Viacom International, Inc. et al v. Youtube, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Viacom International Inc., Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, and Black Entertainment Television LLC alleged that Defendants YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC and Google Inc. infringed Plaintiffs\' copyrights.

Plaintiff: Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Paramount Pictures Corporation and Viacom International, Inc.
Defendant: Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. and Youtube, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv02103
Filed: March 13, 2007
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Louis L. Stanton
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2011 408 Featured Case ORDER: Upon the motion of Jenner & Block LLP, Sharmila Sohoni is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs in this action. Attorney Sharmila Sohoni terminated. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/24/2011) (lnl)
May 23, 2011 407 MOTION for Sharmila Sohoni to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc..(Wilkens, Scottt)
May 18, 2011 406 Featured Case ORDER: Upon the motion of Jenner & Block LLP, Eric R. Haren is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs in this action. Attorney Eric R. Haren terminated. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/18/2011) (lnl)
May 17, 2011 405 MOTION for Eric R. Haren to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc..(Wilkens, Scottt)
December 20, 2010 404 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/28/2010 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (lnl)
September 29, 2010 403 Featured Case ORDER, that for the reasons stated on the record in open court this afternoon, the balance of the pre-motion conference regarding defendants' application for attorneys fees is adjourned until it is rescheduled following receipt of the Court of Appeals' mandate in the pending appeal. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/28/10) (pl)
September 28, 2010 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Pre-Motion Conference held on 9/28/2010 on Motion for attorney's fees. (mro)
August 11, 2010 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 4 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 347 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by IAC/Interactivecorp, Facebook, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., eBay, Inc., 221 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 196 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 369 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 375 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 284 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 265 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,, filed by NBC Universal, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Picture Archive Council Of America, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., SESAC, Inc., American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Zuffa, LLC, Center For The Rule Of Law, Association Of American Publishers, Rosetta Stone Ltd., The Media Institute, Institute For Policy Innovation, Professional Photographers of America, 197 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 5 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 199 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 133 Letter, 381 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 83 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 1 Complaint, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 203 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 47 Notice of Appeal filed by Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow, 73 Notice of Appearance filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 62 Stipulation and Order, 325 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 200 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 152 MOTION for Melissa A. Cox to Withdraw as Attorney. filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 344 MOTION for Leave to File Brief. filed by IAC/Interactivecorp, Facebook, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., eBay, Inc., 343 Notice of Appearance filed by IAC/Interactivecorp, Facebook, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., eBay, Inc., 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 370 Reply filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 321 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 185 Stipulation and Order,,,,,,, 48 MOTION for Rebecca Weinstein Bacon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 38 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 371 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 209 Declaration in Support of Motion,,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 188 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 358 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document, 58 Scheduling Order, 306 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 107 Protective Order, 191 Declaration in Support of Motion,,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 167 Endorsed Letter,, 168 Endorsed Letter,, 300 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 64 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 23 MOTION for Carrie A. Jablonski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 268 Brief, filed by NBC Universal, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Picture Archive Council Of America, Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., SESAC, Inc., American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Zuffa, LLC, Center For The Rule Of Law, Association Of American Publishers, Rosetta Stone Ltd., The Media Institute, Institute For Policy Innovation, Professional Photographers of America, 35 MOTION for Bart E. Volkmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 315 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 213 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 125 MOTION for Melissa A. Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 102 Endorsed Letter, 166 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 41 Order, 399 Order,,,,, 320 Declaration in Support,,,,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 274 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 90 CROSS MOTION for Protective Order. filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 165 Endorsed Letter,, 230 Endorsed Letter, 120 Stipulation and Order, 79 Endorsed Letter, Set Scheduling Order Deadlines,, 258 MOTION for Leave to File brief of amicus curiae. filed by Washington Legal Foundation, 127 Notice of Change of Address, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 249 MOTION to Strike. filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 108 Notice of Change of Address, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 214 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,,,,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 253 Memo Endorsement, 237 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. filed by American Library Association, et al., 261 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Washington Legal Foundation, 61 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 378 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 346 Brief filed by IAC/Interactivecorp, Facebook, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., eBay, Inc., 201 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 55 Protective Order, 225 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 13 MOTION for Scott B. Wilkens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 301 Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion), Objection (non-motion) filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 257 Notice (Other) filed by Washington Legal Foundation, 89 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 318 Declaration in Support,,,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 94 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 303 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 262 Affidavit filed by Washington Legal Foundation, 316 Declaration in Support of Motion,,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 171 Stipulation and Order,, 28 Memo Endorsement, 314 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, 212 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Comedy Partners, Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 350 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. filed by The Sideshow C
August 11, 2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 402 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
August 11, 2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 402 Notice of Appeal,. (nd)
August 11, 2010 402 NOTICE OF APPEAL from 364 Memorandum & Opinion,, 401 Judgment,. Document filed by Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners, Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 911709. (nd)
August 10, 2010 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 402 Final Judgment. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ml)
August 10, 2010 401 FINAL JUDGMENT that for the reasons set forth in the Court's Opinion and Order dated June 23, 2010, judgment is entered for Defendants and against Plaintiffs on all of Plaintiffs' claims. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/9/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml)
August 10, 2010 400 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: The parties have met and conferred and reach a stipulated resolution regarding the treatment of removed videos, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/9/2010) (tro)
August 4, 2010 399 Featured Case ORDER After examining the redactions proposed by the defendants with respect to confidential personal and business information contained in submissions filed in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment, Viacom's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Viacom's Reply in Support of Viacom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Class Plaintiffs' Reply Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - together with the reasons given for continued confidential treatment of the designated material, I have determined that the protection of the value of this private, proprietary and commercially sensitive information to its owners clearly outweighs any countervailing public interest in its disclosure to the general public and to competitors, and justifies its redaction, together with personally identifiable matter such as addresses, telephone and account numbers, family and personal affairs and similar information, publicly filed and disclosed. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/4/2010) (jmi)
August 3, 2010 398 Featured Case ORDER re redactions proposed by the plaintiffs with respect to confidential personal and business information contained in submissions filed in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' motions for Partial Summary Judgment et al: I have determined that the protection of the value of this private, proprietary and commercially sensitive information to its owners clearly outweighs any countervailing public interest in its disclosure to the general public and to competitors, and as further set forth in this document. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/3/10) (cd)
July 30, 2010 397 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Philip M. Kelly dated 7/1/10 re: BayTSP respectfully requests that the Court maintain the Confidential Document under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Because of the prospect that its disclosure may reveal anti-piracy methods, this document (Exhibit 33 to the Schapiro Declaration in support of Google's Reply Brief) shall remain sealed. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/29/10) (rjm)
July 30, 2010 396 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from William F. Bly dated 6/30/10 re: The enclosed documents submitted in response to the Court's Order of March 5, 2010, regarding the unsealing of documents. ENDORSEMENT: I have reviewed the documents and proposed redactions submitted with this letter. The redactions are narrowly tailored, fully justified, approved and shall remain in effect. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/29/10) (rjm)
July 29, 2010 395 Featured Case RULING ON VIACOM'S DISPUTED PRIVILEGE CLAIMS; I have considered the parties' submissions regarding the two claims of privilege asserted by Viacom. In sequence, the decisiveissue in each claim is disposed of in the manner that is set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/28/10) (pl)
June 30, 2010 394 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. (Volume 3: Exhibits 81-198). Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 393 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. (Volume 2: Exhibits 51-80. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 392 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. (Volume 1: Exhibits 1-50) Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 391 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY DECLARATION of Michael Rubin in Support of defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Volume 2: Exhibits 51-355). Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 390 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY DECLARATION of Michael Rubin in Support of defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Volume 1: Exhibits 1-50) Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 389 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY to Viacom's counter-statement in response to defendants' Local Rule 56.1 Statement in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment & Response to Viacom's Supplemental Counter-Statement. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 388 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 387 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY DECLARATION of Michael Rubin in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 386 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) DECLARATION of David King in Support of Defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 385 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY to Class plaintiffs' counter-statement of controverted material facts in Opposition to defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 384 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (mbe)
June 28, 2010 383 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing defendants' first defense(DMCA Safe Harbor Defense). Document filed by class plaintiffs. ***Accepted for filing by the Honorable Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/10 (document number 363). (mro)
June 25, 2010 382 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 381 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 117, # 2 Exhibit 213, # 3 Exhibit 267 and 360)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 380 Featured Case DECLARATION of MICHAEL RUBIN in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 162 - 177, # 2 Exhibit 178 - 180, # 3 Exhibit 181 - 184, # 4 Exhibit 185, # 5 Exhibit 186 - 191, # 6 Exhibit 192 - 355)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 379 Featured Case DECLARATION of MICHAEL RUBIN in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16 - 17, # 2 Exhibit 18 - 26, # 3 Exhibit 27 - 30, # 4 Exhibit 31 - 42, # 5 Exhibit 43 - 44, # 6 Exhibit 45 - 71)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 378 Featured Case DECLARATION of MICHAEL RUBIN in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 6, # 2 Exhibit 7 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 7 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 7 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 7 Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 7 Part 5, # 7 Exhibit 7 Part 6)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 377 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 110 Part 6, # 2 Exhibit 111 - 134, # 3 Exhibit 136 - 146, # 4 Exhibit 147 Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 147 Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 148 - 155, # 7 Exhibit 156 - 161, # 8 Exhibit 162 - 198)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 376 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 96 - 109, # 2 Exhibit 110 Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 110 Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 110 Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 110 Part 4)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 375 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 73 Part 4, # 2 Exhibit 73 Part 5, # 3 Exhibit 73 Part 6, # 4 Exhibit 73 Part 7, # 5 Exhibit 74 - 91)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 374 Featured Case DECLARATION of Scott B. Wilkens in Support re: 367 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Kohlmann, Susan)
June 25, 2010 373 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 43 - 55, # 2 Exhibit 56 - 62, # 3 Exhibit 63 - 64, # 4 Exhibit 65 - 72, # 5 Exhibit 73 Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 73 Part 2)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 372 Featured Case Objection re: 292 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, 289 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, 300 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, 294 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, 293 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, / Viacom's Evidentiary Objections to Portions of Declarations Submitted in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Viacom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
June 25, 2010 371 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3, # 2 Exhibit 4 - 12, # 3 Exhibit 13 - 17, # 4 Exhibit 18 Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 18 Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 19 - 32, # 7 Exhibit 33 - 41, # 8 Exhibit 42 Part 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 370 Featured Case REPLY re: 286 Response in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
June 25, 2010 369 Featured Case DECLARATION of DAVID KING in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 368 Featured Case REPLY TO VIACOM'S COUNTER-STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' LOCAL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT & RESPONSE TO VIACOM'S SUPPLEMENTAL COUNTER-STATEMENT. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 367 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense. / Viacom's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Viacom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
June 25, 2010 366 Featured Case REPLY TO CLASS PLAINTIFFS' COUNTERSTATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 365 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 23, 2010 364 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: #99090 Defendants are granted summary judgment that they qualify for the protection of 17 U. S. C. § 512 (c), as expounded above, against all of plaintiffs' claims for direct and secondary copyright infringement. Plaintiffs' motions for judgment are denied. The parties shall meet and confer about any issues requiring judicial attention remaining in these cases, and submit a report (jointly, if possible) by July 14, 2010. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/2010) (jpo) Modified on 6/24/2010 (ajc). Modified on 6/30/2010 (jpo).
June 23, 2010 363 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, consistent with the March 17, 2010 and May 21, 2010 Stipulations and Orders, the unsealing of materials relating to the parties' replies to summary judgment motions and certain documents from their motions for summary judgment motions in the above referenced actions shall be implemented as set forth in this Stipulation and Order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/2010) (jpo)
June 23, 2010 Featured Case Set Deadlines/Hearings:( Status Report due by 7/14/2010.) (jpo)
June 18, 2010 362 Featured Case ORDER granting 350 Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: granted. No opposition. So Ordered.(Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/18/2010) (jmi)
June 15, 2010 361 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
June 14, 2010 360 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
June 14, 2010 359 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 357 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew William Alsdorf terminated. ENDORSEMENT: Leave granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/14/2010) (jfe)
June 14, 2010 358 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 344 Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. No opposition. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/14/2010) (jfe)
June 11, 2010 357 Featured Case MOTION for Matthew W. Alsdorf to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(Kohlmann, Susan)
June 8, 2010 356 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSED ON NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF RUSSELL J. FRACKMAN: ENDORSEMENT: Granted. No opposition. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/7/2010) (js)
June 7, 2010 354 Featured Case STIPULATED HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/7/2010) (jmi)
June 4, 2010 355 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
June 4, 2010 353 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
June 1, 2010 352 Featured Case BRIEF of Amicus Curiae The Sideshow Coalition in Support of Defendants. Document filed by The Sideshow Coalition.(Grannis, Eric)
June 1, 2010 351 Featured Case DECLARATION of Eric J. Grannis in Support re: 350 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by The Sideshow Coalition. (Grannis, Eric)
June 1, 2010 350 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by The Sideshow Coalition.(Grannis, Eric)
May 28, 2010 349 Featured Case FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by The Sideshow Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eric J. Grannis, # 2 Exhibit Amicus Brief of the Sideshow Coalition)(Grannis, Eric) Modified on 6/1/2010 (db).
May 28, 2010 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Eric Joseph Grannis to RE-FILE Document 349 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents (Declaration in Support and Memorandum of Law in Support) are filed separately, each getting there own Document #. ***REMINDER*** - First Re-File Motion, then file and link any supporting documents - found under the Event Type Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (db)
May 27, 2010 348 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSED granted, no opposition re 273 Motion for Clifford M. Sloan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/27/10) (cd)
May 26, 2010 347 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 346 Featured Case BRIEF of Amici Curiae eBay Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, and Yahoo! Inc. in Support of Defendants. Document filed by eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 345 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael S. Kwun in Support re: 344 MOTION for Leave to File Brief.. Document filed by eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 344 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Brief. Document filed by eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 343 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Asim M. Bhansali on behalf of eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc. (Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 342 Featured Case YOUTUBE'S COUNTER STATEMENT TO VIACOM'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LIABILITY AND INAPPLICABILITY OF THE DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT SAFE HARBOR DEFENSE. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 341 Featured Case DECLARATION OF MICAH SCHAFFER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 340 Featured Case DEFENDANTS' COUNTER STATEMENT TO CLASS PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 339 Featured Case DECLARATION OF CHAD HURLEY SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 338 Featured Case DECLARATION OF DAVID KING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 337 Featured Case DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE MATERIAL FROM VIACOM'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUBMISSIONS AND PUTATIVE CLASS PLAINTIFFS' RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 336 Featured Case DECLARATION OF ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE MATERIAL FROM VIACOM'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUBMISSIONS AND PUTATIVE CLASS PLAINTIFFS' RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 335 Featured Case DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 334 Featured Case VOLUME 9: EXHIBITS 350-425(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 333 Featured Case VOLUME 8: EXHIBITS 313-349(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 332 Featured Case VOLUME 7: EXHIBITS 276-312(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238.(mro) Modified on 5/26/2010 (mro).
May 26, 2010 331 Featured Case VOLUME 6: EXHIBITS 231-275(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 330 Featured Case VOLUME 5: EXHIBITS 211-230(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238.(mro)
May 26, 2010 329 Featured Case VOLUME 4: EXHIBITS 151-210(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238.(mro)
May 26, 2010 328 Featured Case VOLUME 3: EXHIBITS 117-150(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 327 Featured Case VOLUME 2: EXHIBITS 76-116 (attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 326 Featured Case VOLUME 1: EXHIBITS 1-75 (attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238.(mro)
May 21, 2010 325 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten/ Additional Unsealed Exhibits to the Declaration of William M. Hohengarten in Support of Viacom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Support in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 322, # 2 Exhibit 323, # 3 Exhibit 338, # 4 Exhibit 374, # 5 Exhibit 376, # 6 Exhibit 377)(Hohengarten, William)
May 21, 2010 324 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten/ Additional Unsealed Exhibits to the Declaration of William M. Hohengarten in Support of Viacom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Support in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 312 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 312 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 312 - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 313, # 5 Exhibit 315 - Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 315 - Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 315 - Part 3)(Hohengarten, William)
May 21, 2010 323 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten/ Additional Unsealed Exhibits to the Declaration of William M. Hohengarten in Support of Viacom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 38, # 2 Exhibit 76, # 3 Exhibit 78, # 4 Exhibit 79, # 5 Exhibit 80, # 6 Exhibit 83, # 7 Exhibit 86, # 8 Exhibit 110, # 9 Exhibit 113, # 10 Exhibit 137, # 11 Exhibit 182, # 12 Exhibit 192, # 13 Exhibit 193, # 14 Exhibit 194, # 15 Exhibit 195, # 16 Exhibit 197, # 17 Exhibit 198, # 18 Exhibit 201, # 19 Exhibit 202, # 20 Exhibit 292, # 21 Exhibit 301)(Hohengarten, William)
May 21, 2010 322 Featured Case RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 321 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 11, Exhibit 379 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 320 Featured Case DECLARATION of Declaration of Scott B. Wilkens in Support of Viacom's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in Support re: 284 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46)(Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 319 Featured Case DECLARATION of Susan J. Kohlmann/ Exhibits to Declaration of Susan J. Kohlmann in Support of Viacom's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in Support re: 284 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 81, # 2 Exhibit 82, # 3 Exhibit 83, # 4 Exhibit 84, # 5 Exhibit 85, # 6 Exhibit 86, # 7 Exhibit 87, # 8 Exhibit 88, # 9 Exhibit 89, # 10 Exhibit 90, # 11 Exhibit 91, # 12 Exhibit 92, # 13 Exhibit 93)(Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 318 Featured Case DECLARATION of Susan J. Kohlmann/ Exhibits to Declaration of Susan J. Kohlmann in Support of Viacom's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in Support re: 284 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 52, # 2 Exhibit 53, # 3 Exhibit 54, # 4 Exhibit 55, # 5 Exhibit 56, # 6 Exhibit 57, # 7 Exhibit 58, # 8 Exhibit 59, # 9 Exhibit 60, # 10 Exhibit 61, # 11 Exhibit 62 - Part 1, # 12 Exhibit 62 - Part 2, # 13 Exhibit 62 - Part 3, # 14 Exhibit 62 - Part 4, # 15 Exhibit 62 - Part 5, # 16 Exhibit 62 - Part 6, # 17 Exhibit 62 - Part 7, # 18 Exhibit 62 - Part 8, # 19 Exhibit 62 - Part 9, # 20 Exhibit 63, # 21 Exhibit 64, # 22 Exhibit 65, # 23 Exhibit 66, # 24 Exhibit 67, # 25 Exhibit 68, # 26 Exhibit 69, # 27 Exhibit 70, # 28 Exhibit 71, # 29 Exhibit 72, # 30 Exhibit 73, # 31 Exhibit 74, # 32 Exhibit 75, # 33 Exhibit 76, # 34 Exhibit 77, # 35 Exhibit 78, # 36 Exhibit 79, # 37 Exhibit 80)(Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 317 Featured Case DECLARATION of Susan J. Kohlmann/ Exhibits to Declaration of Susan J. Kohlmann in Support of Viacom's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment in Support re: 284 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 30 - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit 30 - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 30 - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit 30 -Part 4, # 5 Exhibit 30 - Part 5, # 6 Exhibit 31, # 7 Exhibit 32, # 8 Exhibit 33, # 9 Exhibit 34, # 10 Exhibit 35, # 11 Exhibit 36, # 12 Exhibit 37, # 13 Exhibit 38, # 14 Exhibit 39, # 15 Exhibit 40, # 16 Exhibit 41, # 17 Exhibit 42, # 18 Exhibit 43, # 19 Exhibit 44, # 20 Exhibit 45, # 21 Exhibit 46, # 22 Exhibit 47, # 23 Exhibit 48, # 24 Exhibit 49, # 25 Exhibit 50, # 26 Exhibit 51)(Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 316 Featured Case DECLARATION of Susan J. Kohlmann in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29)(Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 315 Featured Case DECLARATION of Suzanne Reider in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 314 Featured Case DECLARATION of Micah Schaffer in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 313 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Rubin in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 312 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 311 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims. Defendants' Local Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 310 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 10, Exhibit 374- 378 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 380 - 386, # 2 Exhibit 387 - 412, # 3 Exhibit 413 - 420, # 4 Exhibit 421 - 422, # 5 Exhibit 423, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 423, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 423, Part 3, # 8 Exhibit 424 -425)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 309 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 9, Exhibit 315 -318 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 319 - 335, # 2 Exhibit 336, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 336, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 336, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 337 - 345, # 6 Exhibit 346 - 368, # 7 Exhibit 369 - 373)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 308 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 8, Exhibit 238 -259 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 260 - 272, # 2 Exhibit 273 - 285, # 3 Exhibit 286 - 288, # 4 Exhibit 289 - 296, # 5 Exhibit 297 - 310, # 6 Exhibit 311, Part 1, # 7 Exhibit 311, Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 312 - 314)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 307 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 7, Exhibit 215, Part 1 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 215, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 215, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit 215, Part 4, # 4 Exhibit 215, Part 5, # 5 Exhibit 216 - 222, # 6 Exhibit 223 - 237)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 306 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 6, Exhibit 116 - 127 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 128, # 2 Exhibit 129 - 134, # 3 Exhibit 135 - 141, # 4 Exhibit 142 - 174, # 5 Exhibit 175 -194, # 6 Exhibit 195 - 204, # 7 Exhibit 205 - 214)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 305 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 5, Exhibit 91, Part 1 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 91, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 91, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit 91, Part 4, # 4 Exhibit 91, Part 5, # 5 Exhibit 91, Part 6, # 6 Exhibit 92 - 104, # 7 Exhibit 105 -115)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 304 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 4, Exhibit 78, Part 1 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 78, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 79 - 84, # 3 Exhibit 85 - 90)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 303 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 3, Exhibit 25 - 38 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39 - 45, # 2 Exhibit 46 - 59, # 3 Exhibit 60 - 63, # 4 Exhibit 64, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 64, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 65 - 68, # 7 Exhibit 69 - 77)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 302 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 2, Exhibit 16, Part 6 in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, Part 7, # 2 Exhibit 16, Part 8, # 3 Exhibit 16, Part 9, # 4 Exhibit 16, Part 10, # 5 Exhibit 17 - 24)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 301 Featured Case Objection re: 221 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 196 Declaration in Support of Motion, 192 Declaration in Support of Motion, 211 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 197 Declaration in Support of Motion, 199 Declaration in Support of Motion, 200 Declaration in Support of Motion, 198 Declaration in Support of Motion, 194 Declaration in Support of Motion, 226 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 190 Declaration in Support of Motion, 195 Declaration in Support of Motion, 228 Declaration in Support of Motion, 215 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 216 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 213 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 227 Declaration in Support of Motion, 218 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 202 Declaration in Support of Motion, 223 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 220 Declaration in Support of Motion,, 207 Declaration in Support of Motion,, /Viacom's Evidentiary Objections to and Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Submitted in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 300 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 16, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 16, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 16, Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 16, Part 5)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 299 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Gordon in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 298 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Solomon in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 297 Featured Case DECLARATION of Brent Hurley in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 296 Featured Case COUNTER STATEMENT TO 189 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 295 Featured Case DECLARATION of Zahavah Levine in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 294 Featured Case DECLARATION of Christopher Maxcy in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 293 Featured Case DECLARATION of Steve Chen in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 292 Featured Case DECLARATION of Chad Hurley in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 291 Featured Case DECLARATION of Anthony Weibell in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 290 Featured Case DECLARATION of Micah Schaffer in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 289 Featured Case DECLARATION of David King in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 288 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 249 MOTION to Strike.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 287 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense. Defendants' Counterstatement To Class Plaintiffs' Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 286 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense. YouTube's Counterstatement to Viacom's Statement of Undisputed Facts. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 285 Featured Case COUNTER STATEMENT TO 189 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 284 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
May 21, 2010 283 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 282 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER; that, consistent with the March 17, 2010 Stipulation and Order, the unsealing of materials relating to the parties' oppositions to summary judgment motions and certain documents from their motions for summary judgment in the above referenced actions shall be implemented as follows: (1) To the extent practicable and with the express exception of exhibits in a format that cannot be filed via ECF and overly voluminous exhibits (e.g., large Excel spreadsheets), the parties intend to file all materials related to the parties' summary judgment motions via simultaneous ECF submissions on Friday, May 21, 2010 at 1pm EDT with those portions of the materials the parties contend should remain under seal redacted; (2) To the extent any ECF "filing event" that occurs pursuant to Paragraph 1 would exceed 15 MB, the parties will, unless they are unable to, break it into subparts with subsequent parts clearly identified. Those materials shall remain on the ECF system to allow continued public access. (3) To extent the parties are unsealing certain additional documents from their summary judgment motions because redactions were approved by the Court or have been withdrawn, the parties shall only file those additional documents. (4) So as to further facilitate public access to the parties' summary judgment submissions, the parties shall also file a complete set of all materials related to the parties' summary judgment motions being filed via ECF on May 21, 2010, with those portions of the materials the parties contend should remain under seal redacted, manually with the Clerk of the Court in hard copy to the extent possible and CD/DVD as necessary, promptly after this Stipulation and Order is so-ordered by the Court, but in no event earlier than the filing in Paragraph 1; (5) The original materials filed under seal in connection with the parties' summary judgment motions shall remain under seal unless the Clerk of the Court is otherwise directed by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood, Part I (signed at request of Judge Stanton's chambers), on 5/20/2010) (tve)
May 19, 2010 281 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
May 17, 2010 280 Featured Case MOTION for Russell J. Frackman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation.(mbe)
May 18, 2010 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 273 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 05/07/2010, Receipt Number 902731. (jd)
May 14, 2010 279 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/3/2010 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ab)
May 14, 2010 278 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on May 3, 2010 at 3:15 pm before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (eef)
May 13, 2010 277 Featured Case BRIEF of Amici Curiae. Document filed by Directors Guild of America, Screen Actors Guild, American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO.(DeChiara, Peter)
May 13, 2010 276 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Directors Guild of America, Screen Actors Guild, American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO.(DeChiara, Peter)
May 13, 2010 275 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Dante DeChiara on behalf of Directors Guild of America, Screen Actors Guild, American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, International Alliance of Theatrical Stage Employees and Moving Picture Machine Operators of the United States and Canada, AFL-CIO (DeChiara, Peter)
May 13, 2010 274 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul March Smith on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Smith, Paul)
May 11, 2010 272 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
May 11, 2010 271 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 257 Notice (Other) filed by Washington Legal Foundation. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/10/2010) (jfe)
May 11, 2010 270 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re 267 Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/10/2010) (jfe)
May 11, 2010 269 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Peter D. DeChiara dated 5/5/2010 re: Counsel request a pre-motion conference concerning the application of the Guilds and Unions to file an amicus curiae brief in support of plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: Leave to file the brief amicus is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/10/2010) (jfe) Modified on 5/19/2010 (jfe).
May 7, 2010 273 Featured Case MOTION for Clifford M. Sloan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Association Of American Publishers, Center For The Rule Of Law, Institute For Policy Innovation, The Media Institute, Picture Archive Council Of America, Professional Photographers of America, Rosetta Stone Ltd., Zuffa, LLC.(mro)
May 7, 2010 268 Featured Case BRIEF of AMICI CURIAE. Document filed by American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Association Of American Publishers, Center For The Rule Of Law, Institute For Policy Innovation, The Media Institute, Picture Archive Council Of America, Professional Photographers of America, Rosetta Stone Ltd., Zuffa, LLC.(Rasenberger, Mary)
May 7, 2010 267 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Association Of American Publishers, Center For The Rule Of Law, Institute For Policy Innovation, The Media Institute, Picture Archive Council Of America, Professional Photographers of America, Rosetta Stone Ltd., Zuffa, LLC.(Rasenberger, Mary)
May 7, 2010 266 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Christopher Gardner Clark on behalf of American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Association Of American Publishers, Center For The Rule Of Law, Institute For Policy Innovation, The Media Institute, Picture Archive Council Of America, Professional Photographers of America, Rosetta Stone Ltd., Zuffa, LLC.(Clark, Christopher)
May 7, 2010 265 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Gannett Co., Inc., The Walt Disney Company, General Electric Company, Vivendi S.A., Time Warner Inc., Rosetta Stone Inc., as Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Association Of American Publishers, Center For The Rule Of Law, Institute For Policy Innovation, The Media Institute, Picture Archive Council Of America, Professional Photographers of America, Rosetta Stone Ltd., Zuffa, LLC.(Rasenberger, Mary)
May 7, 2010 264 Featured Case DECLARATION of Paul D. Montclare in Support re: 258 MOTION for Leave to File brief of amicus curiae.. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae)(Wachtler, Lauren)
May 7, 2010 263 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Mary Eleanor Rasenberger on behalf of American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Disney Enterprises, Inc., NBC Universal, Inc., Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc., Association Of American Publishers, Center For The Rule Of Law, Institute For Policy Innovation, The Media Institute, Picture Archive Council Of America, Professional Photographers of America, Rosetta Stone Ltd., Zuffa, LLC.(Rasenberger, Mary)
May 7, 2010 262 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of PAUL D. MONTCLARE. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation. (Wachtler, Lauren)
May 7, 2010 261 Featured Case DECLARATION of Paul D. Montclare in Support re: 258 MOTION for Leave to File brief of amicus curiae.. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit BRIEF OF AMICUS CURIAE)(Wachtler, Lauren)
May 7, 2010 260 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 258 MOTION for Leave to File brief of amicus curiae.. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation. (Wachtler, Lauren)
May 7, 2010 259 Featured Case DECLARATION of Paul D. Montclare in Support re: 258 MOTION for Leave to File brief of amicus curiae.. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation. (Wachtler, Lauren)
May 7, 2010 258 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File brief of amicus curiae. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation.(Wachtler, Lauren)
May 7, 2010 257 Featured Case NOTICE of Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Plaintiffs. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation. (Wachtler, Lauren)
May 7, 2010 256 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Lauren J. Wachtler on behalf of Washington Legal Foundation.(Wachtler, Lauren)
May 7, 2010 255 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Washington Legal Foundation.(Wachtler, Lauren)
May 5, 2010 254 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew Schapiro dated 5/4/10 re: Requesting clarification of the Court's Order denying motion to strike the Page deposition. ENDORSEMENT: The questioned order denied all relief sought in the 4/30/10 Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/5/10) (cd)
May 5, 2010 253 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Viacom's Evidentiary Objections to and Motion to Strike Portions of Declarations Submitted in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment: Denied. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/5/10) (cd)
May 4, 2010 252 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(cb)
May 4, 2010 251 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSED denying 249 Motion to Strike. After hearing counsel, and having reviewed the challenged material, this motion is denied, with leave to defendants to identify transcript portions and references in Mr. Baskins 4/30/10 letter to the court which should be redacted before public filing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/3/2010) (jmi)
May 1, 2010 249 Featured Case MOTION to Strike. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc..(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 3, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Pre-Motion Conference held regarding page testimony on 5/3/2010. (mro)
April 30, 2010 250 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
April 30, 2010 248 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
April 22, 2010 246 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Corrected Exhibit 17 to Declaration of William M. Hohengarten in Support of Viacom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 17)(Kohlmann, Susan)
April 16, 2010 245 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 237 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF NONPARTIES AMERICAN LIBRARY ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND RESEARCH LIBRARIES, ASSOCIATION OF RESEARCH CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY, COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, HOME RECORDING RIGHTS COALITION, INTERNET ARCHIVE, NETCOALITION, AND PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/16/2010) (jpo)
April 15, 2010 244 Featured Case ORDER: I have determined that the protection of the value of this private, proprietary and commercially sensitive information to its owners clearly outweighs any countervailing public interest in its disclosure to the general public and to competitors, and justifies its redaction, together with personally identifiable matter such as addresses, telephone and account numbers, family and personal affairs and similar information, from material publicly filed and disclosed. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/15/2010) (tro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2010: # 1 Main Document) (ae).
April 15, 2010 243 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Certain Unsealed Exhibits to Declaration of William M. Hohengarten in Support of Viacom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 52 - Pt. 1, # 2 Exhibit 52 - Pt. 2, # 3 Exhibit 59, # 4 Exhibit 60, # 5 Exhibit 63, # 6 Exhibit 81, # 7 Exhibit 242, # 8 Exhibit 314, # 9 Exhibit 321, # 10 Exhibit 340)(Kohlmann, Susan)
April 14, 2010 242 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re: 237 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
April 12, 2010 241 Featured Case DECLARATION of Edward Hernstadt in Support re: 237 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by American Library Association, et al.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 12, 2010 240 Featured Case BRIEF of Amici Curiae. Document filed by American Library Association, et al..(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 12, 2010 239 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Library Association, et al..(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 12, 2010 238 Featured Case DECLARATION of Fred Von Lohman in Support re: 237 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by American Library Association, et al.. (Hernstadt, Edward)
April 12, 2010 237 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by American Library Association, et al..(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 12, 2010 236 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Edward Hernstadt on behalf of American Library Association, et al..(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 12, 2010 235 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Hernstadt on behalf of American Library Association, et al. (Hernstadt, Edward)
March 31, 2010 232 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis Stanton from Susan J. Kohlman dated 3/29/2010 re: The parties respectfully request that the Court grant a one week extension to the deadlines set forth in Paragraphs 4 and 6 of the Court's order, such that the parties would have until April 8 to "submit unresolved matters to the Court," and would have until April 11 to "submit proposed findings of fact" regarding items on which there is agreement. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/30/2010) (tve)
March 26, 2010 234 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: An identical copy of the original forensic images of each of Robert Tur's computers or devices captured by Iris Data Services, LLC, will be provided to a New York office of FTI Consulting, Inc. by the latter of 5pm ET on December 4, 2009 or within 2 business days after the parties submit to the Court a fully executed Stipulation to be so ordered. FTI agrees to execute and be bound by the Protective Order entered in the action. The parties agree to cooperate to use their best efforts to present this stipulation for prompt so-ordering by the Court, including trying to arrange a time with Chambers for presenting and so-ordering same; and notwithstanding the above, if the Court refuses to so order the stipulation, FTI shall immediately return the Forensic Images to Iris. FTI shall do nothing but maintain such Forensic Images in its possession, in strict confidence and in a highly secure location, and shall not review, access, copy, image, investigate, analyze, transfer, or forward the Forensic Images or permit any other person or entity to do so, until either (a) the undersigned counsel of record and special counsel for Mr. Tur have executed a written agreement concerning any constraints posed by any alleged privilege, immunity, confidentiality, privacy, or other protection of the Forensic Images as further set forth in this Order....The provision of the Forensic Images to FTI provided for in paragraph 1 above shall not to any extent waive or prejudice any Protection claimed to be due by or to the Forensic Images or by or to Mr. Tur or any other person or entity. Mr. Tur shall be entitled to designate material or information, or any analyses or results thereof, as Highly confidential under the terms of the Protective Order. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #152 and unsealed on 3/26/2010 by document #199 in 07-cv-3582) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/14/09) (tro)
March 26, 2010 233 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER....regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (This document was previously sealed in envelope #149 and unsealed on 3/26/2010 by document #199 in 07-cv-3582) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/16/09) (tro)
March 25, 2010 231 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
March 24, 2010 230 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Susan J. Kohlmann dated 3/23/2010 re: Counsel respectfully request that Your Honor permit Viacom to file the above-listed corrected materials. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/24/2010) (jfe)
March 23, 2010 229 Featured Case ORDER, the Clerk of the Court is directed to strike docket entries 204, 205, and 206 from the record, including attached PDF files. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/22/10) (cd)
March 19, 2010 228 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Rubin Part 3 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Rubin Declaration Part 3, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Rubin Declaration Part 3)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 19, 2010 227 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Rubin Part 2 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Rubin Declaration Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Rubin Declaration Part 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Rubin Declaration Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Rubin Declaration Part 2)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 19, 2010 226 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Rubin in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-17 to Rubin Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 18 to Rubin Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 19-27 to Rubin Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 28-36 to Rubin Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 37-48 to Rubin Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 49-59 to Rubin Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 60-67 to Rubin Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 225 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Thirteen) Ex. 353 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 354, # 2 Exhibit 355, # 3 Exhibit 356, # 4 Exhibit 357, # 5 Exhibit 358, # 6 Exhibit 359, # 7 Exhibit 360, # 8 Exhibit 361, # 9 Exhibit 362, # 10 Exhibit 363, # 11 Exhibit 364, # 12 Exhibit 365, # 13 Exhibit 366, # 14 Exhibit 367, # 15 Exhibit 368, # 16 Exhibit 369, # 17 Exhibit 370, # 18 Exhibit 371, # 19 Exhibit 372, # 20 Exhibit 373, # 21 Exhibit 374, # 22 Exhibit 375, # 23 Exhibit 376, # 24 Exhibit 377, # 25 Exhibit 378, # 26 Exhibit 379, # 27 Exhibit 380, # 28 Exhibit 381, # 29 Exhibit 382, # 30 Exhibit 383, # 31 Exhibit 384, # 32 Exhibit 385, # 33 Exhibit 386, # 34 Exhibit 387, # 35 Exhibit 388)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 224 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Twelve) Ex. 329 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 330, # 2 Exhibit 331, # 3 Exhibit 332, # 4 Exhibit 333, # 5 Exhibit 334, # 6 Exhibit 335, # 7 Exhibit 336, # 8 Exhibit 337, # 9 Exhibit 338, # 10 Exhibit 339, # 11 Exhibit 340, # 12 Exhibit 341, # 13 Exhibit 342, # 14 Exhibit 343, # 15 Exhibit 344, # 16 Exhibit 345, # 17 Exhibit 346, # 18 Exhibit 347, # 19 Exhibit 348, # 20 Exhibit 349, # 21 Exhibit 350, # 22 Exhibit 351, # 23 Exhibit 352)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 223 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 9 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 297-299 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 300-302 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 303 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 304-306 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 307-310 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 311-314 to Schapiro Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 315-386 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 222 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Eleven) Ex. 299 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 300, # 2 Exhibit 301, # 3 Exhibit 302, # 4 Exhibit 303 - Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 303 - Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 303 - Part 3, # 7 Exhibit 303 - Part 4, # 8 Exhibit 303 - Part 5, # 9 Exhibit 304, # 10 Exhibit 305, # 11 Exhibit 306, # 12 Exhibit 307, # 13 Exhibit 308, # 14 Exhibit 309, # 15 Exhibit 310, # 16 Exhibit 311, # 17 Exhibit 312, # 18 Exhibit 313, # 19 Exhibit 314, # 20 Exhibit 315, # 21 Exhibit 316, # 22 Exhibit 317, # 23 Exhibit 318, # 24 Exhibit 319, # 25 Exhibit 320, # 26 Exhibit 321, # 27 Exhibit 322, # 28 Exhibit 323, # 29 Exhibit 324, # 30 Exhibit 325, # 31 Exhibit 326, # 32 Exhibit 327, # 33 Exhibit 328)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 221 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 8 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 279 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 280-281 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 282-283 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 284-286 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 287-290 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 291-294 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 220 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 7 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 262-264 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 265-268 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 269-271 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 272-273 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 274-275 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 276-277 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 219 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Nine) Ex. 287 - Part 3 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 287 - Part 4, # 2 Exhibit 287 - Part 5, # 3 Exhibit 287 - Part 6, # 4 Exhibit 287 - Part 8, # 5 Exhibit 287 - Part 8, # 6 Exhibit 288, # 7 Exhibit 289, # 8 Exhibit 290, # 9 Exhibit 291, # 10 Exhibit 292, # 11 Exhibit 293, # 12 Exhibit 294, # 13 Exhibit 295, # 14 Exhibit 296, # 15 Exhibit 297, # 16 Exhibit 298)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 218 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 6 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 238-241 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 242-246 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 247-250 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 251-254 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 255 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 256-258 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 217 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Nine) Ex. 248 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 249, # 2 Exhibit 250, # 3 Exhibit 251, # 4 Exhibit 252, # 5 Exhibit 253, # 6 Exhibit 254, # 7 Exhibit 255, # 8 Exhibit 256, # 9 Exhibit 257, # 10 Exhibit 258, # 11 Exhibit 259, # 12 Exhibit 260, # 13 Exhibit 261, # 14 Exhibit 262, # 15 Exhibit 263, # 16 Exhibit 264, # 17 Exhibit 265, # 18 Exhibit 266, # 19 Exhibit 267, # 20 Exhibit 268, # 21 Exhibit 269, # 22 Exhibit 270, # 23 Exhibit 271, # 24 Exhibit 272, # 25 Exhibit 273, # 26 Exhibit 274, # 27 Exhibit 275, # 28 Exhibit 276, # 29 Exhibit 277, # 30 Exhibit 278, # 31 Exhibit 279, # 32 Exhibit 280, # 33 Exhibit 281, # 34 Exhibit 282, # 35 Exhibit 283, # 36 Exhibit 284, # 37 Exhibit 285, # 38 Exhibit 286, # 39 Exhibit 287 - Part 1, # 40 Exhibit 287 - Part 2)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 216 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 5 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 218-220 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 221-223 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 224-227 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 228 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 229-231 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 232-234 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 215 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 4 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 161-170 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 171-177 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 178 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 179 Part1 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 179 Part 2 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 180-210 to Schapiro Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 211-212 to Schapiro Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 213-215 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 214 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Eight) Ex. 160 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 161, # 2 Exhibit 162, # 3 Exhibit 163, # 4 Exhibit 164, # 5 Exhibit 165, # 6 Errata 166, # 7 Exhibit 167, # 8 Exhibit 168, # 9 Exhibit 169, # 10 Exhibit 170, # 11 Exhibit 171, # 12 Exhibit 172, # 13 Exhibit 173, # 14 Exhibit 174, # 15 Exhibit 175, # 16 Exhibit 176, # 17 Exhibit 177, # 18 Exhibit 178, # 19 Exhibit 179, # 20 Exhibit 180, # 21 Exhibit 181, # 22 Exhibit 182, # 23 Exhibit 183, # 24 Exhibit 184, # 25 Exhibit 185, # 26 Exhibit 186, # 27 Exhibit 187, # 28 Exhibit 188, # 29 Exhibit 189, # 30 Exhibit 190, # 31 Exhibit 191, # 32 Exhibit 192, # 33 Exhibit 193, # 34 Exhibit 194, # 35 Exhibit 195, # 36 Exhibit 196, # 37 Exhibit 197, # 38 Exhibit 198, # 39 Exhibit 199, # 40 Exhibit 200, # 41 Exhibit 201, # 42 Exhibit 202, # 43 Exhibit 203, # 44 Exhibit 204, # 45 Exhibit 205, # 46 Exhibit 206, # 47 Exhibit 207, # 48 Exhibit 208, # 49 Exhibit 209, # 50 Exhibit 210, # 51 Exhibit 211, # 52 Exhibit 212, # 53 Exhibit 213, # 54 Exhibit 214, # 55 Exhibit 215, # 56 Exhibit 216, # 57 Exhibit 217, # 58 Exhibit 218, # 59 Exhibit 219, # 60 Exhibit 220, # 61 Exhibit 221, # 62 Exhibit 222, # 63 Exhibit 223, # 64 Exhibit 224, # 65 Exhibit 225, # 66 Exhibit 226, # 67 Exhibit 227, # 68 Exhibit 228, # 69 Exhibit 229, # 70 Exhibit 230, # 71 Exhibit 231, # 72 Exhibit 232, # 73 Exhibit 233, # 74 Exhibit 234, # 75 Exhibit 235, # 76 Exhibit 236, # 77 Exhibit 237, # 78 Exhibit 238, # 79 Exhibit 239, # 80 Exhibit 240, # 81 Exhibit 241, # 82 Exhibit 242, # 83 Exhibit 243, # 84 Exhibit 244, # 85 Exhibit 245, # 86 Exhibit 246, # 87 Exhibit 247)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 213 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 3 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 92-102 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 103-114 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 115-129 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 130-139 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 140-145 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 212 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Seven) Ex. 134 - Part 5 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 134 - Part 6, # 2 Exhibit 134 - Part 7, # 3 Exhibit 134 - Part 8, # 4 Exhibit 134 - Part 9, # 5 Exhibit 134 - Part 10, # 6 Exhibit 134 - Part 11, # 7 Exhibit 135, # 8 Exhibit 136, # 9 Exhibit 137, # 10 Exhibit 138, # 11 Exhibit 139, # 12 Exhibit 140, # 13 Exhibit 141, # 14 Exhibit 142, # 15 Exhibit 143, # 16 Exhibit 144, # 17 Exhibit 145 - Part 1, # 18 Exhibit 145 - Part 2, # 19 Exhibit 145 - Part 3, # 20 Exhibit 145 - Part 4, # 21 Exhibit 145 - Part 5, # 22 Exhibit 146, # 23 Exhibit 147, # 24 Exhibit 148, # 25 Exhibit 149, # 26 Exhibit 150, # 27 Exhibit 151, # 28 Exhibit 152, # 29 Exhibit 153, # 30 Exhibit 154, # 31 Exhibit 155, # 32 Exhibit 156, # 33 Exhibit 157, # 34 Exhibit 158, # 35 Exhibit 159)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 211 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 2 in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 36 Part 2 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 37-42 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 43-56 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 57-68 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 69-81 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 82-84 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 210 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Six) Ex. 112 - Part 1 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 112 - Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 112 - Part 3, # 3 Exhibit 112 - Part 4, # 4 Exhibit 113, # 5 Exhibit 114, # 6 Exhibit 115, # 7 Exhibit 116, # 8 Exhibit 117, # 9 Exhibit 118, # 10 Exhibit 119, # 11 Exhibit 120, # 12 Exhibit 121, # 13 Exhibit 122, # 14 Exhibit 123, # 15 Exhibit 124, # 16 Exhibit 125, # 17 Exhibit 126, # 18 Exhibit 127, # 19 Exhibit 128, # 20 Exhibit 129, # 21 Exhibit 130, # 22 Exhibit 131, # 23 Exhibit 132, # 24 Exhibit 133, # 25 Exhibit 134 - Part 1, # 26 Exhibit 134 - Part 2, # 27 Exhibit 134 - Part 3, # 28 Exhibit 134 - Part 4)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 209 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Five) Ex. 105 - Part 1 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 105 - Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 105 - Part 3, # 3 Exhibit 105 - Part 4, # 4 Exhibit 105 - Part 5, # 5 Exhibit 105 - Part 6, # 6 Exhibit 105 - Part 7, # 7 Exhibit 105 - Part 8, # 8 Exhibit 105 - Part 9, # 9 Exhibit 106, # 10 Exhibit 107, # 11 Exhibit 108, # 12 Exhibit 109, # 13 Exhibit 110, # 14 Exhibit 111)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 208 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Four) Ex. 42 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 43, # 2 Exhibit 44, # 3 Exhibit 45, # 4 Exhibit 46, # 5 Exhibit 47, # 6 Exhibit 48, # 7 Exhibit 49, # 8 Exhibit 50, # 9 Exhibit 51 - Part 1, # 10 Exhibit 51 - Part 2, # 11 Exhibit 51 - Part 3, # 12 Exhibit 51 - Part 4, # 13 Exhibit 51 - Part 5, # 14 Exhibit 52, # 15 Exhibit 53, # 16 Exhibit 54, # 17 Exhibit 55, # 18 Exhibit 56, # 19 Exhibit 57, # 20 Exhibit 58, # 21 Exhibit 59, # 22 Exhibit 60, # 23 Exhibit 61, # 24 Exhibit 62, # 25 Exhibit 63, # 26 Exhibit 64, # 27 Exhibit 65, # 28 Exhibit 66, # 29 Exhibit 67, # 30 Exhibit 68, # 31 Exhibit 69, # 32 Exhibit 70, # 33 Exhibit 71, # 34 Exhibit 72, # 35 Exhibit 73, # 36 Exhibit 74, # 37 Exhibit 75, # 38 Exhibit 76, # 39 Exhibit 77, # 40 Exhibit 78, # 41 Exhibit 79, # 42 Exhibit 80, # 43 Exhibit 81, # 44 Exhibit 82, # 45 Exhibit 83, # 46 Exhibit 84, # 47 Exhibit 85, # 48 Exhibit 86, # 49 Exhibit 87, # 50 Exhibit 88, # 51 Exhibit 89, # 52 Exhibit 90, # 53 Exhibit 91, # 54 Exhibit 92, # 55 Exhibit 93, # 56 Exhibit 94, # 57 Exhibit 95, # 58 Exhibit 96, # 59 Exhibit 97, # 60 Exhibit 98, # 61 Exhibit 99, # 62 Exhibit 100, # 63 Exhibit 101, # 64 Exhibit 102, # 65 Exhibit 103, # 66 Exhibit 104)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 207 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 11-12 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 13 Part 1 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 13 Part 2 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 14-20 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 21-26 to Schapiro Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 27 to 35 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 203 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Solomon in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 202 Featured Case DECLARATION of Suzanne Reider in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 201 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Three) Exhibit 12 - Part 15 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12 - Part 16, # 2 Exhibit 12 - Part 17, # 3 Exhibit 12 - Part 18, # 4 Exhibit 12 - Part 19, # 5 Exhibit 12 - Part 20, # 6 Exhibit 13, # 7 Exhibit 14, # 8 Exhibit 15, # 9 Exhibit 16, # 10 Exhibit 17, # 11 Exhibit 18, # 12 Exhibit 19, # 13 Exhibit 20, # 14 Exhibit 21, # 15 Exhibit 22, # 16 Exhibit 23, # 17 Exhibit 24, # 18 Exhibit 25, # 19 Exhibit 26, # 20 Exhibit 27, # 21 Exhibit 28, # 22 Exhibit 29, # 23 Exhibit 30, # 24 Exhibit 31, # 25 Exhibit 32, # 26 Exhibit 33, # 27 Exhibit 34, # 28 Exhibit 35, # 29 Exhibit 36, # 30 Exhibit 37, # 31 Exhibit 38, # 32 Exhibit 39, # 33 Exhibit 40, # 34 Exhibit 41)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 200 Featured Case DECLARATION of Zahavah Levine in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Levine Declaration Part 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 199 Featured Case DECLARATION of Hunter Walk in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 198 Featured Case DECLARATION of David King in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 197 Featured Case DECLARATION of Christopher Maxcy in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 196 Featured Case DECLARATION of Micah Schaffer in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Schaffer Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 195 Featured Case DECLARATION of Chad Hurley in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Hurley Declaration Part 1, # 2 Exhibit to Hurley Declaration Part 2)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 194 Featured Case DECLARATION of Roelof Botha in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 193 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part Two) Exhibit 12 - Part 5 in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12 - Part 6, # 2 Exhibit 12 - Part 7, # 3 Exhibit 12 - Part 8, # 4 Exhibit 12 - Part 9, # 5 Exhibit 12 - Part 10, # 6 Exhibit 12 - Part 11, # 7 Exhibit 12 - Part 12, # 8 Exhibit 12 - Part 13, # 9 Exhibit 12 - Part 14)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 192 Featured Case DECLARATION of Arthur Chan in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 191 Featured Case DECLARATION of William M. Hohengarten (Part One) in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 2 - Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12 - Part 1, # 16 Exhibit 12 - Part 2, # 17 Exhibit 12 - Part 3, # 18 Exhibit 12 - Part 4)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 190 Featured Case DECLARATION of Daniel Ostrow in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 189 Featured Case RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 188 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 177 MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 187 Featured Case RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 186 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 176 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Kohlmann, Susan)
March 18, 2010 185 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record, for the parties hereto, that the unsealing of the materials relating to the parties' summary judgment motions in the above referenced actions shall be implemented as follows: 1. To the extent practicable and with the express exception of exhibits in a format that cannot be filed via ECF and overly voluminous exhibits (e.g., large Excel spreadsheets), the parties intend to file all materials related to the parties' summary judgment motions via simultaneous ECF submissions on Thursday, March 18, 2010 at 1pm EDT with those portions of the materials the parties contend should remain under seal redacted; 2. To the extent any ECF "filing event" that occurs pursuant to Paragraph 1 would exceed 15MB, the parties will, unless they are unable to, break it into subparts with subsequent parts clearly identified. Those materials shall remain on the ECF system to allow continued public access. 3. So as to further facilitate public access to the parties' summary judgment submissions, the parties shall also file a complete set of all materials related to the parties' summary judgment motions, with those portions of the materials the parties contend should remain under seal redacted, manually with the Clerk of the Court in hard copy to the extent possible and CD/DVD as necessary, promptly after this Stipulation and Order is so-ordered by the Court, but in no event earlier than the filing in Paragraph 1; 4. The original materials filed under seal in connection with the parties' summary judgment motions shall remain under seal unless the Clerk of the Court is otherwise directed by the Court. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/18/2010) (tro)
March 17, 2010 184 Featured Case ORDER granting 170 Motion for Matthew S. Hellman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/16/2010) (js)
March 16, 2010 183 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
March 12, 2010 182 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
March 10, 2010 181 Featured Case NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF SPECIFIED CLIPS WITH PREJUDICE, that pursuant to the Court's Order of December 18, 2009, which provides that "Plaintiffs may withdraw 'accused clips' by notice of their dismissal with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), which I will 'So Order," and which further provides that "Partial judgment in defendants' favor on those claims will not be entered, lest it give an appearance of having an effect beyond that accorded by Rule 54(b)," the plaintiffs in the above-captioned action ("Viacom") hereby provide notice of the dismissal with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) of the video clips listed on the attached Schedules A and B. Viacom respectfully requests that the Court "So Order" this notice of dismissal. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/10/10) (pl) Modified on 3/10/2010 (pl).
March 8, 2010 179 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT: 1. The parties' briefs and evidentiary materials relatedto the parties' summary judgment motions shall be filed under seal; 2. Within 10 days of filing, each party shall identify to its adversary the portions of the filings which it claims should be kept redacted. Objections to the unsealing of portions not thus identified are waived, and they shall promptly be unsealed; 3. Within the following week, the parties shall meet andconfer with respect to contested items; 4. Within the week following those meetings, the parties shall submit unresolved matters to the Court; 5. The Court will either rule on the contested items, or set a date when the parties can be heard on specific items; and 6. With respect to each item which the parties agree should be redacted, they (jointly or singly) shall within thenext following 10 days submit proposed findings of fact, narrowly tailored to the item, justifying its redaction. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/5/10) (db)
March 8, 2010 178 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Stuart J. Baskin dated 3/3/10 re: summary judgment motions. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(db)
March 5, 2010 180 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
March 5, 2010 177 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Applicability of the DMCA and on Plaintiffs' Inducement Claims. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc..(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 5, 2010 176 Featured Case MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment /Viacom's Notice of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability and Inapplicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act Safe Harbor Defense. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Affirmation of Service)(Kohlmann, Susan)
March 5, 2010 175 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 3/3/2010 re: We submit this letter in response to Viacom's March 1, 2010 letter proposing a timetable and procedure for unsealing materials and documents related to the upcoming motions for summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket and place this document in the public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/5/2010) (jpo)
March 5, 2010 174 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Stuart J. Baskin dated 3/1/2010 re: Requesting that the Court "so order" Viacom's proposal for promptly unsealing the judicial record as it is placed before the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Please docket and place this document in the public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/5/2010) (jpo)
March 5, 2010 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 170 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 03/01/2010, Receipt Number 895628. (jd)
March 5, 2010 173 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
March 4, 2010 172 Featured Case STIPULATION VIACOM PLAINTIFFS' AND YOUTUBE'S JOINT STIPULATION SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AGREED by counsel for the above'named parties that the parties' summary judgment motions shall be briefed in accordance with the following schedule and additional understanding as set forth in this order. SO Ordered. ( Motions due by 3/5/2010., Replies due by 6/4/2010., Responses due by 4/30/2010) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/4/2010) (jmi)
March 4, 2010 Featured Case ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 172 Stipulation and Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jmi)
March 4, 2010 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Telephone Conference held on 3/4/2010. (mro)
March 4, 2010 Featured Case Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 3/5/2010. Replies due by 6/4/2010. Responses due by 4/30/2010 (jpo)
March 4, 2010 171 Featured Case VIACOM PLAINTIFFS' AND YOUTUBE'S JOINT STIPULATION SUMMARY JUDGMENT: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that the parties' summary judgment motions shall be briefed in accordance with the following schedule and additional understandings, as set forth in this stipulation. Moving briefs shall be filed on or before March 5, 2010. Opposition briefs shall be filed on Or before April 30, 2010. Reply briefs shall be filed on or before June 4, 2010 and as further set forth in this stipulation. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/4/2010) (jpo)
March 1, 2010 170 Featured Case MOTION for Matthew S. Hellman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Viacom International, Inc., et al. (mro)
January 7, 2010 169 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 12/28/2009 re: Counsel writes in response to Plaintiffs' 12/21/209 pre-motion letter in the issue of summary judgment motions in the cases set forth within. ENDORSEMENT: In this case, no pre-motion conference will be required. Each side may move for summary judgment, on a schedule for briefs to be agreed by counsel and approved by the Court. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/30/2009) (jfe)
January 7, 2010 168 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Stuart J. Baskin dated 12/30/2009 re: Counsel encloses a redacted version of Plaintiffs' December 21, 2009 letter requesting a premotion conference in advance of filing or alternatively seeking permission to file a motion for summary judgment on Defendants' liability for copyright infringement and applicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act (DMCA). ENDORSEMENT: To the Clerk of the Court: Please docket and place this document in the public file. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/30/2009) (jfe)
January 7, 2010 167 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Stuart J. Baskin dated 12/21/2009 re: Plaintiff Viacom International Inc., et al., respectfully request a premotion conference in advance of filing or alternatively seek permission to file a motion for summary judgment on Defendants' liability for copy right infringement and applicability of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act. ENDORSEMENT: To the Clerk of the Court: Please docket and place this document in the public file. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/30/2009) (jfe)
December 30, 2009 166 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 12/21/2009 re: Requesting that the Court order Stone and Parker to produce all responsive documents by December 31, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/28/2009) (jpo)
December 22, 2009 165 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Susan J. Kohlmann dated 11/25/09 re: Plaintiffs Viacom International Inc. et al. ("Viacom") write in response to Defendants' November 20, 2009, letter to this Court, in which Defendants request a conference to address Viacom's withdrawal of roughly 250 "accused clips" from its prior responses to Defendants' discovery requests for identification of works in suit. ENDORSEMENT: To the Clerk of the Court: Please docket and place this document in the public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/21/09) (rjm)
December 22, 2009 164 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 11/20/09 re: On behalf of Defendants ("YouTube"), we write to request a Court conference to address Viacom's recent attempt to unilaterally make material changes to its list of works in suit and alleged infringements. ENDORSEMENT: To the Clerk of the Court: Please docket and place this document in the public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/21/09) (rjm)
December 22, 2009 163 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 12/1/09 re: On behalf of Defendants ("YouTube"), we write in reply to Viacom's November 25, 2009 letter concerning Viacom's recent effort to withdraw infringement claims in this case. ENDORSEMENT: To the Clerk of the Court: Please docket and place this document in the public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/21/09) (rjm)
December 21, 2009 162 Featured Case ORDER: Plaintiffs may withdraw "accused clips" by notice of their dismissal with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a) (2), which I will "So Order." Partial judgment in defendants' favor on those claims will not be entered, lest it give an appearance of having an effect beyond that accorded by Rule 54(b). (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/18/2009) (jpo)
December 8, 2009 161 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/13/2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (tve)
December 8, 2009 160 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/16/2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (tve)
November 16, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Discovery Hearing held on 11/16/2009. (mro)
November 13, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Hearing re: protective order held on 11/13/2009. (mro)
November 12, 2009 157 Featured Case STIPULATION & ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN OF DEFENDANTS' COMMON INTEREST PRIVILEGE ASSERTIONS. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record, for the parties hereto, to the following terms: Defendants agree to produce documents described on the July 27 Privilege Log without redaction within 14 days of the execution of this stipulation. Unless Defendants expressly indicate to the contrary, the production of documents pursuant to this Paragraph is not an indication that Defendants have withdrawn their initial claims of privilege, although Defendants agree that they will no longer assert such a claim with respect to these documents... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this STIPULATION & ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN OF DEFENDANTS' COMMON INTEREST PRIVILEGE ASSERTIONS. Relates to 07-2103, 07-3582. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/10/09) (rjm)
November 10, 2009 159 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on October 23, 2009 at 11:35 am before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (rdz)
November 10, 2009 158 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on October 23, 2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (mro)
November 5, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Telephone Conference held regarding discovery question on 11/5/2009. (mro)
October 28, 2009 156 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/9/09 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ldi)
October 23, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Discovery Hearing held on 10/23/2009. (mro)
October 16, 2009 155 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on October 9, 2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (mro)
October 9, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/9/2009. (mro)
October 5, 2009 154 Featured Case ORDER that, consistent with Paragraph 1 of the July 7, 2009 Stipulation, the Viacom Plaintiffs will produce all MSO Agreement Materials in their possession, custody or control, related to the following multiple system cable operators and satellite television providers by no later than October 15, 2009: Time Warner Cable, Inc. and Verizon Communications Inc. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/5/2009) (jmi)
September 14, 2009 153 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW MELISSA A. COX FOR VIACOM INTERNATIONAL INC., ET AL. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/14/09) (dle)
September 11, 2009 152 Featured Case MOTION for Melissa A. Cox to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(Kohlmann, Susan)
August 28, 2009 151 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
August 25, 2009 150 Featured Case STIPULATION & ORDER REGARDING VIACOM'S COPYRIGHT MONITORING PRIVILEGE ASSERTIONS: The terms set forth herein shall govern the stipulated relief to be entered by the Court concerning the July 27 motion. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/24/09) (dle)
August 18, 2009 149 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Kristen Nelson Cunha dated 8/14/2009 re: Requesting a further extension of the briefing schedule such that: Plaintiffs' answering brief would be due on August 18, 2009 and Defendants' reply would be due on August 26, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/17/2009) (jpo)
August 7, 2009 147 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF JENNER & BLOCK LLP FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW DONALD B. VERRILLI, JR., STEVEN B. FABRIZIO, AND PETER H. HANNA AS COUNSEL re: 132 Motion. Upon the motion of Jenner & Block LLP, and there being no opposition, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Steven B. Fabrizio, and Peter H. Hanna are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiffs in the above-captioned action. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/7/09) (tro)
August 7, 2009 146 Featured Case ORDER granting 140 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Upon the motion of Jenner & Block, LLP, Amy L. Tenney is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs in this action. Attorney Amy L. Tenney terminated.(Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/7/09) (tro)
August 7, 2009 144 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Kirsten Nelson Cunha dated 8/6/09 re: Counsel write concerning Defendants' Motion to Compel that was filed on 7/27/09. The parties have agreed to request to an extension of the briefing scheduled as follows: Plaintiffs' answering brief would be due on 8/14/09, and Defendants' reply would be due on 8/24/09. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/6/09) (tro)
August 6, 2009 145 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/28/09 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (pl)
August 5, 2009 148 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/17/09 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (pl)
July 30, 2009 143 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
July 28, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/28/2009. (tro)
July 27, 2009 142 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
July 17, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Pre-Motion Conference held on 7/17/2009. (tro)
July 7, 2009 141 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGE LOGS. The following preocedures shall apply to the creation and production of privilege logs in these actions. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/7/09) (djc)
June 12, 2009 140 Featured Case MOTION for Amy L. Tenney to Withdraw as Attorney / Motion for Leave to Withdraw Amy L. Tenney as Counsel for Viacom International Inc., et al.. Document filed by Viacom International, Inc..(Kohlmann, Susan)
April 29, 2009 139 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING JUNE 23, 2008 order and VIACOM'S DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/29/09) (djc)
April 23, 2009 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 136 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 04/01/2009, Receipt Number 683076. (jd)
April 20, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 138 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jpo)
April 20, 2009 138 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 136 Motion for Eric R. Haren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/20/2009) (jpo)
April 15, 2009 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/2/2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (jmi)
April 15, 2009 137 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 4/15/2009 re: Counsel for defendant You Tube writes requesting that the Court confirm that the 225 hours allotted to YouTube for depositions of the "Collective Plaintiff" applies only to depositions of Viacom, Premier Lounge, and Bourne; that the depositions of the 15 plaintiffs added to this case after the Rule 16(b) Order was entered are not included within the 225 hours allotted to YouTube for depositions of the "Collective Plaintiffs"; and that the parties should negotiate in good faith towards an allocation of remaining hours for depositions of the latter-added plaintiffs, on the basis of whatever is realistically needed. ENDORSEMENT: That is correct. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/15/2009) (tve)
April 2, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Discovery Hearing held and concluded on 4/2/2009. (mro)
April 1, 2009 136 Featured Case MOTION for Eric Haren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(dle)
March 25, 2009 135 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ENDORSEMENT: It is ORDERED that her instant pro se request by letter dated 3/19/09 for another review of the Order denying her pro se motion to intervene in this action is denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/25/09) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (tro)
February 20, 2009 134 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 133 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: Treating Ms. Lucas-Harrow's letter dated January 20, 2009 as a pro se motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 to join both herself and the United States Department of Justice ("DOJ") as necessary and indispensable parties in these related actions alleging violations of the Copyright Act of 1976 on the YouTube website, the motion is denied. Ms. Lucas-Morrow' s pro se application for leave to move to join herself and the DOJ as parties in these cases is denied. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/19/2009) (tve)
February 20, 2009 133 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow dated 1/20/2009 re: Pro Se Movant writes seeking the Court's permission to submit a motion to join both the United Department of Justice ("DOJ") and Movant as indispensable parties under Federal Rule 19 in the above captioned related actions. (tve)
February 12, 2009 132 Featured Case MOTION For Leave To Withdraw Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Steven B. Fabrizio, And Peter H. Hanna As Counsel For Viacom International Inc., Et al. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hohengarten, William)
November 25, 2008 130 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/14/08 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ama)
November 14, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Status Conference held on 11/14/2008. (mro)
October 16, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Telephone Conference held on 10/16/2008. Ruled on discovery issue. (tro)
October 10, 2008 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 129 Endorsed Letter to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (cd)
October 10, 2008 129 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis Stanton from Susan Kohlmann dated 10/7/08 re: Request to remove Adam F. Watkins as attorney for plaintiffs and to add Sarah A. Maguire on behalf of plaintiffs. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/10/08) (cd)
October 2, 2008 128 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/12/2008 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (jn)
September 26, 2008 127 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sharmila Sohoni on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. New Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 919 Third Avenue, 37th Floor, New York, New York, United States 10022, 212-891-1674. (Sohoni, Sharmila)
September 18, 2008 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 126 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mme)
September 18, 2008 126 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 125 Motion for Melissa A. Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/18/08) (mme)
September 12, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 9/12/2008. (js)
September 5, 2008 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 124 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 8/26/08, Receipt Number 661583. (Quintero, Marcos)
August 26, 2008 125 Featured Case MOTION for Melissa A. Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(dle)
August 15, 2008 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 124 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jfe)
August 12, 2008 124 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting 122 Motion for James C. Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/11/2008) (jfe) Modified on 8/20/2008 (rw).
August 12, 2008 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 123 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (cd)
August 12, 2008 123 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 121 Motion for Sarah A. Maguire to Appear Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs Viacom International etal. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/11/08) (cd)
July 28, 2008 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 122 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 121 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 7/18/08, Receipt Number 657128. (Quintero, Marcos)
July 18, 2008 122 Featured Case MOTION for James C. Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice; w/ attch. Affidavit in support. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(pl) (rw).
July 18, 2008 121 Featured Case MOTION for Sarah A. Maquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. w/ attch. Affidavit in support. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC.(pl)
July 17, 2008 120 Featured Case STIPULATION REGARDING 7/1/08 OPINION AND ORDER, with respect to Section 4 of the Court's Opinion and Order dated 7/1/08, in light of certain user privacy concerns which have been raised. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/17/08) (cd)
July 7, 2008 119 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: The Viacom plaintiffs and defendants have agreed to settle their differences with respect to such possible disqualification by means of an appropriate screen to avoid any leakage of the previously disclosed highly confidential information pertaining to Google's business, as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/7/2007) (jpo)
July 7, 2008 118 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/23/08 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ama)
July 2, 2008 117 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER #96195: For the reasons set forth in this Order; (1) The cross-motion for a protective order barring disclosure of the source code for the YouTube.com search function is granted, and the motion to compel production of that search code is denied; (2) The motion to compel production of the source code for the Video ID program is denied; (3) The motion to compel production of all removed videos is granted; (4) The motion to compel production of all data from the Logging database concerning each time a YouTube video has been viewed on the YouTube website or through embedding on a third-party website is granted; (5) the motion to compel production of those data fields which defendants have agreed to produce for the works-in-suit, for all videos that have been posted to the YouTube website is denied; (6) The motion to compel production of the schema for the Google Video Advertising database is denied; (7) The motion to compel production of the schema for the Google Video Content database is granted; and (8) The motion to compel production of the private videos and data related to them is denied at this time except to the extent it seeks production of the specified non-content data about such videos. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/1/2008) (tve) Modified on 7/2/2008 (mr).
June 24, 2008 116 Featured Case ORDER; that the issues presented in defendants' motion to Compel dated 2/8/08 are disposed of by the rulings stated upon the record in open court today. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/08) (pl)
June 23, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Pretrial Conference held on 6/23/2008. Next conference set for 9/5/08 at 3:00 and 10/28/08 at 3:00. (jmi)
June 4, 2008 115 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Luke Cardillo Platzer on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. New Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC, USA 20001-4412, (202) 639-6094. (Platzer, Luke)
May 27, 2008 114 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Scottt Block Wilkens on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. New Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900, Washington, D.C., USA 20001, 202-639-6000. (Wilkens, Scottt)
May 27, 2008 113 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Amy L. Tenney on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. New Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900, Washington, D.C., USA 20001, 202-639-6000. (Tenney, Amy)
May 23, 2008 112 Featured Case ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc..(Mancini, A.)
May 22, 2008 111 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William M. Hohengarten on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. New Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC, USA 20001-4412, 202-639-6000. (Hohengarten, William)
May 22, 2008 110 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sharmila Sohoni on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. New Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC, USA 20001-4412, 202-639-6000. (Sohoni, Sharmila)
May 22, 2008 109 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Brian Desanctis on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. New Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC, USA 20001-4412, 202-639-6000. (Desanctis, Michael)
May 22, 2008 108 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Donald B. Verrilli, Jr on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. New Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 1099 New York Avenue, NW, Suite 900, Washington, DC, USA 20001-4412, 202-639-6000. (Verrilli, Donald)
May 15, 2008 107 Featured Case SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED PRETRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/14/08) (cd)
April 24, 2008 106 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaration and injunctive Relief and Damages and Demand for Jury Trial amending 1 Complaint, against Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC.(jmi) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2008: # 1 Exhibit) (dle).
April 10, 2008 105 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER, all Mayer Brown attorneys and other personnel who performed services in connection with Mayer Brown's prior engagement by Plaintiffs and their affiliates relating to document retention shall be screened from offensive document discovery directed at Viacom in the action titled Viacom Intl etal v. YouTube etal, and as further set forth in this document. This screen shall continue in place only until the conclusion of fact discovery. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/9/08) (cd)
April 2, 2008 103 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Susan J. Kohlmann dated 4/1/08 re: counsel writes on behalf of the Plaintiffs to respectfully request that the Court reconsider its order granting Defendants leave to file a surreply in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to compel. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/1/08) (djc)
April 2, 2008 102 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Susan J. Kohlman dated 4/1/2008 re: Requesting that the Court reconsider its order granting Defendants leave to file a surreply in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to compel. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/1/2008) (jpo)
March 31, 2008 101 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 3/28/2008 re: Requesting permission to file a sur-reply responding to the new material that Plaintiffs have presented. ENDORSEMENT: YouTube may file a sur-reply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/31/2008) (ae)
March 13, 2008 97 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/22/08 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ama)
March 10, 2008 96 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/25/08 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ama)
March 7, 2008 95 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER # 95808: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to amend the complaint to assert a punitive damages claim is denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/7/2008) (jpo) Modified on 3/12/2008 (rw).
March 6, 2008 94 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Brian Desanctis on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Desanctis, Michael)
February 29, 2008 90 Featured Case CROSS MOTION for Protective Order. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc..(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 22, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 2/22/2008. (pl)
February 15, 2008 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 89 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mr)
February 15, 2008 89 Featured Case ORDER granting 59 Motion for James J. Hartnett, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/15/08) (mr)
February 15, 2008 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 88 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mr)
February 15, 2008 88 Featured Case ORDER granting 86 Motion for John H. Hinderaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/15/08) (mr)
February 15, 2008 87 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 80 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Verrilli, Donald)
February 11, 2008 85 Featured Case MOTION to Compel. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(Verrilli, Donald)
February 11, 2008 83 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Opposition re: 80 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 11, 2008 82 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 80 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 8, 2008 81 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 80 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint ("Blackline"), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Verrilli, Donald)
February 8, 2008 80 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(Verrilli, Donald)
January 29, 2008 79 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Susan J. Kohlmann dated 1/18/08 re: the plaintiffs in both actions have agreed to submit a consolidated brief. The parties have agreed on a proposed briefing schedule as follows: Moving Briefs 2/8/08; Opposition Briefs 2/28/08 and Reply Briefs - 3/7/08. Endorsement: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/25/08) (pl)
January 28, 2008 Featured Case Transmission of USCA Mandate/Order to the District Judge re: 78 USCA Mandate,,. (nd)
January 28, 2008 78 Featured Case MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 47 Notice of Appeal filed by Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow USCA Case Number 07-3122-cv. Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and for remand to the district court. Upon due consideration, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED because it lacks an arguable basis in law or fact. See Neitzke v. Williams, 490 U.S. 319, 325 (1989); 28 U.S.C. 1915(e). Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 1/23/2008. (nd)
January 25, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 1/25/2008. (pl)
January 24, 2008 77 Featured Case AMENDED STIPULATED PRE-TRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER; regarding the procedures that will govern the handling of Confidential information. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/25/08) (pl)
January 24, 2008 76 Featured Case AMENDED STIPULATED PRE-TRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... The terms of the foregoing Stipulation are adopted and shall govern this action unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/24/2008) (jar)
January 10, 2008 75 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/26/07 before Judge Judge Louis L. Stanton. (jbe)
January 7, 2008 74 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS: The undersigned hereby stipulate and consent to the substitution of the law firm of Mayer Brown, LLP, by and through its attorneys, Richard Ben-Veniste, Andrew H. Schapiro, and A. John P. Mancini, as attorneys of record for Defendant YouTube, Inc, YouTube, LLC, and Google, Inc. in the above-captioned action in place and instead of the law firm of Barlitt Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott, LLP, and its attorneys, Philip S. Beck, Mark S. Ouweleen, Rebecca Weinstein Bacon, Shayna S. Cook, Carrie A. Jablonski and Alison G. Wheeler. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/7/08) (tro)
December 26, 2007 73 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by A. John P. Mancini on behalf of Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (Mancini, A.)
November 28, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 72 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 71 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
November 28, 2007 72 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 67 Motion for Leo Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Defendants in the above captioned matter. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/28/07) (tro)
November 28, 2007 71 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 69 Motion for Dylan J. Liddiard to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendants in the above-captioned case. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/28/07) (tro)
November 21, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 11/09/2007, Receipt Number 632339. (jd)
November 20, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 70 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jar)
November 20, 2007 70 Featured Case ORDER granting 65 Motion for Michael H. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/16/2007) (jar)
November 13, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 65 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/26/2007, Receipt Number 631287. (jd)
November 9, 2007 69 Featured Case MOTION for Dylan J. Liddiard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (jco)
November 9, 2007 68 Featured Case MOTION for Leo Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (jco)
November 9, 2007 67 Featured Case MOTION for Leo Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (jco)
November 9, 2007 66 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (djc)
October 26, 2007 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/26/2007. (jar)
October 26, 2007 65 Featured Case MOTION for Michael H. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (jco)
October 24, 2007 64 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Bernard Fabrizio on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Fabrizio, Steven)
October 10, 2007 63 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: that the parties will stipulate to that part of the ESI plan on which agreement can be reached by 10/5/2007; that the parties will then exchange letters, by 10/8/2007 at 5:00 PM, identifying any matters regarding the ESI plan that remain to be agreed upon and that the parties will continue to meet and confer on those remaining matters and that by 10/12/2007 at 5:00 PM, the parties will file an amended ESI plan to the extent that additional issues have been agreed upon, and will at the same time exchange letters setting out their respective positions with respect to any issues that remain to be agreed upon. No other dates in the Rule 16(b) scheduling order shall be changed or affected by this stipulation and order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/9/07) (kco)
September 27, 2007 62 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: It hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys for the respctive parties that the parties shall have until October 5, 2007 to stipulate to an ESI Plan. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/26/2007) (jpo) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/27/2007 (Polanco, Juan).
September 7, 2007 61 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 60 Motion to forward the complete record under F.R.A.P. 10(a)(1). ENDORSEMENT: In light of today's entry upon this Court's docket for this case: "Sent photocopies of documents 42 & 43 to USCA 2nd Circuit'' this application is dismissed as moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/6/07) (kco)
August 31, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 08/23/2007, Receipt Number 625286. (jd)
August 23, 2007 86 Featured Case MOTION for John H. Hinderaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(kkc)
August 23, 2007 59 Featured Case MOTION for James J. Hartnett, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (jco) (kkc).
August 20, 2007 60 Featured Case Motion to forward the complete record under F.R.A.P. 10(a)(1). Document filed by Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow.(dle)
August 13, 2007 57 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/27/07 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (jbe)
August 10, 2007 58 Featured Case VIACOM AND YOUTH JOINT RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2007. Discovery due by 12/7/2008. All other deadlines are set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/8/07) (kco)
August 9, 2007 56 Featured Case VIACOM AND YOUTUBE JOINT RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER:Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2007. Deposition due by 12/7/2008. Discovery due by 12/7/2008. this proposed scheduling order has been agreed to by parties in this action, and is deemed sufficient. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/8/07) (jco)
August 9, 2007 55 Featured Case STIPULATED PRE-TRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/8/07) (jco)
August 7, 2007 54 Featured Case DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow.(pl)
August 6, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 53 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
August 6, 2007 53 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. Attorney Rebecca Weinstein Bacon for Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC admitted Pro Hac Vice. This action has been assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system and as such, counsel shall immediately register for an ECF password. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/6/07) (tro)
August 3, 2007 52 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Robert Fishbein on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Fishbein, Stephen)
August 1, 2007 51 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 07/27/07 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (es)
July 30, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 48 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 07/24/2007, Receipt Number 622075. (jd)
July 27, 2007 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/27/2007. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2007 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (db)
July 26, 2007 50 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Gueli on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Gueli, John)
July 26, 2007 49 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stuart Jay Baskin on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Baskin, Stuart)
July 24, 2007 48 Featured Case MOTION for Rebecca Weinstein Bacon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(jco)
July 20, 2007 Featured Case Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 4 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 13 MOTION for Scott B. Wilkens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 32 Memo Endorsement, 28 Memo Endorsement, 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 5 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 22 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 15 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 1 Complaint, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 47 Notice of Appeal filed by Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow, 30 Memo Endorsement, 21 Answer to Complaint filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 31 Memo Endorsement, 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 40 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 38 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 37 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 44 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 46 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 34 MOTION for Maura L. Rees to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 2 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 45 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 39 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 29 Memo Endorsement, 23 MOTION for Carrie A. Jablonski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 35 MOTION for Bart E. Volkmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 26 MOTION for Alison G. Wheeler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 24 MOTION for Shayna S. Coot to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 8 Order, 41 Order, 27 MOTION for Phillip S. Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 25 MOTION for Mark S. Ouwelleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 6 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 11 MOTION for Amy L. Tenney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 10 Letter, 33 MOTION for Caroline E. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 20 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, 36 MOTION for David H. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 7 Summons Returned Executed, filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Comedy Partners, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp)
July 20, 2007 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 47 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
July 20, 2007 Featured Case Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 47 Notice of Appeal. (tp)
July 19, 2007 46 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew William Alsdorf on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Alsdorf, Matthew)
July 18, 2007 45 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter H. Hanna on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Hanna, Peter)
July 5, 2007 Featured Case Appeal Remark as to 47 Notice of Appeal filed by Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow. $455.00 APPEAL FEE DUE. (tp)
July 5, 2007 47 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL from 44 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow. Copies sent to attorney(s) of record: Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C.; Barlit Beck Herman Palenchar & Scott LLP. (tp)
June 28, 2007 44 Featured Case ORDER: Ms. Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow's motion for reconsideration of my June 4, 2007 order denying her application to intervene, is denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/28/07) (js)
June 15, 2007 43 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration re; 41 Order. Document filed by Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow.(jco)
June 5, 2007 42 Featured Case MOTION for an Order, purs. to FRCP 24(a) to Intervene. Document filed by Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow. Received by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton, see Order dated 6/4/07. (tro)
June 5, 2007 41 Featured Case ORDER PERMITTING FILING OF, AND DENYING, MOTION TO INTERVENE: Ms. Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow's May 22, 2007 motion to intervene shall be accepted for filling and docketed by the clerk. The motion is denied. Ms. Lucas-Morrow's motion to intervene is accepted for filing, and is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/4/2007) (jmi)
May 23, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 40 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 38 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 37 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 39 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $100.00, paid on 05/08/2007, Receipt Number 614362. (jd)
May 16, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 40 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
May 16, 2007 40 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Motion for Maura L. Rees to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/16/07) (js)
May 16, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 39 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
May 16, 2007 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 33 Motion for Caroline E. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/16/07) (js)
May 16, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 38 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
May 16, 2007 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 36 Motion for David H. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/16/07) (js)
May 16, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 37 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
May 16, 2007 37 Featured Case ORDER granting 35 Motion for Bart E. Volkmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/16/07) (js)
May 10, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 32 Memo Endorsement, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (djc)
May 10, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 31 Memo Endorsement, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (djc)
May 10, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 30 Memo Endorsement, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (djc)
May 10, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 29 Memo Endorsement, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (djc)
May 10, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 28 Memo Endorsement, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (djc)
May 9, 2007 32 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Granted. No Opposition 27 MOTION for Phillip S. Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/9/07) (djc)
May 9, 2007 31 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Granted. No Opposition 23 MOTION for Carrie A. Jablonski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/9/07) (djc)
May 9, 2007 30 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Granting. No Opposition 25 MOTION for Mark S. Ouwelleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/9/07) (djc)
May 9, 2007 29 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Granted. NO opposition 26 MOTION for Alison G. Wheeler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/9/07) (djc)
May 9, 2007 28 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 24 MOTION for Shayna S. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Granted. No opposition. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/9/07) (djc)
May 8, 2007 36 Featured Case MOTION for David H. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(jco)
May 8, 2007 35 Featured Case MOTION for Bart E. Volkmer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(jco)
May 8, 2007 34 Featured Case MOTION for Maura L. Rees to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(jco)
May 8, 2007 33 Featured Case MOTION for Caroline E. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(jco)
May 8, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $125.00, paid on 05/01/2007, Receipt Number 613728. (jd)
May 2, 2007 22 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Joan Kohlmann on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Kohlmann, Susan)
May 1, 2007 27 Featured Case MOTION for Phillip S. Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(jco)
May 1, 2007 26 Featured Case MOTION for Alison G. Wheeler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(jco)
May 1, 2007 25 Featured Case MOTION for Mark S. Ouweleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(jco)
May 1, 2007 24 Featured Case MOTION for Shayna S. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(jco)
May 1, 2007 23 Featured Case MOTION for Carrie A. Jablonski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.(jco)
April 30, 2007 21 Featured Case ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc..(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
April 30, 2007 20 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc..(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
April 30, 2007 19 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner on behalf of Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
April 30, 2007 18 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan M. Jacobson on behalf of Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (Jacobson, Jonathan)
April 30, 2007 17 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner on behalf of Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
April 20, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
April 20, 2007 16 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSED, granting 13 Motion for Scott B. Wilkens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/20/07) (js)
April 16, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 04/09/2007, Receipt Number 611107. (jd)
April 13, 2007 15 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSED granting 11 Motion for Amy L. Tenney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. No opposition SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/13/2007) (jmi)
April 12, 2007 14 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Luke Cardillo Platzer on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Platzer, Luke)
April 11, 2007 12 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharmila Sohoni on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Sohoni, Sharmila)
April 6, 2007 13 Featured Case MOTION for Scott B. Wilkens to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(jco)
April 6, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 04/02/2007, Receipt Number 610472. (jd)
April 2, 2007 11 Featured Case MOTION for Amy L. Tenney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(jco)
March 27, 2007 9 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William M. Hohengarten on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Hohengarten, William)
March 26, 2007 10 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Donald B. Verrilli Jr. dated 3/23/07 re: Writing to confirm that the parties are available to appear before the Court for the Rule 16(b) conference on Friday July 27, 2007 at 11:30 a.m. In addition Defendants have not yet retained counsel to represent them in this matter. Plaintiffs have agreed to defendants request for a thirty day extension of time until May 2, 2007 for the Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs complaint. (js)
March 16, 2007 Featured Case Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/29/2007 12:30 PM before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (js)
March 16, 2007 8 Featured Case ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16 (b): This action is scheduled for a conference in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) on Friday June 29th, 2007 at 12:30 p.m. in Room 21C. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/16/07) (js)
March 14, 2007 7 Featured Case SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Youtube, LLC served on 3/13/2007, answer due 4/2/2007. Service was accepted by Steve Chen, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc.; Paramount Pictures Corporation; Viacom International, Inc.; Black Entertainment Television, LLC; Comedy Partners. (Verrilli, Donald)
March 14, 2007 6 Featured Case SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Youtube, Inc. served on 3/13/2007, answer due 4/2/2007. Service was accepted by Steve Chen, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc.; Paramount Pictures Corporation; Viacom International, Inc.; Black Entertainment Television, LLC; Comedy Partners. (Verrilli, Donald)
March 14, 2007 5 Featured Case SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Service was accepted by Gladys Ryan, Service of Process Representative. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners. (Verrilli, Donald)
March 14, 2007 4 Featured Case SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Google, Inc. served on 3/13/2007, answer due 4/2/2007. Service was accepted by Ed Choi, Authorized Agent. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc.; Paramount Pictures Corporation; Viacom International, Inc.; Black Entertainment Television, LLC; Comedy Partners. (Verrilli, Donald)
March 13, 2007 3 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donald B. Verrilli, Jr on behalf of Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners (Verrilli, Donald)
March 13, 2007 Featured Case Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the filing of this action. (tro)
March 13, 2007 2 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Viacom, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(tro) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
March 13, 2007 Featured Case Case Designated ECF. (tro)
March 13, 2007 Featured Case Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (tro)
March 13, 2007 Featured Case SUMMONS ISSUED as to Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (tro)
March 13, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Google, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 608839)Document filed by Country Music Television, Inc., Paramount Pictures Corporation, Viacom International, Inc., Black Entertainment Television, LLC, Comedy Partners.(tro) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/14/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Viacom International, Inc. et al v. Youtube, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Country Music Television, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew William Alsdorf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comedy Partners
Represented By: Scott B. Wilkens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Entertainment Television, LLC
Represented By: Scott B. Wilkens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paramount Pictures Corporation
Represented By: John Gueli
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viacom International, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew William Alsdorf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, LLC
Represented By: Maura Lea Rees
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Kramer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, Inc.
Represented By: Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]