Families for Freedom et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al

Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Customs and Border Protection and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, Families for Freedom, Mary Doe and John Doe
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv02705
Filed: March 26, 2010
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Nassau
Presiding Judge: Shira A. Scheindlin
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part re: 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. ( Conference set for 7/22/2011 at 05:00 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/16/11) (cd)
September 30, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 46 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 41 Order Motion for Partial Reconsideration. MOTION for Reconsideration re; 41 Order Motion for Partial Reconsideration filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforc ement, United States Customs and Border Protection, United States Department of Homeland Security. It appears that defendants have produced as few documents as they could possibly produce to plaintiffs without serious consequences. Even more troublin g, they have admitted to the existence of as few documents as they could possibly get away with. Defendants approach frustrates plaintiffs, frustrates the Court, and frustrates the purpose of the Freedom of Information Act. Defendants are ordered to produce additional documents consistent with this Order by October 7, 2011. Any documents over which defendants assert exemptions must be produced in redacted form with the relevant FOIA exemptions indicated with specificity by that date. A conferenc e is scheduled for 4 p.m. on Wednesday, October 5, 2011 to discuss the briefing schedules for the parties' summary judgment motions on the adequacy of the search and for the parties' summary judgment motions on FOIA exemptions over any and all documents that were not addressed in the last round of briefing on that issue. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion [Docket No. 46]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/2011) (lmb)
December 27, 2011 69 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: For the reasons explained above, defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close this motion [Docket No. 58]. Defendants are ordered to produce the documents in compliance with this Opinion and Order by January 9, 2012. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/27/2011) (rdz)
December 27, 2011 70 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is granted. Plaintiffs are instructed to submit a brief letter to the Court describing precisely what limited discovery they believe is appropriate. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close this motion [Docket No. 61]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/27/2011) (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Families for Freedom et al v. United States Customs and Border Protection et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: David Vincent Bober
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Customs and Border Protection
Represented By: David Vincent Bober
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: David Vincent Bober
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Nancy Babette Morawetz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Families for Freedom
Represented By: Nancy Babette Morawetz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Doe
Represented By: Nancy Babette Morawetz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Nancy Babette Morawetz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]