Twombly v. Bell Atlantic, et al Featured Case

Consolidated_plaintiff: Lawrence Marcus
Defendant: SBC Communication, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., QWEST Communications International, Inc., Bell Atlantic Corporation and BellSouth Corporation
Plaintiff: William Twombly
Case Number: 1:2002cv10220
Filed: December 23, 2002
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Gerard E. Lynch
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 5, 2008 Appeal Remark as to 60 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 03-9213-cv: An opinion has been entered by the United States Supreme Court reversing and remanding the case to the US Court of Appeals. USCA hereby recalling and staying the mandate. re: 64 USCA Mandate has been returned to the Court of Appeals to the attention of A. Martin on 6/5/2008. (nd)
July 9, 2007 Appeal Record Returned. Indexed record on Appeal Files for Appeal Record Sent to SCUS - File, 105 Appeal Record Sent to SCUS - Index, Transmission of SCUS Mandate/Order to District Judge, 64 USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 03-9213; SCUS Case Number 05-1126, returned from the Supreme Court of the United States. (tp)
March 2, 2007 106 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying AT&T, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by BellSouth Corporation.(jar)
November 27, 2006 Appeal Record Sent to U.S. Supreme Court (File). Indexed record on Appeal Files for 60 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Lawrence Marcus,, William Twombly, U.S. Supreme Court Number 05-1126, USCA Case Number 03-9213, were transmitted to the U.S. Supreme Court on 11/27/2006 to the attn. of E. Lyles. Sent by FedEx, Number 8531 0667 7059. (nd, ) Modified on 6/20/2007 (tp).
November 27, 2006 105 Appeal Record Sent to US Supreme Court (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 60 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Lawrence Marcus,, William Twombly, USCA Case Number 03-9213, US Supreme Court Number 05-1126, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Supreme Court. (nd, )
August 9, 2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 103 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (lb, )
August 9, 2006 103 Featured Case ORDER granting 99 Motion for William M. Schur to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/7/2006) (lb, )
August 9, 2006 102 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney William J. Kolasky and Peter Kristian Vigeland terminated . (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 3/30/2006) (lb, )
August 9, 2006 101 Featured Case ORDER: By order dated 3/30/2006, the Court granted the Motion of Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP to withdraw as counsel (doc#96). The order was never docketed. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to enter this order on the docket and to close out document # 96 for all internal reports. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/3/2006) (lb, )
August 1, 2006 104 LETTER addressed to The Clerk of the Court from J. Douglas Richards dated 8/3/06 re: request that the enclosed letter to Judge Lynch, dated 2/22/06, and the accompanying proposed Civil Case Mgmt. Plan, be duly filed and docketed. Document filed by William Twombly, Lawrence Marcus.(pl, )
July 5, 2006 100 Featured Case ORDER: It is hereby ordered that all proceedings before this Court are stayed until the Supreme Court renders its decision. The pending motions to dismiss the case (Dkt. Nos. 73 and 75) are deemed withdrawn without prejudice to restoration to the Court's docket upon letter request by either party, upon completion of the proceedings before the Supreme Court. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 6/28/2006) (lb, )
June 27, 2006 99 MOTION for William M. Schur to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attached is Affidvit of Maria T. Galeno Document filed by SBC Communication, Inc.. (djc, )
May 31, 2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 98 Memo Endorsement, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (djc, )
May 30, 2006 98 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Granting 93 MOTION for Javier Aguilar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by SBC Communication, Inc., (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 5/22/06) (djc, )
April 10, 2006 97 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 75 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by BellSouth Corporation. (cd, )
March 27, 2006 96 MOTION for Peter K. Vigeland to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc.. (djc, )
March 27, 2006 95 DECLARATION of Peter K. Vigeland in Support of Motion for an Order purs to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the Local Rules of the USDC..., authorizing Cutler Pickeirng Hale and Dorr LLP to withdraw as co-counsel for Qwest. Document filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc.. (djc, )
March 22, 2006 94 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 73 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Bell Atlantic Corporation, BellSouth Corporation, QWEST Communications International, Inc., SBC Communication, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc.(db, )
March 22, 2006 93 MOTION for Javier Aguilar to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by SBC Communication, Inc.. (jmi, )
March 22, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 92 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 3/17/2006, Receipt Number 573280. (jd, )
March 17, 2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 92 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (cd, )
March 17, 2006 92 Featured Case ORDER granting 91 Motion for Reginald R. Goeke and Lucius T. Outlaw to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 3/15/06) (cd, )
March 15, 2006 91 MOTION for Reginald R. Goeke and Lucius T. Outlaw III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by BellSouth Corporation. (jco, )
March 14, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 86 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 3/6/2006, Receipt Number 571845. (jd, )
March 14, 2006 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on Memo Endorsement, Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Memo Endorsement, Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Memo Endorsement in the amount of $125.00, paid on 3/6/2006, Receipt Number 571891. (jd, )
March 10, 2006 90 DECLARATION of Ryan G. Kriger in Support re: 89 Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion. Document filed by William Twombly, Lawrence Marcus. Received in the night deposit box on 3/10/06 at 8:20 p.m.. (sac, )
March 10, 2006 89 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 75 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by William Twombly, Lawrence Marcus. Received in the night deposit box on 3/10/06 at 8:20 p.m..(sac, )
March 10, 2006 88 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 73 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by William Twombly, Lawrence Marcus. Received in the night deposit box on 3/10/06 at 8:20 p.m.. (sac, )
March 1, 2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: Memo Endorsement, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (kco, )
March 1, 2006 Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: Memo Endorsement, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (lb, )
February 28, 2006 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 71 MOTION for Martha Fitzgerald Bauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/06) (js, )
February 28, 2006 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 69 MOTION for Mark J. Mathews to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc. The request is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/2006) (kco, )
February 28, 2006 MEMO ENDORSED granting 67 Motion for Timothy R. Beyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/2006) (jmi, )
February 28, 2006 MEMO ENDORSED granting 68 Motion for Peter J. Korneffel, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/2006) (jmi, ) Modified on 3/1/2006 (jmi, ).
February 28, 2006 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 70 MOTION for Amy L. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/2006) (lb, )
February 24, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 75 MOTION to Dismiss. 73 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/10/2006 Replies due by 4/10/2006. (db, )
February 24, 2006 87 STIPULATION: the time for plaintiffs to serve and file their oppositions to (a) defendats 1/27/06 motion to dismiss and (b) BellSouth Corporation's 1/27/06 renewed motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and for improper venue is extended to 3/10/06; defendants reply to be served and filed by 4/10/06. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/22/06) (db, )
February 24, 2006 86 Featured Case ORDER granting 85 Motion for Dan K. Webb and Charles B. Molster, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/22/06) (db, )
February 22, 2006 84 Joint Scheduling Conference Submission of Plaintiffs and Defendants Bellsouth Corporation and Qwest Communications International, Inc.. Document filed by William Twombly, Bell Atlantic Corporation, BellSouth Corporation, QWEST Communications International, Inc., SBC Communication, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc., Lawrence Marcus. (db, )
February 21, 2006 85 MOTION for Dan K. Webb and Charles B. Molster, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc. (db, )
February 21, 2006 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori J. Van Auken on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (cd, )
February 10, 2006 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J. David Reich, Jr on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (djc, )
February 10, 2006 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J. David Reich, Jr on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (djc, )
January 30, 2006 78 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Answer and Corperate Disclosure Statement served on Richard S. Schiffrin on 1/27/2006. Service was made by overnight delivery. Document filed by SBC Communication, Inc. (jar, )
January 27, 2006 80 RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by SBC Communication, Inc..(dle, )
January 27, 2006 79 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by SBC Communication, Inc..(dle, )
January 27, 2006 77 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 73 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by BellSouth Corporation. (jco, )
January 27, 2006 76 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 73 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Bell Atlantic Corporation, BellSouth Corporation, QWEST Communications International, Inc., SBC Communication, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (jco, )
January 27, 2006 75 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint. Document filed by BellSouth Corporation. (jco, )
January 27, 2006 74 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc.(jco, )
January 27, 2006 73 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Bell Atlantic Corporation, BellSouth Corporation, QWEST Communications International, Inc., SBC Communication, Inc., Verizon Communications, Inc. (jco, )
January 27, 2006 72 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.(jco, )
January 27, 2006 71 MOTION for Martha Fitzgerald Bauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc. (jco, )
January 27, 2006 70 MOTION for Amy L. Benson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc. (jco, )
January 27, 2006 69 MOTION for Mark J. Mathews to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc. (jco, )
January 27, 2006 68 MOTION for Peter J. Korneffel, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc. (jco, )
January 27, 2006 67 MOTION for Timothy R. Beyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by QWEST Communications International, Inc. (jco, )
January 27, 2006 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Kristian Vigeland, William J. Kolasky on behalf of QWEST Communications International, Inc. (jmi, )
January 27, 2006 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alan Bruce Howard on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (jmi, )
January 19, 2006 Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: 64 USCA Mandate,. (dt, )
January 13, 2006 64 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 60 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Lawrence Marcus,, William Twombly, USCA Case Number 03-9213. It is hereby Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of said District Court be and it hereby is VACATED AND REMANDED in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 1/12/06. (dt, )
July 16, 2004 63 NOTICE of change of law firm name. The law firm Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Leerach LLP has changed its name to Millberg Weiss Bershad & Schulman LLP. Document filed by Lawrence Marcus, William Twombly. (djc, )
April 2, 2004 62 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 60 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Lawrence Marcus, William Twombly USCA Case Number 03-9213, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (dt, )
January 23, 2004 61 NOTICE of Change of Address by counsel for defendant Maria T. Galeno on behalf of SBC Communication, Inc.. New Address: Pillsbury Winthrop LLP, 1540 Broadway, New York, New York, 10036, (212) 858-1000. (pl, )
January 21, 2004 USCA Scheduling Order as to 60 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Lawrence Marcus, William Twombly USCA Case Number 03-9213. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 1/12/04. Appeal Record due by 2/10/2004. Appellant Brief due by 2/17/2004. Appellee Brief due by 3/18/2004. (dt, )
November 14, 2003 Notice of appeal and certified copy of docket to USCA: [60-1] appeal by Lawrence Marcus, William Twombly ; Copy of notice of appeal sent to District Judge. (dt)
November 14, 2003 60 NOTICE OF APPEAL by William Twombly, Lawrence Marcus from [59-1] judgment order, [58-1] order . Copies of notice of appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: Mayer, Brown, Rowe & Maw, LLP. (IN N.Y.), Bellsouth Corporation, Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering,Mayer (IN N.Y.), Brown, Rowe & Maw, LLP. (IN D.C.), Wilmer, Cutler & Pickering (IN D.C.), Kellogg, Huber, Hansen, Todd & Evans, L.L.C., Kirkland & Ellis, Pilsbury Withrop, LLP and Verizon Communications, Inc. $255.00 Appeal filing fee paid 11/14/03 on receipt # E 491366. (dt)
October 15, 2003 Case closed. (tp)
October 15, 2003 59 JUDGMENT, that for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion (89177) and Order dated October 7, 2003, defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint is granted and defendant BellSouth's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is denied as moot. ( signed by J. Michael McMahon, Clerk of Court ); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. Entered On Docket: 10/16/03. (tp)
October 8, 2003 58 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER #89177, granting [32-1] motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint, denying, as moot, [30-1] motion to dismiss the consolidated Amended Complaint. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); Sent to the Judgment Clerk. (kw)
October 7, 2003 57 Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Gerard E. Lynch for the date(s) of 8/1/03. (df)
July 15, 2003 55 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER, Defendant shall have permission to file an answering memorandum of up to 22 pages . ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ) (sb)
July 14, 2003 56 NOTICE of CHANGE of FIRM NAME by BellSouth Corp. Mayer, Brown, Rowe & Maw has registered as a Limited Liability Partnership and has changed its name to Mayer, Brown, Rowe & Maw LLP. Received in the night deposit box on 7/14/03 at 6:18 p.m. (sb) Modified on 07/15/2003
July 1, 2003 54 REPLY by BellSouth Corp. Re: in support of its motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and for improper venue. (docmt received in night dep. on 07/01/03 at 5:55 p.m.) (djc)
June 30, 2003 53 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Bell Atlantic, BellSouth Corp., QWEST Communications, SBC Communication, Verizon Comm. in support re: [30-1] motion to dismiss the consolidated Amended Complaint . (dle)
June 30, 2003 52 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER, that plaintiffs shall have permission to file an answering brief of up to thirty-seven (37) pages. Plaintiffs, in turn, consent to allowing defendants to file a comparably extended reply memorandum . ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ) (tp)
June 20, 2003 51 AFFIDAVIT of Michael M. Buchman by William Twombly in support of [50-1] opposition memorandum, [49-1] opposition memorandum. (sac)
June 20, 2003 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by William Twombly in opposition to [30-1] motion to dismiss the consolidated Amended Complaint. (sac)
June 20, 2003 49 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by William Twombly in opposition to [32-1] motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint, [30-1] motion to dismiss the consolidated Amended Complaint. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/20/03 at 10:11 p.m.) (sac)
June 19, 2003 48 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by BellSouth Corp. in further support of its motion to dismss for lack of personal jurisdiction and for improper venue. (djc)
June 19, 2003 47 DECLARATION of Deborah F.Baker by BellSouth Corp. in further support of Bellsouth Corporation's Motion to Dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction and for improper venue; (djc)
June 12, 2003 46 Featured Case ORDER, granting [39-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 26(c) of the FRCP staying discovery. Until 30 days after the motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim is resolved, discovery in this case shall be stayed. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); (kw)
May 27, 2003 45 REPLY MEMORANDUM by Bell Atlantic, BellSouth Corp., QWEST Communications, SBC Communication, Verizon Comm. re: [39-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 26(c) of the FRCP staying discovery . (cd)
May 23, 2003 44 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by William Twombly in opposition to [39-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 26(c) of the FRCP staying discovery . (dle)
May 23, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [38-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on 5/23/03 Receipt # 474360. (dle)
May 23, 2003 43 Joint Case Management Report by William Twombly, Bell Atlantic, BellSouth Corp., QWEST Communications, SBC Communication, Verizon Comm. . (dle)
May 22, 2003 42 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Verizon Comm. by John Thorne (cd)
May 21, 2003 41 CERTIFICATION of Maria T. Galeno by Bell Atlantic, BellSouth Corp., QWEST Communications, SBC Communication, Verizon Comm. in support of [39-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 26(c) of the FRCP staying discovery. (sb)
May 20, 2003 38 Featured Case ORDER; granting [28-1] motion for an order for John Thorne to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc.; an attorney admitted to practice pro hac vice is required to pay a $25.00 attorney admission fee and to present this Order to take the intake deputy clerk in the Clerk's Office. When paying by mail, return a copy of this Order to the Clerk's Office with the required fee within 10 business days. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); forwarded this document to the Attorney admissions Clerk. (pl)
May 20, 2003 37 Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Lynch from Peter K. Vigeland, dated 5/9/03; granting defts' leave to file a memorandum of law in excess of 25 pages. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); (sac) Modified on 05/22/2003
May 19, 2003 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bell Atlantic, BellSouth Corp., QWEST Communications, SBC Communication, Verizon Comm. in support of [39-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 26(c) of the FRCP staying discovery . (sb)
May 19, 2003 39 NOTICE OF MOTION by Bell Atlantic, BellSouth Corp., QWEST Communications, SBC Communication, Verizon Comm. for an order purs. to Rule 26(c) of the FRCP staying discovery . Return Date 5/29/03. Proposed order attached. (sb)
May 12, 2003 36 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bell Atlantic, BellSouth Corp., QWEST Communications, SBC Communication, Verizon Comm. in support of [32-1] motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint . (cd)
May 12, 2003 35 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by QWEST Communications . (cd)
May 12, 2003 34 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by SBC Communication . (cd)
May 12, 2003 33 DECLARATION of Steven G. Bradbury by Bell Atlantic, BellSouth Corp., QWEST Communications, SBC Communication, Verizon Comm. in support Re: [32-1] motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint . (cd)
May 12, 2003 32 NOTICE OF MOTION by Bell Atlantic, BellSouth Corp., QWEST Communications, SBC Communication, Verizon Comm. to dismiss the Amended Complaint ; Return Date not indicated (cd)
May 12, 2003 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by BellSouth Corp. in support of [30-1] motion to dismiss the consolidated Amended Complaint . (cd)
May 12, 2003 30 NOTICE OF MOTION by BellSouth Corp. to dismiss the consolidated Amended Complaint ; Return Date not indicated (cd)
May 12, 2003 29 RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE filed by Bell Atlantic . (djc)
May 9, 2003 28 NOTICE OF MOTION by Verizon Comm. for an order for John Thorne to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. . No Return Date. Affidavit of David S. Olson, Affidavit of John Thorne, and proposed order attached. (sb)
May 1, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [22-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on $25.00 Receipt # 472347. (dle)
May 1, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [25-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on 5/1/03 Receipt # 472347. (dle)
May 1, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [26-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on 5/1/03 Receipt # 472347. (dle)
May 1, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [27-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on 5/1/03 Receipt # 472347. (dle)
April 25, 2003 27 Featured Case ORDER; granting [18-1] motion for an order allowing the admission on Mark C. Hansen to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SBC Communications. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); Forwarded to attorney admissions clerk. (jco)
April 25, 2003 26 Featured Case ORDER; granting [19-1] motion for an order allowing the admission of Aaron M. Panner to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SBC Communications Inc. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); Forwarded to attorney admissions clerk. (jco)
April 25, 2003 25 Featured Case ORDER; granting [16-1] motion for an order allowing the admission of Michael K. Kellogg to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SBC Communications Inc. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); Forwarded to attorney admissions clerk. (jco) Modified on 04/28/2003
April 17, 2003 23 Featured Case ORDER; granting [21-1] motion for an Order pursuant to Local Rule 1.3(c) of this Court, admitting Lily Fu Swenson to appear pro hac vice. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); Orig. forwarded to the Atty's Admission Clerk. (sac)
April 14, 2003 24 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by William Twombly (Plaintiffs) (Answer due 4/24/03 for Verizon Comm., for SBC Communication, for QWEST Communications, for BellSouth Corp., for Bell Atlantic ) amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (sb)
April 10, 2003 22 Featured Case ORDER; granting [17-1] motion for an order allowing the admission of Michael J. Guzman to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SBC Communications . ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ) (sb)
April 9, 2003 21 NOTICE OF MOTION by BellSouth Corp.; for an Order pursuant to Local Rule 1.3(c) of this Court, admitting Lily Fu Swenson to appear pro hac vice . Return Date not indicated. Proposed Order attached. (jco) Modified on 04/10/2003
April 1, 2003 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to SBC Communication by Richard Park on 1/9/03 . Answer due on 1/29/03 for SBC Communication . (cd)
April 1, 2003 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to Verizon Comm. by Sandra Mohammed on 1/8/03 . Answer due on 1/28/03 for Verizon Comm. . (cd)
April 1, 2003 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to Bell Atlantic by Sandra Mohammed on 1/8/03 . Answer due on 1/28/03 for Bell Atlantic . (cd)
April 1, 2003 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to QWEST Communications by Marchia Gravin on 1/7/03 . Answer due on 1/27/03 for QWEST Communications . (cd)
April 1, 2003 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to BellSouth Corp. by Valerie Holmes on 1/1/03 . Answer due on 1/21/03 for BellSouth Corp. . (cd)
March 28, 2003 19 NOTICE OF MOTION by SBC Communication for an order allowing the admission of Aaron M. Panner to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SBC Communications Inc. No Return Date. Affidavit of Maria T. Galeno, Affidavit of Aaron M. Panner and proposed order attached. Received in the night deposit box on 3/28/03 at 5:56 p.m. (sb)
March 28, 2003 18 NOTICE OF MOTION by SBC Communication for an order allowing the admission on Mark C. Hansen to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SBC Communications . No Return Date. Affidavit of Maria T. Galeno, Affidavit of Mark C. Hansen and proposed order attached. Received in the night deposit box on 3/28/03 at 5:56 p.m. (sb)
March 28, 2003 17 NOTICE OF MOTION by SBC Communication for an order allowing the admission of Michael J. Guzman to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SBC Communications . No Return Date. Affidavit of Maria T. Galeno and Affidavit of Michael J. Guzman attached. Received in the night deposit box on 3/28/03 at 5:56 p.m. (sb)
March 28, 2003 16 NOTICE OF MOTION by SBC Communication for an order allowing the admission of Michael K. Kellogg to appear pro hac vice on behalf of SBC Communications Inc. . No Return Date. Affidavit of Maria T. Galeno, Affidavit of Michael K. Kellogg and proposed order attached. Received in the night deposit box on 3/28/03 at 5:56 p.m. (sb) Modified on 04/01/2003
March 17, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [11-1] order in the amount of $25.00 paid on 03/17/03 Receipt # 867347. (djc)
March 14, 2003 Deadline(s) updated: reset answer due for 5/12/03 for Verizon Comm., for SBC Communication, for QWEST Communications, for BellSouth Corp., for Bell Atlantic ; reset scheduling order deadlines: Response to motion deadline 6/20/03; Reply to response to motion deadline 7/1/03 . (tp)
March 14, 2003 15 Case Management Plan: This case is to be tried by a jury. Plaintiff shall file any new complaint by 4/11/03 and shall accomplish joinder of any additional parties by that date; Defendants agree, without waiving any right to contest personal jurisdiction, that they appear and answer, object or otherwise respond to the complaintby 5/12/03; If any defendants move to dismiss, plaintiff shall have until 6/20/03 to serve a response to that motion, and the moving defendants shall have until 7/1/03 to serve reply papers, if any, in further support of their respective motions; The Court will hold a hearing on the motions to dismiss on 8/1/03, at 2:00 p.m.; The Court will hold a further Case Management Conference on 5/29/03 at 10:00 a.m.; All other deadlines are set accordingly. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ). (tp) Modified on 03/19/2003
March 14, 2003 14 Featured Case ORDER, that the Court is granting the [9-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 1.3(c) of the FRCP permitting William J. Kolasky to appear pro hac vice. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); FORWARDED TO ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS CLERK. (tp)
March 14, 2003 13 Order admitting attorney pro hac vice, The application for admission pro hac vice for Steven G. Bradbury, Colin R. Kass, and Avery W. Gardiner is granted. The admitted attorneys are permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ) (sb)
March 14, 2003 Consolidated Lead Case. Member case is 03cv1567 (GEL). (db)
March 14, 2003 12 Featured Case ORDER: case 03cv1567 (GEL) (as member case) shall be consolidated with 02cv10220 (GEL) (as lead case) , this order shall be entered in 03cv1567 (GEL). No further filings shall be filed under 03cv1567 (GEL), without prior permission of the Court . ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ) (db)
March 11, 2003 11 Featured Case ORDER; granting [5-1] motion for Richard J. Favretto to appear pro hac vice. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); document forwarded to Attorney Admissions Clerk. (jco)
March 7, 2003 10 AFFIDAVIT of William Kolasky by QWEST Communications in support of [9-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 1.3(c) of the FRCP permitting William J. Kolasky to appear pro hac vice . (db)
March 7, 2003 9 NOTICE OF MOTION by QWEST Communications for an order purs. to Rule 1.3(c) of the FRCP permitting William J. Kolasky to appear pro hac vice . Proposed order attached. No Return Date indicated. Original forwarded to Attorney Admissions Clerk. (db) Modified on 03/13/2003
March 3, 2003 CASHIER'S OFFICE REMARK on [7-1] order in the amount of $75.00 paid on 3/3/03 Receipt # 466208. (gf)
February 28, 2003 8 NOTICE of attorney appearance for Verizon Comm. by David S. Olson. (tp)
February 26, 2003 7 Featured Case ORDER, granting [3-1] motion for Steven G. Bradbury, Colin Kass, Avery W. Gardiner to appear pro hac vice for deft Verizon. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); (Sent to the Attorney Admissions Clerk). (kw)
February 26, 2003 6 RULE 7.1 STATEMENT filed by Verizon Comm. (moc)
February 21, 2003 5 NOTICE OF MOTION by BellSouth Corp. for Richard J. Favretto to appear pro hac vice . Return Date not indicated. (laq)
February 18, 2003 3 NOTICE OF MOTION by Verizon Comm. for Steven G. Bradbury, Colin Kass, Avery W. Gardiner to appear pro hac vice for deft Verizon ; Return Date not indicated (cd)
February 13, 2003 4 NOTICE of attorney appearance for SBC Communication by Maria T. Galeno. (djc)
January 30, 2003 2 Featured Case STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 3/21/03 for Verizon Comm., for SBC Communication, for QWEST Communications, for BellSouth Corp., and for Bell Atlantic . ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ) (kw)
December 23, 2002 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. (laq)
December 23, 2002 1 COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 460132. (laq)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Twombly v. Bell Atlantic, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated_plaintiff: Lawrence Marcus
Represented By: John Douglas Richards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBC Communication, Inc.
Represented By: Maria T Galeno
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Steven G. Bradbury
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QWEST Communications International, Inc.
Represented By: Martha Bauer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell Atlantic Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BellSouth Corporation
Represented By: Richard J. Favretto
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Twombly
Represented By: John Douglas Richards
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]