Keeling v. New Rock Theater Productions, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jaime Keeling
Defendant: New Rock Theater Productions, LLC, Eve Hars and Ethan Garber
 
Case Number: 1:2010cv09345
Filed: December 15, 2010
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Thomas P. Griesa
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2013 108 Featured Case OPINION re: 100 MOTION for Permanent Injunction. filed by Jaime Keeling. The motion is granted in its entirety. Defendants along with their respective officers, directors, principals, agents, representatives, servants, employees, affiliates, succe ssors, or assigns, and any person or entity acting on their behalf or in concert or participation with them are enjoined from engaging in any activity, including the examples listed above, constituting an infringement of Keeling's copyright in Point Break LIVE! SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/10/2013) (ama)
March 11, 2013 131 Featured Case OPINION re: 113 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Jaime Keeling. In the court's view, defendants raised a legitimate factual issue regarding whether Garber actually owned or controlled New Rock and, accordingly, whether he could be vicariou sly liable for the other defendants' infringement. The jury, of course, concluded that he was liable, but Garber's defense was not objectively unreasonable. Therefore, because defendants' case was not objective unreasonable, and none of the other Bryant factors are strongly implicated, plaintiffs motion for attorney's fees is denied. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/11/2013) (mro)
March 11, 2013 132 Featured Case OPINION re: 120 MOTION to Stay re: 108 Memorandum & Opinion filed by Eve Hars. The court concludes, therefore, that Hars' likelihood of success on appeal is very small. Accordingly, given the court, the public, and the parties' intere st in bringing this litigation to its ultimate conclusion, as well as Keeling's legitimate interest in vindicating her copyright, Hars' motion to stay enforcement of the permanent injunction is denied. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/11/2013) (mro)
May 23, 2013 139 Featured Case OPINION re: 117 MOTION for New Trial. filed by Ethan Garber. Garber's motions are denied in every respect but one. A new trial will be held to determine whether Garber eventually made a genuine attempt to stop New Rock's infringing productions of Point Break LIVE! If so, when did this occur, and what percentage of defendants' profits was earned after that moment? (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 5/23/2013) (ama)
December 19, 2013 152 Featured Case OPINION re: 141 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 139 Memorandum & Opinion, filed by Jaime Keeling, 143 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by Ethan Garber. Before the court are two motions for reconsideration of the court's resolution of Garbe r's post-trial motion. First, Keeling moves for reconsideration of the order granting a new trial on the issue of Garber's liability after his attempts to stop the infringement. Second, Garber moves for reconsideration of the court's d enial of his motion for a new trial on the amount of New Rock's profits. Both motions are denied. This opinion resolves the motions listed as document numbers 141 and 143 in this case. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/19/2013) (ama)
May 17, 2011 16 Featured Case OPINION. This case involves a claim for copyright infringement by plaintiff, Jaime Keeling, against defendants, New Rock Theater Productions ("New Rock") and Eve Hars and Ethan Garber. Defendants have moved to dismiss, arguing that Keeling& #039;s work, as a parody, cannot be copyrighted. Defendants' motion is denied. Keeling's derivative work is eligible for copyright protection and therefore defendants' motion to dismiss is denied. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 5/17/11) (rjm)
June 7, 2011 22 Featured Case OPINION. Defendants' motion for reconsideration and request for leave to file interlocutory appeal are denied. This resolves the motion listed as document 17 on this docket. re: 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 16 Memorandum & Opinion, and Certificate of Service filed by New Rock Theater Productions, LLC. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 6/7/11) (rjm)
December 13, 2011 41 Featured Case OPINION re: 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by New Rock Theater Productions, LLC. Defendants' motion for summary judgment is denied. This opinion disposes of the motion listed as document number 25 on the docket. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 12/13/2011) (ab)
November 29, 2012 86 Featured Case OPINION denying in its entirety re: 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Certificate of Service filed by New Rock Theater Productions, LLC. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/29/2012) Copies Sent By Chambers. (cd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Keeling v. New Rock Theater Productions, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Keeling
Represented By: Ethan Isaac Jacobs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Rock Theater Productions, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eve Hars
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan Garber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]