The New York Times Company et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation Featured Case

New York Times reporter Charlie Savage's FOIA request to compel the FBI to release data on national security threat assessment, and FBI firearms Shooting Incident Review Team ('SIRT') reports.

Plaintiff: The New York Times Company and Charles Savage
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv07920
Filed: October 18, 2010
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Robert P. Patterson
 
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2011 24 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated November 7, 2011, plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is denied, and defendants motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is granted. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 11/8/11) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt)
November 8, 2011 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 23 Memorandum & Opinion to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (rjm)
November 8, 2011 23 Featured Case OPINION AND ORDER:#100988 Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is denied, and Defendant's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction is granted. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 11/7/2011) Copies Sent By Chambers. (rjm) Modified on 11/10/2011 (jab).
September 1, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert P. Patterson: Motion Hearing held on 9/1/2011 re: 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The New York Times Company, Charles Savage. (ft)
August 19, 2011 22 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument set for 9/1/2011 at 09:30 AM before Judge Robert P. Patterson. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 8/19/2011) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (lmb)
May 23, 2011 21 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(2): THEREFORE, the parties agree and stipulate as follows: Count II of the Complaint shall be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ, P. 41(a). (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 5/22/2011) (jfe)
April 29, 2011 20 DECLARATION of Dennis J. Argall in Support re: 12 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Onozawa, Tomoko)
April 29, 2011 19 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. and in opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Onozawa, Tomoko)
April 18, 2011 18 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David)
April 15, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney David Edward McCraw to RE-FILE Document 15 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): document error. This document indicates it pertains to the Defendant (see document #13). (ldi)
April 15, 2011 17 DECLARATION of Charles Savage in Support re: 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B, # 2 Exhibit C, # 3 Exhibit D-E)(McCraw, David)
April 15, 2011 16 DECLARATION of David McCraw in Support re: 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David)
April 15, 2011 15 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David) Modified on 4/18/2011 (ldi).
March 25, 2011 14 DECLARATION of David M. Hardy in Support re: 12 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Y)(Onozawa, Tomoko)
March 25, 2011 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Onozawa, Tomoko)
March 25, 2011 12 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment and Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. Responses due by 4/15/2011(Onozawa, Tomoko)
March 15, 2011 11 NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Amy Ann Barcelo, New Attorney: Tomoko Onozawa, Address: U.S. Attorney's Office - SDNY, 86 Chambers Street, Third Floor, New York, New York, 10007, (212) 637-2721. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Onozawa, Tomoko)
February 25, 2011 10 DECLARATION of DAVID E. MCCRAW in Support re: 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit F (part 1), # 3 Exhibit Exhibit F (part 2), # 4 Exhibit Exhibits G-K)(McCraw, David)
February 25, 2011 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company. (McCraw, David)
February 25, 2011 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company. Responses due by 3/25/2011 Return Date set for 4/29/2011 at 09:30 AM.(McCraw, David)
January 21, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines: Federal Bureau of Investigation answer due 3/25/2011. (db)
January 21, 2011 7 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2011. Answer deadline 3/25/11. Responses due by 4/15/2011. (Government) Replies due by 4/29/2011. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 1/21/11) (db)
January 21, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert P. Patterson: Case Management Conference held on 1/21/2011, ( Motions due by 2/25/2011., Replies due by 4/15/2011., Responses due by 3/25/2011., Governments Responses due by 4/29/2011.). (mbe)
January 14, 2011 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation.(Barcelo, Amy)
December 17, 2010 5 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson, Jr from Amy A. Barcelo dated 12/16/2010 re: Counsel request a second 4 week extension of time to respond to the complaint to 1/14/11. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 12/17/2010) (jfe)
November 18, 2010 4 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Robert P. Patterson, Jr. from Amy Barcelo (unsigned) dated 11/17/10 re: I am writing on behalf of FBI, and with plaintiffs' consent, to request a four-week extension of time to respond to the complaint. With that extension the FBI's response to the complaint would be due on or before December 17, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. So ordered. Federal Bureau of Investigation answer due 12/17/2010. (Signed by Judge Robert P. Patterson on 11/17/10) (rjm)
November 2, 2010 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 10/19/2010, answer due 11/9/2010. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by The New York Times Company; Charles Savage. (McCraw, David)
October 18, 2010 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Charles Savage, The New York Times Company.(mro) (mro).
October 18, 2010 Case Designated ECF. (mro)
October 18, 2010 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (mro)
October 18, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mro)
October 18, 2010 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 917535)Document filed by The New York Times Company, Charles Savage.(mro) (mro).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: The New York Times Company et al v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The New York Times Company
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Savage
Represented By: David Edward McCraw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]