The Football Association Premier League Limited et al v. Youtube, Inc. et al Featured Case

Plaintiff filed a class action law suit against YouTube and Google for allowing users to upload and distribute media that infringed on plaintiff\'s copyrights.

Plaintiff: The Scottish Premier League Limited, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Alley Music Corporation, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Music Force LLC, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Federation Francaise De Tennis, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Bourne Co., Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association and The Football Association Premier League Limited
Defendant: Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc. and Youtube, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2007cv03582
Filed: May 4, 2007
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2011 348 Featured Case ORDER: Upon the motion of Jenner & Block LLP, Sharmila Sohoni is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs in this action. (Docketed in Case No. 1:07-cv-02103 (LLS)) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/24/2011) (lnl)
May 18, 2011 347 Featured Case ORDER: Upon the motion of Jenner & Block LLP, Eric R. Haren is hereby granted leave to withdraw as counsel for plaintiffs in this action. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/18/2011) (lnl)
April 19, 2011 346 Featured Case ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF JACQUELINE C. CHARLESWORTH: this Court hereby orders that Jacqueline C. Charlesworth of Pryor Cashman LLP be withdrawn as counsel of record in this case, and further orders that Jacqueline C. Charlesworth be removed from the Court's electronic service list. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/19/2011) (ab)
April 1, 2011 345 Featured Case ORDER OF WITHDRAWAL OF JAMES E. HOUGH, ESQ.: Upon consideration of the request to withdraw by James E. Hough, Esq., this Court orders that James E. Hough, Esq. be withdrawn from this case, and further orders that Mr. Hough be removed from the Court's electronic service list. SO ORDERED: Attorney James Edward Hough terminated. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/1/2011) (lnl)
February 23, 2011 344 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jacqueline C. Charlesworth on behalf of Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, National Music Publishers' Association, Stage Three Music (US), Inc., The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization. New Address: PRYOR CASHMAN LLP, 7 TIMES SQUARE, 7 TIMES SQUARE, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA 10036, 212-421-4100. (Charlesworth, Jacqueline)
February 23, 2011 343 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jacqueline C. Charlesworth on behalf of Alley Music Corporation. New Address: PRYOR CASHMAN LLP, 7 TIMES SQUARE, 7 TIMES SQUARE, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, USA 10036, 212-421-4100. (Charlesworth, Jacqueline)
February 22, 2011 342 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Jacqueline C. Charlesworth on behalf of Alley Music Corporation, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, National Music Publishers' Association, Stage Three Music (US), Inc., The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization. New Address: Pryor Cashman LLP, 7 Times Square, New York, NY, USA 10036, (212) 421-4100. (Charlesworth, Jacqueline) Modified on 2/24/2011 (lb).
January 21, 2011 341 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by William Maxwell Hart on behalf of Bourne Co., Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc.. New Address: Proskauer Rose LLP, Eleven Times Square, New York, New York, 10036-8299, 212-969-3000. (Hart, William)
January 11, 2011 340 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Charles S. Sims on behalf of The Football Association Premier League Limited. New Address: Proskauer Rose LLP, 11 Times Square, New York, NY, 10036, 212-969-3000. (Sims, Charles)
December 20, 2010 339 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/28/2010 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (lnl)
September 29, 2010 338 Featured Case ORDER, that for the reasons stated on the record in open court this afternoon, the balance of the pre-motion conference regarding defendants' application for attorneys fees is adjourned until it is rescheduled following receipt of the Court of Appeals' mandate in the pending appeal. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/28/10) (pl)
August 24, 2010 337 SEALED MATERIALS RETRIEVED: Document(s) 209 and 297 were retrieved. Law Firm retrieving records: Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP. Person retrieving records: Alex Fermoso, Jr. on 8/24/2010.(nm)
August 13, 2010 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 174 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 258 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 96 MOTION for Gerald E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, 253 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 326 Order, 184 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 189 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 314 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc., 197 Notice of Change of Address, filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, 251 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 241 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Stage Three Music (US), Inc., The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Scottish Premier League Limited, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., 46 MOTION for John H. Hinderaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 312 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 275 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Stage Three Music (US), Inc., The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Scottish Premier League Limited, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., 293 Endorsed Letter,,, 49 Notice of Appearance filed by The Music Force LLC, 120 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 39 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, 107 Affidavit of Service Other, filed by Bourne Co., The Football Association Premier League Limited, 20 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 74 Endorsed Letter, 173 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 267 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 328 Stipulation and Order, Terminate Motions, Add and Terminate Parties,,,,,,,,,,,, 137 Stipulation and Order, 255 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 8 Stipulation and Order, 313 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 303 Memorandum & Opinion,, 111 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 221 Order on Motion to File Amicus Brief,, 329 Stipulation and Order, 248 Declaration in Opposition to Motion, filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 104 Notice of Appearance filed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, 336 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Stage Three Music (US), Inc., The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., The Football Association Premier League Limited, 234 Notice of Appearance filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Sports Rights Owners Coalition, American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, 88 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Federation Francaise De Tennis, 166 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Scottish Premier League Limited, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., 131 Reply Memorandum of Law in Oppisition to Motion,,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Scottish Premier League Limited, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., 113 Notice of Change of Address filed by The Music Force LLC, The Music Force Media Group LLC, 180 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 284 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by IAC/Interactivecorp, Facebook, Inc., Yahoo! Inc., eBay, Inc., 143 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., 142 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., 307 Reply filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 58 Amended Complaint,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Scottish Premier League Limited, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 195 Notice of Change of Address, filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, 102 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 60 MOTION for Dylan J. Liddiard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 38 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, 1 Complaint filed by Bourne Co., The Football Association Premier League Limited, 235 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae. filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Sports Rights Owners Coalition, American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, 80 Notice of Appearance filed by Alley Music Corporation, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, 73 Endorsed Letter, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 156 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, 187 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 30 MOTION for Shayna S. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 239 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Stage Three Music (US), Inc., The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Scottish Premier League Limited, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., 55 MOTION for Michael H. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 153 MOTION for Christopher E. Coleman to Withdraw as Attorney. filed by Alley Music Corporation, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Stage Three Music (US), Inc., The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, 237 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Sports Rights Owners Coalition, American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, 202 Stipulation and Order,,,,,,, 211 Amicus Curiae Appearance filed by American Library Association, et al., 169 Rule 56.1 Statement filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., 24 Memorandum of Law in Support,,, filed by Bourne Co., The Football Association Premier League Limited, 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Th
August 13, 2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 336 Notice of Appeal,,. (nd)
August 13, 2010 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to the District Judge re: 336 Notice of Appeal,,. (nd)
August 12, 2010 336 NOTICE OF APPEAL from 303 Memorandum & Opinion,, 332 Judgment,. Document filed by Alley Music Corporation, Bourne Co., Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Federation Francaise De Tennis, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, National Music Publishers' Association, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, The Music Force LLC, The Music Force Media Group LLC, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 911803. (nd)
August 12, 2010 335 SEALED MATERIALS RETRIEVED: Document(s) 298 were retrieved. Law Firm retrieving records: Proskauer Rose LLP. Person retrieving records: Jesus Hernandez on 8/12/2010.(nm)
August 11, 2010 334 SEALED MATERIALS RETRIEVED: Document(s) 277 and 289 were retrieved. Law Firm retrieving records: Mayer Brown. Person retrieving records: Abayomi Talbot on 8/11/10.(dn)
August 10, 2010 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 331 Final Judgment. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ml)
August 10, 2010 332 FINAL JUDGMENT that for the reasons set forth in the Court's Opinion and Order dated June 23, 2010, judgment is entered for Defendants and against Plaintiffs on all of Plaintiffs' claims. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/9/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml)
August 10, 2010 329 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: The parties have met and conferred and reach a stipulated resolution regarding the treatment of removed videos, as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/9/2010) (tro)
August 10, 2010 328 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING YOUTUBE'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS: The parties agree that this Stipulation and Order, when entered by the Court, disposes of the Protective Order Issue in its entirety. Tur hereby: (i) dismisses his entire case against YoutTube with prejudice including, without limitation, any right to appeal from the Summary Judgment Order; and (ii) agrees to file a separate dismissal with prejudice as soon as practicable. YouTube hereby withdraws, with prejudice, its request for permission to move for sanctions against Tur in connection with the protective Order Issue and hereby waives and relinquishes any right to seek sanctions or any other form of relief against Tur arising out of or related to the Protective Order Issue. Tur shall pay YouTube the sum of Twenty Thousand and 00/100 dollars ($20,000.00) on or before five (5) business days after the Order requested herein is entered. Tur shall have no liability or obligation for costs, attorneys fees or other relief in this action, and as further set forth in this Order. Robert Tur terminated. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/9/2010) (tro)
August 10, 2010 Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: 327 Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (tro)
August 10, 2010 327 Featured Case ORDER: Judgment for defendants in this case having been entered on August 9, 2010, Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, which was filed under seal on April 9, 2010, is dismissed as moot. The parties having filed all materials in connection with that motion under seal, the Clerk of the Court is directed to unseal Class Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion for Class Certification, recorded in docket entry 209, and return the remainder of the material whose filing is recorded in docket entry 209 and the material whose filing is recorded in docket entries 277, 289, 297 and 298 to the parties. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/9/2010) (tro)
August 9, 2010 330 CLASS PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. (This document was previously sealed in envelope # 209, and unsealed with order # 327) Document filed by Bourne Co., Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc.(mbe)
August 4, 2010 325 Featured Case ORDER After examining the redactions proposed by the defendants with respect to confidential personal and business information contained in submissions filed in support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment, Viacom's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Class Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Defendants' Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Viacom's Reply in Support of Viacom's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Class Plaintiffs' Reply Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - together with the reasons given for continued confidential treatment of the designated material, I have determined that the protection of the value of this private, proprietary and commercially sensitive information to its owners clearly outweighs any countervailing public interest in its disclosure to the general public and to competitors, and justifies its redaction, together with personally identifiable matter such as addresses, telephone and account numbers, family and personal affairs and similar information, publicly filed and disclosed. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/4/2010) (jmi)
August 2, 2010 326 Featured Case ORDER that I have reviewed Exhibits 253, 254, 305 and 334 to the 4/30 (as amended 5/7), 2010 Declaration of Elizabeth Figueira in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and conclude that: Exhibits 253 and 254 may be kept sealed in full, and as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/2/10) (cd)
July 30, 2010 324 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from William F. Bly dated 6/30/10 re: The enclosed documents submitted in response to the Court's Order of March 5, 2010, regarding the unsealing of documents. ENDORSEMENT: I have reviewed the documents and proposed redactions submitted with this letter. The redactions are narrowly tailored, fully justified, approved and shall remain in effect. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/29/10) (rjm)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support of defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Exhibits 81-198.) Original document filed in case number 07-cv-3582 document # 394. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. (Volume 2: Exhibits 51-80.) Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103 document #393 Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. (Volume 1: Exhibits 1-50). Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103 document # 392. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY DECLARATION of Michael Rubin in Support of defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Volume 2: Exhibits 51-355). Original filed in case number 07-cv-3582 document # 391. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY DECLARATION of Michael Rubin in Support of defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Volume 1: Exhibits 1-50) Original document filed in case number 07-cv-2103 document # 390. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY to Viacom's counter-statement in response to defendants' Local Rule 56.1 Statement in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment & Response to Viacom's Supplemental Counter-Statement. Original document filed in case number 07-cv-2103 document # 389. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION)DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support of defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103 document # 388. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY DECLARATION of Michael Rubin in Support pf defendants' motion for Summary Judgment. Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103 document # 387. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 323 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) DECLARATION of David King in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Original Files in case number 07-cv-2103 document # 386) Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) REPLY to class Plaintiffs' counter-statement of controverted material facts in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Original document docketed in case number 07-cv-2103 document # 385). Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 30, 2010 Featured Case (REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Original document filed in 07-cv-2103 Document # 384. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (mbe)
June 28, 2010 322 Featured Case CLASS PLAINTIFFS' COUNTERSTATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by class plaintiffs. ***Accepted for filing by the Honorable Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/10 (document number 302). (mro)
June 28, 2010 321 Featured Case REPLY DECLARATION of Elizabeth Anne Figueira in Support of class plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Document filed by class plaintiffs. ***Accepted for filing by the Honorable Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/10 (document number 302). (mro)
June 28, 2010 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Class Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing defendants' first defense(DMCA Safe Harbor Defense). Document filed by class plaintiffs. ***Accepted for filing by the Honorable Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/10 (document number 302).***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 383.(mro)
June 25, 2010 320 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 319 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 117, # 2 Exhibit 213, # 3 Exhibit 267 and 360)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 318 Featured Case COUNTER STATEMENT TO 169 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Class Plaintiffs' Counterstatement of Controverted Material Facts (Part 2))(Sims, Charles)
June 25, 2010 317 Featured Case DECLARATION of MICHAEL RUBIN in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 162 - 177, # 2 Exhibit 178 - 180, # 3 Exhibit 181 - 184, # 4 Exhibit 185, # 5 Exhibit 186 - 191, # 6 Exhibit 192 - 355)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 316 Featured Case DECLARATION of MICHAEL RUBIN in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16 - 17, # 2 Exhibit 18 - 26, # 3 Exhibit 27 - 30, # 4 Exhibit 31 - 42, # 5 Exhibit 43 - 44, # 6 Exhibit 45 - 71)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 315 Featured Case DECLARATION of MICHAEL RUBIN in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 6, # 2 Exhibit 7 PART 1, # 3 Exhibit 7 PART 2, # 4 Exhibit 7 PART 3, # 5 Exhibit 7 PART 4, # 6 Exhibit 7 PART 5, # 7 Exhibit 7 PART 6)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 314 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 110 PART 6, # 2 Exhibit 111 - 134, # 3 Exhibit 135 - 146, # 4 Exhibit 147 PART 1, # 5 Exhibit 147 PART 2, # 6 Exhibit 148 - 155, # 7 Exhibit 156 - 161, # 8 Exhibit 162 - 198)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 313 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 96 - 109, # 2 Exhibit 110 PART 1, # 3 Exhibit 110 PART 2, # 4 Exhibit 110 PART 3, # 5 Exhibit 110 PART 4)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 312 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 73 PART 4, # 2 Exhibit 73 PART 5, # 3 Exhibit 73 PART 6, # 4 Exhibit 73 PART 7, # 5 Exhibit 74 - 91)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 311 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 43-55, # 2 Exhibit 56-62, # 3 Exhibit 63-64, # 4 Exhibit 65-72, # 5 Exhibit 73 PART 1, # 6 Exhibit 73 PART 2)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 310 Featured Case DECLARATION of ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 3, # 2 Exhibit 4 - 12, # 3 Exhibit 13 - 17, # 4 Exhibit 18 PART 1, # 5 Exhibit 18 PART 2, # 6 Exhibit 19 - 32, # 7 Exhibit 33 - 41, # 8 Exhibit 42 PART 1)(Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 309 Featured Case DECLARATION of DAVID KING in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 308 Featured Case REPLY TO VIACOM'S COUNTER-STATEMENT IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' LOCAL RULE 56.1 STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT & RESPONSE TO VIACOM'S SUPPLEMENTAL COUNTER-STATEMENT. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 307 Featured Case REPLY TO CLASS PLAINTIFFS' COUNTERSTATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 306 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
June 25, 2010 305 Featured Case DECLARATION of Elizabeth Anne Figueira in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Tab 339 is true copy of the Document Bates-stamped GOO001-06519634-6519638 produced by defendants)(Sims, Charles)
June 25, 2010 304 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Sims, Charles)
June 23, 2010 Featured Case Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 303 Opinion and Order, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (jpo)
June 23, 2010 Featured Case Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 7/14/2010. (jpo)
June 23, 2010 Featured Case Set Deadlines/Hearings:( Status Report due by 7/14/2010.) (jpo)
June 23, 2010 303 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants are granted summary judgment that they qualify for the protection of 17 U. S. C. § 512 (c), as expounded above, against all of plaintiffs' claims for direct and secondary copyright infringement. Plaintiffs' motions for judgment are denied. The parties shall meet and confer about any issues requiring judicial attention remaining in these cases, and submit a report (jointly, if possible) by July 14, 2010. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/2010) (jpo) Modified on 6/30/2010 (jpo).
June 23, 2010 302 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that, consistent with the March 17, 2010 and May 21, 2010 Stipulations and Orders, the unsealing of materials relating to the parties' replies to summary judgment motions and certain documents from their motions for summary judgment motions in the above referenced actions shall be implemented as set forth in this Stipulation and Order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/2010) (jpo)
June 18, 2010 301 Featured Case ORDER granting 290 Motion for Leave to File Document.ENDORSEMENT: granted. No opposition. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/18/2010) (jmi)
June 14, 2010 300 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Leave granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/14/2010) (jfe)
June 14, 2010 299 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 283 Motion for Leave to File Document. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. No opposition. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/14/2010) (jfe)
June 14, 2010 298 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(cb)
June 11, 2010 297 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(cb)
June 8, 2010 296 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSED ON NOTICE OF MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF RUSSELL J. FRACKMAN: ENDORSEMENT: Granted. No opposition. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/7/2010) (js)
June 7, 2010 295 Featured Case STIPULATED HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL FILED UNDER SEAL...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/7/2010) (jmi)
June 4, 2010 294 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
June 4, 2010 293 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Thomas C. Moore dated 5/28/2010 re: We represent the American Society of Composers, Authors and Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc. and the Sports Rights Owners Coalition ("Amici") in connection with a motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief in support of plaintiffs in the above-captioned matter. As set forth in more detail in the motion, Amici are simply seeking to place on the record of this action an exact copy of an amicus brief already received by the Court in the related Viacom action. By docket entry 231 in this Class Action, it appears that the Court already has determined that it wishes to have this brief so docketed and the enclosed motion seeks to carry out that direction by the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The docket entry will be take as deeming the brief filed in the records of each action no duplicative filing is required. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/1/2010) (jmi)
June 1, 2010 292 Featured Case BRIEF of Amicus Curiae the Sideshow Coalition in Support of Defendants. Document filed by The Sideshow Coalition.(Grannis, Eric)
June 1, 2010 291 Featured Case DECLARATION of Eric J. Grannis in Support re: 290 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by The Sideshow Coalition. (Grannis, Eric)
June 1, 2010 290 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by The Sideshow Coalition.(Grannis, Eric)
June 1, 2010 289 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(cb)
May 28, 2010 Featured Case ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Eric Joseph Grannis to RE-FILE Document 288 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents (Declaration in Support and Memorandum of Law in Support) are filed separately, each getting there own Document #. ***REMINDER*** - First Re-File Motion, then file and link any supporting documents - found under the Event Type Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (db)
May 28, 2010 288 Featured Case FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by The Sideshow Coalition. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Eric J. Grannis, # 2 Exhibit Amicus Brief of the Sideshow Coalition)(Grannis, Eric) Modified on 6/1/2010 (db).
May 27, 2010 287 Featured Case CLASS PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT EXHIBITS (5-14) TO DECLARATION OF NOAH SISKIND GITTERMAN. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238(mro)
May 26, 2010 286 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 285 Featured Case BRIEF of Amici Curiae eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, and Yahoo! Inc. in Support of Defendants. Document filed by eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 284 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael S. Kwun in Support re: 283 MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief.. Document filed by eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 283 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Amici Curiae Brief. Document filed by eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 282 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Asim M. Bhansali on behalf of eBay, Inc., Facebook, Inc., IAC/Interactivecorp, Yahoo! Inc..(Bhansali, Asim)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case YOUTUBE'S COUNTER STATEMENT TO VIACOM'S STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON LIABILITY AND INAPPLICABILITY OF THE DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT SAFE HARBOR DEFENSE. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 342. (mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case DECLARATION OF MICAH SCHAFFER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 341. (mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case DEFENDANTS' COUNTER STATEMENT TO CLASS PLAINTIFFS' STATEMENT OF UNCONTROVERTED MATERIAL FACTS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 340. (mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case DECLARATION OF CHAD HURLEY SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 339. (mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case DECLARATION OF DAVID KING IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT.***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 338. (mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE MATERIAL FROM VIACOM'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUBMISSIONS AND PUTATIVE CLASS PLAINTIFFS' RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 337. (mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case DECLARATION OF ANDREW H. SCHAPIRO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AND MOTION TO STRIKE MATERIAL FROM VIACOM'S SUMMARY JUDGMENT SUBMISSIONS AND PUTATIVE CLASS PLAINTIFFS' RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 336. (mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 335. (mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case VOLUME 9: EXHIBITS 350-425(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 334. (mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case VOLUME 8: EXHIBITS 313-349(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 333.(mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case VOLUME 7: EXHIBITS 276-312(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 332.(mro) Modified on 5/26/2010 (mro).
May 26, 2010 Featured Case VOLUME 6: EXHIBITS 231-275(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 331.(mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case VOLUME 5: EXHIBITS 211-230(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 330.(mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case VOLUME 4: EXHIBITS 151-210(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 329.(mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case VOLUME 3: EXHIBITS 117-150(attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 328.(mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case VOLUME 2: EXHIBITS 76-116 (attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 327.(mro)
May 26, 2010 Featured Case VOLUME 1: EXHIBITS 1-75 (attached to the Declaration of Andrew H. Schapiro in support of defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motions for partial summary judgment and defendants' objections to evidence and motion to strike material from Viacom's summary judgment submissions and putative class plaintiffs' Rule 56.1 statement). Document filed by the defendants. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. ***Original filed in case number 07-cv-2103, document number 326.(mro)
May 26, 2010 281 Featured Case EXHIBITS TO THE DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH ANNE FIGUEIRA IN SUPPORT OF CLASS PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT (DOCKET ENTRY NO. 166) THAT HAVE BEEN UNSEALED. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238.(mro)
May 26, 2010 280 Featured Case CLASS PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-PUBLIC VERSION. VOLUME 3 OF 3. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 279 Featured Case CLASS PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-PUBLIC VERSION. VOLUME 2 OF 3. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 26, 2010 278 Featured Case CLASS PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT-PUBLIC VERSION. VOLUME 1 OF 3. ***Accepted for filing by the Chambers of Louis L. Stanton on 5/20/10, document number 238. (mro)
May 21, 2010 277 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(cb)
May 21, 2010 276 Featured Case DECLARATION of Elizabeth Anne Figueira, Esq. in Opposition re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 189, # 2 Exhibit 190, # 3 Exhibit 191, # 4 Exhibit 192, # 5 Exhibit 193, # 6 Exhibit 194, # 7 Exhibit 195, # 8 Exhibit 196, # 9 Exhibit 197, # 10 Exhibit 198, # 11 Exhibit 199, # 12 Exhibit 200, # 13 Exhibit 201, # 14 Exhibit 202, # 15 Exhibit 203, # 16 Exhibit 204, # 17 Exhibit 205, # 18 Exhibit 206, # 19 Exhibit 207, # 20 Exhibit 208, # 21 Exhibit 209, # 22 Exhibit 210, # 23 Exhibit 211, # 24 Exhibit 212, # 25 Exhibit 213, # 26 Exhibit 214, # 27 Exhibit 215, # 28 Exhibit 216, # 29 Exhibit 217, # 30 Exhibit 218, # 31 Exhibit 219, # 32 Exhibit 220, # 33 Exhibit 221, # 34 Exhibit 222, # 35 Exhibit 223, # 36 Exhibit 224 Part 1, # 37 Exhibit 224 Part 2, # 38 Exhibit 225, # 39 Exhibit 226, # 40 Exhibit 227 Part 1, # 41 Exhibit 227 Part 2, # 42 Exhibit 227 Part 3, # 43 Exhibit 227 Part 4, # 44 Exhibit 228, # 45 Exhibit 229, # 46 Exhibit 230, # 47 Exhibit 231, # 48 Exhibit 232, # 49 Exhibit 233, # 50 Exhibit 234, # 51 Exhibit 235, # 52 Exhibit 236, # 53 Exhibit 237, # 54 Exhibit 238, # 55 Exhibit 239, # 56 Exhibit 240, # 57 Exhibit 241, # 58 Exhibit 242, # 59 Exhibit 243, # 60 Exhibit 244, # 61 Exhibit 245, # 62 Exhibit 246, # 63 Exhibit 247, # 64 Exhibit 248, # 65 Exhibit 249, # 66 Exhibit 250, # 67 Exhibit 251, # 68 Exhibit 252, # 69 Exhibit 253, # 70 Exhibit 254, # 71 Exhibit 255, # 72 Exhibit 256, # 73 Exhibit 257, # 74 Exhibit 258, # 75 Exhibit 259, # 76 Exhibit 260, # 77 Exhibit 261, # 78 Exhibit 262, # 79 Exhibit 263, # 80 Exhibit 264, # 81 Exhibit 265, # 82 Exhibit 266, # 83 Exhibit 267, # 84 Exhibit 268, # 85 Exhibit 269, # 86 Exhibit 270, # 87 Exhibit 271, # 88 Exhibit 272 Part 1, # 89 Exhibit 272-2, # 90 Exhibit 272 Part 3, # 91 Exhibit 272 Part 4, # 92 Exhibit 272 Part 5, # 93 Exhibit 272 Part 6, # 94 Exhibit 272 Part 7, # 95 Exhibit 272 Part 8, # 96 Exhibit 272 Part 9, # 97 Exhibit 272 Part 10, # 98 Exhibit 272 Part 11, # 99 Exhibit 272 Part 12, # 100 Exhibit 272 Part 13, # 101 Exhibit 272 Part 14, # 102 Exhibit 272 Part 15, # 103 Exhibit 272 Part 16, # 104 Exhibit 272 Part 17, # 105 Exhibit 272 Part 18, # 106 Exhibit 272 Part 19, # 107 Exhibit 273, # 108 Exhibit 274, # 109 Exhibit 275, # 110 Exhibit 276, # 111 Exhibit 277, # 112 Exhibit 278, # 113 Exhibit 279, # 114 Exhibit 280, # 115 Exhibit 281, # 116 Exhibit 282, # 117 Exhibit 283, # 118 Exhibit 284, # 119 Exhibit 285, # 120 Exhibit 286, # 121 Exhibit 287, # 122 Exhibit 288, # 123 Exhibit 289, # 124 Exhibit 290, # 125 Exhibit 291, # 126 Exhibit 292, # 127 Exhibit 293, # 128 Exhibit 294, # 129 Exhibit 295, # 130 Exhibit 296, # 131 Exhibit 297, # 132 Exhibit 298, # 133 Exhibit 299, # 134 Exhibit 300, # 135 Exhibit 301, # 136 Exhibit 302, # 137 Exhibit 303, # 138 Exhibit 304, # 139 Exhibit 305, # 140 Exhibit 306, # 141 Exhibit 307, # 142 Exhibit 308, # 143 Exhibit 309, # 144 Exhibit 310, # 145 Exhibit 311, # 146 Exhibit 312, # 147 Exhibit 313, # 148 Exhibit 314, # 149 Exhibit 315, # 150 Exhibit 316, # 151 Exhibit 317, # 152 Exhibit 318, # 153 Exhibit 319, # 154 Exhibit 320, # 155 Exhibit 321, # 156 Exhibit 322, # 157 Exhibit 323, # 158 Exhibit 324, # 159 Exhibit 325, # 160 Exhibit 326, # 161 Exhibit 327, # 162 Exhibit 328, # 163 Exhibit 329, # 164 Exhibit 330, # 165 Exhibit 331, # 166 Exhibit 332, # 167 Exhibit 333 Part 1, # 168 Exhibit 333 Part 2, # 169 Exhibit 334, # 170 Exhibit 335, # 171 Exhibit 336, # 172 Exhibit 337, # 173 Exhibit 338)(Figueira, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2010 275 Featured Case COUNTER STATEMENT TO 165 Rule 56.1 Statement,,,. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Plaintiffs' Statement of Uncontroverted Facts (Redacted) Part 2)(Figueira, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2010 274 Featured Case DECLARATION of Elizabeth Anne Figueira, Esq. in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, # 3 Exhibit 21, # 4 Exhibit 22, # 5 Exhibit 24, # 6 Exhibit 41, # 7 Exhibit 54, # 8 Exhibit 55, # 9 Exhibit 56, # 10 Exhibit 57, # 11 Exhibit 58, # 12 Exhibit 72, # 13 Exhibit 78 Part 1, # 14 Exhibit 78 Part 2, # 15 Exhibit 82, # 16 Exhibit 129, # 17 Exhibit 131, # 18 Exhibit 132, # 19 Exhibit 162, # 20 Exhibit 179)(Figueira, Elizabeth)
May 21, 2010 273 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro, Group 11, Exhibit 379 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 272 Featured Case DECLARATION of Suzanne Reider in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 271 Featured Case DECLARATION of Micah Schaffer in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 270 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Rubin in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 269 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 268 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Local Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 267 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 10, Exhibit 374 - 378 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 380 - 386, # 2 Exhibit 387 - 412, # 3 Exhibit 413 - 420, # 4 Exhibit 421 - 422, # 5 Exhibit 423, Part 1, # 6 Exhibit 423, Part 2, # 7 Exhibit 423, Part 3, # 8 Exhibit 424 - 425)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 266 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 9, Exhibit 315 - 318 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 319 - 335, # 2 Exhibit 336, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 336, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 336, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 337 - 345, # 6 Exhibit 346 - 368, # 7 Exhibit 369 - 373)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 265 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 8, Exhibit 238 - 259 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 260 - 272, # 2 Exhibit 273 - 285, # 3 Exhibit 286 - 288, # 4 Exhibit 289 - 296, # 5 Exhibit 297 - 310, # 6 Exhibit 311, Part 1, # 7 Exhibit Part 2, # 8 Exhibit 312 - 314)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 264 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 7, Exhibit 215, Part 1 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 215, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 215, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit 215, Part 4, # 4 Exhibit 215, Part 5, # 5 Exhibit 216 - 222, # 6 Exhibit 223 - 237)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 263 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 6, Exhibit 116 - 127 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 128, # 2 Exhibit 129 - 134, # 3 Exhibit 135 - 141, # 4 Exhibit 142 - 174, # 5 Exhibit 175 - 194, # 6 Exhibit 195 - 204, # 7 Exhibit 205 - 214)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 262 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 5, Exhibit 91, Part 1 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 91, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 91, Part 3, # 3 Exhibit 91, Part 4, # 4 Exhibit 91, Part 5, # 5 Exhibit 91, Part 6, # 6 Exhibit 92 - 104, # 7 Exhibit 105 - 115)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 261 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 4, Exhibit 78, Part 1 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 78, Part 2, # 2 Exhibit 79 - 84, # 3 Exhibit 85 - 90)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 260 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 3, Exhibit 25 - 38 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 39 - 45, # 2 Exhibit 46 - 59, # 3 Exhibit 60 - 63, # 4 Exhibit 64, Part 1, # 5 Exhibit 64, Part 2, # 6 Exhibit 65 - 68, # 7 Exhibit 69 - 77)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 259 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro, Group 2, Exhibit 16, Part 6 in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, Part 7, # 2 Exhibit 16, Part 8, # 3 Exhibit 16, Part 9, # 4 Exhibit 16, Part 10, # 5 Exhibit 17 - 24)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 258 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew H. Schapiro in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 15, # 2 Exhibit 16, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit 16, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit 16, Part 3, # 5 Exhibit 16, Part 4, # 6 Exhibit 16, Part 5)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 257 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Gordon in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 256 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Solomon in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 255 Featured Case DECLARATION of Brent Hurley in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 254 Featured Case DECLARATION of Zahavah Levine in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 253 Featured Case DECLARATION of Christopher Maxcy in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 252 Featured Case DECLARATION of Steve Chen in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 251 Featured Case DECLARATION of Chad Hurley in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 250 Featured Case DECLARATION of Anthony Weibell in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 249 Featured Case DECLARATION of Micah Schaffer in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 248 Featured Case DECLARATION of David King in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9)(Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 247 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 224 MOTION to Strike.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 246 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Defendants' Counterstatement to Class Plaintiffs' Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 245 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. YouTube's Counterstatement to Viacom's Statement of Undisputed Facts. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 244 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 21, 2010 243 Featured Case DECLARATION of Noah S. Gitterman, Esq. in Opposition re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16-1, # 17 Exhibit 16-2)(Gitterman, Noah)
May 21, 2010 242 Featured Case DECLARATION of Daniel Hill in Opposition re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Sims, Charles)
May 21, 2010 241 Featured Case DECLARATION of Robert Bienstock in Opposition re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Sims, Charles)
May 21, 2010 240 Featured Case COUNTER STATEMENT TO 169 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Sims, Charles)
May 21, 2010 239 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Sims, Charles)
May 21, 2010 238 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER; that, consistent with the March 17, 2010 Stipulation and Order, the unsealing of materials relating to the parties' oppositions to summary judgment motions and certain documents from their motions for summary judgment in the above referenced actions shall be implemented as follows: (1) To the extent practicable and with the express exception of exhibits in a format that cannot be filed via ECF and overly voluminous exhibits (e.g., large Excel spreadsheets), the parties intend to file all materials related to the parties' summary judgment motions via simultaneous ECF submissions on Friday, May 21, 2010 at 1pm EDT with those portions of the materials the parties contend should remain under seal redacted; (2) To the extent any ECF "filing event" that occurs pursuant to Paragraph 1 would exceed 15 MB, the parties will, unless they are unable to, break it into subparts with subsequent parts clearly identified. Those materials shall remain on the ECF system to allow continued public access. (3) To extent the parties are unsealing certain additional documents from their summary judgment motions because redactions were approved by the Court or have been withdrawn, the parties shall only file those additional documents. (4) So as to further facilitate public access to the parties' summary judgment submissions, the parties shall also file a complete set of all materials related to the parties' summary judgment motions being filed via ECF on May 21, 2010, with those portions of the materials the parties contend should remain under seal redacted, manually with the Clerk of the Court in hard copy to the extent possible and CD/DVD as necessary, promptly after this Stipulation and Order is so-ordered by the Court, but in no event earlier than the filing in Paragraph 1; (5) The original materials filed under seal in connection with the parties' summary judgment motions shall remain under seal unless the Clerk of the Court is otherwise directed by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood, Part I (signed at request of Judge Stanton's chambers), on 5/20/2010) (tve)
May 19, 2010 237 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 235 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae.. Document filed by American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Sports Rights Owners Coalition. (Moore, Thomas)
May 19, 2010 236 Featured Case DECLARATION of Thomas C. Moore in Support re: 235 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae.. Document filed by American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Sports Rights Owners Coalition. (Moore, Thomas)
May 19, 2010 235 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae. Document filed by American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Sports Rights Owners Coalition.(Moore, Thomas)
May 19, 2010 234 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Clay Moore on behalf of American Society of Composers, Authors And Publishers, Broadcast Music, Inc., SESAC, Inc., Sports Rights Owners Coalition (Moore, Thomas)
May 14, 2010 233 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying BMG Rights Management (US) LLC as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc..(Sims, Charles)
May 11, 2010 232 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Notice of Motion for leave to file brief Amicus Curiae Washington Legal foundation in support of Plaintiffs filed by Washington Legal Foundation. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/10/2010) (jfe)
May 11, 2010 231 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: Motion to File Amicus Brief. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/10/2010) (jfe)
May 10, 2010 230 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(cb)
May 6, 2010 229 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
May 5, 2010 228 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on Viacom's Evidentiary Objections to and Motion To Strike Portions of Declarations Submitted In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment: Denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/5/10) (cd)
May 5, 2010 227 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew Schapiro dated 5/4/10 re: Requesting clarification of the Court's Order denying motion to strike the Page deposition. ENDORSEMENT: The questioned order denied all relief sought in the 4/30/10 Notice of Motion and Motion to Strike. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/5/10) (cd)
May 4, 2010 225 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSED denying 224 Motion to Strike. After hearing counsel, and having reviewed the challenged material, this motion is denied, with leave to defendants to identify transcript portions and references in Mr. Baskins 4/30/10 letter to the court which should be redacted before public filing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/3/2010) (jmi)
May 3, 2010 226 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(cb) Modified on 5/5/2010 (cb).
May 1, 2010 224 Featured Case MOTION to Strike. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Schapiro, Andrew)
April 19, 2010 222 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: 206 Motion for Benjamin Galdston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: granted. No opposition. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/19/2010) (tve)
April 16, 2010 221 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 212 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION OF NONPARTIES AMERICAN LIBRARY ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND RESEARCH LIBRARIES, ASSOCIATION OF RESEARCH CENTER FOR DEMOCRACY AND TECHNOLOGY, COMPUTER AND COMMUNICATIONS INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, ELECTRONIC FRONTIER FOUNDATION, HOME RECORDING RIGHTS COALITION, INTERNET ARCHIVE, NETCOALITION, AND PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE TO FILE AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/16/2010) (jpo)
April 15, 2010 220 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline C. Charlesworth on behalf of National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, Stage Three Music (US), Inc. (Charlesworth, Jacqueline)
April 15, 2010 219 Featured Case ORDER: I have determined that the protection of the value of this private, proprietary and commercially sensitive information to its owners clearly outweighs any countervailing public interest in its disclosure to the general public and to competitors, and justifies its redaction, together with personally identifiable matter such as addresses, telephone and account numbers, family and personal affairs and similar information, from material publicly filed and disclosed. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/15/2010) (tro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2010: # 1 Main Document) (ae).
April 14, 2010 218 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on March 26, 2010 11:15 a.m. before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ajc)
April 14, 2010 217 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re: 212 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion of NonParties American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, Association of Research Libraries, Center for Democracy and Technology, Computer and Communications Industry Association, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Home Recording Rights Coalition, Internet Archive, NetCoalition, and Public Knowledge To File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendants. Document filed by Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. (Sims, Charles)
April 14, 2010 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 206 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 04/02/2010, Receipt Number 899422. (jd)
April 13, 2010 216 Featured Case BRIEF of Amici Curiae. Document filed by American Library Association, et al..(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 13, 2010 215 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Library Association, et al..(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 13, 2010 214 Featured Case DECLARATION of Edward Hernstadt in Support re: 212 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by American Library Association, et al.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 13, 2010 213 Featured Case DECLARATION of Fred Von Lohman in Support re: 212 MOTION to File Amicus Brief.. Document filed by American Library Association, et al.. (Hernstadt, Edward)
April 13, 2010 212 Featured Case MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by American Library Association, et al..(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 13, 2010 211 Featured Case Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Edward Hernstadt on behalf of American Library Association, et al..(Hernstadt, Edward)
April 12, 2010 210 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Hernstadt on behalf of American Library Association, et al. (Hernstadt, Edward)
April 9, 2010 209 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
April 8, 2010 207 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles S. Sims on behalf of Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co. (Sims, Charles)
April 2, 2010 206 Featured Case MOTION for Benjamin Galdston to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., Robert Tur, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc.(mro)
April 2, 2010 205 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on March 26, 2010 11:15 a.m. before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ajc)
March 31, 2010 200 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis Stanton from Susan J. Kohlman dated 3/29/2010 re: The parties respectfully request that the Court grant a one week extension to the deadlines set forth in Paragraphs 4 and 6 of the Court's order, such that the parties would have until April 8 to "submit unresolved matters to the Court," and would have until April 11 to "submit proposed findings of fact" regarding items on which there is agreement. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/30/2010) (tve)
March 26, 2010 208 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Pre-Motion Conference held and concluded on 3/26/2010 re: sanctions. (tro)
March 26, 2010 204 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff Robert Tur ("Tur") agrees sign the consent forms attached to the December 16, 2009 letter from David H. Kramer to Noah Gitterman, consenting to the disclosure of email and phone records pursuant to subpoenas that will be served by YouTube, Inc. in the action titled The Football Association Premier League Limited et al v. YouTube, Inc. et al., Case No. 1:07-cv-03582 (LLS) (SDNY) (the "Subpoenas"). All other information produced to Defendants in response to the Subpoenas not addressed in paragraph 2 above shall be designated Highly Confidential under the Protective Order and shall be provided to Fagan and Proskauer within two days of Defendants' receipt of the information. All of the Protective Order's procedures governing such material will apply. Defendants agree that any information produced to Defendants in response to the Subpoenas (including but not limited to the Subpoenaed Information in paragraph 2 above) shall only be used for purposes of this litigation or the leak investigation, and for no other purpose. The Subpoenas shall provide that any and all email communications produced in response to the Subpoenas ("Subpoenaed Information"), shall not be provided to the defendants YouTube, Inc., YouTube LLC and Google, Inc. ("Defendants") but shall be provided directly to FTI Consulting, Inc. ("FTI"), subject to the terms as further set forth in this Order. FTI shall maintain the Subpoenaed Information in strict confidence, and shall not disclose any part of the Subpoenaed Information to anyone, unless either (a) the disclosure is agreed to in writing pursuant to this Stipulation or as part of this Stipulation; or (b) the undersigned counsel of record and Fagan approve in writing such disclosure; or (c) the Court orders that Defendants may access and analyze the Subpoenaed Information. The provision of the Subpoenaed Information to FTI or to Defendants provided for above shall not to any extent waive or prejudice any privilege, immunity, confidentiality, privacy, or other protection claimed to be due by or to the Subpoenaed Information or by or to Tur or any other person or entity. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #155 and unsealed on 3/26/2010 by document #199 in 07-cv-3582) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/1/2010) (tro) Modified on 4/8/2010 (tro).
March 26, 2010 203 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Plaintiff Robert Tur ("Tur") agrees sign the consent forms attached to the December 16, 2009 letter from David H. Kramer to Noah Gitterman, consenting to the disclosure of email and phone records pursuant to subpoenas that will be served by YouTube, Inc. in the action titled The Football Association Premier League Limited et al v. YouTube, Inc. et al., Case No. 1:07-cv-03582 (LLS) (SDNY) (the "Subpoenas"). All other information produced to Defendants in response to the Subpoenas not addressed in paragraph 2 above shall be designated Highly Confidential under the Protective Order and shall be provided to Fagan and Proskauer within two days of Defendants' receipt of the information. All of the Protective Order's procedures governing such material will apply. Defendants agree that any information produced to Defendants in response to the Subpoenas (including but not limited to the Subpoenaed Information in paragraph 2 above) shall only be used for purposes of this litigation or the leak investigation, and for no other purpose. The Subpoenas shall provide that any and all email communications produced in response to the Subpoenas ("Subpoenaed Information"), shall not be provided to the defendants YouTube, Inc., YouTube LLC and Google, Inc. ("Defendants") but shall be provided directly to FTI Consulting, Inc. ("FTI"), subject to the terms as further set forth in this Order. FTI shall maintain the Subpoenaed Information in strict confidence, and shall not disclose any part of the Subpoenaed Information to anyone, unless either (a) the disclosure is agreed to in writing pursuant to this Stipulation or as part of this Stipulation; or (b) the undersigned counsel of record and Fagan approve in writing such disclosure; or (c) the Court orders that Defendants may access and analyze the Subpoenaed Information. The provision of the Subpoenaed Information to FTI or to Defendants provided for above shall not to any extent waive or prejudice any privilege, immunity, confidentiality, privacy, or other protection claimed to be due by or to the Subpoenaed Information or by or to Tur or any other person or entity. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #155 and unsealed on 3/26/2010 by document #199) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/1/2010) (tro) Modified on 4/8/2010 (tro).
March 26, 2010 202 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: An identical copy of the original forensic images of each of Robert Tur's computers or devices captured by Iris Data Services, LLC, will be provided to a New York office of FTI Consulting, Inc. by the latter of 5pm ET on December 4, 2009 or within 2 business days after the parties submit to the Court a fully executed Stipulation to be so ordered. FTI agrees to execute and be bound by the Protective Order entered in the action. The parties agree to cooperate to use their best efforts to present this stipulation for prompt so-ordering by the Court, including trying to arrange a time with Chambers for presenting and so-ordering same; and notwithstanding the above, if the Court refuses to so order the stipulation, FTI shall immediately return the Forensic Images to Iris. FTI shall do nothing but maintain such Forensic Images in its possession, in strict confidence and in a highly secure location, and shall not review, access, copy, image, investigate, analyze, transfer, or forward the Forensic Images or permit any other person or entity to do so, until either (a) the undersigned counsel of record and special counsel for Mr. Tur have executed a written agreement concerning any constraints posed by any alleged privilege, immunity, confidentiality, privacy, or other protection of the Forensic Images as further set forth in this Order....The provision of the Forensic Images to FTI provided for in paragraph 1 above shall not to any extent waive or prejudice any Protection claimed to be due by or to the Forensic Images or by or to Mr. Tur or any other person or entity. Mr. Tur shall be entitled to designate material or information, or any analyses or results thereof, as Highly confidential under the terms of the Protective Order. (This document was previously sealed in envelope #152 and unsealed on 3/26/2010 by document #199) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/14/09) (tro)
March 26, 2010 201 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER....regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (This document was previously sealed in envelope #149 and unsealed on 3/26/2010 by document #199) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/16/09) (tro)
March 26, 2010 Featured Case Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk. Transmitted re: 199 Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing or unsealing of document or case. (rjm)
March 26, 2010 199 Featured Case ORDER. On consent of the parties, all filings (Docket Nos. 149, 152, and 155) with respect to the allegations that Mr. Tur (alone or with others) violated the Court's May 14, 2008 Second Amended Stipulated Pre-Trial Protective Order, are unsealed. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/26/10) (rjm)
March 18, 2010 189 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 9 Exhibit 295-296 in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 297-299 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 300-302 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 303 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 304-306 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 307-310 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 311-314 to Schapiro Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 315-386 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 188 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 8 Exhibit 278 in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 279 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 280-281 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 282-283 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 284-286 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 287-290 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 291-294 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 187 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 7 Exhibit 259-261 in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 262-264 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 265-268 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 269-271 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 272-273 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 274-275 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 276-277 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 186 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 6 Exhibit 235-237 in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 238-241 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 242-246 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 247-250 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 251-254 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 255 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 256-258 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 185 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 5 Exhibit 216-217 in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 218-220 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 221-223 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 224-227 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 228 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 229-231 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 232-234 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 184 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 4 Exhibit 146-160 in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 161-170 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 171-177 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 178 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 179 Part 1 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 179 Part 2 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 180-210 to Schapiro Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 211-212 to Schapiro Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 213-215 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 183 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 3 Exhibit 85-91 in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 92-102 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 103-114 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 115-129 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 130-139 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 140-145 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 182 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 2 Exhibit 36 Part 1 in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 36 Part 2 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 37-42 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 43-56 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 57-68 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 69-81to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 82-84 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 181 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Schapiro Part 1 in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-10 to Schapiro Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 11-12 to Schapiro Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 13 Part 1 to Schapiro Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 13 Part 2 to Schapiro Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 14-20 to Schapiro Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 21-26 to Schapiro Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 27-35 to Schapiro Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 180 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Solomon in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 179 Featured Case DECLARATION of Suzanne Reider in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 178 Featured Case DECLARATION of Zahavah Levine in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Levine Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 177 Featured Case DECLARATION of Hunter Walk in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 176 Featured Case DECLARATION of David King in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 175 Featured Case DECLARATION of Christopher Maxcy in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 174 Featured Case DECLARATION of Micah Schaffer in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Schaffer Declaration)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 173 Featured Case DECLARATION of Chad Hurley in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Hurley Declaration Part 1, # 2 Exhibit to Hurley Declaration Part 2)(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 172 Featured Case DECLARATION of Roelof Botha in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 171 Featured Case DECLARATION of Daniel Ostrow in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 170 Featured Case DECLARATION of Arthur Chan in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 169 Featured Case RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 168 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 167 Featured Case MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Schapiro, Andrew)
March 18, 2010 166 Featured Case DECLARATION of Elizabeth Anne Figueira in supoport of Class Plaintiffs' Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts in support of Their Motion For Partial Summary Judgment in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit Exhibit 74, # 75 Exhibit Exhibit 75, # 76 Exhibit Exhibit 76, # 77 Exhibit Exhibit 77, # 78 Exhibit Exhibit 78, # 79 Exhibit Exhibit 79, # 80 Exhibit Exhibit 80, # 81 Exhibit Exhibit 81, # 82 Exhibit Exhibit 82, # 83 Exhibit Exhibit 83, # 84 Exhibit Exhibit 84, # 85 Exhibit Exhibit 85, # 86 Exhibit Exhibit 86, # 87 Exhibit Exhibit 87, # 88 Exhibit Exhibit 88, # 89 Exhibit Exhibit 89, # 90 Exhibit Exhibit 90, # 91 Exhibit Exhibit 91, # 92 Exhibit Exhibit 92, # 93 Exhibit Exhibit 93, # 94 Exhibit Exhibit 94, # 95 Exhibit Exhibit 95, # 96 Exhibit Exhibit 96, # 97 Exhibit Exhibit 97, # 98 Exhibit Exhibit 97 part 2, # 99 Exhibit Exhibit 98, # 100 Exhibit Exhibit 99, # 101 Exhibit Exhibit 100, # 102 Exhibit Exhibit 101, # 103 Exhibit Exhibit 102, # 104 Exhibit Exhibit 103, # 105 Exhibit Exhibit 104, # 106 Exhibit Exhibit 105, # 107 Exhibit Exhibit 106, # 108 Exhibit Exhibit 107, # 109 Exhibit Exhibit 108, # 110 Exhibit Exhibit 109, # 111 Exhibit Exhibit 110, # 112 Exhibit Exhibit 111, # 113 Exhibit Exhibit 112, # 114 Exhibit Exhibit 113, # 115 Exhibit Exhibit 114, # 116 Exhibit Exhibit 115, # 117 Exhibit Exhibit 116, # 118 Exhibit Exhibit 117, # 119 Exhibit Exhibit 118, # 120 Exhibit Exhibit 119, # 121 Exhibit Exhibit 120, # 122 Exhibit Exhibit 121, # 123 Exhibit Exhibit 122, # 124 Exhibit Exhibit 123, # 125 Exhibit Exhibit 124, # 126 Exhibit Exhibit 125, # 127 Exhibit Exhibit 126, # 128 Exhibit Exhibit 127, # 129 Exhibit Exhibit 128, # 130 Exhibit Exhibit 129, # 131 Exhibit Exhibit 130, # 132 Exhibit Exhibit 131, # 133 Exhibit Exhibit 132, # 134 Exhibit Exhibit 133, # 135 Exhibit Exhibit 134, # 136 Exhibit Exhibit 135, # 137 Exhibit Exhibit 136, # 138 Exhibit Exhibit 137, # 139 Exhibit Exhibit 138, # 140 Exhibit Exhibit 139, # 141 Exhibit Exhibit 140, # 142 Exhibit Exhibit 141, # 143 Exhibit Exhibit 142, # 144 Exhibit Exhibit 143, # 145 Exhibit Exhibit 144, # 146 Exhibit Exhibit 145, # 147 Exhibit Exhibit 146, # 148 Exhibit Exhibit 147, # 149 Exhibit Exhibit 148, # 150 Exhibit Exhibit 149, # 151 Exhibit Exhibit 150, # 152 Exhibit Exhibit 151, # 153 Exhibit Exhibit 152, # 154 Exhibit Exhibit 153, # 155 Exhibit Exhibit 154, # 156 Exhibit Exhibit 154 Part 2, # 157 Exhibit Exhibit 154 Part 3, # 158 Exhibit Exhibit 154 Part 4, # 159 Exhibit Exhibit 155, # 160 Exhibit Exhibit156, # 161 Exhibit Exhibit 157, # 162 Exhibit Exhibit 158, # 163 Exhibit Exhibit 159, # 164 Exhibit Exhibit 160, # 165 Exhibit Exhibit 161, # 166 Exhibit Exhibit 162, # 167 Exhibit Exhibit 163, # 168 Exhibit Exhibit 164, # 169 Exhibit Exhibit 165, # 170 Exhibit Exhibit 166, # 171 Exhibit Exhibit 167, # 172 Exhibit Exhibit 168, # 173 Exhibit Exhibit 169, # 174 Exhibit Exhibit 170, # 175 Exhibit Exhibit 171, # 176 Exhibit Exhibit 172, # 177 Exhibit Exhibit 173, # 178 Exhibit Exhibit 174, # 179 Exhibit Exhibit 175, # 180 Exhibit Exhibit 176, # 181 Exhibit Exhibit 177, # 182 Exhibit Exhibit 178, # 183 Exhibit Exhibit 179, # 184 Exhibit Exhibit 180, # 185 Exhibit Exhibit 181, # 186 Exhibit Exhibit 182, # 187 Exhibit Exhibits 183 - 187, # 188 Exhibit Exhibit 188)(Figueira, Elizabeth)
March 18, 2010 165 Featured Case RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Attachment is Part 2 of the Class Plaintiffs' Statement of Uncontroverted Material Facts in support of their motion for partial summary judgment)(Solomon, Louis)
March 18, 2010 164 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 158 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint... Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. (Solomon, Louis)
March 18, 2010 163 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW THEREFORE IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record, for the parties hereto, that the unsealing of the materials relating to the parties' summary judgment motions in the above referenced actions shall be implemented as follows: 1. To the extent practicable and with the express exception of exhibits in a format that cannot be filed via ECF and overly voluminous exhibits (e.g., large Excel spreadsheets), the parties intend to file all materials related to the parties' summary judgment motions via simultaneous ECF submissions on Thursday, March 18, 2010 at 1pm EDT with those portions of the materials the parties contend should remain under seal redacted; 2. To the extent any ECF "filing event" that occurs pursuant to Paragraph 1 would exceed 15MB, the parties will, unless they are unable to, break it into subparts with subsequent parts clearly identified. Those materials shall remain on the ECF system to allow continued public access. 3. So as to further facilitate public access to the parties' summary judgment submissions, the parties shall also file a complete set of all materials related to the parties' summary judgment motions, with those portions of the materials the parties contend should remain under seal redacted, manually with the Clerk of the Court in hard copy to the extent possible and CD/DVD as necessary, promptly after this Stipulation and Order is so-ordered by the Court, but in no event earlier than the filing in Paragraph 1; 4. The original materials filed under seal in connection with the parties' summary judgment motions shall remain under seal unless the Clerk of the Court is otherwise directed by the Court. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/18/2010) (tro)
March 15, 2010 162 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
March 10, 2010 161 Featured Case NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF SPECIFIED CLIPS WITH PREJUDICE, that pursuant to the Court's Order of December 18, 2009, which provides that "Plaintiffs may withdraw 'accused clips' by notice of their dismissal with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), which I will 'So Order," and which further provides that "Partial judgment in defendants' favor on those claims will not be entered, lest it give an appearance of having an effect beyond that accorded by Rule 54(b)," the plaintiffs in the above-captioned action ("Viacom") hereby provide notice of the dismissal with prejudice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) of the video clips listed on the attached Schedules A and B. Viacom respectfully requests that the Court "So Order" this notice of dismissal. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/10/10) (pl)
March 8, 2010 160 Featured Case NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AND ORDER: Granting pennission for John P. Coffey, Esq. to withdraw his appearance as Co-Lead Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs, Named Plaintiffs and the Prospective Class in the above-captioned action. Mr. Coffey has retired from the law firm effective October 16, 2009 and filed a Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance electronically with the Court on October 21, 2009, Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP continues to serve as Co-Lead Counsel through its attorneys listed below, who request that all future correspondence and papers in this action continue to be directed to them. Attorney John Patrick Coffey terminated. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/8/10) (db)
March 5, 2010 159 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
March 5, 2010 158 Featured Case MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment dismissing with prejudice Defendants' First Defense asserted in Defendants' Answer to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co..(Solomon, Louis)
March 5, 2010 157 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Amy McMillen on behalf of The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co. (McMillen, Lauren)
March 4, 2010 156 Featured Case PREMIER LEAGUE PLAINTIFFS' AND YOUTUBE'S JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties that the class certification and summary judgment shall be briefed in accordance with the following schedule and additional understandings, as set forth in this stipulation. Motions due by 3/26/2010. Replies due by 6/11/2010. Responses due by 5/7/2010. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/4/2010) (jpo)
February 1, 2010 155 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
January 28, 2010 154 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Seymour Fagan dated 12/28/09 re: Request to correct deposition and extension of time to respond to the premotion conference request. ENDORSEMENT: In light of the other demands upon this time, and his status as a fact witness for Mr. Tur, there may be questions whether he should act Pro Hac Vice in this case for Mr. Tur. In any event, Mr. Tur's time to correct his deposition and to respond to the premotion conference request is extended to February 1, 2010. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/14/10) (db)
January 28, 2010 153 Featured Case MOTION for Christopher E. Coleman to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, Stage Three Music (US), Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stellings, David)
December 16, 2009 152 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
December 8, 2009 151 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/13/2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (tve)
December 8, 2009 150 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/16/2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (tve)
November 17, 2009 149 Featured Case SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jri)
November 16, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Discovery Hearing held on 11/16/2009. (mro)
November 13, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Hearing re: protective order held on 11/13/2009. (mro)
November 13, 2009 148 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT. Accordingly there would be no justice in retroactively applying the December 18 fact discovery deadline, leaving the defendants with now only 36 days to work on 198 new works-in-suit and 1548 allegedly infringing video clips. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is granted, and on consideration of the intervening circumstance the Court adheres to the determination that the identification of the additional works-in-suit was untimely, and the claims regarding those works are excluded. Motions terminated: 142 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc.. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/12/09) (rjm)
November 12, 2009 147 Featured Case STIPULATION & ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN OF DEFENDANTS' COMMON INTEREST PRIVILEGE ASSERTIONS. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned counsel of record, for the parties hereto, to the following terms: Defendants agree to produce documents described on the July 27 Privilege Log without redaction within 14 days of the execution of this stipulation. Unless Defendants expressly indicate to the contrary, the production of documents pursuant to this Paragraph is not an indication that Defendants have withdrawn their initial claims of privilege, although Defendants agree that they will no longer assert such a claim with respect to these documents... and as further set forth regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of this STIPULATION & ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN OF DEFENDANTS' COMMON INTEREST PRIVILEGE ASSERTIONS. Relates to 07-2103, 07-3582. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/10/09) (rjm)
November 11, 2009 146 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 142 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. (Solomon, Louis)
November 10, 2009 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on October 23, 2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Original filed in civil case 07cv2103, document #158)(mro)
November 9, 2009 145 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 142 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
November 6, 2009 144 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion for Reconsideration and Memorandum of Law in Support served on Attorney-Andrew H. Schapiro, Esq. on 11/6/09. Service was accepted by Christine Hernandez, Esq.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. (Solomon, Louis)
November 6, 2009 143 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 142 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. Plaintiff X-Ray Dog Music, Inc,'s Memorandum in Support of Its Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. (Solomon, Louis)
November 6, 2009 142 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration re; 140 Endorsed Letter,. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co..(Solomon, Louis)
October 30, 2009 141 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 10/15/09 re: counsel asks that the Court find XRD's September 9, 2009 identification of new alleged infringements untimely. (djc)
October 28, 2009 140 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Hal S. Shaftel dated 10/9/09 re: counsel requests that the Court find that XRD's complete identification of works-in-suit is timely for purposes of this case. ENDORSEMENT: The class plaintiff's request that the Court find their identification of the additional works-in-suit timely (their October 9, 2009 letter to the court) is denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/27/09) (djc)
October 21, 2009 139 Featured Case NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of John P. Coffey. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Browne, John)
October 5, 2009 138 Featured Case ORDER that, consistent with Paragraph 1 of the July 7, 2009 Stipulation, the Viacom Plaintiffs will produce all MSO Agreement Materials in their possession, custody or control, related to the following multiple system cable operators and satellite television providers by no later than October 15, 2009: Time Warner Cable, Inc. and Verizon Communications Inc. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/5/2009) (jmi)
August 25, 2009 137 Featured Case STIPULATION & ORDER REGARDING VIACOM'S COPYRIGHT MONITORING PRIVILEGE ASSERTIONS: The terms set forth herein shall govern the stipulated relief to be entered by the Court concerning the July 27 motion. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/24/09) (dle) (dle)
August 7, 2009 136 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION OF JENNER & BLOCK LLP FOR LEAVE TO WITHDRAW DONALD B. VERRILLI, JR., STEVEN B. FABRIZIO, AND PETER H. HANNA AS COUNSEL re: (132 in 07cv2103) Motion. Upon the motion of Jenner & Block LLP, and there being no opposition, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Donald B. Verrilli, Jr., Steven B. Fabrizio, and Peter H. Hanna are granted leave to withdraw as counsel for the plaintiffs in the above-captioned action. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/7/09) (tro)
July 28, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/28/2009. (tro)
July 7, 2009 135 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING PRIVILEGE LOGS. The following procedures shall apply to the creation and production of privilege logs in these actions. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/7/09) (djc)
July 7, 2009 134 Featured Case *VACATED AS PREMATURE* CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Google, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC against Alley Music Corporation, Bourne Co., Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., Edward B. Marks Music Company, Federation Francaise De Tennis, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., National Music Publishers' Association, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Football Association Premier League Limited, The Music Force LLC, The Music Force Media Group LLC, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Robert Tur that defts' motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted and plaintiffs' claims are dismissed (Judgment vacated on 7/8/09 as premature). (Signed by J. Michael McMahon on 7/7/09) (jf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2009: # 1 notice of right to appeal) (jf). Modified on 7/8/2009 (ml).
July 7, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 133 Memorandum & Opinion, to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (jmi)
July 7, 2009 133 Featured Case OPINION and ORDER: #97713 For the reasons sec forth above, the issues raised by defendants' motion (Docket No. 120) are disposed of as follows: (1) plaintiffs' complaint is deemed amended to include the material set forth in Mr. Weigartens June 4, 2009 Declaration and the representation of plaintiffs' counsel; (2) plaintiffs' Copyright Act claims for statutory damages are dismissed with respect to all unregistered foreign works, except those claims based on unregistered foreign works which qualify for the live broadcast exemption" in Section 411 (c) of the Act; and (3) plaintiffs' claims for punitive damages under the Copyright Act are dismissed. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/3/2009) (jmi) Modified on 7/8/2009 (jab). Modified on 7/8/2009 (jmi).
June 10, 2009 132 Featured Case REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Oliver Weingarten in Opposition re: 120 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Solomon, Louis)
June 10, 2009 131 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 120 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Class Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply To YouTube's Motion For Judgment On The Pleadings Regarding Certain Monetary Relief Available For Unregistered "Foreign" Works. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Solomon, Louis)
June 9, 2009 130 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Louis M. Solomon dated 6/4/09 re: Request permission to file a 3 page sur reply. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/8/09) (db)
May 29, 2009 129 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 120 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Schapiro, Andrew)
May 8, 2009 128 Featured Case DECLARATION of Andrew Shaw in Opposition re: 120 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Solomon, Louis)
May 8, 2009 127 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 120 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Stage Three Music (US), Inc., Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Appendix to Memorandum of Law)(Solomon, Louis)
April 30, 2009 126 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Louis M. Solomon dated 4/29/09 re: The parties have conferred and agree to Plaintiffs' proposed amended briefing schedule relating to Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings on Plaintiffs' punitive damages claim as follows: Plaintiffs' opposing brief: 5/8/09; Defendants' reply brief: 5/22/09. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/29/09) (tro) Modified on 5/1/2009 (tro).
April 20, 2009 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 123 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jpo)
April 20, 2009 123 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE WRITTEN MOTION granting 119 Motion for Eric R. Haren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/20/2009) (jpo)
April 15, 2009 124 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/2/2009 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (jmi)
April 15, 2009 122 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 4/15/2009 re: Counsel for defendant You Tube writes requesting that the Court confirm that the 225 hours allotted to YouTube for depositions of the "Collective Plaintiff" applies only to depositions of Viacom, Premier Lounge, and Bourne; that the depositions of the 15 plaintiffs added to this case after the Rule 16(b) Order was entered are not included within the 225 hours allotted to YouTube for depositions of the "Collective Plaintiffs"; and that the parties should negotiate in good faith towards an allocation of remaining hours for depositions of the latter-added plaintiffs, on the basis of whatever is realistically needed. ENDORSEMENT: That is correct. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/15/2009) (tve)
April 3, 2009 121 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 120 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Mancini, A.)
April 3, 2009 120 Featured Case MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Mancini, A.)
April 2, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Discovery Hearing held and concluded on 4/2/2009. (mro)
April 1, 2009 119 Featured Case MOTION for Eric Haren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (dle)
March 12, 2009 125 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/27/09 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (db)
March 10, 2009 118 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 3/9/09. re: At the conference held on February 27, 2009, the Court requested briefing on two issues relating to YouTube's motion for judgment on the pleadings/to strike Class Plaintiffs' punitive damages allegations. The parties have conferred and agreed to the following briefing schedule: YouTube's Moving Brief: April 3, 2009 Class Plaintiffs' Opposing Brief: May 1, 2009 YouTube's Reply Brief: May 15, 2009 ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Motions due by 4/3/2009. Replies due by 5/15/2009. Responses due by 5/1/2009) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/10/09) (js)
March 5, 2009 117 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow dated 3/1/09 re: Application for Reconsideration. ENDORSEMENT: This application for reconsideration is DENIED, for the reasons stated in my February 19, 2009 Memorandum Endorsement. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/5/09) Copies Mailed by Chambers to Lucas-Morrow.(db)
February 27, 2009 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/27/2009 on defendant's motion to strike punitive damages. (mro)
February 20, 2009 116 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 133 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: Treating Ms. Lucas-Harrow's letter dated January 20, 2009 as a pro se motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 19 to join both herself and the United States Department of Justice ("DOJ") as necessary and indispensable parties in these related actions alleging violations of the Copyright Act of 1976 on the YouTube website, the motion is denied. Ms. Lucas-Morrow' s pro se application for leave to move to join herself and the DOJ as parties in these cases is denied. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/19/2009) (tve)
February 20, 2009 115 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow dated 1/20/2009 re: Pro Se Movant writes seeking the Court's permission to submit a motion to join both the United Department of Justice ("DOJ") and Movant as indispensable parties under Federal Rule 19 in the above captioned related actions. (tve)
February 20, 2009 114 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Sandra Ann Bradshaw Lucas-Morrow dated 1/20/2009 re: Pro Se Movant writes seeking the Court's permission to submit a motion to join both the United Department of Justice ("DOJ") and Movant as indispensable parties under Federal Rule 19 in the above captioned related actions. ENDORSEMENT: To The Clerk of the Court: Please docket and place this document in public file. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/20/2009) (tve)
January 30, 2009 113 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher Lovell on behalf of The Music Force LLC, The Music Force Media Group LLC. New Address: Lovell Stewart Halebian LLP, 61 Broadway, Suite 501, New York, New York, USA 10006, 212-608-1900. (Lovell, Christopher)
January 16, 2009 112 Featured Case ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. Related document: 106 Amended Complaint,,,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Murbo Music Publishing, Inc..(Mancini, A.)
January 5, 2009 111 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for Defendants to serve their answer to the Second Amended Complaint is hereby extended until and including 1/16/09. Google, Inc. answer due 1/16/2009; Youtube, Inc. answer due 1/16/2009. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/31/08) (cd)
December 8, 2008 110 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David S Stellings on behalf of The Football Association Premier League Limited. New Address: Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP, 250 Hudson Street, 8th Floor, New York, New York, USA 10013-1413, 212-355-9500. (Stellings, David)
December 5, 2008 109 Featured Case NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David S Stellings on behalf of The Football Association Premier League Limited. New Address: Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein, LLP, 250 Hudson Street, 8th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10013-1413, 212-355-9500. (Stellings, David)
November 26, 2008 107 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Second Amended Class Action Complaint (Redacted), Second Amended Complaint (filed under seal) served on Andrew Shapiro, Esq., A. John Mancini, Esq., Mayer Brown LLP, 1675 Broadway, N.Y., N.Y.10019 and David H. Kramer, Esq., Michael H. Rubin, Esq., Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati,650 Page Mill Road, Palo Alto, CA. 94303 on 11/26/08. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co.. (Bloom, Elise)
November 26, 2008 106 Featured Case SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 58 Amended Complaint,, against Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Murbo Music Publishing, Inc., Bourne Co.. Related document: 58 Amended Complaint,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Scottish Premier League Limited, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited.(dle) (dle).
November 25, 2008 105 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER Pursuant to this Court's ruling on the record at the November 14, 2008 conference, the parties hereto consent to Plaintiffs' f1Iing of the Second Amended Complaint. A redacted version of the Second Amended Complaint, annexed hereto as Exhibit A, shall be filed publicly, and an unredacted version of the Second Amended Complaint shall be filed under seal pursuant to the Second Amended Pre-Trial Protective Order, paragraph 1, 3 and 8. Upon filing of the Second Amended Complaint, plaintiff The Scottish Premier League Limited shall be withdrawn solely in its capacity as a Named Plaintiff in this action (but not as a member of the putative class) and shall be deleted from the caption of the case. Defendants' time to serve and tile a response to the Second Amended Complaint in the manner permitted by the Federal Rules shall be extended to forty (40) days after the filing of the Second Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/25/08) (mme)
October 3, 2008 104 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Michael Doherty on behalf of Cal IV Entertainment, LLC (Doherty, Kevin)
October 2, 2008 103 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald E. Martin on behalf of Cal IV Entertainment, LLC (Martin, Gerald)
September 24, 2008 102 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION OF GERALD E. MARTIN PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: granting 96 Motion for Gerald E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/18/2008) (tve)
September 22, 2008 101 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on July 15, 2008 3:10 p.m. before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (mro)
September 18, 2008 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 100 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (mme)
September 18, 2008 100 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION OF KEVIN MICHAEL DOHERTY PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 95 Motion for Kevin Michael Doherty to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/18/08) (mme)
September 12, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 9/12/2008. (js)
September 5, 2008 99 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/01/08 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ama)
September 5, 2008 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 96 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 8/29/08, Receipt Number 661795. (Quintero, Marcos)
September 5, 2008 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 95 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 8/29/08, Receipt Number 661794. (Quintero, Marcos)
September 4, 2008 98 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Defendants may restrict class plaintiffs from showing portions of documents, depositions, transcripts, or other materials that defendants produce in this action to the extent that such materials contain the information further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/4/08) (mme)
September 4, 2008 97 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants may restrict Class Plaintiffs from showing portions of documents, deposition transcripts or other materials that Defendants produce in this action to the extent that such materials contain the following information, other than information that is publicly available to McLaughlin, as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/4/2008) (jpo)
August 29, 2008 96 Featured Case MOTION for an order for Gerald E. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice; w/attch. Affidavit in support. Document filed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC.(pl)
August 29, 2008 95 Featured Case MOTION for an order for Kevin Michael Doherty to Appear Pro Hac Vice; affidavit in support. Document filed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC.(pl)
August 26, 2008 94 Featured Case MOTION for Melissa A. Cox to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Viacom International, et al. (dle) Modified on 9/10/2008 (dle).
August 15, 2008 93 Featured Case LETTER addressed to Admission Clerk from Christina Connolly Sharp dated 8/11/2008 re: I write to request two changes to the docket in the above-captioned matter. First, I was admitted pro hac vice in this matter on November 13, 2007. I now request that my pro hac vice admission reflect my name change my last name to Christina H. Connolly Sharp. Document filed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC.(jmi)
August 12, 2008 92 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Murbo Music Publishing, Inc..(Solomon, Louis)
August 12, 2008 91 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC.(Sharp, Christina)
August 12, 2008 90 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christina H. C. Sharp on behalf of Cal IV Entertainment, LLC (Sharp, Christina)
August 12, 2008 89 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Music Force LLC.(McGrath, Christopher)
August 6, 2008 88 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Federation Francaise De Tennis.(Solomon, Louis)
August 6, 2008 87 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc..(Solomon, Louis)
August 6, 2008 86 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by X-Ray Dog Music, Inc..(Solomon, Louis)
August 5, 2008 85 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/01/08 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ama)
August 5, 2008 84 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Edward Hough on behalf of National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation (Hough, James)
August 5, 2008 83 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation.(Hough, James)
August 1, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Discovery Hearing held on 8/1/2008 at 3:30pm. (tro)
July 24, 2008 81 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/15/08 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ama)
July 22, 2008 80 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David S Stellings on behalf of National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation (Stellings, David)
July 17, 2008 79 Featured Case STIPULATION REGARDING July 1/2008 OPINION AND ORDER with respect to Section 4 of the Court's Opinion and Order dated 7/1/08 in light of certain user privacy concerns which have been raised. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/17/08) (cd)
July 15, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/15/2008. (pl)
July 7, 2008 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/23/08 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Original Transcript filed in 07cv2103 doc.#118) (ama)
July 2, 2008 78 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER #96195: For the reasons set forth in this Order; (1) The cross-motion for a protective order barring disclosure of the source code for the YouTube.com search function is granted, and the motion to compel production of that search code is denied; (2) The motion to compel production of the source code for the Video ID program is denied; (3) The motion to compel production of all removed videos is granted; (4) The motion to compel production of all data from the Logging database concerning each time a YouTube video has been viewed on the YouTube website or through embedding on a third-party website is granted; (5) the motion to compel production of those data fields which defendants have agreed to produce for the works-in-suit, for all videos that have been posted to the YouTube website is denied; (6) The motion to compel production of the schema for the Google Video Advertising database is denied; (7) The motion to compel production of the schema for the Google Video Content database is granted; and (8) The motion to compel production of the private videos and data related to them is denied at this time except to the extent it seeks production of the specified non-content data about such videos. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/1/2008) (tve)
June 24, 2008 77 Featured Case ORDER; that the issues presented in defendants' motion to Compel dated 2/8/08 are disposed of by the rulings stated upon the record in open court today. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/23/08) (pl)
June 23, 2008 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Pretrial Conference held on 6/23/2008. Next conference set for 9/5/08 at 3:00 and 10/28/08 at 3:00. (jmi)
June 11, 2008 76 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name. Document filed by The Music Force LLC. (Graubart, Jeffrey)
May 15, 2008 75 Featured Case SECOND AMENDED STIPULATED PRETRIAL PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/14/08) (cd)
April 2, 2008 74 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Susan J. Kohlman dated 4/1/2008 re: Requesting that the Court reconsider its order granting Defendants leave to file a surreply in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to compel. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 4/1/2008) (jpo)
March 31, 2008 73 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Andrew H. Schapiro dated 3/28/2008 re: Requesting permission to file a sur-reply responding to the new material that Plaintiffs have presented. ENDORSEMENT: YouTube may file a sur-reply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 3/31/2008) (jpo) Modified on 4/2/2008 (kkc).
March 13, 2008 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/22/08 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Orig. doc. filed in case no. 07 cv 2103, doc. #97)(ae)
February 26, 2008 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 71 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jpo)
February 26, 2008 71 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 55 Motion for Michael H. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. No opposition. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/22/2008) (jpo)
February 26, 2008 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 70 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jpo)
February 26, 2008 70 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: It is hereby ordered that Leo Cunningham is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendants. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 2/22/2008) (jpo)
February 11, 2008 68 Featured Case MOTION to Compel. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Bourne Co..(Verrilli, Donald)
January 29, 2008 67 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Susan J. Kohlmann dated 1/18/08 re: the plaintiffs in actions 07cv2103 & 07cv3582 have agreed to submit a consolidated brief. The parties have agreed on a proposed briefing schedule as follows: Moving Briefs 2/8/08; Opposition Briefs 2/28/08 and Reply Briefs - 3/7/08. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/25/08) (pl)
January 14, 2008 66 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEYS the undersigned hereby stipulate and consent to the substitution of the law firm of Mayer Brown LLP, by and through its attorneys, Richard Ben-Veniste, Andrew H. Schapire, and A. John P. Mancini, as attorneys of record for Defendants YouTube, Inc., YouTube, LLC, and Google Inc. in the above-captioned action in place and instead of the law firm of Bartlit Beck Herman Palencher & Scott LLP, and its attorneys, Philip S. Beck, Mark S. Ouweleen, Rebecca Weinstein Bacon, Shayna S. Cook, and Carrie A. Jablonski. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/11/2008) (jmi)
December 26, 2007 65 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by A. John P. Mancini on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC (Mancini, A.)
December 4, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 64 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jco)
December 4, 2007 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 60 Motion for Dylan J. Liddiard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 12/4/07) (jco)
December 3, 2007 63 Featured Case ANSWER to Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. Related document: 58 Amended Complaint,, filed by Alley Music Corporation, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Edward B. Marks Music Company, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Scottish Premier League Limited, National Music Publishers' Association, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, The Music Force LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., The Music Force Media Group LLC, Bourne Co., Federation Francaise De Tennis, Robert Tur, The Football Association Premier League Limited.(Kramer, David)
November 30, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 62 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (jmi)
November 30, 2007 62 Featured Case ORDER granting 59 Motion for Christina H. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/30/2007) (jmi)
November 21, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 60 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 11/14/2007, Receipt Number 632862. (jd)
November 21, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,, in the amount of $25.00, paid on 11/13/2007, Receipt Number 632447. (jd)
November 14, 2007 61 Featured Case MOTION for Leo Cunningham to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (jco)
November 14, 2007 60 Featured Case MOTION for Dylan J. Liddiard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (jco)
November 13, 2007 59 Featured Case MOTION for Christina H. Connolly to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., The Football Association Premier League Limited, Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., Bourne Co. (jco)
November 13, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 10/26/2007, Receipt Number 631286. (jd)
November 8, 2007 57 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Summons in a Civil Case and Amended Complaint served on David H. Kramer, Tonia Ouellette Klausner, from the firm of Wilson, Sonsini, Goodrich & Rosati PC, Phillip S. Beck of the Law Firm of Bartlit, Beck, Herman, Palenchar & Scott LLP and Hohn H. Hinderaker of the Firm Fabgre & Benson LLP. on November 7th 2007. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co.. (Solomon, Louis)
November 7, 2007 58 Featured Case AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. Document filed by Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc., Robert Tur, National Music Publishers' Association, The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization, Edward B. Marks Music Company, Freddy Bienstock Music Company, Alley Music Corporation, X-Ray Dog Music, Inc., Federation Francaise De Tennis, The Scottish Premier League Limited, The Music Force Media Group LLC, Sin-Drome Records, Ltd., The Music Force LLC, Cal IV Entertainment, LLC, The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Bourne Co., The Football Association Premier League Limited. (jco)
November 6, 2007 56 Featured Case ORDER ON CONSENT TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT: Pursuant to the Court's rulings on the record at the October 26, 2007 conference, the parties hereto consent to plaintiffs' filing of an Amended Complaint annexed hereto as Exhibit A. Defendants' time to serve and file a response to the Amended Complaint in the manner permitted by the Federal Rules shall be extended to December 3, 2007. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 11/6/07) (tro)
October 26, 2007 55 Featured Case MOTION for Michael H. Rubin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (jco)
October 26, 2007 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton : Interim Pretrial Conference held on 10/26/2007. (js)
October 12, 2007 Featured Case ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number [Protective Order] 54. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (js)
September 27, 2007 53 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys for the respctive parties that the parties shall have until October 5, 2007 to stipulate to an ESI Plan. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/26/2007) (jpo) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/25/2007) (jpo)
September 12, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 52 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (kco)
September 12, 2007 52 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Motion for James J. Hartnett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/11/07) (kco)
September 12, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 51 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (kco)
September 12, 2007 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion for John H. Hinderaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/11/07) (kco)
September 11, 2007 50 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven John D'Onofrio on behalf of The Music Force LLC (D'Onofrio, Steven)
September 11, 2007 49 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Lowell Graubart on behalf of The Music Force LLC (Graubart, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2007 48 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Michael McGrath on behalf of The Music Force LLC (McGrath, Christopher)
August 31, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 47 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $50.00, paid on 08/23/2007, Receipt Number 625287. (jd)
August 23, 2007 47 Featured Case MOTION for James J. Hartnett, IV to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(jco)
August 22, 2007 46 Featured Case MOTION for John H. Hinderaker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(jco)
August 13, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 45 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
August 13, 2007 45 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 41 Motion for David H. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/10/07) (js)
August 13, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 44 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (js)
August 13, 2007 44 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 42 Motion for Keith E. Eggleton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/10/07) (js)
August 9, 2007 43 Featured Case JOINT RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING ORDER:Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2007. Deposition due by 12/7/2008. Discovery due by 12/7/2008. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/8/07) (jco)
August 6, 2007 Featured Case Transmission to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Transmitted re: 38 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, 37 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, 40 Memo Endorsement, 36 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, 39 Order Admitting Attorney Pro Hac Vice, to the Attorney Admissions Clerk for updating of Attorney Information. (tro)
August 6, 2007 40 Featured Case MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 29 MOTION for Mark S. Ouweleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Youtube, LLC, Youtube, Inc., Google, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. No opposition. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/6/07) (tro)
August 6, 2007 39 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. Attorney Rebecca Weinstein Bacon for Google, Inc. and Youtube, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. This action has been assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) and as such, counsel shall immediately register for an ECF password. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/6/07) (tro)
August 6, 2007 38 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. Attorney Carrie A. Jablonski for Google, Inc. and Youtube, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. This action has been assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system and as such, counsel shall immediately register for an ECF password. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/6/07) (tro)
August 6, 2007 37 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. Attorney Philip S. Beck for Google, Inc. and Youtube, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. This action has been assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system and as such, counsel shall immediately register for an ECF passoword. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/6/07) (tro)
August 6, 2007 36 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION. Attorney Shayna Susanne Cook for Google, Inc. and Youtube, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. This action has been assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system and as such, counsel shall immediately register for an ECF password. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/6/07) (tro)
August 2, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK in the amount of $50.00, paid on 07/25/2007, Receipt Number 622172. Paid Pro Hac Vice for David H. Kramer and Keith E. Eggleton. (jd)
July 31, 2007 35 Featured Case NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Jerry L. Dasti of Proskauer Rose LLP as counsel of record for lead plaintiffs The Football Association Premier League Limited and Bourne Co. and the prospective plaintiff class. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/30/07) (cd)
July 30, 2007 Featured Case CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 32 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $125.00, paid on 07/24/2007, Receipt Number 622076. (jd)
July 27, 2007 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/27/2007. Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2007 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (db)
July 27, 2007 34 Featured Case ORDER APPOINTING INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL; plaintiff's motion for appointment of interim class counsel pursuant to FRCP 23(g)(2)(A) is granted and Proskauer Rose LLP and Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP are designated interim counsel to act on behalf of the putative class. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/27/07) (kco)
July 25, 2007 42 Featured Case MOTION for Keith E. Eggleton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(jco)
July 25, 2007 41 Featured Case MOTION for David H. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (jco) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2007 (Correa, Julie).
July 24, 2007 33 Featured Case MOTION for Carrie A. Jablonski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(jco)
July 24, 2007 32 Featured Case MOTION for Philip S. Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(jco)
July 24, 2007 31 Featured Case MOTION for Rebecca Weinstein Bacon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(jco) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2007 (Correa, Julie).
July 24, 2007 30 Featured Case MOTION for Shayna S. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(jco)
July 24, 2007 29 Featured Case MOTION for Mark S. Ouweleen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(jco)
July 19, 2007 28 Featured Case RESPONSE re: 16 Memorandum of Law Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Appoinment of Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
July 11, 2007 25 Featured Case RESPONSE re: 16 Memorandum of Law Response of Cal IV Entertainment, LLC In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Appointment Of Interim Class Counsel Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(2)(A). Document filed by Cal IV Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration Of Daniel Hill In Support)(Levine, Jonathan)
July 11, 2007 24 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 Memorandum of Law, 17 Declaration, 15 Order to Show Cause,, 19 Stipulation and Order, Terminate Hearings, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,,, Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum of Law-Together With Four Additional Supporting Declarations-In Support of Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)(2)(A). Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration Of Robert Tur In Support# 2 Exhibit B Declaration of Daniel Hill in Support# 3 Exhibit C Declaration of David J. Grisman in Support# 4 Exhibit D Declaration of Henry Marx on Behalf of the The Music Force LLC in Support)(Solomon, Louis)
July 11, 2007 23 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan K. Levine on behalf of Cal IV Entertainment, LLC (Levine, Jonathan)
July 9, 2007 22 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Tonia Klausner dated 7/5/07 re: defts YouTube and Google request for a pre motion conference. ENDORSEMENT: the complaint is sufficiently definitive to be readily susceptible to answer, without need for a more definite statement. Defts' time is extended to 7/9. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/6/07) (cd).
July 9, 2007 21 Featured Case ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
July 9, 2007 20 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC.(Klausner, Tonia Maria)
July 6, 2007 27 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co. (cd)
July 6, 2007 26 Featured Case DECLARATION of John Coffey and Louis Solomon in support of motion for appointment of Interim Class Counsel. Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co. (cd)
July 6, 2007 19 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER; plaintiffs in this action and counsel for plaintiff Cal IV in the Tennessee action shall serve any supplemental papers on the motion by 7/11/2007; defendants shall serve any papers concerning said motion by 7/19/2007; and any replies from plaintiffs or other interested parties shall be served on or before 7/25/2007. Accordingly, the Court conference scheduled for 7/10/2007 is adjourned. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/5/07) (kco)
July 5, 2007 18 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emily Alice Smith on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC (Smith, Emily)
July 5, 2007 17 Featured Case DECLARATION of John P. Coffey and Louis Solomon in Support of Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P.23(G)(2)(A). Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)(Solomon, Louis)
July 5, 2007 16 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of Motion for Appointment of Interim Class Counsel Pursuant to FED.R.CIV.P23(g)(2)(A). Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co.. (Solomon, Louis)
July 3, 2007 15 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; defendants You Tube, Inc., YouTube, LLC, and Google, Inc. and all other interested parties shall show cause as to why the Court should not enter an order approving the schedule requested in the letter submitted by plaintiffs to the Honorable Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/29/2007, which requested leave to file a motion to designate Proskauer Rose LLP and Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP as Interim Class Counsel pursuant to FRCP 23(g)(2)(A). Show Cause Hearing set for 7/10/2007 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/3/07) (kco)
July 2, 2007 14 Featured Case ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from John P. Coffey dated 6/29/07 re: We write to jointly as co-counsel in this action for PL/B Plaintiffs and the prospective Class. We seek to leave to file a motion to appoint Proskauer Rose LLP. and Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP. interim Class counsel in this action. FRCP 23(g)(2)(A) ("The Court may designate interim counsel to act on behalf of the putative Class before determining whether to certify the action as a class action). ENDORSEMENT: Leave to file the motion is GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 6/29/07) (js)
May 31, 2007 13 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Lovell on behalf of The Music Force LLC (Lovell, Christopher)
May 21, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/27/2007 11:30 AM before Judge Louis L. Stanton. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/21/2007) (jar)
May 21, 2007 10 Featured Case NOTICE of Withdrawal of Jerry L. Dasti of Proskauer Rose LLP As Counsel of Record For Lead Plaintiffs The Football Association Premier League Limited And Bourne Co. And The Prospective Plaintiff Class. Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co.. (Dasti, Jerry)
May 18, 2007 9 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER by and between the undersigned that Defendants, having acknowledged service of process upon each of them. shall have until July 5 2007, to move against or otherwise respond to the complaint. The parties agree that the foregoing extension shall not prejudice or be claimed to affect plaintiffs' stated intention to coordinate this action and the action styled Viacom Int'l Inc. V. YouTube, Inc.,et al., 07 Civ. 02103 (S.D.N.Y.) (LLS) (the "Viacom Action") (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/14/2007) (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/14/2007) (jmi) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2007 (Miles, Janeen). Modified on 6/4/2007 (Miles, Janeen).
May 16, 2007 Featured Case Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (laq)
May 16, 2007 12 Featured Case NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq)
May 16, 2007 Featured Case CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:07-cv-02103-LLS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (laq)
May 15, 2007 Featured Case Set Answer Due Date purs. to 8 Stipulation and Order, as to Google, Inc. answer due on 7/5/2007; Youtube, Inc. answer due on 7/5/2007; Youtube, LLC answer due on 7/5/2007. (jar)
May 15, 2007 8 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants, having acknowledged service of process upon each of them, shall have until 7/5/2007, to move against or respond to the complaint. The parties agree that the extention shall not prejudice or be claimed to affect plts' stated intention to coordinat this action and the action Viacom Int'l Inc. v. YouTube, Inc. et al., 07cv2103(SDNY). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 5/15/2007) (jar)
May 15, 2007 7 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Tonia Maria Ouellette Klausner on behalf of Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC (Klausner, Tonia Maria)
May 14, 2007 6 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Google, Inc. served on 5/7/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch, Authorized Agent. Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited; Bourne Co.. (Solomon, Louis)
May 14, 2007 5 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Youtube, LLC served on 5/7/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. Service was accepted by Magaret Wilson, Process Specialist, CT Corporation. Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited; Bourne Co.. (Solomon, Louis)
May 14, 2007 4 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Youtube, Inc. served on 5/7/2007, answer due 5/28/2007. Service was accepted by Rhonda McCarty, Authorized Agent, CSC Lawyers, Inc.. Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited. (Solomon, Louis)
May 4, 2007 Featured Case Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the filing of this action. (tro)
May 4, 2007 3 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited.(tro) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2007 (Rodriguez, Tiffany).
May 4, 2007 2 Featured Case RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Bourne Co..(tro)
May 4, 2007 Featured Case Case Designated ECF. (tro)
May 4, 2007 Featured Case CASE REFERRED TO Judge Louis L. Stanton as possibly related to 1:07-cv-2103. (tro)
May 4, 2007 Featured Case SUMMONS ISSUED as to Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (tro)
May 4, 2007 1 Featured Case COMPLAINT against Google, Inc., Youtube, Inc., Youtube, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 614018)Document filed by The Football Association Premier League Limited, Bourne Co..(tro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: The Football Association Premier League Limited et al v. Youtube, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Scottish Premier League Limited
Represented By: Christina H. Connolly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: X-Ray Dog Music, Inc.
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alley Music Corporation
Represented By: Max Wallace Berger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sin-Drome Records, Ltd.
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Music Force LLC
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Rodgers & Hammerstein Organization
Represented By: Max Wallace Berger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federation Francaise De Tennis
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cal IV Entertainment, LLC
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Music Force Media Group LLC
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward B. Marks Music Company
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Bienstock Music Company
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bourne Co.
Represented By: Eric Todd Kanefsky
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherry Lane Music Publishing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Tur
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Music Publishers' Association
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Football Association Premier League Limited
Represented By: Louis M. Solomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google, Inc.
Represented By: Leo Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Youtube, LLC
Represented By: A. John P. Mancini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]