Brooks v. Macy's, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joseph E. Brooks
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv05304
Filed: July 13, 2010
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Barbara S. Jones
 
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2010 23 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: For all of the reasons listed in this Memorandum Opinion and Order, defendant's application for a stay of discovery is granted to the extent defendant seeks to stay deposition discovery; it is denied in all other respects. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 12/21/10) Copies Transmitted By Chambers. (mro)
April 8, 2011 33 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER based on the present record, plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is denied. My ruling is without prejudice to a renewed application to compel deposition discovery if either side can make a specific showing that a witness's health warrants a deposition to preserve the witness's testimony. SO ORDERED (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 4/8/2011) (jmi)
May 6, 2011 34 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: I write to resolve several discovery disputes that were left open after the conference held in this matter on April 19, 2011 as further set forth within this Memorandum Opinion and Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 5/6/2011) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (jfe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brooks v. Macy's, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Brooks
Represented By: Danielle Caroline Lesser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]