Sokolow et al v. Palestine Liberation Organization et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs sued the Palestine Liberation Organization under the Antiterrorism Act for deaths and injuries in seven terrorist attacks carried out by the PLO and Palestinian Authority between January 8, 2001 and January 29, 2004.

Plaintiff: Norman Gritz, Yitzhak Shalom Goldberg, Nevenka Gritz, Mark I. Sokolow, Yaakov Moshe Goldberg, Shayna Eileen Gould, Ronald Allan Gould, Elise Janet Gould, Jessica Rine, Shmuel Waldman, Henna Novack Waldman, Morris Waldman, Eva Waldman, Alan J. Bauer, Revital Bauer, Yehonathon Bauer, Binyamin Bauer, Daniel Bauer, Yehuda Bauer, Leonard Mandelkorn, Shaul Mandelkorn, Nurit Mandelkorn, Oz Joseph Guetta, Varda Guetta, Katherine Baker, Rebekah Blutstein, Richard Blutstein, Larry Carter, Shaun Coffel, Dianne Coulter Miller, Robert L. Coulter, Jr., Robert L. Coulter, Sr., Chana Bracha Goldberg, Eliezer Simcha Goldberg, Esther Zahava Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Malka Goldberg, Tzvi Yehoshua Goldberg, Lauren M. Sokolow, Elana R. Sokolow, Jamie A. Sokolow and Rena M. Sokolow
Defendant: Palestine Liberation Organization, Palestinian Authority and John Does 1-99
 
Case Number: 1:2004cv00397
Filed: January 16, 2004
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Nassau
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 30, 2005 10
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - THIRD MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Cpmplaint. Document filed by Palestine Liberation Organization, Palestinian Authority. (Attachments: # 1)(Schilling, Lawrence) Modified on 8/31/2005 (kg).
September 13, 2005 13 Featured Case
ORDER granting [9] Motion for David J. Strachman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/13/05) (db, )
December 7, 2005 15 Featured Case
ORDER re: [14] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Palestine Liberation Organization, John Does 1-99, Palestinian Authority. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove the defendants' motion for a further enlargement of time to respond to the amended complaint, document #14, from the Court's docket. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 12/6/05) (jco, )
January 27, 2006 17 Featured Case
ORDER; Plaintiffs may file a formal motion for default judgment with the Court. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/26/06) (pl, )
January 30, 2006 18
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J. Strachman on behalf of Larry Carter, Shaun Coffel, Dianne Coulter Miller, Robert L. Coulter, Jr, Robert L. Coulter, Sr, Elana R. Sokolow, Chana Bracha Goldberg, Eliezer Simcha Goldberg, Esther Zahava Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Malka Goldberg, Shayna Eileen Gould, Tzvi Yehoshua Goldberg, Yaakov Moshe Goldberg, Yitzhak Shalom Goldberg, Nevenka Gritz, Norman Gritz, Ronald Allan Gould, Elise Janet Gould, Jessica Rine, Shmuel Waldman, Henna Novack Waldman, Morris Waldman, Eva Waldman, Alan J. Bauer, Revital Bauer, Yehonathon Bauer, Mark I. Sokolow, Binyamin Bauer, Daniel Bauer, Yehuda Bauer, Leonard Mandelkorn, Shaul Mandelkorn, Nurit Mandelkorn, Oz Joseph Guetta, Varda Guetta, Rena M. Sokolow, Jamie A. Sokolow, Lauren M. Sokolow, Katherine Baker, Rebekah Blutstein, Richard Blutstein (Strachman, David) Modified on 1/31/2006 (kg).
February 6, 2012 198 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs are ordered to provide responsive Answers to these Interrogatories on or before February 9, 2012. The decision of whether to sanction and what sanction is appropriate will be deferred until the Court can assess Plaintiffs' demonstration of good faith after the specific guidance given at the January 9, 2012 conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 2/6/2012) (ft)
September 6, 2012 255 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER re: 157 MOTION to Compel BBC to Comply With Subpoena filed by Dianne Coulter Miller, Shayna Eileen Gould, Robert L. Coulter, Jr., Jamie A. Sokolow, Yaakov Moshe Goldberg, Eliezer Simcha Goldberg, Yitzhak Shalom Goldberg, Larry Carter, Esther Zahava Goldberg, Varda Guetta, Shaul Mandelkorn, Shmuel Waldman, Rena M. Sokolow, Elana R. Sokolow, Shaun Coffel, Elise Janet Gould, Nurit Mandelkorn, Henna Novack Waldman, Morris Waldman, Daniel Bauer, Mark I. Sokolow, Alan J. B auer, Richard Blutstein, Leonard Mandelkorn, Tzvi Yehoshua Goldberg, Shoshana Malka Goldberg, Katherine Baker, Jessica Rine, Rebekah Blutstein, Eva Waldman, Yehonathon Bauer, Robert L. Coulter, Sr., Lauren M. Sokolow, Oz Joseph Guetta, Norman Gritz, Revital Bauer, Karen Goldberg, Binyamin Bauer, Nevenka Gritz, Chana Bracha Goldberg, Ronald Allan Gould, Yehuda Bauer, 143 MOTION to Quash Plaintiffs' Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action dated August 9, 2011 of The British Br oadcasting Corporation filed by Subpoenaed Non-Party The British Broadcasting Corporation. For the foregoing reasons, the BBC's Motion to Quash the Subpoena is DENIED, and the Plaintiffs' Cross- Motion to Compel BBC to Comply is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. BBC is directed to produce the outtakes of the interviews with the specified individuals. It is not compelled to produce a witness to testify as to the authenticity of the documentary or outtakes. However, BBC shall furnis h the outtakes with written affidavits from knowledgeable witnesses as to the authenticity of the documentary and outtakes. The outtakes and the accompanying affidavit(s) shall be provided to the Plaintiffs on or before September 17, 2012. This Order resolves Docket # 143 and Docket # 157. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 9/6/2012) (lmb)
April 27, 2006 25 Featured Case
ORDER; Dft's responses to plaintiffs motion for a default judgment is extended to 6/30/2006. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 4/27/06) (pl, )
August 4, 2006 28 Featured Case
ORDER: Accordingly, plaintiffs' motion for default judgment is denied without prejudice. This Court will fully consider the parties' complete submissions and arguments on the issue of jurisdiction. It will then determine whether this case should be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, or whether judgment of default should be entered if defendants otherwise willfully decline to defend this case on its merits. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 8/4/06) (js, )
December 20, 2006 30
CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time. Document filed by Larry Carter, Shaun Coffel, Dianne Coulter Miller, Robert L. Coulter, Jr, Robert L. Coulter, Sr, Elana R. Sokolow, Chana Bracha Goldberg, Eliezer Simcha Goldberg, Esther Zahava Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Malka Goldberg, Shayna Eileen Gould, Tzvi Yehoshua Goldberg, Yaakov Moshe Goldberg, Yitzhak Shalom Goldberg, Nevenka Gritz, Norman Gritz, Ronald Allan Gould, Elise Janet Gould, Jessica Rine, Shmuel Waldman, Henna Novack Waldman, Morris Waldman, Eva Waldman, Alan J. Bauer, Revital Bauer, Yehonathon Bauer, Mark I. Sokolow, Binyamin Bauer, Daniel Bauer, Yehuda Bauer, Leonard Mandelkorn, Shaul Mandelkorn, Nurit Mandelkorn, Oz Joseph Guetta, Varda Guetta, Rena M. Sokolow, Jamie A. Sokolow, Lauren M. Sokolow, Katherine Baker, Rebekah Blutstein, Richard Blutstein. (Strachman, David)
December 20, 2006 31
SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [22] MOTION for Entry of Default as to Palestine Liberation Organization (PLO) and Palestinian Authority (PA) pursuant to FRCP 55(a) and 55(b)(2).. Document filed by Elana R. Sokolow, Chana Bracha Goldberg, Eliezer Simcha Goldberg, Esther Zahava Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Malka Goldberg, Shayna Eileen Gould, Tzvi Yehoshua Goldberg, Yaakov Moshe Goldberg, Yitzhak Shalom Goldberg, Nevenka Gritz, Norman Gritz, Ronald Allan Gould, Elise Janet Gould, Jessica Rine, Shmuel Waldman, Henna Novack Waldman, Morris Waldman, Eva Waldman, Alan J. Bauer, Revital Bauer, Mark I. Sokolow, Binyamin Bauer, Daniel Bauer, Leonard Mandelkorn, Shaul Mandelkorn, Nurit Mandelkorn, Oz Joseph Guetta, Varda Guetta, Rena M. Sokolow, Jamie A. Sokolow, Lauren M. Sokolow, Katherine Baker. (Strachman, David)
April 5, 2007 36
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time JOINT APPLICATION FOR A REVISED BREIFING SCHEDULE AND RESCHEDULING OF ORAL ARGUMENT. Document filed by Mark I. Sokolow.(Strachman, David) Modified on 4/6/2007 (lb).
October 24, 2013 372 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Tolchin is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by November 8, 2013, why personal sanctions, including under 28 U.S.C. § 1927, should not be imposed upon him for intentionally violating the Protective Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 10/24/2013) (rsh)
July 30, 2007 44
SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF Regarding Subject Matter Juridiction. Document filed by Palestine Liberation Organization, Palestinian Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index to Exhibits# 2 Exhibit A - Senate Hearing# 3 Exhibit A - Senate Hearing (part 2)# 4 Exhibit A - Senate Hearing (part 3)# 5 Exhibit A - Senate Hearing (part 4)# 6 Exhibit B - House Hearing# 7 Exhibit C - Factual Summary# 8 Exhibit D - Dayan Case# 9 Exhibit E - Elon Moreh case# 10 Exhibit F - History and Creation of PNA# 11 Exhibit G - Geneva Convention# 12 Exhibit H - The Hague# 13 Exhibit I - UN Doc# 14 Exhibit J - Declaration of Principles)(Hibey, Richard)
July 30, 2007 45
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Palestine Liberation Organization, Palestinian Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hibey, Richard)
September 21, 2007 48
NOTICE of of Motion. Document filed by Mark I. Sokolow. (Strachman, David)
September 21, 2007 49
MOTION For Summary Denial of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction,or in the Alternative, For Jurisdictional Discovery and for Related Relief. Document filed by Mark I. Sokolow.(Strachman, David)
September 21, 2007 50
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 MOTION For Summary Denial of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction,or in the Alternative, For Jurisdictional Discovery and for Related Relief.. Document filed by Mark I. Sokolow. (Strachman, David)
September 24, 2007 51
NOTICE of Errata for docket #50 re: 50 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Mark I. Sokolow. (Strachman, David)
October 3, 2007 52
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Larry Carter, Shaun Coffel, Dianne Coulter Miller, Robert L. Coulter, Jr, Robert L. Coulter, Sr, Elana R. Sokolow, Chana Bracha Goldberg, Eliezer Simcha Goldberg, Esther Zahava Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Malka Goldberg, Shayna Eileen Gould, Tzvi Yehoshua Goldberg, Yaakov Moshe Goldberg, Yitzhak Shalom Goldberg, Nevenka Gritz, Norman Gritz, Ronald Allan Gould, Elise Janet Gould, Jessica Rine, Shmuel Waldman, Henna Novack Waldman, Morris Waldman, Eva Waldman, Alan J. Bauer, Revital Bauer, Yehonathon Bauer, Mark I. Sokolow, Binyamin Bauer, Daniel Bauer, Yehuda Bauer, Leonard Mandelkorn, Shaul Mandelkorn, Nurit Mandelkorn, Oz Joseph Guetta, Varda Guetta, Rena M. Sokolow, Jamie A. Sokolow, John Does 1-99, Lauren M. Sokolow, Katherine Baker, Rebekah Blutstein, Richard Blutstein. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Tolchin, Robert)
October 5, 2007 53
OPPOSITION BRIEF re: 49 MOTION For Summary Denial of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction,or in the Alternative, For Jurisdictional Discovery and for Related Relief.. Document filed by Palestine Liberation Organization, Palestinian Authority.(Rochon, Mark)
October 19, 2007 54
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 49 MOTION For Summary Denial of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss For Lack of Personal Jurisdiction,or in the Alternative, For Jurisdictional Discovery and for Related Relief.. Document filed by Mark I. Sokolow. (Strachman, David)
October 24, 2007 55
DECLARATION of Robert Tolchin, submitting Exhibit previously erroneously omitted in Opposition re: 45 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Larry Carter, Shaun Coffel, Dianne Coulter Miller, Robert L. Coulter, Jr, Robert L. Coulter, Sr, Elana R. Sokolow, Chana Bracha Goldberg, Eliezer Simcha Goldberg, Esther Zahava Goldberg, Karen Goldberg, Shoshana Malka Goldberg, Shayna Eileen Gould, Tzvi Yehoshua Goldberg, Yaakov Moshe Goldberg, Yitzhak Shalom Goldberg, Nevenka Gritz, Norman Gritz, Ronald Allan Gould, Elise Janet Gould, Jessica Rine, Shmuel Waldman, Henna Novack Waldman, Morris Waldman, Eva Waldman, Alan J. Bauer, Revital Bauer, Yehonathon Bauer, Mark I. Sokolow, Binyamin Bauer, Daniel Bauer, Yehuda Bauer, Leonard Mandelkorn, Shaul Mandelkorn, Nurit Mandelkorn, Oz Joseph Guetta, Rena M. Sokolow, Jamie A. Sokolow, Lauren M. Sokolow, Katherine Baker, Rebekah Blutstein, Richard Blutstein. (Tolchin, Robert)
July 1, 2005 5
FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Document filed by Palestine Liberation Organization, Palestinian Authority. (Schilling, Lawrence) Modified on 8/31/2005 (kg).
April 9, 2009 62 Featured Case ORDER that the Parties SHALL complete personal jurisdiction discovery in this case no later than 5/29/09. ( Discovery due by 5/29/2009.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 4/9/09) (cd)
July 6, 2005 6 Featured Case
ORDER; Defendants' motion for an enlargement of time to rspond to the First Amended complaint to July 31, 2005 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment is denied. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/5/05) (djc, )
July 15, 2005 7 Featured Case
ORDER that the Court having granted deft's motion for an enlargement of time to respond to the first amended complaint, the Clerk of the Court is hereby ordered to remove this motion from the Court's docket. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/14/05) (cd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sokolow et al v. Palestine Liberation Organization et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Gritz
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yitzhak Shalom Goldberg
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevenka Gritz
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark I. Sokolow
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaakov Moshe Goldberg
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayna Eileen Gould
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Allan Gould
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elise Janet Gould
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Rine
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shmuel Waldman
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henna Novack Waldman
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morris Waldman
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Waldman
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan J. Bauer
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Revital Bauer
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yehonathon Bauer
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Binyamin Bauer
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bauer
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yehuda Bauer
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard Mandelkorn
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaul Mandelkorn
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nurit Mandelkorn
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oz Joseph Guetta
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Varda Guetta
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Baker
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Blutstein
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Blutstein
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Carter
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaun Coffel
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Coulter Miller
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Coulter, Jr.
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Coulter, Sr.
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chana Bracha Goldberg
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Simcha Goldberg
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Zahava Goldberg
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Goldberg
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shoshana Malka Goldberg
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tzvi Yehoshua Goldberg
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren M. Sokolow
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elana R. Sokolow
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie A. Sokolow
Represented By: Olimpio Lee Squitieri
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rena M. Sokolow
Represented By: David J. Strachman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palestine Liberation Organization
Represented By: Mark John Rochon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palestinian Authority
Represented By: Richard A. Hibey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-99
Represented By: Ramsey Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]