The Authors Guild et al v. Google Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiffs The Authors Guild. Herbert Mitgang, Betty Miles and Daniel Hoffman sued Google Inc. for reproducing a digital copy of plaintiffs' works without the copyright holders' permission and in violation of the authors' rights under the copyright laws.

Plaintiff: The Author's Guild, Betty Miles, Daniel Hoffman, Paul Dickson, Herbert Mitgang and Joseph Goulden
Defendant: Google Inc.
Case Number: 1:2005cv08136
Filed: September 20, 2005
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: John E. Sprizzo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 23, 2013 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files ONLY for 1092 Notice of Appeal, filed by The Authors Guild, Canadian Standard Association, Herbert Mitgang, Jim Bouton, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., Paul Dickson, Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (APPELLANT'S COUNSEL IS RESPONSIBLE FOR THE PHYSICAL SUPPLEMENTAL INDEX FOR ANY AND ALL NON-ECF DOCUMENTS, ONCE THE CASE IS OPENED IN THE SECOND CIRCUIT) (nd)
December 23, 2013 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 1092 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
December 23, 2013 1092 NOTICE OF APPEAL from 1091 Amended Judgment,, 1089 Judgment,,. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., Jim Bouton, Canadian Standard Association, Paul Dickson, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., Herbert Mitgang, Pearson Education, Inc., The Authors Guild, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number 0208-9204161. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Rosenthal, Edward)
December 10, 2013 1091 AMENDED JUDGMENT amending 1089 Judgment, that, 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied; 2. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted; 3. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice; 4. Costs in this action are awarded to Defendant, as the prevailing party in this action; and 5. Any application for attorneys' fees must be made within 14 days of the final resolution of all appeals or, if no appeal is taken, within 14 days after the expiration of time for filing a notice of appeal; 6. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 12/10/13) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml)
December 9, 2013 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Lynn T. Chu to RE-FILE Document 1090 FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees. ERROR(S): No Signature or s/. (db)
December 6, 2013 1090 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Attorney Fees. Document filed by Writers' Representatives LLC.(Chu, Lynn) Modified on 12/9/2013 (db).
November 27, 2013 Terminate Transcript Deadlines (ml)
November 27, 2013 1089 JUDGMENT that, 1. Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied; 2. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted; 3. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed with prejudice; 4. Costs in this action are awarded to Defendant, as the prevailing party in this action; and 5. Any application for attorneys' must be made within 14 days after entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2)(B)(i). (Signed by Circuit Judge Denny Chin on 11/27/13) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(ml)
November 14, 2013 1088 Featured Case OPINION re: #103753 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication filed by Google Inc., 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed by Betty Miles, The Authors Guild, Joseph Goulden, Jim Bouton. For the reasons set forth in this Opinion, plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment is denied and Google's motion for summary judgment is granted. Judgment will be entered in favor of Google dismissing the Complaint. Google shall submit a proposed judgment, on notice, within five business days hereof. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 11/14/2013) (tro) (Main Document 1088 replaced on 11/14/2013) (tro). Modified on 11/19/2013 (ca).
October 3, 2013 1087 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 9/23/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(Rodriguez, Somari)
October 3, 2013 1086 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 9/23/2013 before Judge Denny Chin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/28/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/4/2014.(Rodriguez, Somari)
September 16, 2013 1085 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version).. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild. (Boni, Michael)
September 9, 2013 1084 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
September 4, 2013 1083 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Seth Goldman on behalf of The Authors Guild. (Goldman, Jeremy)
September 4, 2013 1082 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Henry Rosenthal on behalf of The Authors Guild. (Rosenthal, Edward)
August 29, 2013 1081 Featured Case ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from plaintiffs' counsel, dated August 28, 2013, requesting a two-week extension of the schedule for briefing and argument of the parties' summary judgment motions. Defendant Google, Inc. opposes this request. The request is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: The deadline for plaintiffs to submit their reply brief is extended to Monday, September 16, 2013. The request for adjournment of oral argument is denied. The date of September 23, 2013 was set on July 8, 2013, more than five weeks ago. The Court will not adjourn oral argument because new counsel in this eight-year old litigation is unavailable on September 23rd because he will be attending a conference on copyright law. (Replies due by 9/16/2013.) (Signed by Judge Denny Chin, Sitting by Designation on 8/29/2013) (ja)
August 27, 2013 1080 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
August 27, 2013 1079 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
August 26, 2013 1078 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Google Inc.'s Responses and Objections to Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts in Support of their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (provisionally filed under seal) served on Michael J. Boni and Joanne E. Zack, Counsel for Plaintiffs on August 26, 2103. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
August 26, 2013 1077 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 1054 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
August 26, 2013 1076 DECLARATION of Scott Dougall in Opposition re: 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version).. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
August 26, 2013 1075 DECLARATION of Joseph C. Gratz in Opposition re: 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version).. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Gratz, Joseph)
August 26, 2013 1074 DECLARATION of Paul Aiken in Opposition re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Boni, Michael)
August 26, 2013 1073 DECLARATION of of Michael J. Boni in Opposition re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 3), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 3), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 1 of 3), # 5 Exhibit 2 (Part 2 of3), # 6 Exhibit 2 (Part 3 of 3), # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 4, # 9 Exhibit 5, # 10 Exhibit 6, # 11 Exhibit 7, # 12 Exhibit 8, # 13 Exhibit 9, # 14 Exhibit 10)(Boni, Michael)
August 26, 2013 1072 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version). Defendant Google Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
August 26, 2013 1071 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 1043 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild. (Boni, Michael)
August 26, 2013 1070 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild. (Boni, Michael)
August 26, 2013 1069 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin, from Michael J. Boni, dated 8/23/2013, re: on behalf of all parties, plaintiffs and Google, to request that the parties be able to file their respective, non-public sealed versions of their briefs on Tuesday, August 27, 2013. The deadline to file their summary judgment opposition briefs is a day earlier, and on that date (August 26) the parties will file electronically their public, redacted versions of the brief, and will also serve one another with their undredacted versions as well. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. SO ORDERED. (Brief due by 8/27/2013.) (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 8/26/2013) (ja)
July 8, 2013 1068 Featured Case ORDER: The briefing schedule for the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment is hereby modified as follows: (1) By August 26, 2013, the parties shall file their oppositions to the cross-motions for summary judgment. The parties shall include any arguments in response to the amici curiae briefs in their memoranda in opposition to the cross-motions. The parties' memoranda of law shall not exceed 50 pages, including any response to the amici curiae briefs. (2) By September 9, 2013, in memoranda of law not to exceed 20 pages, the parties shall file their replies in support of the cross-motions for summary judgment. (3) Oral argument on the cross-motions for summary judgment will be heard on September 23, 2013 at 2:30 PM. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 8/26/2013, Replies due by 9/9/2013.), ( Oral Argument set for 9/23/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Denny Chin.) (Signed by Judge Denny Chin Sitting by Designation on 7/8/2013) (rsh)
July 1, 2013 1067 Featured Case ORDER: By August 5, 2013, the parties shall file their oppositions to the cross-motions for summary judgment. The parties shall include any arguments in response to the amici curiae briefs in their memoranda in opposition to the cross-motions. The parties' memoranda of law shall not exceed 50 pages, including any response to the amici curiae briefs. By August 19, 2013, in memoranda of law not to exceed 10 pages, the parties shall file their replies in support of the cross-motions for summary judgment. Oral argument on the cross-motions for summary judgment will be heard on September 5, 2013 at 10:00 AM. Responses due by 8/5/2013. Replies due by 8/19/2013. Oral Argument set for 9/5/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Denny Chin. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin Sitting by Designation on 7/1/2013) (ft) Modified on 7/12/2013 (ft).
July 1, 2013 1066 MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 12-3200-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the order of the District Court is VACATED and the case is REMANDED in accordance with the opinion of this Court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 07/01/2013. (nd)
July 1, 2013 1065 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA USCA Case Number 12-3200-cv. For the reasons stated, we VACATE the June 11, 2012 order of the District Court certifying plaintiffs proposed class and REMAND the cause to the District Court for consideration of the fair use issues, without prejudice to any renewal of the motion for class certification before the District Court following its decision on the fair use defense. In the interest of judicial economy, any further appeal from the decisions of the District Court shall be assigned to this panel. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 07/1/2013. (nd)
April 7, 2013 1064 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Cindy A. Cohn on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation et al.. New Address: Electronic Frontier Foundation, 815 Eddy Street, San Francisco, CA, USA 94109, 415-436-9333. (Cohn, Cindy)
September 17, 2012 1063 Featured Case ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 12-3200. Appellant Google, Inc. has filed a motion to stay District Court proceedings pending appeal of the class certification order and appellees have filed a response stating that they consent to the stay, although not to the arguments put forward in the motion as to why Google expects to prevail on appeal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion to stay proceedings pending appeal is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Order: 09/17/2012. Certified: 09/17/2012. (nd)
August 29, 2012 1062 Featured Case ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a letter from defendant Google, Inc. ("Google"), dated August 17, 2012, requesting that the Court stay all proceedings in this case pending review by the Second Circuit of this Court's May 31, 2012 Order granting class certification (the "Class Certification Order"). Plaintiffs have not responded to Google's letter. For the following reasons, the application is denied as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 8/28/2012) (lmb)
August 28, 2012 USCA Appeal Fees received $ 455.00 receipt number 465401046514 on 08/16/2012 re: 1057 USCA Order granting leave to appeal pursuant to FRAP 23(f). (nd)
August 17, 2012 1061 Featured Case ORDER: It is hereby ordered as follows: (1) By October 24, 2012, the parties shall file their oppositions to the cross-motions for summary judgment. (2) By November 19, 2012, plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the amici curiae briefs, in a memorandum of law not to exceed 40 pages. (3) By November 19, 2012, the parties shall file their replies in support of the cross-motions for summary judgment. (4) Oral argument on the motions for summary judgment shall proceed on December 4, 2012 at 2PM., ( Responses due by 11/19/2012., Replies due by 11/19/2012.), ( Oral Argument set for 12/4/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Denny Chin.) (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 8/17/2012) (lmb)
August 15, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version)., 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Responses due by 8/24/2012 (jfe)
August 15, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: ( Responses due by 9/17/2012), Set/Reset Hearings:( Oral Argument set for 10/9/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Denny Chin.) (jfe)
August 15, 2012 1060 Featured Case ORDER granting 1047 Motion for Leave to File Document; granting 1051 Motion to File Amicus Brief. It is hereby ordered as follows: (1) The motions for leave to file amici curiae briefs are granted, and the proposed briefs are accepted for filing. (2) Plaintiffs shall respond to the amici curiae briefs by September 17, 2012 in a memorandum of law not to exceed 40 pages. (3) The amici curiae may not file replies. (4) The parties' oppositions to the cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed by August 24, 2012. (5) The parties' replies in support of the cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed by September 17, 2012. (6) Oral argument on the motions for summary judgment shall proceed on October 9, 2012 at 10 AM.. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 8/15/2012) (jfe)
August 15, 2012 1059 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1051 MOTION to File Amicus Brief IN PARTIAL SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION.. Document filed by Digital Humanities Scholars and Law Professors. (Siavoshy, Babak)
August 14, 2012 1058 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 1047 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by America Library Association, Assocation of Research Libraries, Association of College and Research Libraries, Electronic Frontier Foundation et al.. (Band, Jonathan)
August 14, 2012 Appeal Fee Due: for 1057 USCA Order granting leave to appeal. $455.00 Appeal fee due by 8/28/2012. (nd)
August 14, 2012 1057 TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA USCA Case Number 12-2402. Petitioner, through counsel, moves, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(f), for leave to appeal the District Court's order granting Respondents' motion for class certification. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the petition is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Certified: 08/14/2012. New Case No. 12-3200. (nd) Modified on 8/28/2012 (nd).
August 9, 2012 1056 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1051 MOTION to File Amicus Brief IN PARTIAL SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION., 1047 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Motions for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild. (Boni, Michael)
August 3, 2012 1055 BRIEF re: 1051 MOTION to File Amicus Brief IN PARTIAL SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. (CORRECTED). Document filed by Digital Humanities Scholars and Law Professors.(Siavoshy, Babak)
August 3, 2012 1054 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild. (Zack, Joanne)
August 3, 2012 1053 DECLARATION of Joanne Zack in Support re: 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version).. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-22, # 2 Exhibit 23, part 1, # 3 Exhibit 23, part 2, # 4 Exhibit 24-32, # 5 Exhibit 33-35, # 6 Exhibit 36-37, # 7 Exhibit 38-41, # 8 Exhibit 42, part 1, # 9 Exhibit 42, part 2-43)(Zack, Joanne)
August 3, 2012 1052 BRIEF re: 1051 MOTION to File Amicus Brief IN PARTIAL SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION.. Document filed by Digital Humanities Scholars and Law Professors.(Siavoshy, Babak)
August 3, 2012 1051 MOTION to File Amicus Brief IN PARTIAL SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. Document filed by Digital Humanities Scholars and Law Professors.(Siavoshy, Babak)
August 3, 2012 1050 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version). (Redacted). Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild. (Zack, Joanne)
August 3, 2012 1049 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Public Version). Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild.(Zack, Joanne)
August 1, 2012 1048 BRIEF re: 1047 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by America Library Association, Assocation of Research Libraries, Association of College and Research Libraries, Electronic Frontier Foundation et al..(Band, Jonathan)
August 1, 2012 1047 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by America Library Association, Assocation of Research Libraries, Association of College and Research Libraries, Electronic Frontier Foundation et al..(Band, Jonathan)
July 31, 2012 1046 Featured Case ORDER granting 1030 Motion for Babak Siavoshy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon payment to the Clerk of the Court of the applicable fee.(Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 7/31/2012) (ama)
July 31, 2012 1045 Featured Case ORDER granting 1029 Motion for Jennifer M. Urban to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Upon payment to the Clerk of the Court of the applicable fee.(Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 7/31/2012) (ama) Modified on 7/31/2012 (ama).
July 27, 2012 1044 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
July 27, 2012 1043 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph C. Gratz to RE-FILE Document 1033 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Use the event type Rule 56.1 Statement found under the event list Other Answers. (db)
July 27, 2012 1042 DECLARATION of Gloriana St. Clair in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1041 DECLARATION of Stephane Jaskiewicz in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1040 DECLARATION of Brad Hasegawa in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1039 DECLARATION of Bruce S. Harris in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, Part 2)(Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1038 DECLARATION of Kurt Groetsch in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1037 DECLARATION of Albert N. Greco in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, part 1, # 2 Exhibit A, part 2)(Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1036 DECLARATION of Joseph C. Gratz in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1035 DECLARATION of Dan Clancy in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1034 DECLARATION of Judith A. Chevalier in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1033 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication. Local Rule 56.1 Statement of Uncontested Facts in Support of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Adjudication or in the Alternative for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph) Modified on 7/27/2012 (db).
July 27, 2012 1032 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 1031 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of Defendant Google Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication. Document filed by Google Inc..(Gratz, Joseph)
July 25, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 1030 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 07/25/2012, Receipt Number 1044640. (jd)
July 25, 2012 1030 MOTION for Babak Siavoshy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Digital Humanities Scholars and Law Professors.(pgu)
July 24, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 1029 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 07/20/2012, Receipt Number 1044226. (jd)
July 20, 2012 1029 MOTION for Jennifer M. Urban to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Digital Humanities Scholars and Law Professors.(pgu)
June 19, 2012 1028 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions for summary judgment due by 7/27/2012. Responses due by 8/24/2012 Replies due by 9/17/2012. Oral Argument set for 10/9/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Denny Chin. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 6/19/2012) (cd)
June 14, 2012 1027 ANSWER to 985 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Google Inc..(Gratz, Joseph)
June 11, 2012 1026 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: It is hereby Ordered that the Class is certified, defined as set forth within this Order. Betty Miles, Joseph Goulden, and Jim Bouton are designated as Representative Plaintiffs for the Class. Boni & Zack LLC is appointed Lead Counsel, and Milberg LLP and Kohn, Swift & Graf, P.C. are appointed Class Counsel. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin, Sitting by designation on 6/11/2012) (jfe)
June 1, 2012 1024 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Joanne Zack and Joseph C. Gratz dated 5/23/2012 re: We write regarding three matters related to the upcoming briefing on the parties' contemplated motions for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Redactions are to be kept to a minimum. Approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 6/01/2012) (ama) Modified on 6/7/2012 (ama).
May 31, 2012 1025 INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re: 1023 Memorandum & Opinion. (Attachments: # 1 U.S. Copyright Office - Search Copyright Records) (tro)
May 31, 2012 1023 Featured Case OPINION # 101856. For the reasons stated above, Google's motions to dismiss the claims of the associational plaintiffs are denied and the AG Representative Plaintiffs' motion for class certification is granted. Re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Betty Miles, The Authors Guild, Joseph Goulden, Paul Dickson, Herbert Mitgang, Daniel Hoffman, 992 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc. (Signed by U.S. Circuit Judge Denny Chin Sitting by Designation on 5/31/2012) (rjm) Modified on 5/31/2012 (rjm). Modified on 6/1/2012 (ft).
May 30, 2012 1022 RESPONSE re: 1021 Notice (Other) of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles, The Authors Guild, Jim Bouton. (Zack, Joanne)
May 18, 2012 1021 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Gratz, Joseph)
May 17, 2012 1020 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 5/3/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 17, 2012 1019 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 5/3/2012 before Judge Denny Chin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Linda Fisher, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/11/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/21/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/20/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 16, 2012 1018 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
May 15, 2012 1017 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiffs are permitted to file under seal a Reply Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (Confidential Portion). A public Reply Declaration in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification has already been filed, but does not contain the confidential pages to be filed under seal. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 5/14/2012) (js)
May 15, 2012 1016 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
May 3, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denny Chin: Motion Hearing held on 5/3/2012. Case called for motion argument on Defendants motions to dismiss 1st amended complaint (in both cases) and Plaintiffs motion for class certification in the Authors Guild case- 05 cv 8136. Motions argued; decision reserved. (cd)
April 24, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 1011 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 04/05/2012, Receipt Number 1034585. (jd)
April 24, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 1012 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 04/05/2012, Receipt Number 1034548. (jd)
April 16, 2012 1015 Featured Case ORDER. The Court is in receipt of letters from Google and the Authors Guild plaintiffs, both dated April 12, 2012. Google's request for leave to file a surreply is denied. Its request for an order compelling Mr. Edelman and Mr. Gervais to appear for depositions within the next two weeks is also denied, as expert depositions are scheduled for May 28th to June 8, 2012. Google's objection to the inclusion of expert reports in the Authors Guild plaintiffs' reply brief is noted and can be addressed at oral argument. The motions to dismiss (in both cases) and the motion for class certification (in The Authors Guild case) having been fully submitted[ the Court will hold oral argument on these motions on May 3, 2012 at 10:00 AM. (Oral Argument set for 5/3/2012 at 10:00 AM before Judge Denny Chin.) (Signed by U.S. Circuit Judge Denny Chin Sitting by Designation on 4/16/2012) (rjm) Modified on 4/16/2012 (rjm).
April 11, 2012 1014 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR DAVID F. MCGOWAN granting 1012 Motion for David F. McGowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by USCJ Denny Chin By Designation on 4/4/2012) (rjm)
April 11, 2012 1013 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR GENEVIEVE ROSLOFF granting 1011 Motion for Genevieve Rosloff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by USCJ Denny Chin By Designation on 4/5/2012) (rjm) Modified on 4/11/2012 (rjm).
April 5, 2012 1012 MOTION for David F. McGowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google Inc..(bwa)
April 5, 2012 1011 MOTION for Genevieve Rosloff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google Inc..(bwa)
April 3, 2012 1010 DECLARATION of Joanne Zack in Support re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4-8, # 3 Exhibit 9-12, # 4 Exhibit 13-14, # 5 Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 17-18)(Zack, Joanne)
April 3, 2012 1009 DECLARATION of Joanne Zack in Support re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles. (Zack, Joanne)
April 3, 2012 1008 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Jim Bouton, Joseph Goulden, Betty Miles. (Zack, Joanne)
March 28, 2012 1007 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: At the request of the parties Opening expert reports shall be filed by May 4, 2012. b. Rebuttal expert reports shall be filed by May 24, 2012. c. Expert depositions shall be completed between May 28, 2012 to June 8,2012.d.Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed by June 14, 2012. e. Oppositions to Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed by July 23, 2012. f. Replies in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed by August 13, 2012. Motions due by 6/14/2012. Responses due by 7/23/2012 Replies due by 8/13/2012. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 3/27/2012) (js)
March 27, 2012 1006 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 998 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE: Motion GRANTED. DeVore and DeMarco, LLP, is hereby RELIEVED as counsel for the class members listed above. ***Attorney Andrew C. DeVore and Amin S. Kassam terminated. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 3/26/2012) (ab)
February 17, 2012 1005 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 992 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
February 8, 2012 1004 DECLARATION of Daniel Clancy in Opposition re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
February 8, 2012 1003 DECLARATION of Joseph C. Gratz in Opposition re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10A, # 11 Exhibit 10B, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16)(Gratz, Joseph)
February 8, 2012 1002 DECLARATION of E. Gabriel Perle in Opposition re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
February 8, 2012 1001 DECLARATION of Hal Poret in Opposition re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Appendix A, # 3 Appendix B, # 4 Appendix C, # 5 Appendix D, # 6 Appendix E, # 7 Appendix F)(Gratz, Joseph)
February 8, 2012 1000 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
February 8, 2012 999 DECLARATION of Amin Kassam in Support re: 998 MOTION for Amin Kassam and Andrew DeVore to Withdraw as Attorney.. Document filed by Arlo Guthrie, Catherine Ryan Hyde, Eugene Linden, Julia Wright. (Kassam, Amin)
February 8, 2012 998 MOTION for Amin Kassam and Andrew DeVore to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Arlo Guthrie, Catherine Ryan Hyde, Eugene Linden, Julia Wright.(Kassam, Amin)
February 6, 2012 997 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 992 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The Authors Guild. (Zack, Joanne)
January 17, 2012 996 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: The following deadlines shall apply: a. Plaintiffs' opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss shall be filed by 2/6/2012; b. Defendant's response to the class certification motion shall be filed by 2/8/2012; c. Defendant's reply in support of its motion to dismiss shall be filed by 2/17/2012; d. Plaintiffs' reply in support of their class certification motion shall be filed by 4/3/2012; e. Fact discovery shall be completed by 4/13/2012. The remaining deadlines set forth in the Court's 9/16/2011 Scheduling Order shall remain in place. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 1/17/2012) (ft)
January 17, 2012 995 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF HERBERT MITGANG, DANIEL HOFFMAN, AND PAUL DICKSON AS REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFFS: All claims of representative plaintiffs Herbert Mitgang, Daniel Hoffman, and Paul Dickson are voluntarily dismissed. The dismissals are without prejudice, and Herbert Mitgang, Daniel Hoffman, and Paul Dickson retain all right as members of the putative class in this action. The foregoing is without costs, disbursements, or counsel fees to any party. Herbert Mitgang, Paul Dickson and Daniel Hoffman terminated. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 1/17/2012) (ft)
December 22, 2011 994 NOTICE of Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint re: 992 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Gratz, Joseph)
December 22, 2011 993 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 992 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
December 22, 2011 992 MOTION to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint. Document filed by Google Inc.. Responses due by 1/23/2012(Gratz, Joseph)
December 12, 2011 991 DECLARATION of Joanne Zack in Support re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, Daniel Hoffman, Betty Miles, Herbert Mitgang, The Authors Guild. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-12, # 2 Exhibit 13-23)(Zack, Joanne)
December 12, 2011 990 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 989 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, Daniel Hoffman, Betty Miles, Herbert Mitgang, The Authors Guild. (Zack, Joanne)
December 12, 2011 989 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, Daniel Hoffman, Betty Miles, Herbert Mitgang, The Authors Guild. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zack, Joanne)
November 29, 2011 988 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: The following deadlines shall apply: a. Defendant's motions to dismiss shall be filed by December 23, 2011. b. Plaintiffs' oppositions to defendant's motions shall be filed by January 23, 2012. c. Defendant's replies shall be filed by February 3, 2012. The deadlines set forth in the Court's September 16, 2011 Scheduling Order shall remain in place. Motions due by 12/23/2011. Responses due by 1/23/2012. Replies due by 2/3/2012. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 11/28/2011) (rjm)
October 28, 2011 987 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Joseph C. Gratz dated 10/25/2011 re: Counsel for the defendant writes on behalf of all parties to request an extension of Defendants time to file its response to the complaint, until 11/28/2011. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The deadline set forth in the Court's 9/16/11 Scheduling Order shall otherwise remain in place. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 10/28/2011) (ft)
October 20, 2011 986 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Joseph C. Gratz dated 10/18/2011 re: Counsel for both parties request that the Court permit Defendant to file its response to the complaint on or before 11/7/2011. ENDORSEMENT: Approved, but FINAL. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 10/20/2011) (ft)
October 14, 2011 985 FOURTH AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT amending 782 Amended Complaint against Google Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, Daniel Hoffman, Betty Miles, Herbert Mitgang, The Authors Guild. Related document: 782 Amended Complaint filed by Canadian Standard Association, Simon & Schuster, Inc., Herbert Mitgang, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., Betty Miles, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Daniel Hoffman, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc.(mro)
September 21, 2011 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 985 Transcript. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tro)
September 21, 2011 984 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 9/15/2011 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 21, 2011 983 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 9/15/2011 before Judge Denny Chin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/17/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
September 16, 2011 982 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Any Motion to Amend the Third Amended Complaint by October 14, 2011. Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion by December 12, 2011. Defendants' Response Class Certification Motion by January 26, 2012. Plaintiffs' Reply in further support of Class Certification Motion by March 12, 2012. Motions for summary judgment due by 5/31/2012. Responses to summary judgment motion due by 7/9/2012 Reply in support of summary judgment due by 7/30/2012. Expert deposition from 5/14/12 through 5/25/2012. Merits discovery shall be completed by 3/30/2012. Oral Argument set for 9/6/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Denny Chin. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/16/2011) (jfe)
September 16, 2011 Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so redesignated. (pgu)
September 15, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denny Chin: Status Conference held on 9/15/2011. All counsel present. Status Conference held. The parties have submitted a proposed scheduling order. The Court will adopt the proposed schedule and issue an order. (mro)
September 14, 2011 981 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Colin A. Underwood dated 9/12/2011 re: We write to inform the Court that, as a result of our firm's recent hiring of Julian Perlman from Mishcon de Reya New York LLP and Mr. Perlman's prior representation of plaintiffs in this litigation, our firm is in the process of being retained by the American Society of Media Photographers ("ASMP") as special counsel in connection with ASMP's claims against Google. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will address this issue at the conference tomorrow. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/14/2011) (lmb)
August 1, 2011 980 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 7/19/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 1, 2011 979 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 7/19/2011 before Judge Denny Chin. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/5/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/3/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly)
July 26, 2011 978 BRIEF CITATION OF NEW AUTHORITY (SUPREME COURT'S WAL-MART OPINION ON CLASS ACTION CERTIFICATION). Document filed by Robert M. Kunstadt.(Maggioni, Ilaria)
July 26, 2011 977 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ilaria Maggioni on behalf of Robert M. Kunstadt (Maggioni, Ilaria)
July 19, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Denny Chin: Status Conference held on 7/19/2011, ( Status Conference set for 9/15/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge Denny Chin.). (mbe)
April 18, 2011 975 NOTICE of Compliance with the Clerk's 4/6/2011 Note to refile document Manually. (mbe)
April 16, 2011 976 NOTICE of Filing Amended Certificate of Service. Document filed by Darlene Marshall. (mbe)
April 15, 2011 974 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Bruce P. Keller dated 4/14/2011 re: The parties respectfully request that the upcoming status conference scheduled for 4/25/11 be rescheduled for 6/1/11 at 4 p.m. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 4/14/2011) (jfe)
April 6, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Matthew Jay Weiss to MANUALLY RE-FILE Document No. 973 Petition. This document is not filed via ECF. (ka)
April 5, 2011 973 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - BILL OF COSTS (Petition to Preserve Claim For Incentive Award And Attorneys' Fees). Document filed by Darlene Marshall.(Weiss, Matthew) Modified on 4/6/2011 (ka).
March 24, 2011 972 Featured Case ORDER: The Court's Opinion, dated March 22, 2011, is hereby amended at pages 47 and 48 to list the appearance of counsel for the United States of America, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 3/24/2011) (mro)
March 22, 2011 971 Featured Case OPINION: #100080 In the end, I conclude that the ASA is not fair, adequate, and reasonable. As the United States and other objectors have noted, may of the concerns raised in the objections would be ameliorated if the ASA were converted from an "opt-out" settlement to an "opt-in" settlement. I urge the parties to consider revising the ASA accordingly. The motion for final approval of the ASA is denied, without prejudice to renewal in the event the parties negotiate a revised settlement agreement. The motion for an award of attorneys' fees and costs is denied, without prejudice. The Court will hold a status conference on 4/25/2011, at 4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11A of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse. (Status Conference set for 4/25/2011 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denny Chin.) (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 3/22/2011) (tro) Modified on 3/24/2011 (ajc).
February 18, 2011 970 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND CASH PAYMENT DEADLINE: The parties to the above-captioned case and to The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., et al. v. Google Inc., No. 05 CV 8881, by and through their undersigned counsel, hereby agree that the proposed Amended Settlement Agreement, dated November 13,2009, is amended as follows: (see order). (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 2/18/2011) (jar)
January 11, 2011 969 Letter from Edward R. Clark dated January 3, 2011 re: Please advise if the Court has approved the settlement in the above case. Considering the Fairness Hearing was conducted nearly a year ago, I'm suspicious that the Settlement Administrator, Rust Consulting, Inc. of Minneapolis, MN is not being honest, claiming the Court has not approved the settlement. (arc)
October 12, 2010 968 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on February 18, 2010 at 10:10 am before Judge Denny Chin. (eef)
September 30, 2010 967 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 848 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: The application was granted, as the brief was accepted and the Japan P.E.N. Club's lawyer was heard at the hearing. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/30/2010) (jfe)
April 9, 2010 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 964 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 03/25/2010, Receipt Number 898543. (jd)
April 2, 2010 966 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 964 Motion for Paul D. Rothstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Paul D. Rothstein is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Objector Darlene Marshall in this action. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 4/2/2010) (tro)
March 25, 2010 964 Featured Case MOTION for Paul D. Rothstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Darlene Marshall.(mro)
March 10, 2010 963 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/18/2010 before Judge Denny Chin. (jfe)
March 10, 2010 962 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/18/2010 before Judge Richard Owen. (jfe)
March 9, 2010 961 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from David Bolt dated 1/28/10 re: Canadian authors who are part of the proposed Author Sub Class object to the amended settlement in the Google Book Search Copyright Class Action. ENDORSEMENT: This letter is accepted for filing as a timely objection. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 3/9/10) (dle)
February 25, 2010 960 Featured Case MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 780 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Picture Archive Council of America, Lou Jacobs, Jr, Peter Turner, North American Nature Photography Association, Dan Budnick, The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Joel Meyerowitz, Graphic Artists Guild, 752 Notice of Appeal, filed by Picture Archive Council of America, Lou Jacobs, Jr, Peter Turner, North American Nature Photography Association, Dan Budnick, Joel Meyerowitz, The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc. USCA Case Number 09-4161. Insofar as no opposition has been filed hereto, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for voluntary Dismissal be, and it hereby is GRANTED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 2/22/2010. (nd)
February 24, 2010 959 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John W. Davis on behalf of David Meininger (Davis, John)
February 24, 2010 958 Featured Case Objection [supplemental]. Document filed by David Meininger. (Davis, John)
February 22, 2010 957 Featured Case MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 756 Notice of Appeal filed by Lewis Hyde, Harry Lewis USCA Case Number 09-4224-cv(con. Ordered that the appeal is DISMISSED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 2/19/2010. (nd)
February 12, 2010 956 Featured Case DECLARATION of Katherine Kinsella in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit)(Cunard, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2010 955 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement. / Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum Responding to Specific Objections. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
February 11, 2010 954 Featured Case DECLARATION of Belinda Bulger in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-5 to Bulger Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 6 to Bulger Declaration)(Keller, Bruce)
February 11, 2010 953 Featured Case DECLARATION of Tiffaney Allen in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Cunard, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2010 952 Featured Case DECLARATION of Paul Aiken in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
February 11, 2010 951 Featured Case DECLARATION of Jeffrey P. Cunard in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Cunard, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2010 950 Featured Case DECLARATION of Owen Atkinson in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
February 11, 2010 949 Featured Case DECLARATION of Richard Sarnoff in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
February 11, 2010 948 Featured Case DECLARATION of Daphne Keller in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Google Books Privacy Policy))(Gratz, Joseph)
February 11, 2010 947 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement. / Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Settlement Approval. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
February 11, 2010 946 Featured Case DECLARATION of Daniel Clancy in Support re: 945 MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Google Inc.. (Gratz, Joseph)
February 11, 2010 945 Featured Case MOTION to Approve Amended Settlement Agreement / Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Final Judgment and Order of Dismissal)(Keller, Bruce)
February 11, 2010 944 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael J. Boni (w/Exhibits A-E) in Support re: 942 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs.. Document filed by Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, The Author's Guild, Herbert Mitgang, Betty Miles, Daniel Hoffman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F -- Declaration of Sanford P. Dumain, # 2 Exhibit G -- Declaration of Robert J. LaRocca)(Boni, Michael)
February 11, 2010 943 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 942 MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs. Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Counsel for the Author Sub-Class for an Award of Fees and Reimbursement of Costs. Document filed by Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, The Author's Guild, Herbert Mitgang, Betty Miles, Daniel Hoffman. (Boni, Michael)
February 11, 2010 942 Featured Case MOTION for Attorney Fees Notice of Motion and Motion for Approval of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs. Document filed by Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, The Author's Guild, Herbert Mitgang, Betty Miles, Daniel Hoffman.(Boni, Michael)
February 11, 2010 941 Featured Case BRIEF of Google Inc. in Support of Motion for Final Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Google Inc..(Gratz, Joseph)
February 11, 2010 940 Featured Case NOTICE of State of CT Withdrawal of Request to Appear at Feb 18, 2010 Fairness Hearing re: 914 Notice (Other). Document filed by Richard Blumenthal CT Attorney General. (Becker, Gary)
February 11, 2010 939 Featured Case NOTICE of INTENT TO APPEAR that the undersigned, of the law firm of Eaton & Van Winkle, LLP, intends to appear at the Fairness Hearing in the above-captioned action, currently scheduled for February 18,2010. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel may appear, but as this matter us untimely and numerous request to speck have been received counsel will not be permitted to speck. SO ORDERED. Document filed by Lewis Hyde, Harry Lewis, Charles Nesson, Nicholas Negroponte. (jmi) Modified on 2/11/2010 (jmi).
February 10, 2010 935 Featured Case NOTICE of Withdrawal of Request to Appear at the February 18, 2010 Fairness Hearing. Document filed by Questia Media Inc.. (Kaplan, Lee)
February 9, 2010 938 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from Stuart Bernstein dated 2/4/2010 re: Please accept this letter as a notice of my intent to speak at the 2/18/2010 Fairness Hearing in the matter of the Amended Google Book Settlement. ENDORSEMENT: As this request was received on 2/9/2010, it is untimely. In light of the number of requests to speak, this request is DENIED as untimely. Mr. Bernstein is welcome to attend. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 2/9/2010) (tro)
February 9, 2010 937 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 907 Motion for Michael K. Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Michael K. Kellogg is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for AT&T Corp. and its affiliates in this action. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 2/9/2010) (tro)
February 9, 2010 936 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 906 Motion for Kiran Sriram Raj to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Kiran Sriram Raj is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for AT&T Corp. and its affiliates in this action. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 2/9/2010) (tro)
February 9, 2010 934 Featured Case NOTICE of of Intent to Appear by Marc Rotenberg on Behalf of the Electronic Privacy Information Center. Document filed by Electronic Privacy Information Center. (Rotenberg, Marc)
February 9, 2010 933 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent To Appear. Document filed by Charles Nesson, Nicholas Negroponte, Lewis Hyde, Harry Lewis. (Garbus, Martin)
February 8, 2010 932 Featured Case ORDER; that two additional entities have also notified the Court of their desire to be heard at the fairness hearing against the proposed settlement in this case: (1) The Commonwealth of Pennsylvania; and (2) Writers' Representatives LLC and Richard A. Epstein. They will be permitted to speak at the hearing, in accordance with the procedures set forth in the order dated February 5, 2010. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 2/8/10) (pl)
February 8, 2010 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. 931 HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney Lynn Chu : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (KA)
February 6, 2010 931 Featured Case FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lynn T. Chu on behalf of Writers' Representatives LLC(LETTER). (Chu, Lynn) Modified on 2/8/2010 (KA).
February 5, 2010 930 Featured Case ORDER: The Hearing will be held at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York in Courtroom 23B at 10:00 a.m. on February 18, 2010. Overflow seating will be available in Courtroom 11A, where video of the proceeding will be provided. Seats will be reserved in the Courtroom for the parties, the government, and the twenty-six above-listedobjectors, supporters, and amici. If any of the objectors, supporters, or amici listed above has not provided the name of the representative who will be speaking, it shall provide the name in writing to the Court promptly. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 2/5/2010) (jpo)
February 5, 2010 929 Featured Case NOTICE OF INTENT TO BE HEARD: Please let it be known that Joseph V. Saphia, attorney for amicus curiae VG Wort, intends to appear and be heard at this Court's February 18, 2009 hearing. (jpo)
February 5, 2010 928 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jennifer B. Coplan dated 2/4/2010 re: Requesting leave from the Court to appear at the fairness hearing scheduled for February 18, 2010. (jpo)
February 5, 2010 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. 915 HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney Jennifer B. Coplan : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (KA)
February 4, 2010 927 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from Susan Bergholz dated 1/26/2010 re: Objection to the settlement agreement. (tro) (tro).
February 4, 2010 926 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Philip Roberts dated 1/29/2010 re: The John Hopkin's University's Withdrawal of Objection to Settlement Agreement and Certificate of Service. *Withdrawal of Objection to Settlement Agreement attached hereto. (tro)
February 4, 2010 925 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTION of Alex M.G. Burton re: For the reasons set forth in Mr. Burton's original and supplemental objection, this settlement should not be approved or the settlement classes certified. (tro)
February 4, 2010 924 Featured Case PETITION to Withdraw ProQuest LLC's Objections to the First Proposed Settlement. Document filed by Proquest, LLC. (tro)
February 4, 2010 923 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to appear at Fairness Hearing on 2/18/2010. *Letter Addressed to Judge Denny Chin, From Sarah Canzoneri, dated 1/28/2010 re: Objection to the Settlement Agreement, attached hereto. Document filed by Sarah E. Cazoneri. (tro) Modified on 2/5/2010 (tro).
February 4, 2010 922 Featured Case NOTICE of Statement of Interest. Document filed by United States of America. (Clopper, John)
February 4, 2010 921 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Brett Smith dated 1/28/2010 re: The Free Software Foundation writes to urge the Court to reject the proposed settlement until the objections further set forth in this letter are addressed, including that terms are incorporated to ensure that works covered by Free licenses are always included in the Google Books Search database under the terms of that same license. (tve)
February 4, 2010 920 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Lateet Mtima and Steven D. Jamar dated 1/27/2010 re: The Institute of Intellectual Property and Social Justice at the Howard University School of Law respectfully requests leave to address the Court on February 18, 2010, on the Google Books Settlement Agreement. (tve)
February 4, 2010 919 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear at the Fairness Hearing on February 18, 2010. Document filed by French Republic. (Max, Theodore)
February 4, 2010 918 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear at the Fairness Hearing on February 18, 2010. Document filed by Federal Republic of Germany. (Max, Theodore)
February 4, 2010 917 Featured Case NOTICE of to Appear at the Fairness Hearing. Document filed by Questia Media Inc.. (Kaplan, Lee)
February 4, 2010 916 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear. Document filed by AT&T CORP.. (Guzman, Michael)
February 4, 2010 915 Featured Case FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - REQUEST TO PARTICIPATE of Sony Electronics at the February 18, 2010 Fairness Hearing as Amicus Curiae(LETTER). Document filed by Sony Electronics Inc..(Coplan, Jennifer) Modified on 2/5/2010 (KA).
February 4, 2010 914 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear at the February 18, 2010 Fairness Hearing re: 851 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Richard Blumenthal CT Attorney General. (Becker, Gary)
February 4, 2010 913 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear. Document filed by Carl Hanser Verlag, Lynley Hood, New Zealand Society of Authors, Associazone Italiana Editori, Borsenverein des Deutschen Buchhandels, Schweizer Buchhandler - und Verleger-Verband SBVV, Hauptverband des Osterreichischen Buchhandels. (Arato, Cynthia)
February 4, 2010 912 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Associazone Italiana Editori.(Arato, Cynthia)
February 4, 2010 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 906 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 907 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 02/02/2010, Receipt Number 893451. (jd)
February 3, 2010 911 Featured Case REQUEST TO PARTICIPATE of Consumer Watchdog at the February 18, 2010 Fairness Hearing as Amicus Curiae. Document filed by Consumer Watchdog.(Fetterman, Daniel)
February 3, 2010 910 Featured Case NOTICE of of Intent to Appear at Fairness Hearing. Document filed by Electronic Privacy Information Center. (Rotenberg, Marc)
February 3, 2010 909 Featured Case NOTICE of INTENT TO APPEAR AT THE FEBRUARY 18, 2010 FAIRNESS HEARING. Document filed by Open Book Alliance. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
February 3, 2010 908 Featured Case NOTICE of INTENT TO APPEAR AT THE FEBRUARY 18, 2010 FAIRNESS HEARING. Document filed by The Internet Archive. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
February 2, 2010 907 Featured Case MOTION for Michael Kerry Kellogg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by AT&T CORP.(mro)
February 2, 2010 906 Featured Case MOTION for Kiran Sriram Raj to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by AT&T CORP.(mro)
February 2, 2010 905 Featured Case NOTICE of of Intent to Appear by Amazon.com, Inc.. Document filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Wiles, Alexander)
February 2, 2010 904 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear at the February 18, 2010 Fairness Hearing. Document filed by Arlo Guthrie, Julia Wright, Catherine Ryan Hyde, Eugene Linden. (DeVore, Andrew)
February 2, 2010 903 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Ron Lazebrik dated 1/28/2010 re: Counsel writes to inform that SFWA and ASJA are members of the Author Sub-Class in this action and object to the proposed amended settlement agreement. Attached herein is that Objection of Science Fiction and Fantasy Writes of America, Inc., and American Society of Journalists and Authors Inc., to the Amended Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
February 2, 2010 902 Featured Case NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR filed by Science Fiction and Fantasy Writers of America, Inc., and the American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc. (jfe)
February 2, 2010 901 Featured Case OBJECTION OF WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION TO AMENDED PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND TO CERTIFICATION OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT CLASS AND SUBCLASSES. Filed by Richard A. Samp. (jfe)
February 2, 2010 900 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from James L. Turk dated 1/28/2010 re: CAUT writes to you to register its objection to the proposed amended settlement agreement. (jfe)
February 2, 2010 899 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Lewis Hyde dated 1/27/2010 re: Counsel writes to amend the letter of objection that counsel wrote last August in regard to The Authors Guild, Inc., et al. v. Google Inc. (jfe)
February 2, 2010 898 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Gregory Crane dated 8/7/2009 re: In support of the books Google has digitalized reach the widest possible audience as quickly as possible. (jfe)
February 1, 2010 897 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra A. E. Shapiro on behalf of Associazone Italiana Editori (Shapiro, Alexandra)
February 1, 2010 896 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear at the Feb. 18, 2010 Fairness Hearing. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Rubin, Thomas)
January 29, 2010 895 Featured Case BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE IN OPPOSITION TO THE AMENDED PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Public Knowledge.(jpo)
January 29, 2010 894 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Martin Kahn dated 1/27/2010 re: Requesting the Court's approval to withdraw its objections, filed on September 8, 2009, pursuant to Rules 23(e)(5) of the F.R.C.P.. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 893 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from Pamela Samuelson dated 1/27/2010 re: I am writing to express my intent to appear at the Fairness Hearing for the above cited case, currently scheduled for February 18, 2010. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 892 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from Moira Munro dated 1/16/2010 re: I hope that the Court will refuse to certify the class and reject the Amended Settlement Agreement. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 891 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Kees Holierhoek dated 1/26/2010 re: Requesting the Court's permission to submit this letter as an amicus curiae brief opposing approval of the Amended Settlement Agreement. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 890 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Tony Simpson dated 1/27/2010 re: Requesting the Court's permission to submit this letter as an amicus brief opposing approval of the Amended Settlement Agreement in this case. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 889 Featured Case LETTER addressed to William F. Cavanaugh from Joanne Merriam dated 1/25/2010 re: I write to express my views and concerns regarding how the United States should respond to the Amended Settlement Agreement filed on November 13, 2009. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 888 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from Stuart Bernstein dated 1/26/2010 re: We beseech the Court to give authors back their rights. Force Google to negotiate like any other publisher. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 887 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jennifer S. Jackson dated 1/27/2010 re: The State of Texas writes to object to the Amended Settlement Agreement. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 886 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from Donic Bettanin dated 1/22/2010 re: We wish to lodge an objection to the Amendments to the Original Google Book Settlement. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 885 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from Paulina Borsook dated 1/26/2010 re: Requesting that the Court junk Google Book Settlement 2.0 in favor of something that actually benefits and respects creators, and shows vision not blinded by Google dust. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 884 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from William Ash dated 1/12/2010 re: As an authors and publishers, I and my partner, Naomi Otsubo, would like to state our objections to the amended Google Book Settlement. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 883 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Antonio Ma. Avila dated 1/26/2010 re: We therefore object to the Amended Settlement Agreement. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 882 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Christian Cherdon dated 1/22/2010 re: Requesting that the Court deny final approval of the Amended Settlement Agreement. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 881 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Samantha Holman dated 1/26/2010 re: Requesting that Court's permission to submit this letter as an amicus curiae brief opposing approval of the Amended Settlement Agreement in this case. (jpo) (jpo).
January 29, 2010 880 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from John B. Morris dated 1/28/2010 re: I am writing for two purposes: to submit an amended version of our amicus brief and to request tp appear at the hearing. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 879 Featured Case NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR: I, Scott E. Gant, hereby notify the Court of my intent to appear at the Fairness Hearing in the above captioned case, currently scheduled for February 18, 2010. As explained in my Objection, filed in August 2009, I will be appearing in my individual capacity, as a member of the proposed Author Sub-Class. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 878 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Franziska Eberhard dated 1/21/2010 re: ProLitteris therefore requests the Court to deny final approval of the Amended Settlement Agreement unless the following amendments are made, as set forth in this letter. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 877 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from Rodger Touchie dated 1/28/2010 re: We consider the amended Settlement to be in the best interest of the majority of our members, particularly because it allows many Canadian publishers and/or authors to opt out of the agreement, with a process for doing so that is logical and transparent. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 876 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, J. Michael McMahon from M. Le Fanu dated 1/22/2010 re: In conclusion, our Management Committee and most members who have expressed a view consider that at a time when the creative industries are struggling to find "new models" for the digital age which can satisfy both rights holders and users, the Google Book Settlement offers a reasonable and practical way forward. (jpo)
January 29, 2010 875 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Teresa Cremisi dated 1/26/2010 re: We therefore object to the amended settlement agreement by reference to the observations of French Publishers Association in its amicus curiae letter, which hereby become an integral part of our own objections as filed herewith. (jpo)
January 28, 2010 874 Featured Case Objection of Microsoft Corporation to Proposed Amended Settlement and Certification of Proposed Settlement Class and Sub-Classes. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Rubin, Thomas)
January 28, 2010 873 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia S. Arato on behalf of Associazone Italiana Editori (Arato, Cynthia)
January 28, 2010 872 Featured Case DECLARATION of Christian Sprang in Support re: 868 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Borsenverein des Deutschen Buchhandels. (Arato, Cynthia)
January 28, 2010 871 Featured Case DECLARATION of Inge Kralupper in Support re: 868 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Hauptverband des Osterreichischen Buchhandels. (Arato, Cynthia)
January 28, 2010 870 Featured Case DECLARATION of Stephan Joss in Support re: 868 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Carl Hanser Verlag. (Arato, Cynthia)
January 28, 2010 869 Featured Case DECLARATION of Pierfrancesco Attanasio in Support re: 868 Objection (non-motion). Document filed by Associazone Italiana Editori. (Arato, Cynthia)
January 28, 2010 868 Featured Case Objection to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Carl Hanser Verlag, Lynley Hood, New Zealand Society of Authors. (Arato, Cynthia)
January 28, 2010 867 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carl Hanser Verlag, New Zealand Society of Authors.(Arato, Cynthia)
January 28, 2010 866 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear. Document filed by Science Fiction and Fantasy Writers of America, Inc., American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc.. (Lazebnik, Ron)
January 28, 2010 865 Featured Case DECLARATION of Ron Lazebnik. Document filed by Science Fiction and Fantasy Writers of America, Inc., American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lazebnik, Ron)
January 28, 2010 864 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Science Fiction and Fantasy Writers of America, Inc., American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc.. (Lazebnik, Ron)
January 28, 2010 863 Featured Case Objection to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by AT&T CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-I)(Guzman, Michael)
January 28, 2010 862 Featured Case REPLY. Document filed by Writers' Representatives LLC. (Chu, Lynn)
January 28, 2010 861 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Derek Tam Ho on behalf of AT&T CORP. (Ho, Derek)
January 28, 2010 860 Featured Case Objection re: 768 MOTION to Approve / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Attorney General. (Marden, Norman)
January 28, 2010 859 Featured Case NOTICE of Supplemental Objections. Document filed by Charles D Weller, Dirk Sutro. (Siegel, Edward)
January 28, 2010 858 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Marc Maurer, President, National Federation of the Blind dated 1/19/10 re: Request for the Opportunity of the National Federation of the Blind to address the court briefly at the February 18 fairness hearing. (db)
January 28, 2010 857 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Dr. Robert Staats and Rainer Just, Co-Managing Directors, VG WORT dated 1/21/10 re: Request that the Court deny final approval of the Amended Settlement Agreement. (db)
January 28, 2010 856 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from James Grimmelman dated 1/28/10 re: The Court should reject the Proposed Amended Settlement Agreement. (db)
January 28, 2010 855 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL OBJECTION OF SCOTT E. GANT TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT, AND TOCERTIFICATION OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT CLASS AND SUB-CLASSES. (db)
January 28, 2010 854 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Susan Price dated 1/27/10 re: Request that the Court refuse to certify the class and to reject the Amended Settlement Agreement. (db)
January 28, 2010 853 Featured Case DECLARATION of Nicolas Georges in Opposition re: 768 MOTION to Approve / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by French Republic. (Max, Theodore)
January 28, 2010 852 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Federal Republic of Germany. (Max, Theodore)
January 28, 2010 851 Featured Case Objection of the State of Connecticut to Amended Class-Action Settlement. Document filed by Richard Blumenthal CT Attorney General. (Becker, Gary)
January 28, 2010 850 Featured Case NOTICE of Objections to Amended Class Action Settlement And Notice of Intent To Appear at the February 18, 2010 Fairness Hearing. Document filed by Darlene Marshall. (Weiss, Matthew)
January 28, 2010 849 Featured Case Objection to Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Arlo Guthrie, Julia Wright, Catherine Ryan Hyde, Eugene Linden. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Objections of Guthrie, et al. to Proposed Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Supplemental Declaration of Catherine Ryan Hyde)(DeVore, Andrew)
January 28, 2010 848 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief by Japan P.E.N. Club in Opposition to Amended Proposed Settlement. Document filed by Japan P.E.N. Club. (Attachments: # 1 Japan P.E.N. Club's Amicus Curiae Brief in Opposition to Amended Proposed Settlement Agreement)(Saito, Yasuhiro)
January 28, 2010 847 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandra A. E. Shapiro on behalf of Carl Hanser Verlag, Lynley Hood, New Zealand Society of Authors (Shapiro, Alexandra)
January 28, 2010 846 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia S. Arato on behalf of New Zealand Society of Authors (Arato, Cynthia)
January 28, 2010 845 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia S. Arato on behalf of Carl Hanser Verlag, Lynley Hood (Arato, Cynthia)
January 28, 2010 844 Featured Case NOTICE of of Intent to Appear and Be Heard at the Fairness Hearing. Document filed by Takashi Atouda, Jiro Asada, Takeaki Hori, Shinobu Yoshioka, Kenta Yamada, Tomotsuyo Aizawa, Yu Ohara, Yasumasa Kiyohara, Takashi Tsujii, Akira Nogami, Hiroyuki Shinoda, Toshihiko Yuasa, Hidehiko Nakanishi, Yashio Uemura, Nobuo Uda, Tsukasa Yoshida. (Saito, Yasuhiro)
January 28, 2010 843 Featured Case Objection to the Amended Proposed Settlement. Document filed by Takashi Atouda, Jiro Asada, Takeaki Hori, Shinobu Yoshioka, Kenta Yamada, Tomotsuyo Aizawa, Yu Ohara, Yasumasa Kiyohara, Takashi Tsujii, Akira Nogami, Hiroyuki Shinoda, Toshihiko Yuasa, Hidehiko Nakanishi, Yashio Uemura, Nobuo Uda, Tsukasa Yoshida. (Saito, Yasuhiro)
January 28, 2010 842 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by John Burnett Morris, Jr on behalf of Center for Democracy & Technology.(Morris, John)
January 28, 2010 841 Featured Case SECOND BRIEF of Consumer Watchdog, Amicus Curiae, in Opposition to re: 768 MOTION to Approve / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Consumer Watchdog.(Fetterman, Daniel)
January 28, 2010 840 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF AMICUS CURIAE OPEN BOOK ALLIANCE IN OPPOSITION TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT BETWEEN THE AUTHORS GUILD, INC., ASSOCIATION OFAMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., ET AL., AND GOOGLE INC.. Document filed by Open Book Alliance. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
January 28, 2010 839 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Ursula K. LeGuin dated 1/25/10 re: author LeGuin opts out of settlement and provides petition regarding the Google Book Settlement including 367 signatures. Document filed by Ursula K. LeGuin.(dle)
January 28, 2010 838 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc..(Lazebnik, Ron)
January 28, 2010 837 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Science Fiction and Fantasy Writers of America, Inc..(Lazebnik, Ron)
January 28, 2010 836 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Serge Eyrolles dated 1/26/10 re: objection to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by French Publishers Association.(dle)
January 28, 2010 835 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ron Lazebnik on behalf of Science Fiction and Fantasy Writers of America, Inc., American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc. (Lazebnik, Ron)
January 28, 2010 834 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Michel Prigent dated 1/26/10 re: objection to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Presses Universitaires de France.(dle)
January 28, 2010 833 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Irene Lindon dated 1/26/10 re: objection to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Les Editions De Minuit S.A.(dle)
January 28, 2010 832 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon, Clerk of the Court from John Mauldin dated 1/18/10 re: objection to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by John Mauldin.(dle)
January 28, 2010 831 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Alain Kouck dated 1/26/10 re: objection to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Editis Group.(dle)
January 28, 2010 830 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Maree McCaskill dated 1/28/10 re: request that the Court accept and approve the Amended Settlement in the form in which it currently appears. Document filed by Australian Publishers Association.(dle)
January 28, 2010 829 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Francis Esmenard, President dated 1/26/10 re: objection to the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Editions Albin Michel.(dle)
January 28, 2010 828 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Antoine Gallimard dated 1/26/10 re: objection to the amended settlement agreement. Document filed by Antoine Gallimard.(dle)
January 28, 2010 827 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Magdalena Vinent dated 1/22/10 re: CEDRO requests the Court's permission to submit this letter as an amicus curiae brief opposing approval of the amended settlement agreement. Document filed by CEDRO.(dle)
January 28, 2010 825 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Simon Juden dated 1/27/10 re: request thta the Court approve the Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Publisher's Association.(dle)
January 27, 2010 Featured Case ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 803 LETTER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ae)
January 27, 2010 826 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jacqueline C. Hushion dated 1/27/10 re: request that the Court approve the amended Google Book Settlement as proposed. Document filed by The Canadian Publishers' Council.(dle)
January 27, 2010 824 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cindy A. Cohn on behalf of Electronic Frontier Foundation et al. (Cohn, Cindy)
January 27, 2010 823 Featured Case Objection of Amazon.com, Inc., to Proposed Amended Settlement. Document filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Wiles, Alexander)
January 27, 2010 822 Featured Case NOTICE of FILING OF OBJECTION TO AMENDED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Hachette UK Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Micheletto, Robert)
January 27, 2010 821 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Google Book Search Settlement Administrator from Tony Peake dated 12/24/09 re: This is to confirm that as an author I wish to opt out of the Google settlement, which I have already done on line. In addition, I do not want my books to be digitized - and I request that any books of mine that have been digitized be removed from Google's database. (pl)
January 27, 2010 820 Featured Case NOTICE of FILING OF OBJECTION TO AMENDED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Hachette Livre SA, Librarie Arthme Fayard SA, Dunod Editeur SA, Les Editions Hatier SNC, Editions Larousse SAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Micheletto, Robert)
January 27, 2010 819 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Thomas King, Hartley Goodweather dated 1/27/10 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. I am opting out of both the "Author Sub-Class" and the "Publisher Sub-Class" and out of the settlement in its entirety. (pl)
January 27, 2010 818 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Erika Faith Larsen dated 1/27/10 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. I am opting out of both the"Author Sub-Class" and the "Publisher Sub-Class," and out of the settlement in its entirety. (pl)
January 27, 2010 817 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk J. Michael McMahon from Diana Kimpton dated 1/10/10 re: that as a result of the within objections, I ask the court to refuse to certify the class and to reject the Amended Settlement Agreement. If the Amended Settlement goes back for renegotiation, the minimum changes required include a) limiting its scope to books published in the USA b) limiting its scope to allowing Google to scan books for search purposes only and to display snippets of strictly limited length, determined as a percentage of the whole work or insert. c) treating all in-copyright books the same so that no book that is still in copyright could be used in any way by Google without the express consent ofthe copyright holder. This would remove all the problems associated with deciding if a book is Not Commercially Available, remove the need for an unclaimed works fiduciary and give all copyright holders the protection they are entitled to under International Copyright Law. (pl)
January 27, 2010 816 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from David McRae dated 1/7/10 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. I am opting out of both the "Author Sub-Class" and the "Publisher Sub-Class" and out of the settlement in its entirety. (pl)
January 27, 2010 815 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Google Book Search Settlement Administrator from Chelsea Duke dated 1/4/10 re: Chelsea Duke writes to request that I opt out of the Google Book Settlement in respect of the following work: Title: High Heels and a Head Torch: The Essential Guide for Girls Who Backpack. I am opting out of the Author Sub-Class and am the author of the work. (pl)
January 27, 2010 814 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Andrea Winterbottom dated 1/4/10 re: Andrea Winterbottom writes by this letter, to opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. I am opting out of both the "Author Sub-Class" and the "Publisher Sub-Class," and out of the settlement in its entirety. (pl)
January 27, 2010 811 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW MEMORANDUM OF AMICUS CURIAE THE INTERNET ARCHIVE IN OPPOSITION TO AMENDED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Document filed by The Internet Archive. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
January 27, 2010 810 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Google Book Search Settlement Admin. from Heather Morrall dated undated re: party gives notice that he is opting out of the Author Sub-Class in the Google Book Settlement, and from any participation in the settlement. (djc)
January 27, 2010 809 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Clerk of Court from Matthew Charles Francis dated 1/14/10 re: party notifies court that he is opting out of both the Author Sub-Class and Publisher Sub-Class and out of the settlement in its entirey. (djc)
January 27, 2010 808 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Court from Clare Morrall dated 1/13/10 re: this is to give notice that I am opting out of the Author Sub-Class in the Google Book Settlement, and from any participation in the settlement. (djc)
January 27, 2010 807 Featured Case LETTER from Niyogi Books dated undated re: OBJECTIONS OF NIYOGI BOOKS, IPP CATALOGUE PUBLICATIONS, STAR PUBLICATIONS PVT. LTD., PlJ8TAK MAHAL, UNICORN BOOKS I)VT. LTD, LAXMI PUBLICATIONS PVT. LTD., PRAGUN PUBLICATION, ESS ESSPUBLICATIONS, NEW CENTURY PUBLICATION, DAYA PUBLISHING HOUSE, ARORA LAW BOOK AGENCY, DR. SAROJINI PRITAM AND AAKAR BOOKS TO THE PROPOSED REVISED SETTLEMENT AND BRIEF OF AMICI ClJRIAE,FEDERATION OF INDIAN PUBLISHERS, THE INDIANREPROGRAPHIC RIGHTS ORGANIZATION AND PROFESSOR RAVI SHANKER(djc)
January 27, 2010 806 Featured Case LETTER addressed to the Clerk of the Court from Blaine Regan Newton dated 1/12/10 re: party notified the Court that she is opting our of the settlement in this case, both the Author sub-Class and the Publisher Sub-Class and out of the settlement in its entirety. (djc)
January 27, 2010 805 Featured Case LETTER addressed to the Clerk of the Court from Alisa Smith, dated 1/6/08 re: party notifies the Court that she is opting out of the settlement in this case, both the Author sub-Class and the Publisher Sub-Class and out of the settlement in its entirety. (djc)
January 27, 2010 804 Featured Case LETTER addressed to the Clerk of the Court from Leigh Faulkner, dated 1/12/10 re: party notified the Court that she is opting our of the settlement in this case, both the Author sub-Class and the Publisher Sub-Class and out of the settlement in its entirety. (djc)
January 27, 2010 802 Featured Case LETTER addressed to the Clerk of the Court from Vivian Kane dated 1/5/10 re: party notified the Court that she is opting our of the settlement in this case, both the Author sub-Class and the Publisher Sub-Class and out of the settlement in its entirety. (djc)
January 27, 2010 801 Featured Case LETTER addressed to the Clerk of the Court from Blaine Regan Newton dated 1/12/10 re: party notified the Court that he is opting our of the settlement in this case, both the Author sub-Class and the Publisher Sub-Class and out of the settlement in its entirety. (djc)
January 27, 2010 800 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from David R. M. Prest dated undated re: party notifies the Court that is opting out of ht proposed settlement in this case. Opting out of both the Author Sub-Class and Publisher Sub-Class and our to the settlement in its entirety. (djc)
January 27, 2010 799 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Graham Swift dated 1/14/2010 re: Google Book Settlement. Please find enclosed for your reference a copy of my letter, mailed (by UK certified airmail) on 14th January 2010 to the Google Book Search Administrator, by which I opt out of the Google Book Settlement. Please confirm your receipt and filing of this letter and enclosure. (mbe)
January 26, 2010 813 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Douglas Johnson and Maureen Johnson dated 1/26/10 re: I am opting out of both the "Author Sub-Class" and the "Publisher Sub-Class," and out of the settlement in its entirety. (pl)
January 26, 2010 812 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Antonio Ma. Avila dated 1/26/10 re: Antonio Ma. Avila writes to object to the Amended Settlement Agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicative filings. We therefore object to the Amended Settlement Agreement by reference to the observations of Borsenverein des Deutschen Buchhandels, Syndicat National de I'edition and Associazione Italiana Editore. in its amicus curiae letter, which hereby become an integral part of our own objections as filed herewith. (pl)
January 26, 2010 Featured Case ****DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 798 letter. The document was filed as a duplicate entry in this case. (djc)
January 26, 2010 Featured Case ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 795 letter. The document was filed as a duplicate entry in this case. (djc)
January 26, 2010 Featured Case ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 794 letter. The document was filed as a duplicate entry in this case. (djc)
January 26, 2010 Featured Case ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 793 Letter. The document was filed as a duplicate entry in this case. (djc)
January 26, 2010 797 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Sandra Csillag dated 1/18/2010 re: We respectfully request the court's permission to submit this letter as an amicus curiae brief opposing approval of the Amended Settlement Agreement in the above case. Literar-Mechana therefore requests the Court to deny final approval of theAmended Settlement Agreement unless the following amendments are made.(mbe)
January 26, 2010 796 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Racheli Edelman dated 1/24/2010 re: I am and Israeli Publisher of Schocken Publishing house and the Hebrew Encyclopedia. We were very pleased to get the honorable court decision to exclude all books that are not being published in the US in the Canada, the UK and Australia from the Google Settlement agreement. Nevertheless we would like to make sure that all the books that were published by the following publishing houses will be removed from the Google Books sites. Therefore we will be grateful if the court will authorize Google not to put the above mentioned publishing houses titles on their books sites.(mbe)
January 26, 2010 792 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Antonio Ma. Avila dated 1/26/2010 re: I am the Executive Director of the Federation de Gremios de Editores de Espana. We write to object to the Amended Settlement Agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicative filings. We therefore object to the Amended Settlement Agreement by reference to the observations of Borsenverein de Deutschen Buchhandels, Syndicat National de I'edition and Associazione Italiana Editore, in its amicus curiae letter, which hereby become an integral part of our own objections as field herewith. (mbe)
January 26, 2010 791 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Paul N. Courant dated 1/18/2010 re: I write to express my interest in speaking at the Fairness Hearing per your order of 19 November 2009. My interest in the case are many. I am an active scholar in economics and public policy, and am the author of many works that are subject to the settlement. I am also the University Librarian and Dean of Libraries at the University of Michigan, and was the Provost and Executive Vice-President of the University at the time that Google began scanning the University's collections. In my role as librarian I oversee the University of Michigan Press, a significant academic publisher. As Provost and as Librarian I have been closely engages for several years with the Google scanning project, and the aspects of the settlement that have implication for participating libraries. As an active scholar and mender of the author class, as an academic administrator, and as the head of a major research library with responsibility for a university press, it is my strongly held opinion that the settlement will be of great benefit to the general public and to scholarly practice and progress. I would be most grateful for the opportunity to share these views with the Court at the Fairness Hearing.(mbe)
January 26, 2010 790 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Barbara Morrison dated 1/26/2010 re: I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. I am opting out of both the "Author Sub-Class" and the "Publisher Sub-Class", and out of the settlement in its entirely. I have written and/or published works under names including, but not limited to, the following variant spellings, forms, pen names, and/or pseudonyms: B.Morrison, Barbara Morrison. I am the owner of Cottey House Press. (mbe) (mbe).
January 26, 2010 789 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Dina E. Cox dated 1/19/2010 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. (jmi)
January 26, 2010 788 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Margaret Jane Ross (Mr. Cooke) dated 1/19/2010 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. (jmi)
January 26, 2010 787 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Margaret Jane Ross dated 1/20/2010 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. (jmi)
January 26, 2010 786 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jonatha Ceely dated 1/19/2010 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. (jmi)
January 26, 2010 785 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Luis Ortiz dated 1/11/2010 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. (jmi)
January 26, 2010 784 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Edward Lipsett dated 1/12/2010 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. (jmi)
January 26, 2010 783 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Dina Cox dated 1/19/10 re: Proposed Google Book Settlement and I am opting out, filed by Dina Cox. (cd)
December 4, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 777 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 11/19/2009, Receipt Number 706520. (jd)
December 3, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 781 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jmi)
December 3, 2009 781 Featured Case ORDER granting 777 Motion for Jonathan Band to Appear Pro Hac Vice for America Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries and Assocation of Research Libraries. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 12/3/2009) (jmi)
December 2, 2009 Featured Case Transmission of Amended Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 780 Amended Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
December 2, 2009 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 780 Amended Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
December 1, 2009 780 Featured Case AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: 752 Notice of Appeal, 765 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 428 Order. Document filed by The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, North American Nature Photography Association, Joel Meyerowitz, Dan Budnick, Peter Turner, Lou Jacobs, Jr. (nd)
December 1, 2009 779 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION denying 774 Motion for Reconsideration. Amazon's motion for reconsideration is denied. Amazon may set forth its arguments in its objections to the proposed settlement in conjunction with the final settlement approval process. Amazon also requests that the Court amend its preliminary approval order with regard to the mechanism by which objectors may submit objections to the proposed settlement. The order provides that objectors may now object only to amended terms of the settlement agreement, and that the time for objecting to the original settlement terms has passed. The Court will consider objections to the amended settlement in conjunction with previously-submitted objections to the original settlement. Amazon asks that, instead, objectors be permitted to withdraw their previous objections and to submit superseding objections that relate to both the original and the amended settlement terms. This request is denied, but to the extent that objectors find it necessary to refer to their prior objections now to present "cohesive and accurate filings," they may do so. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 12/1/09) (tro)
November 25, 2009 778 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from John D. Clopper dated 11/24/09 re: Counsel requests that the Court clarify the Government's deadline for submitting a statement regarding the amended settlement agreement in this action as 2/4/2010. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 11/25/09) (tro)
November 24, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 776 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jmi)
November 24, 2009 776 Featured Case ORDER granting 266 Motion for John B. Morris, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amicus Curaie. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 11/23/2009) (jmi)
November 20, 2009 775 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 774 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Wiles, Alexander)
November 20, 2009 774 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Amazon.com, Inc..(Wiles, Alexander)
November 19, 2009 777 Featured Case MOTION for Jonathan Band to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by America Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries and Assocation of Research Libraries.(mro)
November 19, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/18/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Denny Chin. (js)
November 19, 2009 773 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR AMENDMENT: The Clerk of the Court is directed to docket the Third Amended Complaint as filed on the date this stipulation and order are entered on the docket, and plaintiffs shall follow up with submission of an electronic version of the amended complaint in accordance with the Court's ECF Rules and Instructions. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 11/19/09) (js)
November 19, 2009 772 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF AMENDED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: granting 768 Motion to Approve preliminary approval of an Amended Settlement Agreement among plaintiffs and defendant. All other provisions as set forth in this order. A final settlement/fairness hearing shall be held on February 18, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 11/19/09) (js)
November 19, 2009 771 Featured Case NOTICE of Withdrawal of Objection re: 297 Affirmation in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Songwriters Guild of America. (Fedele, John)
November 16, 2009 782 Featured Case THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, 36 Amended Complaint, 59 Second Amended Complaint, against Google Inc.Document filed by Canadian Standard Association, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Associational Plaintiffs, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc., The Author's Guild, Herbert Mitgang, Betty Miles, Daniel Hoffman. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by The Author's Guild, Betty Miles, Herbert Mitgang, Daniel Hoffman, 36 Amended Complaint, filed by The Author's Guild, Betty Miles, Joseph Goulden, Paul Dickson, Herbert Mitgang, Daniel Hoffman, 59 Second Amended Complaint,, filed by The Author's Guild, Joseph Goulden, Simon & Schuster, Inc., Herbert Mitgang, Associational Plaintiffs, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., Betty Miles, Paul Dickson, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Daniel Hoffman, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc. (ae)
November 13, 2009 770 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael J. Boni in Support re: 768 MOTION to Approve / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Changes made to Amended Settlement Agreement)(Keller, Bruce)
November 13, 2009 769 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 768 MOTION to Approve / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
November 13, 2009 768 Featured Case MOTION to Approve / Notice of Motion for Preliminary Approval of Amended Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc..(Keller, Bruce)
November 9, 2009 767 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Michael J. Boni dated 11/9/09 re: counsel for plaintiff writes on behalf of the parties, I write to advise the Court that plaintiffs expect to file their motion seeking preliminary approval of the Amended Settlement Agreement by no later than this Friday, November 13, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 11/9/09) (pl)
November 4, 2009 765 Featured Case MEMORANDUM DECISION for the reasons set forth above, denying 738 Motion for Reconsideration. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 11/4/09) (cd)
October 30, 2009 764 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSED ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 10/30/09) (dle)
October 29, 2009 763 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Joseph S. Hall in Support re: 762 MOTION to Withdraw.. Document filed by Eric Jager, Harold Bloom, Elliot Abrams, Charlotte Allen, Phyllis Ammons, Richard Armey, Jacques Barzun, Nicholas Basbanes, Stephen Bates, Shawn J. Bayern, Jack Beerman, Michael Behe, Michael Cox, Douglas Crase, Frank Gonzalez-Crussi, Midge Decter, John Derbyshire, Thomas M. Disch, Gerald Early, Mel Eisenberg, Richard A. Epstein, Henry Fetter, David Gelernter, Gabrielle Glaser, Mary Ann Glendon, Robert Herbold, Arthur Herman, Charles Hill, Manuela Hoelterhoff, Richard Howard, Ishmael Jones, David Kuo, Michael Ledeen, Susan Lee, Mary Lefkowitz, David Lehman, John Lehman, Howard Markel, Sherwin B. Nuland, Steven Ozment, Michael Perry, Norman Podhoretz, Diane Ravitch, Ralph Reed, Sarah Ruden, Peter Schweizer, Roy Spencer, Geoffrey R. Stone, Charles Sykes, Terry Teachout, Paco Underhill, Ruth Wisse, Elizabeth Wurtzel, John Yoo, Wendy Shalit, American Society of Journalists and Authors. (Hall, Joseph)
October 29, 2009 762 Featured Case MOTION to Withdraw. Document filed by Eric Jager, Harold Bloom, Elliot Abrams, Charlotte Allen, Phyllis Ammons, Richard Armey, Jacques Barzun, Nicholas Basbanes, Stephen Bates, Shawn J. Bayern, Jack Beerman, Michael Behe, Michael Cox, Douglas Crase, Frank Gonzalez-Crussi, Midge Decter, John Derbyshire, Thomas M. Disch, Gerald Early, Mel Eisenberg, Richard A. Epstein, Henry Fetter, David D. Friedman, Gabrielle Glaser, Mary Ann Glendon, Victor Davis Hanson, Robert Herbold, Arthur Herman, Charles Hill, Manuela Hoelterhoff, Ishmael Jones, Donald Kagan, David Kuo, Michael Ledeen, Mary Lefkowitz, David Lehman, John Lehman, Howard Markel, Sherwin B. Nuland, Steven Ozment, Michael Perry, Norman Podhoretz, Diane Ravitch, Ralph Reed, Harriet Rubin, Sarah Ruden, Roy Spencer, Geoffrey R. Stone, Charles Sykes, Terry Teachout, Ruth Wisse, Elizabeth Wurtzel, John Yoo, Wendy Shalit.(Hall, Joseph)
October 28, 2009 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph Hall to RE-FILE Document 761 MOTION to Withdraw. ERROR(S): Supporting Document must be filed individually. Use the event type Affidavit in Support found under event list Replies, Oppositions, Supporting Documents. NOTE: The Motion must be correctly re-filed. (jar)
October 28, 2009 761 Featured Case FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Withdraw. Document filed by Eric Jager, Harold Bloom, Elliot Abrams, Charlotte Allen, Phyllis Ammons, Richard Armey, Jacques Barzun, Nicholas Basbanes, Stephen Bates, Shawn J. Bayern, Jack Beerman, Michael Behe, Michael Cox, Douglas Crase, Frank Gonzalez-Crussi, Midge Decter, John Derbyshire, Thomas M. Disch, Gerald Early, Mel Eisenberg, Richard A. Epstein, Henry Fetter, David D. Friedman, David Gelernter, Gabrielle Glaser, Mary Ann Glendon, Victor Davis Hanson, Robert Herbold, Arthur Herman, Charles Hill, Manuela Hoelterhoff, Richard Howard, Ishmael Jones, Donald Kagan, David Kuo, Michael Ledeen, Susan Lee, Mary Lefkowitz, David Lehman, John Lehman, Howard Markel, Sherwin B. Nuland, Steven Ozment, Michael Perry, Norman Podhoretz, Diane Ravitch, Ralph Reed, Harriet Rubin, Sarah Ruden, Roy Spencer, Geoffrey R. Stone, Charles Sykes, Terry Teachout, Paco Underhill, Ruth Wisse, Elizabeth Wurtzel, John Yoo, Wendy Shalit, American Society of Journalists and Authors. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit In Support of Withdrawal)(Hall, Joseph) Modified on 10/29/2009 (jar).
October 22, 2009 760 Featured Case NOTICE of Amended Settlement Issues. Document filed by Electronic Frontier Foundation et al.. (Rudman, Samuel)
October 16, 2009 766 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/7/09 before Judge Denny Chin. (tro)
October 16, 2009 759 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christina Jacqueline DeVries on behalf of The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, North American Nature Photography Association, Joel Meyerowitz, Dan Budnick, Lou Jacobs, Jr (DeVries, Christina)
October 14, 2009 758 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply in Support of Motion for Reconsideration served on The Authors Guild on October 14, 2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, North American Nature Photography Association, Joel Meyerowitz, Dan Budnick, Peter Turner, Lou Jacobs, Jr. (DeVries, Christina)
October 14, 2009 757 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 738 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Objecting to the Proposed Class Action Settlement Agreement and Preserving Right to Appeal.. Document filed by The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, North American Nature Photography Association, Joel Meyerowitz, Dan Budnick, Peter Turner, Lou Jacobs, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(DeVries, Christina)
October 9, 2009 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 756 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
October 9, 2009 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 756 Notice of Appeal. (nd)
October 9, 2009 756 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL from 308 Order on Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Lewis Hyde, Harry Lewis, Nicholas Negroponte, Charles Nesson. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 702610. (nd)
October 9, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 755 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jmi)
October 9, 2009 755 Featured Case ORDER granting 745 Motion for Norman W. Marden to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 10/8/2009) (jmi)
October 8, 2009 754 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Michael J. Boni dated 10/5/09 re: Plaintiffs request that the Court deny the ASMP movants' motion for reconsideration. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk of the Court shall accept this letter for filing, and the ASMP movants shall respond by 10/14/09. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 10/7/09) (tro)
October 8, 2009 753 Featured Case MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 09-41420-op. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Petitioner's Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus is DENIED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 10/6/2009. (nd)
October 7, 2009 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 752 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
October 7, 2009 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 752 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
October 7, 2009 752 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL from 428 Order,,. Document filed by The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Picture Archive Council of America, North American Nature Photography Association, Joel Meyerowitz, Dan Budnick, Peter Turner, Lou Jacobs, Jr. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 702434. (nd)
October 6, 2009 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Matthew Weiss to RE-FILE Document 750 MOTION for Writ of Mandamus as to Judge Denny Chin. ERROR(S): Case number missing from document. (jar)
October 6, 2009 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY THAT THE ATTEMPTED FILING OF Document No. 749 HAS BEEN REJECTED. Note to Attorney Matthew Weiss : THE CLERK'S OFFICE DOES NOT ACCEPT LETTERS FOR FILING, either through ECF or otherwise, except where the judge has ordered that a particular letter be docketed. Letters may be sent directly to a judge. (jar)
October 6, 2009 751 Featured Case ORDER: The Court has received the following requests regarding the status conference scheduled for October 7, 2009, at 10 a.m. in this case: 1. To have a court reporter present at the status conference; and 2. To audio or video record the status conference. The first request is granted; it was always the Court's intention to have a court reporter present to transcribe the conference. The second request is denied; the Court will not permit audio or video recording of the proceeding. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 10/6/2009) (rw)
October 6, 2009 750 Featured Case FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Writ of Mandamus as to Judge Denny Chin. Document filed by Darlene Marshall.(Weiss, Matthew) Modified on 10/8/2009 (jar).
October 6, 2009 749 Featured Case FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT (LETTER) - TRANSCRIPT REQUEST Court Reporter Request for proceedings held on Oct. 7, 2009 before Judge Denny Chin. Document filed by Darlene Marshall.(Weiss, Matthew) Modified on 10/8/2009 (jar).
October 2, 2009 748 Featured Case NOTICE of of Objection. Document filed by Electronic Privacy Information Center. (Rotenberg, Marc)
October 1, 2009 747 Featured Case ORDER, granting 744 Motion for Mark E. Avsec, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice be admitted to the Bar of this court pro hac vice as counsel for Canadian Standards Association, upon payment of the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 10/1/09) (pl)
October 1, 2009 746 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, that Marc Rotenberg is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for EPIC. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 10/1/09) (pl)
October 1, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 745 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/28/2009, Receipt Number 701643. (jd)
September 29, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 744 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/25/2009, Receipt Number 701530. (jd)
September 29, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 743 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/24/2009, Receipt Number 700552. (jd)
September 28, 2009 745 Featured Case MOTION for Norman W. Marden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Commonwealth of Pennsylvania.(mro)
September 28, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 732 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 731 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 09/22/2009, Receipt Number 700437. (jd)
September 25, 2009 744 Featured Case MOTION for Mark Edward Avsec to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Canadian Standard Association.(mro)
September 25, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 742 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
September 25, 2009 742 Featured Case ORDER granting 730 Motion for Robert J. LaRocca to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/25/09) (js)
September 25, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 741 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
September 25, 2009 741 Featured Case ORDER granting 732 Motion for Richard Montgomery Donaldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/25/09) (js)
September 25, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 740 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
September 25, 2009 740 Featured Case ORDER granting 731 Motion for Charles B. Casper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/25/09) (js)
September 25, 2009 739 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 738 MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Objecting to the Proposed Class Action Settlement Agreement and Preserving Right to Appeal.. Document filed by The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, North American Nature Photography Association, Joel Meyerowitz, Dan Budnick, Peter Turner, Lou Jacobs, Jr. (Saed, Shirley)
September 25, 2009 738 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration of Denial of Motion to Intervene for the Limited Purposes of Objecting to the Proposed Class Action Settlement Agreement and Preserving Right to Appeal. Document filed by The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, North American Nature Photography Association, Joel Meyerowitz, Dan Budnick, Peter Turner, Lou Jacobs, Jr.(Saed, Shirley)
September 24, 2009 743 Featured Case MOTION for Marc Rotenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Electronic Privacy Information Center.(mro)
September 24, 2009 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Shirley Saed to RE-FILE Document 737 MOTION for Reconsideration certificate of service. The Certificate of Service may be include with the Motion for Reconsideration. However, you may use the event type Certificate of Service Other found under the event list Service of Process (case name and case number must be include with Certificate before re-filing). (jar)
September 24, 2009 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Shirley Saed to RE-FILE Document 736 MOTION for Reconsideration.. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents must be filed individually. Use the event type Memorandum of Law found under event list Replies, Opposition, Supporting Documents. NOTE: The Motion must be correctly re-filed. (jar)
September 24, 2009 737 Featured Case FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (Certificate of Service) - MOTION for Reconsideration certificate of service. Document filed by The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc..(Saed, Shirley) Modified on 9/25/2009 (jar).
September 24, 2009 736 Featured Case FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion to Intervene, # 2 Exhibit Letter to Chambers, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Saed, Shirley) Modified on 9/25/2009 (jar).
September 24, 2009 735 Featured Case ORDER, that on September 22, 2009, plaintiffs moved for an adjournment of the fairness hearing currently scheduled for October 7, 2009. Defendant Google, Inc. does not oppose the motion. Under all the circumstances, it makes no sense to conduct a hearing on the fairness and reasonableness of the current settlement agreement, as it does not appear that the currentsettlement will be the operative one. Accordingly, the Court will not proceed with the fairness hearing on October 7, 2009. The Court will, however, conduct a status conference on October 7 at 10 00 a.m. to determine how to proceed with the case as expeditiously as possible, as this case has now been pending for over four years The parties shall attend. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/24/09) (pl)
September 24, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 734 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (pl)
September 24, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 730 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/21/2009, Receipt Number 700386. (jd)
September 23, 2009 733 Featured Case BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE. Document filed by Public Knowledge.(ad)
September 23, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 717 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 718 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 719 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $125.00, paid on 09/15/2009, Receipt Number 700022, 700067 & 700099. (jd)
September 22, 2009 732 Featured Case MOTION for Richard Montgomery Donaldson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation.(mro)
September 22, 2009 731 Featured Case MOTION for Charles B. Casper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation.(mro)
September 22, 2009 729 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 728 MOTION for Hearing / Notice of Unopposed Motion of the Author Sub-Class and the Publisher Sub-Class to Adjourn October 7, 2009 Final Fairness Hearing and Schedule Status Conference.. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc.. (Keller, Bruce)
September 22, 2009 728 Featured Case MOTION for Hearing / Notice of Unopposed Motion of the Author Sub-Class and the Publisher Sub-Class to Adjourn October 7, 2009 Final Fairness Hearing and Schedule Status Conference. Document filed by Association of American Publishers, Inc., The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc..(Keller, Bruce)
September 21, 2009 734 Featured Case ORDER, that Gary Leland Reback, Esq. be admitted to the Bar of this Court pro hac vice as counsel for Amicus Curiae Open Book Alliance, upon payment of the applicable fee to the Clerk of Court. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/19/09) (pl) Modified on 9/24/2009 (pl).
September 21, 2009 730 Featured Case MOTION for Robert J. LaRocca to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, The Author's Guild, Herbert Mitgang, Betty Miles, Daniel Hoffman.(mro)
September 21, 2009 727 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Google Settlement from Dolores Karl dated 9/1/09 re: To opt out of the Google-Authors Guild Settlement. (db)
September 21, 2009 726 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Ann Mitcalfe dated 9/3/09 re: Objection to the Proposed Settlement. (db)
September 21, 2009 725 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from The Berne Convention for the Protection of Literary and Artistic Works dated 9/3/09 re: Objection to the Proposed Settlement. (db)
September 21, 2009 724 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ENDORSEMENT re: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF THE CANADIAN STANDARDS ASSOCIATION. ORDER granting 657 Motion to Withdraw Attorney. Attorney Kristin Hackett Neuman terminated. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/19/09) (db)
September 21, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 723 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (db)
September 21, 2009 723 Featured Case ORDER ADMITTING EDWARD F. SIEGEL PRO HAC VICE: ORDER granting 717 Motion for Edward F. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Charles D. Weller. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/19/09) (db)
September 21, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 722 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (db)
September 21, 2009 722 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: ORDER granting 718 Motion for Lee L. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Questia Media, Inc. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/19/09) (db)
September 21, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 721 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (db)
September 21, 2009 721 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: ORDER granting 719 Motion for Charles D. Ossola and Victor S. Perlman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, North American Nature Photography Association, Joel Meyerowitz, Dan Budnick, Peter Turner, Lou Jacobs. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/19/09) (db)
September 18, 2009 720 Featured Case NOTICE of Statement of Interest. Document filed by United States of America. (Clopper, John)
September 17, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 304 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/08/2009, Receipt Number 699159. (jd)
September 17, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 700 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/08/2009, Receipt Number 699182. (jd)
September 16, 2009 716 Featured Case ORDER: September 8, 2009 was the deadline by which objections and amicus curiae briefs were to be filed with the Court. In light of the volume of submissions, and the apparent public interest in the case, the following procedures shall govern the fairness hearing: By 10/2/09 the parties shall respond in writing to the filings in this case. The fairness hearing shall proceed as scheduled on 10/7/09 at 10:00 a.m. Any person who wishes to speak at the fairness hearing must submit a request to speak by sending an email to googlebookcase@nysd.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. EDT on 9/21/09. The parties shall post a copy of this order on the settlement website forthwith. Details regarding courtroom seating, press access, and an overflow room will be provided in a later order. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/16/09) (tro)
September 15, 2009 719 Featured Case MOTION for Charles D. Ossola, Elaine Metlin and Victor S. Perlman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by The American Society of Media Photographers, Inc., Graphic Artists Guild, Picture Archive Council of America, North American Nature Photography Association, Joel Meyerowitz, Dan Budnick, Peter Turner, Lou Jacobs.(mro) Modified on 9/17/2009 (mro).
September 15, 2009 718 Featured Case MOTION for Lee L. Kaplan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Document filed by Questia Media, Inc.(mro)
September 15, 2009 717 Featured Case MOTION for Edward F. Siegel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed Charles D. Weller. (mro)
September 15, 2009 715 Featured Case OBJECTION OF FREE SOFTWARE FOUNDATION, INC. AND KARL FOGEL TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Karl Fogel, Free Software Foundation, Inc. (tro)
September 15, 2009 714 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Donna J. Wood dated 9/11/09 re: Objections to the Proposed Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Donna J. Wood.(tro)
September 15, 2009 713 Featured Case STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Matthew B. Cazoneri. (tro)
September 15, 2009 712 Featured Case STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Dale Henderson. (tro)
September 15, 2009 711 Featured Case NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR AT FAIRNESS HEARING and STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Sarah E. Cazoneri. (tro)
September 15, 2009 710 Featured Case OBJECTIONS OF WASHINGTON LEGAL FOUNDATION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND TO CERTIFICATION OF THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT CLASS AND SUBCLASSES. Document filed by The Washington Legal Foundation. (tro)
September 15, 2009 709 Featured Case OBJECTION OF PROQUEST LLC TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Proquest, LLC. (tro)
September 15, 2009 708 Featured Case OBJECTION TO CLASS-ACTION SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR OF THE UNDERSIGNED STATES REPRESENTED BY THEIR RESPECTIVE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND REGISTERED CHARITIES WITHIN THEIR POLITICAL BOUNDARIES. Document filed by The State of Missouri. (tro)
September 15, 2009 707 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Andrea Warren dated 9/7/09 re: Andrea Warren writes to object the settlement. Document filed by Andrea Warren.(tro)
September 15, 2009 706 Featured Case STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT dated 9/7/09. Document filed by Rebecca C. Jones. (tro)
September 15, 2009 705 Featured Case STATEMENT OF OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT dated 9/8/09. Document filed by Elizabeth Greenberg. (tro)
September 15, 2009 704 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Eva Swartz dated 9/2/09 re: Eva Swartz, CEO of Natur & Kultur join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations as further set forth in this letter. Document filed by Eva Swartz.(tro)
September 15, 2009 703 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Sander van Vlerken dated 8/28/09 re: Publishing House De Geus, write to you in regards to the proposed Settlement Agreement between Google, Inc. and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers. We would like to raise the concerns and objections listed herein to the Settlement. Document filed by Publishing House De Geus.(tro)
September 15, 2009 702 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Tobias Koerner dated 9/4/09 re: Tobias Koerner, join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations that includes as further set forth in this letter. Document filed by Tobias Koerner.(tro)
September 15, 2009 701 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Moritz Hagenmuller dated 9/1/09 re: Moritz Hagenmuller, Managing Director of the Books on Demand GmbH, join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations that includes the Borsenverein des Deutschen Buchhandels and others, for the reasons presented to this Court by those individuals and entities. Document filed by Moritz Hagenmuller.(tro)
September 14, 2009 699 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion For Leave To Withdraw Appearance served on Cindy A. Cohn, Hadley Perkins Roeltgen, J. Kate Reznick (See attatched certificate) on 9/14/09. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Canadian Standards Association. (Neuman, Kristin)
September 14, 2009 659 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Kristin H. Neuman in Support re: 657 MOTION for Kristin H. Neuman to Withdraw as Attorney Motion For Leave To Withdraw Appearance On Behalf Of The Canadian Standards Association.. Document filed by Canadian Standards Association. (Neuman, Kristin)
September 14, 2009 657 Featured Case MOTION for Kristin H. Neuman to Withdraw as Attorney Motion For Leave To Withdraw Appearance On Behalf Of The Canadian Standards Association. Document filed by Canadian Standards Association.(Neuman, Kristin)
September 14, 2009 630 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Manfred Finkeldey dated 9/3/2009 re: We are German publishing house and write to object the proposed Settlement Agreement between Google Inc., and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers for the reasons set forth within. (jfe)
September 14, 2009 629 Featured Case DECLARATION of Nicolas Georges. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 698 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Tony Simpson dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 697 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jesus Sanchez Garcia dated 9/3/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 696 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Lothar Schirmer dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 695 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Brigitte Balke-Schmidt dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Google Book Settlement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 694 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Vibeke Viteri-Loohuis dated 9/2/09 re: We hope that the court will seriously consider the objections and remarks made herein. Document filed by Vibeke Viteri-Loohuis.(mro)
September 11, 2009 693 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Brigitte Balke-Schmidt dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 692 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. h.c. Karl-Peter Winters dated 9/1/09 re: We write to object to the settlement agreement. Document filed by h.c. Karl-Peter Winters.(mro)
September 11, 2009 691 Featured Case AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE of Junji Suzuki re: 467 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion). (jfe)
September 11, 2009 690 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Professor Barbara Scheuch-Voetterle dated 9/2/09 re: We write to object to the settlement agreement. Document filed by Barbara Scheuch-Voetterle.(mro)
September 11, 2009 689 Featured Case AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE of Mika Hasegawa re: 464 Objection (non-motion). (jfe)
September 11, 2009 688 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Klaus Humann dated 9/2/09 re: We write to object to the settlement agreement. Document filed by Klaus Humann.(mro)
September 11, 2009 687 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Olivier Nora dated 9/3/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Proposed Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 686 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dirk Sieben dated 9/2/09 re: We write to object to the proposed settlement agreement. Document filed by Dirk Sieben.(mro)
September 11, 2009 685 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Holly K. Towle dated 8/31/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Google Book Settlement.(jfe)
September 11, 2009 684 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Kim Griggs dated 9/4/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 683 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Alain Kouck dated 9/2/09 re: We would like to raise objections to the settlement agreement listed herein. Document filed by Alain Kouck.(mro)
September 11, 2009 682 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Olswang LLP dated 9/8/2009 re: Counsel respectfully request the Court's permission to file this letter as an amicus curiae brief to address certain concerns of UK authors who have not opted-out of the proposed settlement agreement in this proceeding. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 681 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Settlement Administrator dated 9/2/09 re: SATV is opting out of the settlement in Authors Guild, Inc. et al. Document filed by Frank P. Scibilia.(mro)
September 11, 2009 680 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Jeanetter Wilson dated 9/3/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 679 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Chris Else dated 9/3/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 678 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Clerk Michael McMahon from John Mouldin dated 8/31/09 re: If you respect the actions listed herein, you can take on my behalf: make sure my comments and objections are heard by Court. Document filed by John Mouldin.(mro)
September 11, 2009 677 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Marianne Rubelmann dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 676 Featured Case LETTER addressed to The Court from Jesse Rutherford dated 9/3/09 re: For the reasons herein, I respectfully request that this Court reject the proposed settlement and/or decline to certify the class with regard to non-US rights holders. Document filed by Jesse Rutherford.(mro)
September 11, 2009 675 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Marie Langley dated 3/9/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 674 Featured Case LETTER from Donica Bettanin re: It appears to us that there needs to be serious thought given to the administrative demands and possible problems of the settlement for rights holders outside the USA. (mro)
September 11, 2009 673 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Barbara Helen Else re: Counsel writes to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 672 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Isabelle Magnac dated 9/3/09 re: For the reasons herein, Salvat respecfully requests that this Court reject the proposed settlement and/or decline to certify the class with regard to non-US rights holders. Document filed by Isabelle Magnac.(mro)
September 11, 2009 671 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Arnaud Nourry dated 9/3/09 re: For the reasons herein, Hachette UK respecfully requests that this Court reject the proposed settlement and/or decline to certify the class with regard to non-US rights holders. Document filed by Arnaud Nourry.(mro)
September 11, 2009 670 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Stephanie Golden dated 9/5/09 re: Im writing to object to the Google settlement in its correct form. Document filed by Stephanie Golden.(mro)
September 11, 2009 669 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Giles Sandeman-Allen dated 9/4/09 re: If the settlement is agreed in principle, I am writing to request for an amendment in the determination of "in print". Document filed by Giles Sandeman-Allen.(mro)
September 11, 2009 668 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir Michael McMahon from Aime Van Hecke dated 9/2/09 re: We raise concerns and objections to this settlement listed herein. Document filed by Aime Van Hecke.(mro)
September 11, 2009 667 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Rose Teo dated 9/4/09 re: As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object to the proposed settlement agreement. Document filed by Rose Teo.(mro)
September 11, 2009 666 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir/Madam from Minoru Ito dated 9/3/09 re: We write to express our rejection to the settlement and request to opt out of the settlement. Document filed by Minoru Ito.(mro)
September 11, 2009 665 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Salley Shannon dated 9/4/09 re: Writes to object to the proposed settlement agreement. Document filed by Salley Shannon.(mro)
September 11, 2009 664 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Robert K. Massie dated 9/8/09 re: I am sending you this copy of a letter I sent last week to the Google Book Search Committee Settlement Administration which has so far not permitted me to opt put of the settlement as I wish to do and as I first told them in April. (mro)
September 11, 2009 663 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Dr. Comelia Heering dated 9/3/09 re: As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object to the proposed settlement agreement. Document filed by Comelia Heering.(mro)
September 11, 2009 662 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Dr. Comelia Heering dated 9/3/09 re: As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object to the proposed settlement agreement. Document filed by Comelia Heering.(mro)
September 11, 2009 661 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Antonio dated 9/8/09 re: We would like to join in the objections against the settlement presented by the Associazione Italiana Editori. Document filed by Federacion de Gremios de Editores de Espana.(mro)
September 11, 2009 660 Featured Case LETTER Brief from Mumia Abu-Tamal re: Objection to the pending settlement. Document filed by Mumia Abu-Tamal.(mro)
September 11, 2009 658 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Felix Breidenstein dated 9/1/09 re: I am the executive director of the German Bible Society; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Felix Breidenstein.(mro)
September 11, 2009 656 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Karin Schmidt-Friderichs dated 9/2/09 re: We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Karin Schmidt-Friderichs.(mro)
September 11, 2009 655 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Dr. Comelia Heering dated 9/3/09 re: We are a German publishing house having its registered office at Braunschweig, Germany; As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object. Document filed by Comelia Heering.(mro)
September 11, 2009 654 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Dr. Comelia Heering dated 9/3/09 re: We are a German publishing house having its registered office at Essen, Germany; As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object. Document filed by Comelia Heering.(mro)
September 11, 2009 653 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jesus Sanchez Garcia dated 9/3/09 re: For the reasons herein, Edelsa Grupo Didascalia respectfully requests that this Court reject the proposed settlement and/or decline to certify the class with regard to non-US rights holders. Document filed by Jesus Sanchez Garcia.(mro)
September 11, 2009 652 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Mitchell Allen dated 9/4/09 re: I am writing as president, publisher, and owner of Left Coast Press, Inc., a scholarly for profit publishing house of humanities and social sciences based on the San Francisco Bay Aread, and on behalf of authors we publish; We wish to express our objections to the settlement before settlement administrator here and hope you reject the settlement terms. Document filed by Mitchell Allen.(mro)
September 11, 2009 651 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Kazufumi Watanabe dated 9/3/09 re: We strongly reject the action carried out by Google, as it infringes upon the publication and sale of books based upon contracts signed between the author (copyright holder) and the publishing company. Document filed by Kazufumi Watanabe.(mro)
September 11, 2009 650 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Michael McMahon from Jean L. Cooper dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to oppose the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 649 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Jean L. Cooper dated 9/2/09 re: I am a librarian and an author, and as I have standing as a member of the author class in the Google Book Settlement; I am opposed to the Settlement for the reasons stated herein. Document filed by Jean L. Cooper.(mro)
September 11, 2009 648 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ralf Frenzel dated 9/1/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 647 Featured Case DECLARATION OF LYNNE D. FINNEY, AUTHOR, COPYRIGHT OWNER, AND PUBLISHER, IN OPPOSITION TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 646 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Erna Paris re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 645 Featured Case NFS'S OBJECTION TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 644 Featured Case OBJECTION AND NOTICE TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ABSENT CLASS MEMBER, DAVID MEININGER. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 643 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Oliver Waffender dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 642 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Katharina Eleonore Meyer dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 641 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ingwert Paulsen dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 640 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dieter Krause dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 639 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Christine Autenrieth dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 638 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Jurgen Kleidt dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 637 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Wilmar Diepgrond dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the proposed Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 636 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ingwert Paulsen dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 635 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Christine Autenrieth dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 634 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Gunter Berg dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement.. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 633 Featured Case Objection of Takashi Yamamoto. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 632 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Stefan Ruhling dated 9/1/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 631 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Kurt Stellfeld dated 9/1/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 11, 2009 628 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Georg Kessrer dated 9/2/2009 re:My name is Georg Kessler, and I am Managing Director/Publisher of the GRAFE UND UNZER Publishers, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany. GRAFE UND UNZER Publishers is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 309 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 311 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 310 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 627 Featured Case Objection OF AMERICAN PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 626 Featured Case BRIEF AMICI CURIAE OF LYRASIS, INC., NYLINK AND BIBLIOGRAPHICAL CENTER FOR RESEARCH ROCKY MOUNTAIN, INC. IN SUPPORT OF MODIFICATION OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 625 Featured Case Objection of Alex M.G. Burton to Class Settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 624 Featured Case DECLARATION of Ministerialdirigent Dr. Johannes Christian Wichard. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 623 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Regina Harris Baiocchi dated 9/1/2009 re: This letter serves as my formal notification to OPT OUT of the Google Book Settlement. My OPT out request. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 622 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from G. Emil Ward dated 9/4/2009 re: I am the copyrights holder for: Massachusetts Landlord-Tenant Practice: Law and Forms, formerly published by Lexis-Nexis. The copyright was assigned back to me by that publisher approximately six years ago which assignment I sent to the Copyrights Office in recent months. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 621 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Stephen Nachmanovitch dated 9/3/2009 re: Digitizing the contents of the great libraries of the world - for both the functions of backup and accessibility - is an exciting project. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 620 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Andrzei Karpowicz dated 9/3/2009 re: Acting on behalf of the author, Mr Waldemar Lysiak I hereby inform you that my Client does not consent to have his books covered by the provisions of the settlement, regarding the Google Book Search software. This concerns in particular, but without limitations, the following titles published by various publishers in Poland and USA. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 619 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Norbert Froitzheim dated 9/2/2009 re: My name is Norbert Froitzheim and I am member of the executive board of the Deutscher Arzte-Verlag G3mbH, a book publisher located in Cologne, Germany. The Deutscher Arzte-Verlag GmbH is a member of the settlement class embraced by the propose settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 618 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Annette Sievers dated 9/2/2009 re: My name is Annette Sievers, and I am managing director of the pmv Peter Meyer Verlag, a book publisher located in Frankfurt am Main. pmv Peter Meyer Verlag is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the Settlement Agreement), because it own rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 617 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Vivian Vande Velde dated 9/1/2009 re: I am writing to express my displeasure with everything about the handling of the Google Settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 616 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Hans A. Baensch dated 9/2/2009 re: My name is Han -Albrecht Baensch, and I am the owner and Manager of Mergus Verlag GmbH (publisher), Im Wiele 27, 49328 Melle, Germany. Mergus Verlag GmbH is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. Copyright laws. We wright to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 615 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Liana Levi dated 9/3/09 re: I am the Manager and Editor in Chief of the Editions Liana Levi, a book publisher located in France. We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by the French Publishers Association (Syndicat National de L'Edition/SNE), for the reasons presented to this Court by this entity. (tro)
September 11, 2009 614 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Bardo Jensch dated 9/1/2009 re: My name is Mr. Bardo Jensch, and I am officer with procuration of the Schwabenverlag Aktiengesellschaft, a book publisher located in Ostfildern (Germany). Schwabenverlag Aktiengesell chaft is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 613 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Neckar-Verlag dated 9/3/2009 re: We are a German publishing house having its registered office at Villingen-Schwenningen, Germany. As a major publisher in the area of educational and other products we are distributing about 300 different books (150 educational up-to-date for which we are holding the US copyright. As a so called rightsholder under the Settlement Agreement we object to the proposed settlement agreement between Google Inc., and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers (the "Settlement Agreement"). (jmi)
September 11, 2009 612 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Mr. Thijs VerLoren van Themaat dated 9/2/2009 re: We, Verloren Publisher from Hilversum, The Netherlands, are writing to you in regards to the proposed Settlement Agreement between Google Inc., and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers. We would like to raise the following concerns and objections to this Settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 611 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Albrecht Koschutzke dated 9/3/09 re: I am the CEO of the Verlag J. H. W. Dietz Nachf GmbH, located in Bonn, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Albrecht Koschutzke.(mro)
September 11, 2009 610 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ingwert Paulsen dated 9/2/09 re: I am the owner of the Mattheisen Verlag Ingwert Paulsen, located in Husum, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Ingwert Paulsen.(mro)
September 11, 2009 609 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ingwert Paulsen dated 9/2/09 re: I am the owner of the Hamburger Lesehefte Verlag, Inh located in Husum, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Ingwert Paulsen.(mro)
September 11, 2009 608 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Axel Schonberger dated 9/2/09 re: I am chief executive officer of the Valentia GmbH located in Frankfurt, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Axel Schonberger.(mro)
September 11, 2009 607 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Axel Schonberger dated 9/2/09 re: I am the owner of the Axel Schonberger Verlag located in Frankfurt, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Axel Schonberger.(mro)
September 11, 2009 606 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Oskar Klan dated 9/3/09 re: I am editor in chief of the Schwaneberger Verlag GmbH, a book publisher in Unterschleibheim, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Oskar Klan.(mro)
September 11, 2009 605 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jennifer B. Coplan dated 9/8/09 re: Enclosed please find a courtesy copy of the Amicus Curiar Brief of Sony Electronics. in support of proposed Google Book Search settlement, which was electronically filed earlier today. (mro)
September 11, 2009 604 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Nathalie Jouven dated 9/3/09 re: I am a citizen of France and Chief Executive Officer of Dunod Editeur SA; Dunod objects to the proposed settlement. Document filed by Nathalie Jouven.(mro)
September 11, 2009 603 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Irwin Kohn on behalf of Canadian Standard Association (Kohn, William)
September 11, 2009 602 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Francis Esmenard dated 9/4/09 re: I am the CEO of Albin Michel Group, a book publisher located in France; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Francis Esmenard.(mro)
September 11, 2009 601 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Whom it may concern from Stephen Cox dated 9/3/09 re: I would like to formally make an objection to the action to Google.com violating my book copyrights by way of creating a book database including my materials without my permission. Document filed by Stephen Cox.(mro)
September 11, 2009 600 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir Michael McMahon from Mr. E.A. van Ingen dated 9/2/09 re: We, Publishing House Nelissen are writing to you in regards to the proposed settlement agreement; We would like to raise concerns and objections to this settlement listed herein. Document filed by E.A. van Ingen.(mro)
September 11, 2009 599 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Klaas Jarchow dated 9/1/09 re: I am publisher of the Murman Verlag, a book publisher located in Hamburg, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Klaas Jarchow.(mro)
September 11, 2009 598 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Martin Wagner dated 9/3/09 re: I am legal counsel of Langescheidt ELT GmbH, a book publisher in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Martin Wagner.(mro)
September 11, 2009 597 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Michael Vogtmeier dated 9/2/09 re: I am publishing director of the Hogrefe Berlag Gmbh & Co. KG, a book publisher located in Gottingen, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Michael Vogtmeier.(mro)
September 11, 2009 596 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Robert Dimbleby dated 9/3/09 re: I am the publishing manager of Hogrefe Publishing GmbH, a book publisher located in Gottingen, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Robert Dimbleby.(mro)
September 11, 2009 595 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Michael Schweins dated 9/2/09 re: I am the president of the Ars Edition GmbH, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Michael Schweins.(mro)
September 11, 2009 594 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Claude Portmann dated 9/3/0* re: I am owner and manager of the C.F. Portmann Verlag and Edition Hu&Hott, a book published located in Erlenbach, Switzerland; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Claude Portmann.(mro)
September 11, 2009 593 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Antoine Gallimard dated 9/3/09 re: I am chairman and chief executive officer of the Edition Gallimard, SA, a book publisher located in France; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Antoine Gallimard.(mro)
September 11, 2009 592 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir Michael McMahon dated 9/3/09 re: We, Sanoma Uitgevers BV, are writing in regards to the proposed settlement; We raise concerns and objections to this settlement herein. Document filed by Henk Scheenstra.(mro)
September 11, 2009 591 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir, from Bernd Tofflinger dated 9/3/09 re: We are a German publishing house having its registered office at Braunschweig, Germany. As a major publisher in the area of educational products we are distributing about 300 different educational books up to date for which we are holding the US copyright. As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object to the proposed settlement agreement. Document filed by Bernd Tofflinger.(mro)
September 11, 2009 590 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk dated 9/3/09 re: We are a Polish publishing house having its registered office at Lodz, Poland. As a major publisher in the area of educational products we are distributing about 400 different educational books up to date for which we are holding the US copyright. As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object to the proposed settlement agreement. Document filed by Eginhard Hohne.(mro)
September 11, 2009 589 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, from Eginhard Hohne dated 9/3/09 re: We are a Hungarian publishing house having its registered office of Budapest, Hungary; As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object. Document filed by Eginhard Hohne.(mro)
September 11, 2009 588 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Ulrike Jurgens dated 9/3/09 re: We are a German publishing house having its registered office at Braunschweig Germany; As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object. Document filed by Ulrike Jurgens.(mro)
September 11, 2009 587 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Tatjana Sepin dated 9/1/09 re: I am manager rights and permissions of S. Karger AG, a book publisher located in Basel, Switzerland; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Tatjana Sepin.(mro)
September 11, 2009 586 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Martin Wagner dated 9/3/09 re: I am legal counsel and head of the legal department of Polyglott Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Martin Wagner.(mro)
September 11, 2009 585 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Martin Wagner dated 9/3/09 re: I am legal counsel and head of the legal department of Axel Juncker Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Martin Wagner.(mro)
September 11, 2009 584 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Martin Wagner dated 9/3/09 re: I am legal counsel and head of the legal department of Mentor Verlag GmbH a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Martin Wagner.(mro)
September 11, 2009 583 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir Michael McMahon from Hans Nijenhuis, dated 9/4/09; re: We, publishing house De Bezige Bij/ Thomas Rap, based in Amsterdam, The Netherlands, are writing you in regards to the proposed settlement agreement; We raise concerns and objections to this settlement herein. Document filed by Hans Nijenhuis.(mro)
September 11, 2009 582 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Bernhard Bucker dated 9/3/09 re: I am financial director of Suhrkamp GmbH & Co. KG, a book publisher located in Frankfurt, Germany; I am publishing director of Buchverlage LangenMuller Herbig nymphenburger terra magica, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Bernhard Bucker.(mro)
September 11, 2009 581 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Kobushi Shobo dated 8/31/09 re: For the reasons listed herein, Kobushi Shobo protests the actions carried out by Google, Inc, and demands that Google, Inc. immediately cease its digitalization and release to the public of books published by Kobushi Shobo. Document filed by Kobushi Shobo.(mro)
September 11, 2009 580 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Olivier Nora dated 9/3/09 re: I am a citizen of France and chief executive officer of Librairie Artheme Fayard SA; Fayard objects to the proposed settlement and strenuously urges the Court to reject it. Document filed by Olivier Nora.(mro)
September 11, 2009 579 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Sven Fund dated 9/3/09; re: I am the managing director of the Walter de Gruyter GmbH & CO. KG, Sellier de Gruyter and De Gruyter Rechtswissenschaften-Verlags GmbH, a book publishers located in Berlin, Germany; I am publishing director of Buchverlage LangenMuller Herbig nymphenburger terra magica, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Sven Fund.(mro)
September 11, 2009 578 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Helga Schreiber, ppa dated 9/3/09 re: I am publishing director of Buchverlage LangenMuller Herbig nymphenburger terra magica, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Brigitte Fleissner-Mikorey.(mro)
September 11, 2009 577 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Kristin Nilsson dated 8/31/09 re: I am publisher of the Folkuniversitetets forlag, a book publisher located in Lund, Sweden; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Kristin Nilsson.(mro)
September 11, 2009 576 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Teresa Cremisi dated 9/3/09 re: I am CEO of the Flammarion Group, a book publisher in France; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Teresa Cremisi.(mro)
September 11, 2009 575 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from K.D. Wood dated 9/4/2009 re: Iam a New Zealand citizen and a New Zealand author, publisher; illustrator etc., with copyrights that are protected by the New Zeal d Copyright Act 1994, by any contracts under copyright protection, and by the Berne Convention for the Protection of Literary and Artistic Work. The United States does not have jurisdiction to over-ride these protections. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 574 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Norbert Treuheit dated 9/1/09 re: I am publisher and executive of the ars vivendi publishing house, a book publisher located in Cadolzburg, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Norbert Treuheit.(mro)
September 11, 2009 573 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Diana Kimpton dated 9/2/09 re: I am a member of the settlement class for this case and I am writing to object to the proposed settlement agreement. Document filed by Diana Kimpton.(mro)
September 11, 2009 572 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Mie Li Doy dated 9/3/2009 re: My name is Irene Lindon and I am CEO of LES EDITIONS DE MINUIT S.A., a book publisher located in France. LES EDITIONS DE MINUIT is a member of the settlement class embraced by t e proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 571 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Sara Mella dated 9/2/09 re: I am the managing director of Otava Publishing Company Ltd located in Helsinki, Finland; I write to let this Court know that our company as a copyright hold is opposed to this settlement agreement. Document filed by Sara Mella.(mro)
September 11, 2009 570 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Paul A. Heider dated 9/2/09 re: I am Geschafsfuhrer of the Steyler Verlag and Steyler Verlagsbuchhandlung GmbH, a book publisher located in Nettetal, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Paul A. Heider.(mro)
September 11, 2009 569 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir or Madam from Dana P. Tierney dated 9/3/09 re: Our clients are members of the publisher subclass and the purpose of this correspondence is to advise that they "opt out" of the Google Book Settlement. Document filed by Dana P. Tierney.(mro)
September 11, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 266 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/02/2009, Receipt Number 699011. (jd)
September 11, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 232 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 09/01/2009, Receipt Number 698924. (jd)
September 11, 2009 568 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from John C. Lorenz dated 8/30/09 re: Please accept this letter as the formal objection of the American Association of Petroleum Geologists to the Google Copyright settlement referenced above. Document filed by John C. Lorenz.(mro)
September 11, 2009 567 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk` from Regina Lindhoff and Simone Linden dated 9/2/09 re: I am the head of the public relations of Mehr Zeit fur Kinder e. V., a book publisher located in Frankfurt, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Regina Lindhoff.(mro)
September 11, 2009 566 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Albrecht Oldenbourg dated 9/3/09 re: We are a German publishing house having its registered office at Wuerzburg, Germany; As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object. Document filed by Albrecht Oldenbourg.(mro)
September 11, 2009 565 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Michael Cramm dated 9/2/09 re: I am the contract manager of the Taschen GmbH, a book publisher located in Cologne, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Michael Cramm.(mro)
September 11, 2009 564 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Joachim Kamphausen dated 9/2/09 re: I am publisher of the J. Kamphausen Verlag & Distribution GmbH, located in Bielefeld, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Joachim Kamphausen.(mro)
September 11, 2009 563 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Johan de Koning dated 9/3/09 re: We, Standaard Uitgeverij NV, are writing you in regards to the proposed settlement agreement between Google, Inc and the Authors Guild, etc. We raise concerns and objections to this settlement listed herein. Document filed by Johan de Koning.(mro)
September 11, 2009 562 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Elisabeth Zerlauth dated 9/3/09 re: We, E. DORNER GmbH, are an Austrian publishing house having its registered office at Vienna, Austria. As a major publisher in the area of educational products we are distributing about different educational up to date for which we are holding the US copyright; As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object to the proposed settlement agreement. Document filed by Elisabeth Zerlauth.(mro)
September 11, 2009 561 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Carsten C. Hubner dated 9/2/09 re: I am managing director of the ADAC Verlad GmbH, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Carsten C. Hubner.(mro)
September 11, 2009 560 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Alexander Potyka dated 9/1/09 re: I am manager of the Picus Verlag Ges. m.b.H., a book publisher located in Vienna, Austria; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Alexander Potyka.(mro)
September 11, 2009 559 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ursula Rosengart dated 9/1/09 re: I am CEO of the GABAL Verlag, a book publisher located in Offenbach, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Ursula Rosengart.(mro)
September 11, 2009 558 Featured Case Objection of Editions Larousse SAS to Proposed Class Settlement. For each of the foregoing reasons, Editions Larousse respectfully requests that this Court reject the Proposed Settlement and/or decline to certify the class with regard to non-US Rightsholders. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 557 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Albrecht Weiland dated 9/3/2009 re: My name is Dr. Albrecht Weiland, and I am CEO of the Verlag Schnell & Steiner GmbH a book publisher located in Regensburg, Germany. Verlag Schnell & Steiner GmbH is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 556 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Joachin Kaps dated 9/2/2009 re: My name is Dr. Joachim Kaps, and I am Managing Director of TOKYOPOP GmbH, a book publisher located in Hamburg, Germany. TOKYOPOP GmbH is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 555 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jurgen-Matthias Springer dated 9/2/2009 re: My name is Jurgen-Matthias Springer, and I am Managing Director of the Peter Lang GmbH, a book publisher located in Frankfurt am Main, Germany. Peter Lang GmbH is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 554 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Eginhard Hohne dated 9/3/2009 re: we are a Hungarian publishing house having its registered office at Celldomolk, Hungary. As a major publisher in the area of educational products we are distributing about 300 different educational books up-to-date for which we are holding the US copyright. As a so called rightsholder under the Settlement Agreement we object. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 553 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Alian Kouck dated 9/2/2009 re: We, EDITIS HOLDING, are writing to you in regards to the proposed Settlement Agreement between Google Inc., and the Authors Guild (AG) and the Association of American Publishers (AAP). We would like to raise the following objections that arise in Europe/France from the above mentioned Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 552 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Springer Uitgeverij dated 9/2/2009 re: We, Springer Uitgeverij BV, are writing to you in regards to the proposed Settlement Agreement between Google Inc., and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers. We would like to raise the following concerns and objections to this Settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 551 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Oliver Nora dated 9/3/2009 re: For each of the foregoing reasons, Fayard respectfully requests that this Court reject the Proposed Settlement and/or decline to certify the class with regard to non-US Rightsholders. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 550 Featured Case OBJECTION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT Unless both the foregoing concerns can be resolved, I respectfully request that the proposed settlement agreement be rejected by this Court. I am submitting this in my capacity as an author and a member of the Authors Guild, not in my capacity as a lawyer. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 549 Featured Case QUESTIA MEDIA, INC.'S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT By ignoring copyright laws and by twisting this class action settlement to its own ends, Google will obtain a monopoly for the commercial exploitation of millions of orphan works. Questia asks the Court not to provide Google with an unfair advantage. The orphan works problem can be solved, but it should be solved through legislation for the benefit of all, not through a class action settlement for the benefit of one company. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 548 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Annette Sabelus dated 9/2/2009 re: My name is Annette Sabelus, and I am Head of Rights Department of the Piper Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany. Piper Verlag is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 547 Featured Case OBJECTION TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR OF THE UNDERSIGNED STATES REPRESENTED BY THEIR RESPECTIVE ATTORNEYS GENERAL ON BEHALF OF THEMSELVES AND REGISTERED CHARITIES WITHIN THEIR POLITICAL BOUNDARIES In closing if this Court approves the Proposed Settlement, the State Objectors suggests a modification of the proposed settlement agreement requiring the parties to include a provision in the BRR's articles of incorporation or other enabling document to comply with state unclaimed property laws in the same manner as ASCAP and BMI. This will ensure the fairest and most reasonable result for rightsholders, ensure the preservation of charitable assets and further the public purposes of the unclaimed property laws. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 546 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Gary K. Hebley dated 9/3/2009 re: As a class member, I wish to support the New Zealand Society of Authors in their objection to the Proposed Settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 545 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Dr. Diane A. Hebley dated 9/3/2009 re: As a class member, I wish to support the New Zealand Society of Authors in their objection to the Proposed Settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 544 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Michael W. Perry dated 9/2/2009 re: I should introduce myself. I was also one of the seven authors or their representatives who requested that the court extend the deadlines for the Google settlement by four months. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 543 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Gary Mokotoff dated 9/4/2009 re: Avotaynu is a publisher of books for which the copyright owners are the authors themselves. We wish to object to the proposed settlement between Google, Inc. and various copyright owners. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 542 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Jo Tatchell dated 9/3/2009 re: I am opting in but would like to register the following concerns: Concern about the lack of European representation on the Book Rights Registry, and the ability of the settlement to ensure comprehensive distribution of income to authors. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 541 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Dana P. Tierney dated 9/3/2009 re: Our clients are members of the publisher subclass and the purpose of this correspondence is to advise that they "opt out" of the Google Book Settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 540 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ann Douglas dated 9/4/2009 re: As the author of 28 works of non-fiction, both for adults and for children, as well as numerous anthology contributions, I am writing to vigorously oppose the terms of the Google Books settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 539 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Racheli Edelman dated 4/9/2009 re: The scope and the details of the Google Settlement agreement were brought to our attention too late to tile an objection in court. Only today I have found out that one can also send a letter to the court in this matter and state our position. Reading the settlement agreement between Google and its American parties. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 538 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Mr. W.J. Sbetenhorst dated 9/2/2009 re: We, Boom uitgevers Den Haag, are writing to you in regards to the proposed Settlement Agreement between Google Inc., and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers. We would like to raise the following concerns and objections to this Settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 537 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin dated 9/3/2009 re: I, Serge Eyrolles, am a citizen of France and President of the French Publishers Association (Syndicat National de l'Editioni SNE), the leading association of book publishers in my country. SNE represents 530 member companies whose combined business endeavors account for the bulk of French publishing. Its missions include: advocating publishers' interests, supporting creativity by defending freedom to publish and promoting the respect of intellectual property rights, promoting and defending the fixed book price and promoting literacy. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 536 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dorotea Bromberg dated 8/31/2009 re: My name is Dorotea Bromberg, and I am CEO of the Brombergs Bokforlag AB, a book publisher located in Stockholm, Sweden. Brombergs Bokforlag AB is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 535 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jesus Sanchez Garcia dated 9/3/2009 re: Objections of EDELSA GRUPO DIDASCALIA, S.A. to Proposed Class Settlement. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 508 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Michael Kincaid dated 8/28/2009 re: I am writing to object to the class-action Google copyright settlement. As an author potentially affected by the Settlement, a labyrinth of terms, conditions, and definitions formulated without my consultation, I object, first, to the distraction and inconvenience entailed in trying to comprehend those terms, conditions, etc.; to discern the increment of justice (if any) contained therein; and to decide on a fit response, one that does justice to my own interests. (jmi)
September 11, 2009 418 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Markus Hatzer dated 9/2/09 re: I am the managing director of the Studienverlag GmbH, a book publisher located in Austria; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro) Modified on 9/11/2009 (mro). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2009: # 1 letter doc) (mro).
September 10, 2009 534 Featured Case OBJECTIONS TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO INTERVENE For the foregoing reasons and under the authority of Rule 24, Intervenors respectfully claim their right to intervene as of right. Additionally, Intervenors give notice of their intention to appear and speak at the October 7, 2009 fairness hearing. (jmi)
September 10, 2009 533 Featured Case OBJECTION OF JIRO MAKINO AND IWAO KIDOKORO TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND TO CERTIFICATION OF THEPROPOSED SETTLEMENT CLASS AND SUB-CLASSES The Settlement Agreement contains serious defects in that it requires a decision which exceeds proper scope of jurisdiction for the case and in that it ignores the global nature of the Internet (its capacity that all of the users in the entire world can use it simultaneously). It disregards the fact that works will be distributed in the entire world, and regards the issue as a domestic issue within the U.S. Furthermore, the Settlement Agreement focuses its scope only on a legal decision as to permissibility of digitization of the subject works, and contains significant defects in that it ignores the underlying issue of existing mode of "digital data search system." It fails to acknowledge important issues of how to guarantee fairness and diversity of the search by giving priority to economy without making sufficient consideration in cultural diversity. As a result, it suffers from extreme bias of the search results. For the reasons explained above, we respectfully request that the Court to reject the Settlement Agreement or decline to certify the class with respect to Japanese or foreign authors. (jmi)
September 10, 2009 532 Featured Case QUESTIA MEDIA, INC.'S AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Questia Media, Inc. ("Questia") urges the Court not to approve the Settlement Agreement between Google, Inc. and the Plaintiffs. Among other things, the settlement calls for Google. (jmi)
September 10, 2009 531 Featured Case OBJECTION AND NOTICE TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ABSENT CLASS MEMBER, DAVID MEININGER (jmi)
September 10, 2009 530 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Alain Kouck dated 9/2/09 re: We, Editis Holding, are writing to you in regards to the proposed settlement agreement between Google, Inc and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers. We would like to raise objections that arise in Europe/France from the above mentioned settlement agreement; Objections listed herein. Document filed by Alain Kouck.(mro)
September 10, 2009 529 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Ben-Ami Freier dated 9/9/09 re: This letter is being submitted to respectfully request that the Court approve the settlement between the Authors Guild and Google. We believe the proposed settlement represents a historic opportunity to increase access to a vast library of information by people with disabilities. Document filed by Ben-Ami Freier.(mro)
September 10, 2009 528 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Bjorn Andersson dated 8/31/09 re: I am publisher of the Historiska Media, a book publisher located in Lund, Sweden, Historika Media is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Bjorn Andersson.(mro)
September 10, 2009 527 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Vincent Montagne dated 9/4/09 re: I am chairman of Media Participations Paris, a publishing group operating in France, Belgium, and Switzerland through different subsidaries namely Dargaud, Dupuis, Le Lombard, Fleurus, Magnificat, Mame, Mango, Kana, Rustica, etc; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Vincent Montagne.(mro)
September 10, 2009 526 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Arnaud Nourry dated 9/3/09 re: I am a citizen of France and Chief Executive Officer of Hachette Livre SA; As a European publisher, Hachette Livre objects to the proposed settlement and strenuously urges the Court to reject it due to the significant unfair and inequitable effects that it will have on all non-US Authors and Publishers. The proposed settlement is purely and simply unacceptable from the point of view of a European publisher. Document filed by Arnaud Nourry.(mro)
September 10, 2009 525 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Eva Swartz dated 9/2/09 re: I am the CEO of Natur & Kaltur, a book publisher located in Stockholm, Sweden; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Eva Swartz.(mro)
September 10, 2009 524 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir Michael McMahon from Mr. E.A. van Ingen dated 9/2/09; re: We are writing in regards to the proposed settlement agreement. We like to raise concerns and objections to this settlement, listed herein. Document filed by E.A. van Ingen.(mro)
September 10, 2009 523 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jesus Sanchez Garcia dated 9/3/09 re: I am a citizen of Spain and consejero-secretario del Consejo de Administacion de Grupo Editorial Bruno,SL; As a European publisher, Grupo Editorial Bruno SL objects to the proposed settlement and strenuously urges the Court to reject it due to the significant unfair and inequitable effects that it will have on all non-US Authors and Publishers. The proposed settlement is purely and simply unacceptable from the point of view of a European publisher. Document filed by Jesus Sanchez Garcia.(mro)
September 10, 2009 522 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Serge Eyrolles dated 9/3/09 re: I am a citizen of France and President of the French Publishers Association, the leading association of book publishers in my country; On September 2, 2009, our Executive Committee and General Council formally authorized SNE to present objections to this Court regarding the settlement and objections are listed herein. Document filed by Serge Enyrolles.(mro)
September 10, 2009 521 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Nathalie Jouven dated 9/3/09 re: I am a citizen of France and Legal Representative of Les Editions Hatier SNC; As a European publisher, Les Editions Hatier SNC objects to the proposed settlement and strenuously urges the Court to reject it due to the significant unfair and inequitable effects that it will have on all non-US Authors and Publishers. The proposed settlement is purely and simply unacceptable from the point of view of a European publisher. Document filed by Nathalie Jouven.(mro)
September 10, 2009 520 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Isabelle Jeuge-Maynart dated 9/3/09 re: I am a citizen of France and the legal representative (president) of Editions Larousse SAS; As a European publisher, Editions Larousse objects to the proposed settlement and strenuously urges the Court to reject it due to the significant unfair and inequitable effects that it will have on all non-US Authors and Publishers. The proposed settlement is purely and simply unacceptable from the point of view of a European publisher. Document filed by Isabelle Jeuge-Maynary.(mro)
September 10, 2009 519 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Gary Rhoades dated 9/4/09 re: The American Association of University Professors (AAUP) submits this letter in response to the proposed settlement agreement in this case. This letter is neither in opposition to nor in support of the proposed settlement agreement; instead it raises concerns about the Google Library Project and the proposed settlement agreement on behalf of the interests of college and university faculty and the public in enabling the free exchange of information. Document filed by Gary Rhoades.(mro)
September 10, 2009 518 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Sudi Shayesteh and Merrill Parra dated 9/8/09 re: We write this letter on behalf of the City University of New York Committee on student disability Issues to respectfully request that the court approve the settlement between the Authors Guild and Google in the above referenced case. Document filed by Sudi Shayesteh, Merrill Parra.(mro)
September 10, 2009 517 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ingwert Paulsen dated 9/2/09 re: I am the owner of the Verlag der Nation Ingwet Paulsen Jr., a book publisher located in Husum, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Ingwert Paulsen.(mro)
September 10, 2009 516 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Bernd Vincent Walbaum dated 9/1/09 re: I am the managing direct of Edition Peters GmbH resp. C. F. Peters GmbH & Co. KG, a publisher located in Frankfurt/Main, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Bernd Vincent Walbaum.(mro)
September 10, 2009 515 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Bernd Vincent Walbaum dated 9/1/2009 re: My name is Bernd Vincent Walbaum, and I am the managing director of Edition Peters GmbH resp. C. F. Peters GmbH & Co. KG, a publisher located in Frankfurt/Main, Germany. C. F. Peters is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. (jmi)
September 10, 2009 514 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Paul N. Courant dated 9/4/2009 re: I, hereby, request this court's permission to submit this letter as an amicus curiae supporting final settlement approval in the above-referenced case. (jmi)
September 10, 2009 513 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Susan J. Gordon dated 8/30/2009 re: I am a professional book author and freelance magazine/newspaper writer objecting to the Google Book Settlement because it is not fair or good for writers or most publishers. Google gets to write copyright law, has no restrictions its use of reader information, and provides no language forbidding censorship. I also find the premise that I am "in" (that is, accepting of the entire settlement agreement) unless I "opt out" to be unfair and outrageous. (jmi)
September 10, 2009 512 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Peter Hanser-Strecker and Michael Petry dated 9/1/2009 re: Our name is Dr. Peter Hanser-Strecker (managing director and shareholder of Schott Music GmbH & Co. KG) and Michael Petry (managing director of the SCHOTT MUSIC GmbH & Co. KG). Schott Music GmbH & Co. KG is a music book publisher located in Mainz, Germany. SCHOTT MUSIC GmbH &Co. KG is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 10, 2009 505 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Martin Kegel dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 504 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Karin Low dated 9/1/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 503 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Hildegard Wehler dated 9/1/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 502 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Bausassessor Dipl.-Ing. Johannes Lohaus dated 9/1/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 501 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Anthony Holcroft dated 9/3/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Proposed Settlement as a class member. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 499 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Andreas Barth dated 1/09/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 498 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Juerg Flury dated 9/1/2009 re: Counsel writes in objection to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 497 Featured Case OBJECTION OF JAPANESE PUBLISHERS COMENT TO THE SETTLEMENT. by Japanese publishers. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 496 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Mathias Lilleengen dated 9/4/2009 re: Counsel writes on behalf of our member publishers in connection with the proposed settlement of the class-action copyright infringement litigation brought by the U.S. Authors Guild and others against Google's Book Search service. counsel respectfully request that this Court accept this letter as an amicus curiae submission. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 495 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Bror Tronbacke dated 8/31/09 re: We present this letter to this Court in English, for the Court's convenience and it was translated for us. (db)
September 10, 2009 494 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ann Spaak dated 8/31/09 re: We present this letter to this Court in English, for the Court's convenience and it was translated for us. (db)
September 10, 2009 493 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir Michael McMahon from A.M.W. Holl dated 9/1/09 re: Objection to Proposed Settlement Agreement. (db)
September 10, 2009 491 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Erik Hellqvist dated 8/31/09 re: We present this letter to this Court in English, for the Court's convenience and it was translated for us. (db)
September 10, 2009 490 Featured Case THE GOOGLE SETTLEMENT: Letter dated 5/27/09 from Forlaeggerforeningen (Danish Publishers Association). (db)
September 10, 2009 489 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Michael McMahon from Bert de Groot dated 8/25/2009 re: Counsel writes to draw your attention to the copyrights of the Dutch books owned by our publishing house which appear to be included in the settlement reached between Google and the Authors Guild and Association of American Publishers. Counsel should first like to point out that they have not yet been consulted or heard in this settlement, even though our copyrights are involved. Google's actions have raised many questions, comments and objections as set forth within. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 488 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Stuart Bernstein dated 8/31/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Google Book Settlement. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 487 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. med. Axel Bedurftig dated 9/1 re: We present this letter to this Court in English, for the Court's convenience and it was translated for us. (db)
September 10, 2009 486 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from W.J. Van Oorschot dated 8/29/2009 re: Counsel writes to make the following objection and comments to the Google Book Search Settlement set forth within. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 485 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dieter Bergemann dated 9/1/09 re: We present this letter to this Court in English, for the Court's convenience and it was translated for us. (db)
September 10, 2009 484 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Mr. Helmuth Bauer-Callwey dated 9/1/09 re: We present this letter to this Court in English, for the Court's convenience and it was translated for us. (db)
September 10, 2009 483 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dorothea Kieler dated 9/1/09 re: We present this letter to this Court in English, for the Court's convenience and it was translated for us. (db)
September 10, 2009 482 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir Michael McMahon from Mai Spijkers dated 8/26/2009 re: Counsel writes in regards to the proposed Settlement Agreement between Google Inc., and the Author Guild and the Association of American Publishers. Counsel raises the following concerns and objections to the Settlement set forth within. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 481 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Patrik Widlund dated 8/31/09 re: We present this letter to this Court in English, for the Court's convenience and it was translated for us. (db)
September 10, 2009 480 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Lewis Hyde dated 8/31/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to some of the terms of the settlement that has been proposed by the litigants in Case No. 05 CV 8136, The Authors Guild, Inc., et al. v. Google Inc. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 479 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr..McMahon from Sander Knol dated 8/27/2009 re: Counsel writes to make the following objections and comments to the Google Book Settlement as set forth within. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 478 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Karsten Blauert and Marie Svane dated 9/1/09 re: Request that the Court accept this letter as an Amicus Curiae submission. (db)
September 10, 2009 477 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Honorable Clerk from Jesus F. Gonzalez dated 8/25/2009 re: Counsel writes in objection to the Google Book Search Agreement. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 476 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Margaret Jefferies dated 9/3/09 re: Objection to Proposed Settlement as a class member. (db)
September 10, 2009 475 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Wolfgang Foerster dated 9/1/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Counsel therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations that includes the Borsenverein des Deutschen Buchhandels and others, for the reasons presented to this Court by those individuals and entities. In addition, counsel wish to inform this Court that their company did not receive any written notice of the Settlement Agreement, nor did they see any published notice of the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 474 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Karsten Blauert and Marie Svane dated 9/1/09 re: Request that the Court accept this letter as an Amicus Curiae submission. (db)
September 10, 2009 473 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ann Marie Skarp dated 8/31/09 re: We present this letter to this Court in English, for the Court's convenience and it was translated for us. (db)
September 10, 2009 472 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. Michael McMahon from Mr. E. A. Van Ingen dated 8/27/2009 re: Boom Publishers Amsterdam are writing to you in regards to the proposed Settlement Agreement between Google Inc., and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers. Counsel would like to raise the following concerns and objections to this Settlement as set forth within.(jfe)
September 10, 2009 471 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Arnaud Nourry dated 9/3/2009 re: Hachette respectfully requests that this Court reject the Proposed Settlement and/or decline to certify the class with regard to non-US Rightsholders. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 470 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Settlement Adminstrator from Frank P. Scibilia dated 9/2/2009 re: Counsel writes to inform you, Google, Inc., and all other interested parties (including Class Counsel and the so-called "Book Rights Registry") that EMI is opting out of the settlement in Authors Guild, Inc. et al. v. Google, Inc., 05 CV 8136 (DC) (the "Google Books Settlement" or the "Settlement"). (jfe)
September 10, 2009 469 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Vittorio E. Klostermann dated 9/1/2009 re: Counsel writes to join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of Foreign publishers and publishing associations that includes the Borsenverein des Deutschen Buchhandels and others, for the reasons presented to this Court by those individuals and entities. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 468 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Johannes Lessmann dated 9/2/09 re: Join in the objections that have been presented to the Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations that includes the Borsenverein des Deutschen Buchhandels and others, for the reasons presented to the Court by those individuals and entities. (db)
September 10, 2009 467 Featured Case OBJECTION AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR OF CLASS MEMBER JUNJI SUZUKI TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS THE AUTHORS GUILD, INC., ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., ET AL. AND GOOGLE, INC. By 194 writers in Japan who are members of the Japan Visual Copyright Association. (db)
September 10, 2009 466 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL LIBRARY ASSOCIATION COMMENTS ON THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. By the Library Associations. (db)
September 10, 2009 465 Featured Case THE PROPOSED GOOGLE SETTLEMENT: Views from the Booksellers Association of the United Kingdom & Ireland Limited. (db)
September 10, 2009 464 Featured Case OBJECTION AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPEAR OF CLASS MEMBER SHOJIRO AKASHI TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT BETWEEN PLAINTIFFS THE AUTHORS GUILD, INC., ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., ET AL. AND GOOGLE, INC. (db)
September 10, 2009 463 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Petter Luthersson dated 8/31/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Counsel therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations that includes the Svenska Forlaggareforeningen, for the reasons presented to this Court by those individuals and entities. In addition, counsel wish to inform this Court that the written notice that our company received of the Settlement Agreement in Swedish was extremely difficult to read and included a number of meaningless or nonsensical terms and had obviously been translated very poorly. (jfe)
September 10, 2009 462 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ulf Heimdahl dated 8/31/09 re: I am managing director of the Informationsforlaget Heimdahls AB, a book publisher in Stockholm, Sweden; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Ulf Heimdahl.(mro)
September 10, 2009 461 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Malcolm Campbell dated 9/3/09 re: I write to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. The grounds for my objection are listed herein. Document filed by Malcolm Campbell.(mro)
September 10, 2009 460 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Ann Louise Mitcalfe dated 9/3/09 re: I write to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. The grounds for my objection are listed herein. Document filed by Ann Louise Mitcalfe.(mro)
September 10, 2009 459 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Antonette R. Jones dated 9/3/09 re: I write to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. The grounds for my objection are listed herein. Document filed by Antonette R Jones.(mro)
September 10, 2009 458 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Gordon Charles Ell (pen-name Pita Graham) dated 9/2/09 re: I write to object to the proposed settlement as a class member. The grounds for my objection are: Court has misapplied the Berne Convention; Court has exceeded jurisdiction; Author sub-class not applicable to NZ authors, etc. Document filed by Gordon Charles Ell.(mro)
September 10, 2009 456 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Russell Davis dated 9/2/09 re: This letter is sent in protest to the proposed settlement in The Authors Guild, Inc, et al v. Google, Inc. The objection is lodged on behalf of the Science Fiction and Fantasy Writers of America, Inc. ("SFWA"), a non profit organization of professional writers of science fiction, fantasy, and related genres; SFWA requests the opportunity to appear at the Fairness Hearing in this matter currently scheduled for October 7, 2009. Document filed by Russell Davis.(mro)
September 10, 2009 455 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Torbjorn Santerus re: I am founder and owner of the Santerus Forlag, a book publisher located in Stockholm, Sweden; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Torbjorn Santerus.(mro)
September 10, 2009 454 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Reinhard Martini dated 9/2/09 re: I am the publisher of Junfermann Verlag, a book publisher located in Paderborn, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Reinhard Martini.(mro)
September 10, 2009 453 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Peter Hohl dated 9/1/09 re: I am managing director of hte SecuMedia Verlag, a book publisher located in Gai-Algesheim, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Peter Hohl.(mro)
September 10, 2009 452 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Joachim Weidler dated 9/1/09 re: I am the publisher of Weidler Buchverlag Berlin, a book publisher located in Berlin (Germany); We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Joachim Weilder.(mro)
September 10, 2009 451 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Georg Holzmeister dated 9/1/09 re: I am general manager of the Fidula-Verlag Holzmeister GmbH, a book publisher located in Boppard/Rhine in Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Georg Holzmeister.(mro)
September 10, 2009 450 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Cordula Walter-Bolhofer dated 9/1/09 re: I am director of the Calypso Verlag, a book publisher located in 53819 Neunkirchen, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations; Our company did not receive any written notice of the settlement agreement, nor did we see any published notice of the settlement agreement. Document filed by Cordula Walter-Bolhofer.(mro)
September 10, 2009 449 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Chris Schoen dated 9/1/09 re: I am CEO of ibidem-Verlag J. Haunschild/C. Schon GbR, a book publisher located in Suttgart and Hannover, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Chris Schoen.(mro)
September 10, 2009 448 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Harald Kirbach dated 9/1/09 re: I am managing director of the Wirtschaftsverlag, a book publisher located in Bremerhaven, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations; We also wish to inform the Court that our company did not receive any written notice of the settlement agreement. Document filed by Harald Kirbach.(mro)
September 10, 2009 447 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Susanne Greiner dated 9/1/09; re: I am Geschaftsfuhrer of the Johannes Verlag Einsiedeln, a book publisher located in Freiburg, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations Document filed by Susanne Greiner.(mro)
September 10, 2009 446 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Hans-Jurgen Dietrich dated 9/1/09 re: I am the publishing director of the Ergon-Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located in Wurzburg, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Dr.Hans-Jurgen Dietrich.(mro)
September 10, 2009 445 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Martin Wagner dated 9/2/09 re: I am legal counsel and head of the legal department of Langenscheidt KG, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Martin Wagner.(mro)
September 10, 2009 444 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Andreas Schulz dated 9/2/09 re: I am the CEO of the Vista Point Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located in Cologne, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Andreas Schulz.(mro)
September 10, 2009 443 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Karl Heinz Bonny dated 9/2/09 re: I am CEO of Landwirtschaftsverlag GmbH, a book publisher in Munster, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Karl Heinz Bonny.(mro)
September 10, 2009 442 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Kristoffer Lind dated 8/30/09 re: I am chairman of the Nordic Independent Publishers Association (Nordiska Oberoende Forlagas Forening, NOFF) located in Stockholm, Sweden. I write on behalf of NOFF in connection with the proposed settlement of the class action copyright infringement litigation brought by the US Authors Guild and others against Google's Book search service; We urge this Court not to approve the settlement agreement, for the reasons herein; To the extent necessary, we respectfully request that this Court accept this letter as an amicus curiae submission. Document filed by Kristoffer Lind.(mro)
September 10, 2009 441 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Par Sjolinder dated 9/2/09 re: I am junior editor of the Modernista, a book publisher located in Stockholm, Sweden; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Par Sjolinder.(mro)
September 10, 2009 440 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from David Stansvik dated 8/31/09 re: I am managing director of the Bokforlaget Nya Doxa AB, a book publisher located in Nora, Sweden; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by David Stansvik.(mro)
September 10, 2009 439 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Catrine Christell Grimlund dated 8/31/09 re: I am owner of the Bokforlaget Opal AB, a book publisher located in Stockholm, Sweden; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Catrine Christell Grimlund.(mro)
September 10, 2009 438 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Lena Andersson dated 9/2/09 re: I am Managing Director of the Berghs Forlag AB, a book publisher located in Stockholm, Sweden; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Lena Andersson.(mro)
September 10, 2009 437 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dag Hernried dated 9/1/09 re: I am managing director of the Alfabeta Bokforlag AB, a book publisher located in Stockholm, Sweden; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Dag Hernried.(mro)
September 10, 2009 436 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Adrian Schommers dated 9/2/09 re: I am the managing director of the Montan-und Wirtschaftsverlag Gmbh, a book publisher located in Dusseldorf, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Adrian Schommers.(mro)
September 10, 2009 435 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Adrian Schommers dated 9/2/09 re: I am managing director of the Giesserei-Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located in Duseeldorf, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Adrian Schommers.(mro)
September 10, 2009 434 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Adrian Schommers dated 9/2/09 re: I am the managing director of the Verlag Stahleisen GmbH, a book publisher located in Dusseldorf, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Adrian Schommers.(mro)
September 10, 2009 433 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Daniela Filthaut dated 9/1/09 re: I am publishing director of the Gerstenberg Verlag GmbH & Co. KG, a book publisher located in Hildeshein, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 10, 2009 432 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Michael Schmitt, Parzeller & Co. KG dated 9/1/09 re: I am managing director of Parzeller & Co. KG, a book publisher located in Fluda, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 10, 2009 431 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Hans-Robert Cram dated 9/2/09 re: I am managing director of the Dietrich Reimer Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located in Berlin, Germany, with a book list of more than 1,800 titles; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 10, 2009 430 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Prof. Dr. Wulf D. v. Lucius dated 9/2/09 re: I am CEO of the Lucius & Lucius Berlagsgesellschaft mbH, a book publisher located in Stuttgart, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 10, 2009 427 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Karl-Heinz Remmers dated 9/1/09 re: I am CEO of the Solarpraxis AG, a book publisher located in Berlin, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 10, 2009 426 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Hans Freiwald dated 9/2/09 re: I am Editorial Director of the CW Niemeyer Buchverlage GmbH, a book publisher located in Hameln, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. (mro)
September 10, 2009 425 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Manfred Metzner re: I am CEO of the Verlag Das Wunderhorn GmbH, a book publisher located in Heidelberg, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 10, 2009 424 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Manfred Krick dated 9/2/09 re: We are a German publishing house having its registered office at Bad Homburg, Germany. As a major publisher in the area of educational products we are distributing about 300 different educational books up to date for which we are holding the US copyright. As a so called rights holder under the settlement agreement we object to the proposed settlement agreement. (mro)
September 10, 2009 421 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Daphne Clair de Jong dated 9/2/09 re: I write to object to the proposed settlement as a class member; I urge the Court to reject the proposed settlement on the grounds listed herein. (mro)
September 10, 2009 419 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Carola Muller dated 9/2/09 re: I am CEO of the publishing house Vandenhoeck & Ruprecht, a book publisher located in Gottingen, Germany; We join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 10, 2009 417 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Klaus-Thorsten Firnig dated 9/1/09 re: I am Managing Director of the EGMONT Verlagsgesellschaften mbH, a book publisher located in Cologne, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 10, 2009 416 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Deborah Burnside dated 9/2/09 re: I write to object to the Proposed Settlement as a class member in support of the New Zealand Society of Author's objection. I am a New Zealand author and citizen and my books are published by New Zealand and Australian publishers.(mro)
September 10, 2009 415 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Salley Shannon dated 9/4/09 re: As the author of several books, plus portions of anthologies, all of which were published before September 5, 2009, I write to put my objections before you; The so-called remedy is disproportionate, duplicitous, and bears little relationship to the offense; I do recognize that much about how Google operates its proprietary, making it difficult to monitor any limitations. Nevertheless, please direct that limits be set. It is time.(mro)
September 10, 2009 413 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Bengt Fasth dated 8/31/2009 re: We write to object to Settlement Agreement. (jpo)
September 10, 2009 412 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Kristoffer Lind dated 8/31/2009 re: We write to object the Settlement Agreement. (jpo)
September 10, 2009 411 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Gerhard Denndorf dated 9/2/2009 re: We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jpo)
September 9, 2009 511 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Zsuzsanna Bazing dated 9/1/2009 re: My name is Dr. Zsuzsanna Bazing, and I am the managing director of the Schenk Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located in Passau Germany. Schenk Verlag GmbH is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 510 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Zsuzsanna Bazing dated 9/1/2009 re: My name is Dr. Zsuzsanna Bazing, and I am the managing director of the Dialog Campus Kiado-NORDEX GmbH, a book publisher located in Passau Germany. Dialog Campus Kiado-NORDEX GmbH is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 509 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Autouio dated 9/8/2009 re: The Federacion de Gremios de Editores de Espaiia (FGEE) is a private entity representing the interest of the publishing sector in Spain. We are writing to you in regards to the proposed Settlement Agreement of the class action copyright infringement litigation brought by the U.S. Author's Guild and others against Google Inc (hereinafter the "Settlement"). (jmi)
September 9, 2009 507 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Eva Dreikurs Feruson dated 8/29/2009 re: As copyright holder for the published works of Rudolf Dreikurs, Sadie Dreikurs, and Eva Dreikurs Ferguson, I am writing to send my objection regarding the Settlement between Google and Authors. I wish to be a member of the Settlement and request the Court to take into account my concerns when finalizing the Settlement. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 500 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir from Racheli Edelman dated 4/9/2009 re: Counsel writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jfe)
September 9, 2009 492 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Giles Sandeman Allen dated 9/4/2009 re: Counsel writes to request an amendment in the determination of "in print". Please can the following clause or something similar be inserted, into the Attachment A to Settlement Agreement, probably at 3.2 (a)(i)(4), to say: "A Book is not "in-print" if the author-publisher contract is governed by foreign law which allows for automatic reversion to the Author of rights in the Book and the criteria for such automatic reversion have been met." (jfe)
September 9, 2009 457 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Owen Atkinson dated 9/4/09 re: The Authors' Licensing Collecting Society(ALCS) wishes to submit this letter in relation to the final settlement approval in this case; The proposed Google settlement agreement is an important issue for our members; We have already identified more than 18,000 of our members and 37,000 works as being directly affected by the settlement. Document filed by Owen Atkinson.(mro)
September 9, 2009 429 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Alison Gray dated 9/2/09 re: I write to object to the proposed settlement as a class member; For the reasons listed herein, I urge the Court to reject the proposed settlement. (mro)
September 9, 2009 423 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Kurt Mattes dated 9/1/09 re: I am owner of the Mattes Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located at Heidelberg in Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 422 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk J. Michael McMahon from Prof. Dr. Rainer Kuhlen dated 8/31/09 re: objection to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by "Copyright for Education and Science" (CCES).(pl)
September 9, 2009 420 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. McMahon from Tony Simpson dated 9/2/09 re: The proposed settlement affects published authors and rights holders. The NZSA owns the rights to numerous publications as well as being the principal advocate for the professional interests of New Zealand's writers, actively working to protect copyright through contractual negotiations. The proposed settlement affects our copyright and that of our members; We urge the Court to rejec the propsed settlement on the grounds as detailed above. (mro)
September 9, 2009 414 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Maria Schonefeld dated 8/31/2009 re: We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jpo)
September 9, 2009 410 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Thomas Grundmann dated 9/1/09 re: We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Bouvier Berlag.(pl)
September 9, 2009 409 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Eckhart Holzboog dated 9/1/09 re: We therefore joinin the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations that includes the Borsenverein des Deutschen Buchhandels and others, for the reasons presented to this Court by those individuals and entities. Document filed by Frommann-holzboog e.K..(pl)
September 9, 2009 408 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Geert Noorman, Director dated 9/1/09 re: Dutch objections and concerns Google Book Settlement. Document filed by The Dutch Publishers Association (NUV).(pl)
September 9, 2009 407 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Hiroshi Sakagami, President dated 9/4/09 re: objection to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by The Japan Writers' Association.(pl)
September 9, 2009 406 Featured Case OBJECTIONS to Proposed Settlement and Brief of Amici Curiae Borsenverein Des Deutschen Buchhandels, Schweizer Buchhandler - Und Verleger - Verbank Sbvv, Hauptverband Des Osterreichischen Buchhandels, Svenska Forlaggareforeningen. Document filed by Harrasowitz, Media24, Studentlitteratur AB, Norstedts Forlagsgrupp AB, Norstedts Kartor AB, Leopard Forlag AB, Borsenverein des Deutschen Buchhandels, Schweizer Buchhandler - und Verleger-Verband SBVV, Hauptverband des Osterreichischen Buchhandels, Svenska Forlaggareforeningen. (ae)
September 9, 2009 405 Featured Case Objections To Settlement. Document filed by Harrasowitz, Media 24 et al. (cd)
September 9, 2009 404 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Irene Lindon, CEO dated 9/3/09 re: objection to the Proposed Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Les Editions De Minuit S.A..(pl)
September 9, 2009 403 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Martin Kahn (ProQuest) dated 9/3/09 re: Objections to settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 402 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Motohisa Ohno re: Objections to Settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 401 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Serge Eyrolles dated 9/3/09 re: Serge Eyrolles, President of the French Publishers Association, writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by French Publishers Association.(ae)
September 9, 2009 400 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Olswang LLP dated 9/8/09 re: that on behalf on behalf of the UK Agents, we respectfully request the Court's permission to file this letter as an amicus curiae brief to address certain concerns of UK authors who have not opted-out of the proposed settlement agreement in this proceeding. The within brief is in support of neither party. Document filed by Olswang LLP.(pl)
September 9, 2009 399 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Tim Teloeken dated 9/1/09 re: Tim Teloeken, director of Alba Fachverlag GmbH & Co.KG, writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Alba Fachverlag GmbH & Co.KG.(ae)
September 9, 2009 398 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Gary Rhoades (AAUP) dated 9/4/09 re: Concerns about the Google Library Project/settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 397 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Mary Lynn Cabrall dated 9/4/09 re: Request for rejection of the settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 396 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Nikolaus Hansen dated 9/1/09 re: Nikolaus Hansen, publisher of the Arche Literatur Verlag AG, writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Arche Literatur Verlag AG.(ae)
September 9, 2009 395 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Susan Bergholz dated 8/31/09 re: Objections to the settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 394 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Tanja Graf dated 9/2/09 re: objection to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Tanja Graf.(pl)
September 9, 2009 393 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Diane Aronson dated 9/3/09 re: Concerns about settlement etc. (cd)
September 9, 2009 392 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Harry Lewis (Author Sub-Class) dated 9/4/09 re: Objections to some of the terms of the settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 391 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Hans J. Schmidtke dated 9/1/09 re: Hans J. Schmidtke, Publisher of the Cadmos Verlag GmbH, writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Cadmos Verlag GmbH.(ae)
September 9, 2009 390 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Raymond Nimmer and Jeff Dodd (University of Houston) dated 9/4/09 re: Request for rejection of the settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 389 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Ulrich Grunwald dated 9/1/09 re: Ulrich Grunwald, Manager of the Verlag Handwerk und Technik GmbH, writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Verlag Handwerk und Technik GmbH.(ae)
September 9, 2009 388 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Steffen Herrmann dated 9/1/09 re: Steffen Herrmann, publisher of Junius Verlag GmbH, writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Junius Verlag GmbH.(ae)
September 9, 2009 387 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jonathan Band (Jonathna Band PLLC) dated 9/3/09 re: Courtesy copies of the listed filings re settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 386 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk, U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York from Dr. Martina Erdmann dated 9/1/09 re: objection to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Dr. Martina Erdmann.(pl)
September 9, 2009 385 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Florian Sautter dated 9/1/09 re: Florian Sautter, owner of the "Verlag der Buchhandlung Sautter & Lackmann, writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Sautter & Lackmann Gachbuchhandlung.(ae)
September 9, 2009 384 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Anne Kenney (Cornell University Library) dated 9/2/09 re: Supporting final settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 383 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Gregory Crane (Tufts University) dated 8/7/09 re: In support of the books Google has digitalized reach the widest possible audience as quickly as possible. (cd)
September 9, 2009 382 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Eva Maria Buchholz dated 9/1/09 re: Evan Maria Buchhlz, head of book department of the Hinstorff Verlag GmbH writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Hinstorff Verlag GmbH.(ae)
September 9, 2009 381 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jennifer Nicholson (IFLA) dated 9/1/09 re: Territorial limits of the settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 380 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Nikolaus Hansen dated 9/1/09 re: Nikolaus Hansen, publisher of the Atrium Vertag AG, writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Atrium Veriag AG.(ae)
September 9, 2009 379 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Karl ZoBell and Millie Basden (DLA Paper) dated 8/26/09 re: Request for approval of the settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 378 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Margret Schneider dated 09/1/09 re: Dr. Stefan Schlegel, manager of the Vde Verlag GmbH writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Vde Verlag GmbH.(ae)
September 9, 2009 377 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Robert Stein (Uniform Law Commission) dated 9/3/09 re: Not opting out of the proposed settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 376 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon, Clerk of Court from Hesys Sanchez Garcia dated 9/3/09 re: Objections of Grupo Editorial Bruno, S.L. to proposed Class Settlement. Document filed by Edelsa Grupo Didascalia, S.A..(pl)
September 9, 2009 375 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Dr. Wolfgang Illert dated 9/2/09 re: The Deutsche Stiftung Denkmalschutz writes objecting to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by The Deutsche Stiftung Denkmalschutz.(ae)
September 9, 2009 374 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Karin Wittenborg (University of Virginia Library) dated 9/3/09 re: Request for final approval of the settlement agreement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 373 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Dr. W. Georg Olms dated 9/1/09 re: Dr. W. Georg Olms, Managing Director of the Georg Olms Verlag writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by W. Georg Olms.(ae)
September 9, 2009 372 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Ulich Pokern and Tilo Knoche dated 9/1/09 re: Parties Ulrich Pokern and Tilo Knoche, Executive Directors of Erns Klett Verlag GmbH jointly object the Settlement Agreement. Filed by Ulich Pokern, Tilo Knoche. (ae)
September 9, 2009 371 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jesus Sanchez Garcia dated 9/3/09 re: Grupo Anaya objects to the proposed Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Grupo Anaya SA.(dle)
September 9, 2009 369 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Peter Kirchheim dated 9/1/09 re: P. Kirchheim Verlag joins in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant et al. Document filed by P. Kerchheim Verlag.(dle)
September 9, 2009 368 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Klaus W. Mueller, Carl-Auer Publ. dated 9/1/09 re: Klaus W. Mueller, General Manager of Carl-Auer Publishers writes to the Court objecting to the Settlement Agreement. Filed by Klaus W. Mueller.(ae)
September 9, 2009 367 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Peter Gollasch dated 9/2/09 re: Peter Gollasch, CFO of the Thienemann Verlag GmbH writes to the Court objecting to the Settlement Agreement. Filed by Peter Gollasch.(ae)
September 9, 2009 366 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ludger Kieyboldt dated 9/1/09 re: Friedrich Kiehl Verlag GmbH joins in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant, et al. Document filed by Friedrich Kiehl Verlag GmbH.(dle)
September 9, 2009 365 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Sakari Laiho dated 9/1/09 re: Sakari Laiho, Director of the The Finnish Book Publishers Association writes to oppose the Settlement Agreement. Filed by Sakari Laiho(ae)
September 9, 2009 364 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Tom Kraushaar, Publisher dated 9/2/09 re: Tom Kraushaar, Publisher of the J.G. Cotta'sche Buchhandlung Nachfolger GmbH, writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Filed by Tom Kraushaar. (ae)
September 9, 2009 363 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Joachim Nourney dated 9/2/09 re: Fachbuchverlag Pfanneberg joins in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant et al. Document filed by Fachbuchverlag Pfanneberg.(dle)
September 9, 2009 362 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Martin Wichert dated 9/1/09 re: Martin Wichert, Sales Director of the Hatje Cantz Verlag, a book publisher located in Ostifildern, Germany writes to object to the Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Martin Wichert.(ae)
September 9, 2009 361 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Chin from Rodney Erickson et al (Committee on Institutional Cooperation) dated 9/4/09 re: Request for approval of the settlement agreement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 360 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Joachim Nourney dated 9/2/09 re: Verlag- Europa Lehrmittel joins in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant et al.. Document filed by Verlag Europa-Lehrmittel.(dle)
September 9, 2009 359 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Leroy Watson (The National Grange) dated 9/3/09 re: Request for approval of the final settlement agreement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 358 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Raymond Johnson-Ohla dated 9/1/09 re: VDI Verlag GmbH joins in the objections presented to this Court by Scott Gant et al. Document filed by VDI Verlag GmbH.(dle)
September 9, 2009 357 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Michael Keller and Lauren Schoenthaler (Stanford University Libraries) dated 9/8/09 re: Request for approval of the Proposed Settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 356 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Bernhard Schmid dated 9/2/09 re: Karl-May-Verlag joins in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant et al. Document filed by Karl-May-Verlag.(dle)
September 9, 2009 355 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Gregor Rauh dated 9/1/09 re: Cornelsen Verlag Scriptor GmbH & Co. KG joins in the objections presented to this Court by Scott Gant et al. Document filed by Cornelsen Verlag Scriptor GmbH & Co. KG.(dle)
September 9, 2009 354 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Roberta Adelman (CUNY LEADS) dated 9/4/09 re: Request for approval of the settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 353 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Lateef Mitima (Institute of Intellectual Property) dated 9/8/09 re: Request for approval of settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 352 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Tilmann Michaletz and Martin Huppe dated 9/1/09 re: Cornelsen Verlag GmbH joins in the objections that thave been presented to this Court by Scott Gant, et al. Document filed by Cornelsen Verlag GmbH.(dle)
September 9, 2009 351 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Stefan Krummow, Legal Advisor dated 9/1/09 re: legal advisor to Aufbau Verlag GmbH & Co. KG joins the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant, et al. (dle)
September 9, 2009 350 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Lezi Baskerville (NAFEO) dated 8/20/09 re: Request for approval of the proposed settlement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 349 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Rainer Schneider dated 9/1/09 re: I am general director and owner of the Schneider Verlag Hohengehren GmbH, a book publisher located in Baltmannsweiler, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 348 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Christian Schumacher-Gebler dated I am CFO of the Ullstein Buchverlage GmbH, a publisher located in Berlin, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations; We also wish to inform the Court that the written notice that our company received of the settlement agreement in German was extremely difficult to read.(mro)
September 9, 2009 347 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Jan Mucha dated 9/1/09 re: I am the CEO of the IZ Immobilienzeitung Verlagsgesellschaft mbH, a book publisher located in Wiesbaden, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 346 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dietrich zu Klampen, publisher dated 9/1/09 re: Dietrich zu Klampen Verlag GbR joins in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant et al. Document filed by Dietrich zu Klampen Verlag GbR.(dle)
September 9, 2009 345 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Edward Feigenbaum et al (Stanford Computer Science) dated 9/3/09 re: In support of approval of the final settlement. Document filed by Peter Schweizer.(cd)
September 9, 2009 344 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Sven H. Koeltz re: I am owner of the Koeltz Scientific Books, a book publisher located in Konigstein, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 343 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Madam or Sir from Dr. Walt Obermiller dated 9/1/09 re: I am partner of E. Schweizerbart'sche Verlagsbuchhandlung of Stuttgart, Germany, a publisher of scholarly books and journals since 1826. Our books and journals are in considerable circulation in the US and elsewhere; We write to object to the settlement agreement. (mro)
September 9, 2009 342 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Wade Henderson (Leadership Conference on Civil Rights) dated 9/3/09 re: Failure to approve the settlement would be tragic. (cd)
September 9, 2009 341 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Madam or Sir from Dr. A. Nagele dated 9/1/09 re: My name is Andreas Nagele, one of the partners of Gebr. Borntraeger Verlagsbuchhandlung of Stuttgart, Germany, a publisher of scholarly books and journals since 1790. Our books and journals are in distributed and read in US, and elsewhere; We write to object the settlement agreement; Further, roughly 90% of the data on Gebr. Borntraeger's publications, that Google Inc. has made available in the preview of its planned book registry is flawed, incomplete and downright incorrect, especially when it concerns the commercial availability of our copyrighted works; It appears to us that Google Inc. has simply chosen to label everything out of print, with very few exceptions. (mro)
September 9, 2009 340 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ulrike Metzger dated 9/2/09 re: Ulrike Metzer, Managing Director of Ravensburger joins in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations as further set forth in this letter. Document filed by Ravensburger Buchverlag Otto Maier GmbH.(dle)
September 9, 2009 339 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Mr. Michael McMahon from Mr. Kees Holierhoek dated 8/31/09 re: We, the foundation of Dutch Authors, Stichting Lira, hereinafter Lira, are writing to you with regard to the proposed settlement agreement between Google and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers. Lira has decided to join the settlement and to file claims with regard to one time cash payments, only on behalf of our rights holders who have mandated Lira hereto. In relation to future "Display Use" under the settlement, Lira is still surveying and evaluating which Lira member authors are interested in giving consent to Google with regard to (future) display use under the settlement. (mro)
September 9, 2009 338 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Gerhard Grossmann dated 9/1/09 re: I am corporate counsel of the Richard Boorberg Verlag GmbH & Co KG, a book publisher located in Stuttgart, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 337 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Gerhard Grossmann dated 9/1/09 re: I am Corporate Counsel of the et+k, edition text + kritik in Richard Boorberg Verlag GmbH & Co. KG, a book publisher located in Munchen, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations; We also wish to inform this Court that our company has not received any written notice of the settlement agreement, nor did we see any published notice of settlement agreement. (mro)
September 9, 2009 336 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Pamela Samuelson (Berkeley Law) dated 9/3/09 re: Google should not have a monopoly on a digital database of books. (cd)
September 9, 2009 335 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Stephan D. Job dated 9/1/09 re: I am managing directior of the Carl Hanser Verlag GmbH & Co. KG, a book publisher located in Munich, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. (mro)
September 9, 2009 334 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jennifer Jackson (Attorney General of Texas) dated 9/4/09 re: Texas asks the Court to modify the settlement agreement. (cd)
September 9, 2009 333 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Detlef Holtgrefe dated 9/1/09 re: I am Publisher and President of the Brunnen Verlag GmbH, a book publisher located in GieBen, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 332 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Michael McMahon from Lex Jansen dated 8/27/09 re: The hearing in October 2009 regarding the Google settlement; We would like to draw your attention to the copyrights of the Dutch books owned by our publishing house which appear to be included in the settlement reached between Google and the Authors Guild and Association of American Publishers. We should first like to point out that we have not yet been consulted or heard in this settlement, even though our copyrights are involved; We have no problem with snippets of works published by our publishing house appearing in search results on Google, but we do intend to retain all rights on works jointly owned by us, our authors and/or our translators now and in the future. (mro)
September 9, 2009 331 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Joachim Schmidt dated 9/1/09 re: I am CEO of the Erich Schmidt Verlag GmbH & Co., a book publisher located in Berlin, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 330 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Jan Weitendorf dated 9/1/09 re: I represent "Verlagsgrupe Oetinger" as CEO and publisher, a book publisher located in Hamburg, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement; We cannot afford to loose rights to Google via internet-this way of selling books has to be one of our "recoupment" possibilities for the future. (mro)
September 9, 2009 329 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Jay Starkman dated 9/1/2009 re: I am the author and copyright holder of The Sex of a Hippopotamus: A Unique History of Taxes and Accounting (Twinset, 2008). It is detestable that the court would write judicial legislation through a "settlement" vehicle abridging my rights (and those of others) and granting those involuntarily ceded rights to Google or any other entity. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 328 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Liana Levi dated 9/3/2009 re: My name is Liana Levi, and I am Manager and Editor in Chief of the Editions Liana Levi, a book publisher located in France. Editions Liana Levi is a member of the settlement class embraced by the proposed settlement agreement that is before this Court in this action (the "Settlement Agreement"), because it owns rights in books that are protected by U.S. copyright law. We write to object to the Settlement Agreement. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 327 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Wolf Dieter Eggert dated 9/1/09 re: I am Managing Director of the Hueber Verlag GmbH & Co. KG, a book publisher located in Ismaning, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 326 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Alexandra Eib dated 9/1/09 re: I am the lawyer for the Bibliographisches Institut AG, a book publisher located in Mannheim, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement; In addition, we wish to inform this Court that the written notice that our company received of the Settlement agreement in German was extremely difficult to read and included a number of meaningless or nonsensical terms and had been translated very poorly.(mro)
September 9, 2009 325 Featured Case PRIVACY AUTHORS AND PUBLISHERS' OBJECTION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 324 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Dr. Manfred Biehal dated 9/1/09 re: I am CEO of the Deutscher Genossenschafts-Verlag eG, a book publisher located in Wiesbaden, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 323 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Sir Michael McMahon from Uitgeverij Malmberg, Johan Leenaars dated 8/25/09 re: We, uitgeverij Malmberg, are writing in regards to the proposed settlement agreement. We would like to raise the following concerns and objections to this settlement: Consequences for European right holders; Determination of commercial availability; Bad quality of the database; Uncertainty about digitization status; Lack of representation of non-US rights holders in the Book Rights Registry; Deadline for making objections or opting out still too short. (mro)
September 9, 2009 322 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Michael Schmitt dated 9/1/09 re: I am Managing Director of the Fachverlag Hans Carl GmbH, a book publisher located in Nuremberg, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. Document filed by Federal Republic of Germany.(mro)
September 9, 2009 321 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Rayan Radia dated 9/4/2009 re: The Competitive Enterprise Institute, a 501(3) non-profit public interest organization that studies the intersection of risk, regulation and markets, hereby requests the Courts permission to submit this letter as an amicus curiae in the Authors Guild et al. v Google, Inc. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 320 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Ludwig Paulmichl dated 9/1/09 re: I am publisher of the Folio publishing house, a book publisher located in Vienna. We write to object to the settlement agreement. (mro)
September 9, 2009 319 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Reinhard Kawohl dated 9/1/09 re: I am proprietor and managing director of the Kawohl Verlag, a publisher of books, calendars and gifts located in Wesel, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement; In addition, we wish to inform this Court that our company did not receive any written notice of the settlement agreement, nor did we see any published notice of the settlement agreement. (mro)
September 9, 2009 318 Featured Case LETTER addressed to The Office of the Clerk from Susanne Franzkeit dated 9/1/09 re: I am the managing director of the V&R unipress GmbH, a book publisher located in Gottingen, Germany; We write to object to the settlement agreement. We do not have the resources to provide this Court with legal briefing regarding our objections nor do we wish to burden this Court with duplicate filings. We therefore join in the objections that have been presented to this Court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations. (mro)
September 9, 2009 317 Featured Case OBJECTION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT Unless both the foregoing concerns can be resolved, I respectfully request that the proposed settlement agreement be rejected by this Court. I am submitting this in my capacity as an author and a member ofthe Authors Guild, not in my capacity as a lawyer. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 316 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Denny Chin from Edward John Hasbrouck dated 8/31/2009 re: By this letter, I opt out of the proposed settlement in this case. Although the settlement notice claims that, "your opt-out request.., must state which Sub-Class you wish to opt out of (either the Author Sub-Class or Publisher Sub-Class)," I believe that this is both incorrect and improper: Since I am opting out of the proposed settlement, I am not subject to its purported division of the proposed class into sub-classes. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 315 Featured Case BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE The Court should advise the parties to amend the settlement to uphold the rights of book owners, all copyright owners and embody the principles of a digital media exchange. Amicus request permission to appear at the Fairness Hearing currently set to be held on October 7, 2009. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 314 Featured Case BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF THE CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY & TECHNOLOGY IN SUPPORT OF APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT AND PROTECTION OF READER PRIVACY The New Services enabled by the Proposed Settlement will be extraordinarily valuable, and will make available to the public a vast amount of knowledge and information that is largely inaccessible today. The Settlement should be approved. But the New Services create serious privacy concerns, and the Court must take affirmative action - as part of the settlement approval - to protect reader privacy. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 313 Featured Case BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE OF CONSUMER WATCHDOG IN OPPOSITION TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT The proposed Settlement Agreement would strip rights from millions of absent class members, worldwide, in violation of national and international copyright law, for the sole benefit of Google. If, as Google claims, its "limited" search-engine activities were protected by fair use, the public deserves an adjudication on this matter, to allow the creation of a competitive book-search market. And it is up to Congress to create a solution to the orphan-works problem that would allow all potential users to benefit, while protecting the copyright holders as well as international interests. The parties simply cannot justify this "solution" which does not adequately protect the Rightsholders and unfairly benefits a single party. Accordingly, Consumer Watchdog respectfully asks that the Court not approve the settlement. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 312 Featured Case QUESTIA MEDIA, INC.'S AMICUS CURIAE OPPOSITION BRIEF TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT: Questia Media, Inc. ("Questia") urges the Court not to approve the Settlement Agreement between Google, Inc. and the Plaintiffs. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 311 Featured Case ORDER granting 304 Motion for Philip Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Canadian Standard Association, Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Associational Plaintiffs, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc., The Author's Guild, Herbert Mitgang, Betty Miles, Daniel Hoffman. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/9/2009) (jmi)
September 9, 2009 310 Featured Case ORDER granting 232 Motion for Edwin C. Komen to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Federal Republic of Germany. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/9/2009) (jmi)
September 9, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 309 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jmi)
September 9, 2009 309 Featured Case ORDER granting 233 Motion for Michael J. Guzman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Harold Bloom, Elliot Abrams, Charlotte Allen,Phyllis Ammons, Dick Armey, Jacques Barzun, Nicholas A. Basbanes, Stephen Bates, Shawn J.Bayem, Jack Beerman, Michael Behe, Michael Cox, Douglas Crase, Frank Gonzalez-Crussi, MidgeDeeter, John Derbyshire, The Estate of Thomas M. Disch, Gerald Early, Mel Eisenberg, Richard A.Epstein, Henry Fetter, David D. Friedman, David Gelemter, Gabrielle Glaser, Mary Ann Glendon,Victor Davis Hanson, Robert Herbold, Arthur Herman, Charles Hill, Manuela Hoelterhoff, RichardHoward, Ishmael Jones, Donald Kagan, David Kuo, Michael Ledeen, Susan Lee, Mary Lefkowitz,David Lehman, John Lehman, Howard Markel, Sherwin B. Nuland, Steven Ozment, Michael Perry,Norman Podhoretz, Diane Ravitch, Ralph Reed, Harriet Rubin, Sarah Ruden, Peter Schweizer, RogerSimon, Roy Spencer, Geoffrey R. Stone, Charles Sykes, Terry Teachout, Paco Underhill, Ruth Wisse,Elizabeth Wurtzel, and John Yoo. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/9/2009) (jmi)
September 9, 2009 308 Featured Case ORDER denying 299 Motion to Intervene. Lewis Hyde, Harry Lewis, and the Open Access Trust, Inc. (the "proposed interveners") move, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(b), to intervene in this action. The motion is denied. This case was filed some four years ago and has been conditionally settled; it is simply too late to permit new parties into the case. The Court will, however, consider the objections raised by the proposed interveners. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/9/2009) (jmi)
September 9, 2009 307 Featured Case ORDER denying 283 Motion for Discovery.The Bloom Objectors' motion is denied. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/9/2009) (jmi)
September 9, 2009 306 Featured Case ORDER The Computer and Communications Industry Association ("CCIA") moves for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in this case. CCIA's motion is granted, and its brief is accepted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/9/2009) (jmi)
September 9, 2009 305 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Office of the Clerk from Anette Ziethen dated 9/1/09 re: join in the objections that have been presented to this court by Scott Gant and the group of foreign publishers and publishing associations...; (djc)
September 9, 2009 303 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Erez Lieberman-Aiden and Jean-Baptiste Michel dated September 3, 2009 re: Amici curiae in support of the settlement. Document filed by Darlene Marshall.(ad)
September 9, 2009 302 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Denny Chin from Edward Feigenbaum, Jennifer Widom, Daphne Koller, Monica Lam, Nils Nilsson, Jeffrey Ullman, Terry Winograd, Jure Leskovec, John Ousterhout, Mehran Sahami, Russ Altman, Gary Bradski, Stuart Card, Goeff Gordon and Shirley Tessler dated September 3, 2009 re: Amicus curiae in support of the approval of the final settlement. (ad)
September 8, 2009 700 Featured Case MOTION for Gary Leland Reback to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Open Book Alliance.(pl)
September 8, 2009 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Martin Garbus to RE-FILE Document 300 MOTION to Intervene Objections to Proposed Settlement and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Opposition found under the event list Replies, Oppositions, Supporting Documents. (jar)
September 8, 2009 301 Featured Case REQUEST TO PARTICIPATE of Darlene Marshall Objection to Class Action Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear. Document filed by Darlene Marshall.(Weiss, Matthew)
September 8, 2009 300 Featured Case FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Intervene Objections to Proposed Settlement and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Lewis Hyde, Harry Lewis, Open Access Trust Inc.. Return Date set for 9/30/2009 at 09:30 AM.(Garbus, Martin) Modified on 9/9/2009 (jar).
September 8, 2009 299 Featured Case MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by Lewis Hyde, Harry Lewis, Open Access Trust Inc.. Return Date set for 9/30/2009 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Affirmation of Charles R. Nesson, # 2 Supplement Objections and Memorandum of Law)(Garbus, Martin)
September 8, 2009 297 Featured Case AFFIRMATION of Charles J. Sanders in Opposition re: 55 MOTION to Approve /Notice of Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval.. Document filed by Songwriters Guild of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover letter explaining delay in filing.)(Fedele, John)
September 8, 2009 296 Featured Case Objection Of Proquest LLC To Proposed Settlement. (rw) (rw).
September 8, 2009 295 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by French Republic. (Max, Theodore)
September 8, 2009 Featured Case ***REJECTION OF ATTEMPTED PAPER FILING IN ECF CASE. The following document(s) Epic's Motion to Intervene, by Mark Rotenberg, was rejected by the Clerk's Office and must be FILED ELECTRONICALLY on the Court's ECF System. (eef)
September 8, 2009 294 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear at the Fairness Hearing on October 7, 2009, on behalf of the aforementioned members of the Publisher Sub-Class.. Document filed by Hachette Livre SA, Librarie Arthme Fayard SA, Dunod Editeur SA, Les Editions Hatier SNC, Editions Larousse SAS, Editorial Salvat SL, Grupo Anaya SA, Algaida Editores, S.A., Alianza Editorial, S.A., Edicions Xerais De Galicia, S.A., Editorial Barcanova, S.A., Larousse Editorial, S.L, Grupo Editorial Bruno, S.L., Edelsa Grupo Didascalia, S.A., Hachette UK Limited. (Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 293 Featured Case Objection to Proposed Settlement. Document filed by Free Software Foundation, Inc.. (Williamson, Aaron)
September 8, 2009 292 Featured Case BRIEF AMICI CURIAE OF LYRASIS, INC., NYLINK AND BIBLIOGRAPHICAL CENTER FOR RESEARCH ROCKY MOUNTAIN, INC. IN SUPPORT OF MODIFICATION OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Lyrasis, Inc., NYLINK, Bibliographical Center for Research Rocky Mountain, Inc..(Clarida, Robert)
September 8, 2009 291 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW MEMORANDUM OF AMICUS CURIAE THE INTERNET ARCHIVE IN OPPOSITION TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Document filed by The Internet Archive. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
September 8, 2009 290 Featured Case DECLARATION of Nicolas Georges in Opposition re: 287 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. Document filed by French Republic. (Max, Theodore)
September 8, 2009 289 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lyrasis, Inc., NYLINK, Bibliographical Center for Research Rocky Mountain, Inc..(Clarida, Robert)
September 8, 2009 288 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 55 MOTION to Approve /Notice of Motion for Preliminary Settlement Approval.. Document filed by Yahoo! Inc.. (Turner, Robert)
September 8, 2009 287 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition To The Settlement Proposal On Behalf of the French Republic. Document filed by French Republic. (Max, Theodore)
September 8, 2009 286 Featured Case Objection to Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Dirk Sutro. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Class Action Reports)(Horowitz, Eric)
September 8, 2009 285 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Cunningham Turner on behalf of Yahoo! Inc. (Turner, Robert)
September 8, 2009 284 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert William Clarida on behalf of Lyrasis, Inc., NYLINK, Bibliographical Center for Research Rocky Mountain, Inc. (Clarida, Robert)
September 8, 2009 283 Featured Case MOTION for Discovery of Putative Class Representatives and Defendant Google Inc.. Document filed by Eric Jager, Harold Bloom, Elliot Abrams, Phyllis Ammons, Jacques Barzun, Nicholas Basbanes, Stephen Bates, Shawn J. Bayern, Michael Behe, Michael Cox, Douglas Crase, Frank Gonzalez-Crussi, Midge Decter, John Derbyshire, Thomas M. Disch, Gerald Early, Mel Eisenberg, Richard A. Epstein, Henry Fetter, David D. Friedman, David Gelernter, Gabrielle Glaser, Mary Ann Glendon, Victor Davis Hanson, Robert Herbold, Arthur Herman, Charles Hill, Manuela Hoelterhoff, Richard Howard, Ishmael Jones, Donald Kagan, David Kuo, Michael Ledeen, Susan Lee, Mary Lefkowitz, David Lehman, John Lehman, Howard Markel, Sherwin B. Nuland, Steven Ozment, Norman Podhoretz, Diane Ravitch, Ralph Reed, Harriet Rubin, Sarah Ruden, Peter Schweizer, Roger Simon, Roy Spencer, Geoffrey R. Stone, Charles Sykes, Terry Teachout, Paco Underhill, Ruth Wisse, Elizabeth Wurtzel, John Yoo, Julia Wright, Wendy Shalit, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Charlotte Allen. Return Date set for 9/18/2009 at 05:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Discovery Requests)(Hall, Joseph)
September 8, 2009 282 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW MEMORANDUM OF AMICUS CURIAE OPEN BOOK ALLIANCE IN OPPOSITION TO THE PROPOSED SETTLEMENT BETWEEN THE AUTHORS GUILD, INC., ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN PUBLISHERS, INC., ET AL., AND GOOGLE INC.. Document filed by Open Book Alliance. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
September 8, 2009 281 Featured Case BRIEF IN OBJECTION TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Privacy Authors and Publishers. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Rudman, Samuel)
September 8, 2009 280 Featured Case Objection to Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Charles D Weller, weller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A --- Class Action Reports)(Horowitz, Eric)
September 8, 2009 279 Featured Case NOTICE of Intent to Appear. Document filed by Privacy Authors and Publishers. (Rudman, Samuel)
September 8, 2009 278 Featured Case OPPOSITION BRIEF re: 64 Order on Motion to Approve,,, Objection to Proposed Settlement: Proposed Settlement Violates State Unclaimed Property Laws and Chartible Trust Laws, State May Not Be Included in Class Without its Consent. Document filed by Richard Blumenthal CT Attorney General.(Becker, Gary)
September 8, 2009 277 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Gary M. Becker on behalf of Richard Blumenthal CT Attorney General.(Becker, Gary)
September 8, 2009 276 Featured Case Objection re: 64 Order on Motion to Approve,,, Objections of Microsoft Corporation to Proposed Settlement and Certification of Proposed Settlement Class and Sub-Classes. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to G, # 2 Exhibit H to O, # 3 Exhibit P to Q, # 4 Exhibit R, # 5 Exhibit S to T, # 6 Exhibit U part 1 of 6, # 7 Exhibit U part 2 of 6, # 8 Exhibit U part 3 of 6, # 9 Exhibit U part 4 of 6, # 10 Exhibit U part 5 of 6, # 11 Exhibit U part 6 of 6, # 12 Exhibit V to Z)(Rubin, Thomas)
September 8, 2009 275 Featured Case BRIEF Amicus Brief of Antitrust Law and Economics Professors In Support Of The Settlement. Document filed by Antitrust Law and Economics Professors.(Ingber, Matthew)
September 8, 2009 274 Featured Case BRIEF Amicus Curiae Brief of Sony Electronics Inc. In Support Of Proposed Google Book Search Settlement. Document filed by Sony Electronics Inc..(Coplan, Jennifer)
September 8, 2009 273 Featured Case Objection to Proposed Settlement and Notice of Intent to Appear. Document filed by Eric Jager, Harold Bloom, Elliot Abrams, Richard Armey, Jacques Barzun, Nicholas Basbanes, Stephen Bates, Shawn J. Bayern, Michael Behe, Michael Cox, Douglas Crase, Frank Gonzalez-Crussi, Midge Decter, John Derbyshire, Thomas M. Disch, Gerald Early, Mel Eisenberg, Richard A. Epstein, Henry Fetter, David D. Friedman, David Gelernter, Gabrielle Glaser, Mary Ann Glendon, Victor Davis Hanson, Robert Herbold, Arthur Herman, Charles Hill, Manuela Hoelterhoff, Richard Howard, Ishmael Jones, Donald Kagan, David Kuo, Michael Ledeen, Susan Lee, Mary Lefkowitz, David Lehman, John Lehman, Howard Markel, Sherwin B. Nuland, Steven Ozment, Norman Podhoretz, Diane Ravitch, Ralph Reed, Harriet Rubin, Sarah Ruden, Peter Schweizer, Roger Simon, Roy Spencer, Geoffrey R. Stone, Charles Sykes, Terry Teachout, Paco Underhill, Ruth Wisse, Elizabeth Wurtzel, John Yoo, Wendy Shalit, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Charlotte Allen. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Hall, Joseph)
September 8, 2009 272 Featured Case Objection of Canadian Standards Association to Proposed Settlement. Document filed by Canadian Standards Association. (Neuman, Kristin)
September 8, 2009 271 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Canadian Standards Association.(Neuman, Kristin)
September 8, 2009 270 Featured Case NOTICE of OF FILING OF OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED SETTLEMENT BY HACHETTE LIVRE, S.A., LIBRARIE ARTHME FAYARD, S.A., DUNOD EDITEUR, S.A., LES EDITIONS HATIER, S.N.C., EDITIONS, LAROUSSE, S.A.S., EDITORIAL SALVAT, S.L., GRUPO ANAYA, S.A., ALGAIDA EDITORES, S.A., ALIANZA EDITORIAL, S.A., EDICIONS XERAIS DE GALICIA, S.A., EDITORIAL BARCANOVA, S.A., LAROUSSE EDITORIAL, S.L., GRUPO EDITORIAL BRUO, S.L., EDELSA GRUPO DIDASCALIA, S.A., AND HACHETTE U.K. LIMITED. Document filed by Akiko Shimojyu. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 269 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying None as Corporate Parent. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Microsoft Corporation.(Rubin, Thomas)
September 8, 2009 268 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristin Hackett Neuman on behalf of Canadian Standard Association (Neuman, Kristin)
September 8, 2009 267 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Solomon Hall on behalf of Harold Bloom, Elliot Abrams, Richard Armey, Jacques Barzun, Nicholas Basbanes, Stephen Bates, Shawn J. Bayern, Jack Beerman, Michael Behe, Michael Cox, Douglas Crase, Frank Gonzalez-Crussi, Midge Decter, John Derbyshire, Thomas M. Disch, Gerald Early, Mel Eisenberg, Richard A. Epstein, Henry Fetter, David D. Friedman, David Gelernter, Gabrielle Glaser, Mary Ann Glendon, Robert Herbold, Arthur Herman, Charles Hill, Manuela Hoelterhoff, Richard Howard, Ishmael Jones, Donald Kagan, David Kuo, Michael Ledeen, Susan Lee, Mary Lefkowitz, David Lehman, John Lehman, Howard Markel, Steven Ozment, Michael Perry, Norman Podhoretz, Diane Ravitch, Ralph Reed, Harriet Rubin, Sarah Ruden, Peter Schweizer, Roger Simon, Roy Spencer, Geoffrey R. Stone, Charles Sykes, Terry Teachout, Paco Underhill, Ruth Wisse, Elizabeth Wurtzel, John Yoo, Wendy Shalit, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Charlotte Allen (Hall, Joseph)
September 8, 2009 265 Featured Case NOTICE of of Intent To Appear and Be Heard At The Fairness Hearing. Document filed by Takashi Atouda, Susumu Nakanishi, Akiko Shimojyu, Jiro Asada, Takeaki Hori, Yuko Matsumoto, Chihaya Takahashi, Shinobu Yoshioka, Kenta Yamada, Tomotsuyo Aizawa, Yu Ohara, Yasumasa Kiyohara, Takashi Tsujii, Akira Nogami, Hiroyuki Shinoda, Toshihiko Yuasa, Koichi Kato, Masahiko Motoki, Hidehiko Nakanishi, Yashio Uemura, Nobuo Uda, Tsukasa Yoshida. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Saito, Yasuhiro)
September 8, 2009 264 Featured Case Objection to the Proposed Settlement and to Certification of the Proposed Settlement Class and Sub-Class by Members of Japan P.E.N. Club. Document filed by Takashi Atouda, Susumu Nakanishi, Akiko Shimojyu, Jiro Asada, Takeaki Hori, Yuko Matsumoto, Chihaya Takahashi, Shinobu Yoshioka, Kenta Yamada, Tomotsuyo Aizawa, Yu Ohara, Yasumasa Kiyohara, Takashi Tsujii, Akira Nogami, Hiroyuki Shinoda, Toshihiko Yuasa, Koichi Kato, Masahiko Motoki, Hidehiko Nakanishi, Yashio Uemura, Nobuo Uda, Tsukasa Yoshida. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jiro Makino in Support of Objection, # 2 Declaration of Naoki Gokita in Support of Objection, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Saito, Yasuhiro)
September 8, 2009 263 Featured Case BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE of Consumer Watchdog in Opposition to the Proposed Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Consumer Watchdog.(Fetterman, Daniel)
September 8, 2009 262 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Yasuhiro Saito on behalf of Takashi Atouda, Susumu Nakanishi, Akiko Shimojyu, Jiro Asada, Takeaki Hori, Yuko Matsumoto, Chihaya Takahashi, Shinobu Yoshioka, Kenta Yamada, Tomotsuyo Aizawa, Yu Ohara, Yasumasa Kiyohara, Takashi Tsujii, Akira Nogami, Hiroyuki Shinoda, Toshihiko Yuasa, Koichi Kato, Masahiko Motoki, Hidehiko Nakanishi, Yashio Uemura, Nobuo Uda, Tsukasa Yoshida (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Seervice)(Saito, Yasuhiro)
September 8, 2009 261 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief of Computer & Communications Industry Association. Document filed by Computer and Communications Industry Association. (Attachments: # 1 CCIA Amicus Curiae Brief)(Schruers, Matthew)
September 8, 2009 260 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Computer and Communications Industry Association.(Schruers, Matthew)
September 8, 2009 259 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Christian Schruers on behalf of Computer and Communications Industry Association (Schruers, Matthew)
September 8, 2009 258 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette U.K. Holding Ltd. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hachette UK Limited.(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 257 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Grupo Anaya S.A. and Education Management, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Larousse Editorial, S.L.(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 256 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette Livre Espana, S.A.U. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Grupo Editorial Bruno, S.L..(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 255 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Grupo Anaya, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Editorial Barcanova, S.A..(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 254 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Grupo Anaya, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Edicions Xerais De Galicia, S.A..(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 253 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette Livre, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Edelsa Grupo Didascalia, S.A..(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 252 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Grupo Anaya, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Alianza Editorial, S.A..(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 251 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Grupo Anaya, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Algaida Editores, S.A..(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 250 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette Livre Espana, S.A.U. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Editorial Salvat SL.(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 249 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette Livre Espana, S.A.U. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Grupo Anaya SA.(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 248 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette Livre, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Editions Larousse SAS.(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 247 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette Livre, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Les Editions Hatier SNC.(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 246 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette Livre, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Dunod Editeur SA.(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 245 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette Livre, S.A as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Librarie Arthme Fayard SA.(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 244 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Hachette, S.A. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Hachette Livre SA.(Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 243 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert C. Micheletto on behalf of Hachette Livre SA, Librarie Arthme Fayard SA, Dunod Editeur SA, Les Editions Hatier SNC, Editions Larousse SAS, Editorial Salvat SL, Grupo Anaya SA, Algaida Editores, S.A., Alianza Editorial, S.A., Edicions Xerais De Galicia, S.A., Editorial Barcanova, S.A., Larousse Editorial, S.L, Grupo Editorial Bruno, S.L., Edelsa Grupo Didascalia, S.A., Hachette UK Limited (Micheletto, Robert)
September 8, 2009 242 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nidhi Yadava on behalf of Hachette Livre SA, Librarie Arthme Fayard SA, Dunod Editeur SA, Les Editions Hatier SNC, Editions Larousse SAS, Editorial Salvat SL, Grupo Anaya SA, Algaida Editores, S.A., Alianza Editorial, S.A., Edicions Xerais De Galicia, S.A., Editorial Barcanova, S.A., Larousse Editorial, S.L, Grupo Editorial Bruno, S.L., Edelsa Grupo Didascalia, S.A., Hachette UK Limited (Yadava, Nidhi)
September 7, 2009 241 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Nelson E. Roth on behalf of Cornell University. (Attachments: # 1 Amicus Curiae Letter from Cornell University)(Roth, Nelson)
September 4, 2009 304 Featured Case MOTION for Philip Roberts to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Canadian Standard Association, Paul Dickson, Joseph Goulden, Association of American Publishers, Inc., Associational Plaintiffs, The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc., Pearson Education, Inc., Simon & Schuster, Inc., John Wiley & Sons, Inc., The Author's Guild, Herbert Mitgang, Betty Miles, Daniel Hoffman.(mro)
September 4, 2009 298 Featured Case ORDER. The Electronic Privacy Information Center moves, pursuant to FRCP 24(b), to intervene in this action. The motion is denied. This case was filed some four years ago and has been conditionally settled; it is simply too late to permit new parties into the case. EPIC is free to file an objections to the proposed settlement, but it must do so by 10:00 a.m. EST on September 8, 2009 (Signed by Judge Denny Chin on 9/4/09) (djc)
September 3, 2009 240 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Cort Rubin on behalf of Microsoft Corporation (Rubin, Thomas)
September 3, 2009 239 Featured Case BRIEF Amicus Curiae. Document filed by New York Law School, Institute for Information Law and Policy.(Grimmelmann, James)
September 3, 2009 238 Featured Case Objection to the Proposed Settlement Agreement. Document filed by DC Comics. (Forrest, Katherine)
September 3, 2009 237 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. E.C. Publications, Inc., Time Warner Communications Inc. and Warner Communications Inc as Corporate Parents. Document filed by DC Comics.(Forrest, Katherine)
September 3, 2009 236 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Lloyd Silverstein on behalf of DC Comics (Silverstein, Mark)
September 3, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 233 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 08/31/2009, Receipt Number 698602. (jd)
September 3, 2009 235 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine B Forrest on behalf of DC Comics (Forrest, Katherine)
September 3, 2009 234 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Solomon Hall on behalf of Ishmael Jones, Wendy Shalit, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Charlotte Allen, Harold Bloom, Elliot Abrams, Richard Armey, Jacques Barzun, Nicholas Basbanes, Stephen Bates, Shawn J. Bayern, Jack Beerman, Michael Behe, Michael Cox, Douglas Crase, Frank Gonzalez-Crussi, Midge Decter, John Derbyshire, Thomas M. Disch, Gerald Early, Mel Eisenberg, Richard A. Epstein, Henry Fetter, David D. Friedman, David Gelernter, Gabrielle Glaser, Mary Ann Glendon, Victor Davis Hanson, Robert Herbold, Arthur Herman, Charles Hill, Manuela Hoelterhoff, Richard Howard, Donald Kagan, David Kuo, Michael Ledeen, Susan Lee, Mary Lefkowitz, David Lehman, John Lehman, Howard Markel, Sherwin B. Nuland, Steven Ozment, Michael Perry, Norman Podhoretz, Diane Ravitch, Ralph Reed, Harriet Rubin, Sarah Ruden, Peter Schweizer, Roger Simon, Roy Spencer, Geoffrey R. Stone, Charles Sykes, Terry Teachout, Paco Underhill, Ruth Wisse, Elizabeth Wurtzel, John Yoo (Hall, Joseph)
September 2, 2009 506 Featured Case LETTER addressed to J. Michael McMahon from Mai Spijkers dated 8/26/2009 re: We Prometheus/Bert Bakker are writing to you in regards to the propose settlement Agreement between Google Inc., and the Authors Guild and the Association of American Publishers. We would like to raise the following concerns and Objections to this Settlement. (jmi)
September 2, 2009 428 Featured Case ORDER: The Court has received requests for pre-motion conferences by the American Society of Media Photographers,