Broadcast Music, Inc. v. AOL, Inc. Featured Case

Petitioner: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Respondent: AOL, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2010cv09300
Filed: December 14, 2010
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Unassigned
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 7, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Telephone Conference held and concluded on 6/7/2011. (jmi)
May 13, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Status Conference held and concluded on 5/13/2011. (Court Reporter None) (cg)
February 18, 2011 8 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Harris Lee Cohen on behalf of AOL, Inc.. New Address: Greenberg Traurig LLP, 153 Townsend Street, 8th Floor, San Francisco, California, United States of America 94107, 415.655.1308. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-09300-LLS, 1:64-cv-03787-LLS(Cohen, Harris)
February 16, 2011 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth L. Steinthal on behalf of AOL, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-09300-LLS, 1:64-cv-03787-LLS(Steinthal, Kenneth)
February 16, 2011 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Harris Lee Cohen on behalf of AOL, Inc. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:10-cv-09300-LLS, 1:64-cv-03787-LLS(Cohen, Harris)
February 10, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 2/10/2011. (mro)
January 18, 2011 5 Featured Case ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b): Initial Conference set for 2/18/2011 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/18/2011) (jfe)
December 21, 2010 Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz is so designated. (sjo)
December 21, 2010 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
December 21, 2010 CASE ACCEPTED AS SIMILAR. Create association to 1:64-cv-03787-LLS. Notice of Assignment to follow. (sjo)
December 16, 2010 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. AOL, Inc. served on 12/15/2010, answer due 1/5/2011. Service was accepted by Amy Moscati, Assistant to Julie Jacobs, General Counsel at AOL Inc.. Document filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Salzman, Michael)
December 13, 2010 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Gannett Co., Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.(mro) (rdz).
December 13, 2010 Case Designated ECF. (mro)
December 13, 2010 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Louis L. Stanton as possibly similar to 64-cv-3787. (mro)
December 13, 2010 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AOL, Inc.(mro)
December 13, 2010 1 PETITION. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 923486).Document filed by Broadcast Music, Inc.(mro) (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. v. AOL, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Elliot Salzman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: AOL, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]