms in dispute: Disputed Term: connector body and/or connector body member. Construction: "structure of the connect that is secured to the post at one end and includes an open end for receiving a portion of the coaxial cable. The structure can be comprised of more than one piece and is therefore not limited to a single integral or unitary one-piece component." Disputed Term: A first end. Constuction: No construction necessary. Disputed Term: A first central bore extending about said tubular post . Construction: "a cavity lying between the inner wall of the connector body and the post". Disputed Term: Fastener Member. Construction: "the structure of the connector that deforms the connector body member inwardly toward the po st when slid over the connector body". Disputed Term: Central passageway. Construction: "a cavity in the center of the fastener member extending between the first and second ends therof". Disputed Term: Secured to the connector b ody prior to installation. Construction: "the first end of the fastener member is secured to the connector body in the pre-installed state and prior to the prepared end of the coaxial cable being inserted in to the second end of the fastener m ember during installation". Disputed Term: Cental passageway being dimensioned to compress the first end of the connector body radially inward to decrease the volume of the first central bore. Construction: "the central passageway conta ins a portion of reduced diameter that contacts the connector body and compresses the body radially inwardly toward the post, thereby decreasing the volume of the first central bore". Disputed Term: Ramped surface. Construction: "a surfa ce inside the fastener member that starts at one diameter toward the first opening and gradually narrows to a smaller diameter toward the second opening". Disputed Term: Wherein the fastener member is slidingly moved from the first preinstalle d configuration to the second end of the connector body without rotation. Construction: "the fastener member is configued to slide from its first pre-installed position toward the second end of the connector body without having to be rotated". Disputed Term: First end of said connector body is secured to said fastener member by a press fit. Construction: No construction necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Gary L. Sharpe on 3/3/2015. (jel, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PPC Broadband, Inc. v. Corning Gilbert Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PPC Broadband, Inc.
Represented By: John D. Cook
Represented By: Jason C. Halpin
Represented By: Douglas J. Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning Gilbert Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.