The Authors Guild, Inc. et al v. Hathitrust et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, the Writers' Union of Canada, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Helge Ronning, Jack R. Salamanca, Danielle Simpson, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Pat Cummins, Angelo Loukakis, Roxana Robinson, Andre Roy, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles and Fay Weldon
Defendant: Edmund Manydeeds, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Troy Sherven, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, S. Mark Tyler, Jose F. Vazquez, David G. Walsh, William R. Cast, Patrick A. Shoulders, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Bruce Cole, Philip N. Eskew, Jr., Cora J Griffin, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr., Derica W. Rice, William H. Strong, Richard C. Blum, David Crane, William De La Pena, Russell Gould, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, George M. Marcus, Alfredo Mireles, Jr., Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Reiss, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul Wachter, Charlene Zettel, Jeffrey Bartell, Mark J. Bradley, Judith V. Crain, John Drew, Tony Evers, Michael J Falbo, Hathitrust, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Trustees Of Indiana University, Cornell University, Julia Donovan Darlow, Laurence B. Deitch, Denise Ilitch, Olivia P. Maynard, Andrea Fischer Newman, Andrew C. Richner, S. Martin Taylor and Katherine E. White
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv06351
Filed: September 12, 2011
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Harold Baer
 
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2013 173 Featured Case MEMORANDUM ORDER denying 158 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 163 Motion for Attorney Fees. On October 10, 2012, I granted the defendants' ("Libraries") and the defendant-intervenors' ("NFB") motions for summary judgment and held, among other things, that their participation in the Mass Digitization Project and the present application of the HathiTrust Digital Library are protected under fair use. See Authors Guild, Inc. v. HathiTrust, No. 11 Civ. 6351,2012 WL 4808939, at *15 (S.D.N.Y. Oct. 10, 2012). Familiarity with that Opinion and Order is assumed. The Libraries and NFB now move for costs and attorneys' fees under Rule 54(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. § 505. The motions for costs and attorneys' fees are denied. The Clerk of Court is instructed to close the open motions. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 2/14/2013) (mro) Modified on 2/19/2013 (mro).
December 6, 2012 172 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
December 6, 2012 171 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 163 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Defendant Intervenors.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
November 20, 2012 170 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees., 163 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Defendant Intervenors.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
November 20, 2012 169 DECLARATION of Edward H. Rosenthal in Opposition re: 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees., 163 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Defendant Intervenors.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rosenthal, Edward)
November 20, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition to motion due by 11/20/2012. Reply by defendants due by 12/6/2012. (mt)
November 20, 2012 168 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Edward H. Rosenthal dated 11/16/2012 re: We are writing with the consent of counsel for Defendant-Intervenors National Federation of the Blind, et al. with respect to the briefing schedule for NFB's motion for costs and attorneys fees. The parties have agreed, subject to the Court's approval, that Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion will be served on or before 11/20/2012 and any reply by Defendants will be filed on or before 12/6/2012. This would result in both Defendants' and the NFB's motions for costs and attorneys' fees being on the same schedule and fully briefed by 12/6/2012. ENDORSEMENT: Same schedule seem appropriate - granted. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 11/20/2012) (mt)
November 8, 2012 Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for 125 Declaration in Support of Motion,,,,, filed by Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Fay Weldon, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, Daniele Simpson, David Crane, James Shapiro, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Angelo Loukakis, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, 59 MOTION for Jonathan Band to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by American Library Association, Association of Research Libraries, Association of College and Research Libraries, 42 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 12 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 93 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Fay Weldon, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, Daniele Simpson, James Shapiro, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Angelo Loukakis, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, 92 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Fay Weldon, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, Daniele Simpson, James Shapiro, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Angelo Loukakis, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, 62 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae. filed by American Library Association, Association of Research Libraries, Association of College and Research Libraries, 110 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Hathitrust, 91 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Fay Weldon, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, Daniele Simpson, James Shapiro, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Angelo Loukakis, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, 50 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Pat Cummins, Fay Weldon, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, Daniele Simpson, James Shapiro, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Danielle Simpson, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Angelo Loukakis, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, 10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 5 MOTION for Alex S. Fonoroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Cora J Griffin, Mark J. Bradley, David G. Walsh, Jose F. Vazquez, Monica Lozano, Andrea Fischer Newman, Leslie Tang Schilling, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, Michael J. Spector, Jeffrey Bartell, Cornell University, Bonnie Reiss, Philip N. Eskew, Jr., Alfredo Mireles, Jr., Hadi Makarechian, Richard C. Blum, S. Martin Taylor, Bruce D. Varner, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, S. Mark Tyler, Fred Ruiz, Michael J Falbo, Charlene Zettel, Derica W. Rice, Judith V. Crain, Patrick A. Shoulders, Troy Sherven, Charles Pruitt, Bruce Cole, William R. Cast, Russell Gould, Paul Wachter, Odessa Johnson, William H. Strong, Laurence B. Deitch, William De La Pena, Tony Evers, The Trustees Of Indiana University, David Crane, Sherry L. Lansing, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, Julia Donovan Darlow, George Kieffer, Norman J. Pattiz, Denise Ilitch, Olivia P. Maynard, Hathitrust, Andrew C. Richner, Brent Smith, Katherine Pointer, Katherine E. White, John Drew, Eddie Island, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr., George M. Marcus, Edmund Manydeeds, The Regents of the University of California, 118 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by National Federation of the Blind, 52 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Hathitrust, 77 Declaration in Support of Motion, filed by Courtney Wheeler, Georgina Kleege, The National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, 117 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by National Federation of the Blind, 70 Notice of Filing Transcript, 137 Declaration in Opposition to Motion filed by Hathitrust, 132 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Fay Weldon, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Daniele Simpson, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Angelo Loukakis, Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, James Shapiro, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment. filed by Courtney Wheeler, Georgina Kleege, The National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, National Federation of the Blind, 167 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Fay Weldon, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Daniele Simpson, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Angelo Loukakis, Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, James Shapiro, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., 138 Declaration in Opposition to Motion filed by Hathitrust, 131 Declaration in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Fay Weldon, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Daniele Simpson, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Angelo Loukakis, Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, James Shapiro, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., 102 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Hathitrust, 55 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,, filed by Pat Cummins, Fay Weldon, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Daniele Simpson, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Angelo Loukakis, Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, James Shapiro, Danielle Simpson, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., 128 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Courtney Wheeler, Georgina Kleege, The National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, 160 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Hathitrust, 164 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion filed by Courtney Wheeler, Georgina Kleege, The National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, 39 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Hathitrust, 19 Stipulation and Order,, 64 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by American Library Association, Association of Research Libraries, Association of College and Research Libraries, 124 Declaration in Support of Motion,, filed by Fay Weldon, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Daniele Simpson, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Angelo Loukakis, Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, James Shapiro, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., 53 Notice of Change of Address filed by Cora J Griffin, Mark J. Bradley, David G. Walsh, Jose F. Vazquez, Monica Lozano, Andrea Fischer Newman, Leslie Tang Schilling, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, Michael J. Spector, Jeffrey Bartell, Cornell University, Bonnie Reiss, Philip N. Eskew, Jr., Alfredo Mireles, Jr., Hadi Makarechian, Richard C. Blum, S. Martin Taylor, Bruce D. Varner, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, S. Mark Tyler, Fred Ruiz, Michael J Falbo, Charlene Zettel, Derica W. Rice, Judith V. Crain, Patrick A. Shoulders, Troy Sherven, Charles Pruitt, Bruce Cole, William R. Cast, Russell Gould, Paul Wachter, Odessa Johnson, William H. Strong, Laurence B. Deitch, William De La Pena, Tony Evers, The Trustees Of Indiana University, Sherry L. Lansing, David Crane, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, Julia Donovan Darlow, Norman J. Pattiz, George Kieffer, Denise Ilitch, Olivia P. Maynard, Andrew C. Richner, Hathitrust, Brent Smith, Katherine Pointer, Katherine E. White, John Drew, Eddie Island, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr., George M. Marcus, Edmund Manydeeds, The Regents of the University of California, 78 Declaration in Support of Motion filed by Courtney Wheeler, Georgina Kleege, The National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, 135 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Fay Weldon, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Daniele Simpson, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Angelo Loukakis, Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, James Shapiro, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., 84 Declarat
November 8, 2012 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: 167 Notice of Appeal,,. (nd)
November 8, 2012 167 NOTICE OF APPEAL from 157 Clerk's Judgment,,, 156 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 0208-7961302. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit. (Rosenthal, Edward)
November 8, 2012 166 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Edward H. Rosenthal dated 11/6/2012 re: Counsel for plaintiff writes that the parties have agreed, subject to the Court's approval, that plaintiiffs' opposition to the motion will be served on or before November 20, 2012 and any reply by defendants will be filed on or before December 6, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: granted.., ( Replies due by 12/6/2012.) (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 11/7/2012) (pl)
November 1, 2012 165 DECLARATION of Daniel F. Goldstein in Support re: 163 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Defendant Intervenors.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit B-4, # 6 Exhibit B-5, # 7 Exhibit B-6, # 8 Exhibit B-7, # 9 Exhibit B-8, # 10 Exhibit B-9, # 11 Exhibit B-10, # 12 Exhibit B-11, # 13 Exhibit B-12)(Goldstein, Daniel)
November 1, 2012 164 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 163 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Defendant Intervenors.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
November 1, 2012 163 MOTION for Attorney Fees of Defendant Intervenors. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler.(Goldstein, Daniel)
October 26, 2012 162 DECLARATION of Joseph Petersen in Support re: 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Errata B, # 3 Exhibit C (Part 1 of 4), # 4 Exhibit C (Part 2 of 4), # 5 Exhibit C (Part 3 of 4), # 6 Exhibit C (Part 4 of 4))(Petersen, Joseph)
October 26, 2012 161 DECLARATION of Raymond J. Dowd in Support re: 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
October 26, 2012 160 DECLARATION of Roger L. Zissu in Support re: 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
October 26, 2012 159 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
October 26, 2012 158 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Document filed by Hathitrust.(Petersen, Joseph)
October 12, 2012 157 CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated October 10, 2012, Plaintiffs' motions are denied; Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted in part and denied in part: the Associational Plaintiffs have Article III standing; the U.S. Associational Plaintiffs lack statutory standing; and Plaintiffs' OWP claims are not ripe; Defendants and Defendant Intervenors' motions for summary judgment are granted: their participation in the MDP and the present application of the HDL are protected under fair use; and the two unopposed motions for leave to file briefs as amici are granted; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 10/12/12) (Attachments: # 1 NOTICE OF RIGHT TO APPEAL)(ml)
October 10, 2012 Transmission to Judgments and Orders Clerk. Transmitted re: 156 Memorandum & Opinion to the Judgments and Orders Clerk. (lmb)
October 10, 2012 156 Featured Case OPINION & ORDER # 102471re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Courtney Wheeler, National Federation of the Blind, The National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Georgina Kleege, 120 MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by American Library Association, Association of Research Libraries, Association of College and Research Libraries, 37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. filed by Hathitrust, 54 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Pat Cummins, Fay Weldon, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, Daniele Simpson, James Shapiro, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Danielle Simpson, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Angelo Loukakis, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, 122 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File filed by DIGITAL HUMANITIES AND LAW SCHOLARS, 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Pat Cummins, Fay Weldon, Roxana Robinson, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors League Fund, Inc, Pat Cummings, the Writers' Union of Canada, Jack R. Salamanca, T.J. Stiles, Daniele Simpson, James Shapiro, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Danielle Simpson, Andre Roy, Helge Ronning, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Angelo Loukakis, Erik Grundstrom, The Authors Guild, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hathitrust. I have considered the parties' remaining arguments and find them to be without merit. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motions are DENIED. Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part: the Associational Plaintiffs have Article III standing; the U.S. Associational Plaintiffs lack statutory standing; and Plaintiffs' OWP claims are not ripe. Defendants' and Defendant Intervenors' motions for summary judgment are GRANTED: their participation in the MDP and the present application of the HDL are protected under fair use. The two unopposed motions for leave to file briefs as amici are GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the seven open motions, close the case, and remove it from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/10/2012) (lmb) Modified on 10/16/2012 (ft).
September 28, 2012 155 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Jessica P. Weber dated 9/28/12 re: Counsel writes to request that the fee accompanying her motion for admission pro hac vice be applied to her petition for admission to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. ENDORSEMENT: Please apply the fee to Ms. Weber's petition for admission to the SDNY Court. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 9/28/2012) (mro)
August 22, 2012 154 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNCE proceeding held on 8/6/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 22, 2012 153 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERNCE held on 8/6/2012 before Judge Harold Baer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/27/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/26/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
August 16, 2012 152 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
August 3, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 151 MOTION for Jessica P. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 3, 2012 151 MOTION for Jessica P. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice CORRECTED. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler, Courtney Wheeler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing New York, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Maryland, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Jessica)
August 3, 2012 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice regarding Document No. 150 MOTION for Jessica P. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7702049. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The Order has to Contain all the Attorney's Information. (wb)
August 3, 2012 150 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jessica P. Weber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7702049. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler, Courtney Wheeler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing NY, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing MD, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Weber, Jessica) Modified on 8/3/2012 (wb).
July 27, 2012 149 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 27, 2012 148 DECLARATION of Fredric Schroeder in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 27, 2012 147 DECLARATION of James Fruchterman in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 27, 2012 146 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 145 DECLARATION of Joseph Petersen (redacted) in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 144 DECLARATION of John Wilkin in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
July 27, 2012 143 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 27, 2012 142 DECLARATION of Jeremy S. Goldman in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 25, 2012 141 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
July 20, 2012 140 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (REDACTED). Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
July 20, 2012 139 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 116 Rule 56.1 Statement,,. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
July 20, 2012 138 DECLARATION of (REDACTED) Joseph Petersen in Opposition re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
July 20, 2012 137 DECLARATION of (REDACTED) Cory Snavely in Opposition re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
July 20, 2012 136 DECLARATION of Bernt Hugenholtz in Opposition re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
July 20, 2012 135 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 20, 2012 134 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 76 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 20, 2012 133 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 113 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 20, 2012 132 DECLARATION of Jeremy S. Goldman (redacted) in Opposition re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 20, 2012 131 DECLARATION of Paul Aiken (Second) in Opposition re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 20, 2012 130 COUNTER STATEMENT TO 116 Rule 56.1 Statement,,., RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 20, 2012 129 DECLARATION of James Fruchterman in Opposition re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 20, 2012 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
July 19, 2012 127 Featured Case ORDER: With the consent of all parties, that the Non-conforming documents be deleted and access thereto permanently removed. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 7/19/2012) (jar)
July 13, 2012 126 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(nm)
July 11, 2012 125 DECLARATION of Edward H. Rosenthal (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION) in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, David Crane, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 5 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 2 Exhibit 6 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 3 Exhibit 7 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 4 Exhibit 8 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 5 Exhibit 9 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 6 Exhibit 10 (redacted0 (CORRECTED VERSION), # 7 Exhibit 80 (redacted) (CORRECTED), # 8 Exhibit 81 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 9 Exhibit 82 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 10 Exhibit 83 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 11 Exhibit 84 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 12 Exhibit 85 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 13 Exhibit 87 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 14 Exhibit 88 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 15 Exhibit 89 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 16 Exhibit 92 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION), # 17 Exhibit 93 (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION))(Rosenthal, Edward)
July 11, 2012 124 DECLARATION of Benjamin Edelman (redacted) (CORRECTED VERSION) in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
July 7, 2012 123 FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by DIGITAL HUMANITIES AND LAW SCHOLARS. (Colman, Charles)
July 7, 2012 122 FIRST MOTION for Leave to File. Document filed by DIGITAL HUMANITIES AND LAW SCHOLARS.(Colman, Charles)
July 6, 2012 121 BRIEF re: 120 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. in Support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, Association of Research Libraries.(Band, Jonathan)
July 6, 2012 120 MOTION to File Amicus Brief. Document filed by American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, Association of Research Libraries.(Band, Jonathan)
July 3, 2012 119 DECLARATION of Joel Waldfogel, Ph.D. (redacted) in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
July 2, 2012 118 DECLARATION of James Fruchterman in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by National Federation of the Blind. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Curriculum Vitae of James Fruchterman)(Bernstein, Robert)
July 2, 2012 117 DECLARATION of George Kerscher in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by National Federation of the Blind. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhiit A to Declaration of George Kerscher)(Bernstein, Robert)
June 29, 2012 116 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 115 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (redacted). Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 114 DECLARATION of Edward H. Rosenthal (redacted) in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Redacted), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Redacted), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Redacted), # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit 74, # 75 Exhibit 75, # 76 Exhibit 76, # 77 Exhibit 77, # 78 Exhibit 78, # 79 Exhibit 79, # 80 Exhibit 80 (Redacted), # 81 Exhibit 81 (Redacted), # 82 Exhibit 82 (Redacted), # 83 Exhibit 83 (Redacted), # 84 Exhibit 84 (Redacted), # 85 Exhibit 85 (Redacted), # 86 Exhibit 86, # 87 Exhibit 87 (Redacted), # 88 Exhibit 88 (Redacted), # 89 Exhibit 89 (Redacted), # 90 Exhibit 90, # 91 Exhibit 91, # 92 Exhibit 92 (Redacted), # 93 Exhibit 93 (Redacted), # 94 Exhibit 94, # 95 Exhibit 95, # 96 Exhibit 96, # 97 Exhibit 97, # 98 Exhibit 98, # 99 Exhibit 99, # 100 Exhibit 100, # 101 Exhibit 101, # 102 Exhibit 102 (Part A), # 103 Exhibit 102 (Part B), # 104 Exhibit 103, # 105 Exhibit 104, # 106 Exhibit 105)(Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 113 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 112 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 111 AFFIRMATION of Joseph Petersen in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-W)(Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 110 DECLARATION of John Wilkin in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 2), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 2), # 3 Exhibit B-C)(Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 109 DECLARATION of Professor Daniel Gervais in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 108 DECLARATION of Joel Waldfogel, Ph.D. in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 107 DECLARATION of Faith C. Hensrud in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 106 DECLARATION of Benjamin Edelman (redacted) in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 105 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment. CORRECTED. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 104 DECLARATION of Neil R. Smalheiser in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 103 DECLARATION of Margret Leary in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 102 DECLARATION of Stanley Katz in Support re: 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 101 DECLARATION of John White in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 100 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Hathitrust. Responses due by 7/20/2012(Petersen, Joseph)
June 29, 2012 99 DECLARATION of Fay Weldon in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, S. Martin Taylor, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B (part 1), # 3 Exhibit B (part 2), # 4 Exhibit B (part 3))(Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 98 DECLARATION of Daniele Simpson in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 97 DECLARATION of James Shapiro in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Sherry L. Lansing, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 96 DECLARATION of Andre Roy in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 95 DECLARATION of Helge Ronning in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 94 DECLARATION of Roxana Robinson in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 93 DECLARATION of Isabel Howe in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 92 DECLARATION of Isabel Howe in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 91 DECLARATION of Jan Terje Helmli in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 90 DECLARATION of Louise Hedberg in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Fred Ruiz, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 89 DECLARATION of Erik Grundstrom in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 88 DECLARATION of Francis Farley-Chevrier in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norman J. Pattiz, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 87 DECLARATION of Kelly Duffin in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 86 DECLARATION of Pat Cummings in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 85 DECLARATION of Owen Atkinson in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 84 DECLARATION of Trond Andreassen in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 83 DECLARATION of T.J. Stiles in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 82 DECLARATION of Paul Aiken in Support re: 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D (part 1), # 5 Exhibit D (part 2), # 6 Exhibit D (part 3))(Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada.(Rosenthal, Edward)
June 29, 2012 80 DECLARATION of JAMES FRUCHTERMAN in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 79 DECLARATION of GEORGE KERSCHER in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 78 DECLARATION of DR. MARC MAURER in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 77 DECLARATION of LAURA ABELSON in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - CCB Depo, # 2 Exhibit B - Google Clancy, # 3 Exhibit C - interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit D - Kleege, # 5 Exhibit E - Seidlitz, # 6 Exhibit F - Wheeler)(Goldstein, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 76 RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 75 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 74 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler. Responses due by 7/20/2012(Goldstein, Daniel)
June 29, 2012 73 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer Jr. from Edward R. Rosenthal dated 6/28/12 re: Counsel writes on behalf of the parties to request that they be permitted to serve redacted versions of their papers and to submit an unredacted set of the papers for filing under seal. The parties also request that they be permitted to serve a memorandum of law not longer than thirty pages. ENDORSEMENT: 30 pages is OK no further extensions by any party redacted and unredacted versions will be submitted. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 6/28/2012) (mro)
June 19, 2012 72 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to File Document. It is hereby ORDERED that the unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae filed by the American Library Association, the Association of College and Research Libraries, and the Association of Research Libraries is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the motion and remove it from my docket. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 6/18/2012) (lmb)
June 6, 2012 71 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Edward H. Rosenthal dated 5/29/12 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs requests that the last day for fully briefed motions be served and filed be extended for one week to 7/27/12. Counsel proposes the following schedule: moving papers by 6/29; opposition by 7/20 and reply by 7/27. ENDORSEMENT: Fine. ( Motions due by 6/29/2012., Responses due by 7/20/2012, Replies due by 7/27/2012.) (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 6/6/2012) (mro) Modified on 6/7/2012 (mro).
May 29, 2012 70 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 5/17/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 29, 2012 69 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTIONS held on 5/17/2012 before Judge Harold Baer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/22/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/2/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/30/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 14, 2012 68 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer from Joseph Petersen dated 5/10/2012 re: Discovery dispute and to request direction from the Court on scheduling as it relates to the parties' filing of summary judgment motions. ENDORSEMENT: This problem should have been brought to my attention earlier and certainly not on the eve of the discovery cutoff and I trust it will not happen again. (1) l'd like a list of all depositions-name and role and schedule, (2) the three who are "too busy" will appear in NY wit hin the next ten (10) days at their convenience and I'd like a note from Mr. Salamanca's doctor as to his ability or lack thereof to participate at his bedside or wherever in an hour (1) of questions and answers. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 5/14/2012) (cd)
May 11, 2012 67 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 54 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
May 7, 2012 66 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer Jr. from Edward H. Rosenthal dated 5/1/12 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs requests permission for the plaintiffs to file a 15-page reply brief in connection with plaintiffs' motion for partial judgment on the pleadings. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 5/7/2012) (mro)
April 24, 2012 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $200.00, paid on 04/11/2012, Receipt Number 1035078. (jd)
April 20, 2012 65 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 54 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Potter, Robert)
April 20, 2012 64 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, Association of Research Libraries.(Band, Jonathan)
April 20, 2012 63 BRIEF Amici Curiae in Opposition of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, Association of Research Libraries.(Band, Jonathan)
April 20, 2012 62 MOTION for Leave to File Brief Amici Curiae. Document filed by American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, Association of Research Libraries.(Band, Jonathan)
April 20, 2012 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re: 54 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Of Defendants Intervenors'. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler, Courtney Wheeler. (Goldstein, Daniel)
April 20, 2012 60 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 59 Motion for Jonathan Band to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby Ordered that Jonathan Band be admitted Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes for counsel for amici American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, and Association of Research Libraries. ENDORSEMENT: Application for Pro Hac Vice granted. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 4/19/2012) (mro) Modified on 4/20/2012 (mro).
April 12, 2012 58 ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz, Blair Seidlitz, The National Federation of the Blind, Courtney Wheeler, Courtney Wheeler. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 7.1 Disclosure)(Abelson, Laura)
April 10, 2012 59 MOTION for Jonathan Band to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, Association of Research Libraries.(bwa)
March 21, 2012 57 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the time for Defendants and Intervenor Defendants to respond to the February 28, 2012 motion by Plaintiffs for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings is hereby extended to April 20, 2012. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the Plaintiffs will serve any reply papers with respect to such motion on or before May 11, 2012. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that no party shall file any further dispositive motions of any type prior to May 20, 2012. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 54 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. :( Responses due by 4/20/2012) (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 3/21/2012) (jfe)
March 20, 2012 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Nathan Potter on behalf of Hathitrust (Potter, Robert)
February 28, 2012 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 54 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
February 28, 2012 54 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada.(Rosenthal, Edward)
February 24, 2012 53 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joseph E. Petersen on behalf of All Defendants. New Address: 1114 Avenue of the Americas, 21st Floor, New York, NY, 10036,. (Petersen, Joseph)
February 17, 2012 52 DECLARATION of Joseph Petersen in Support re: 37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Objections and Responses to Requests for Admission, # 2 Exhibit B - Objections and Responses to Request for Production, # 3 Exhibit C - Objections and Responses to Requests for Admissions, # 4 Exhibit D - Objections and Responses of Plaintiff SFF, # 5 Exhibit E - Objections and Responses of Plaintiff NFFO, # 6 Exhibit F - Objections and Responses of Plaintiff Authors Licensing and Collecting)(Petersen, Joseph)
February 17, 2012 51 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
January 31, 2012 50 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Rosenthal, Edward)
January 31, 2012 49 DECLARATION of Edward H. Rosenthal in Opposition re: 37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., The Authors League Fund, Inc, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon, the Writers' Union of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Rosenthal, Edward)
January 24, 2012 48 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 27 Motion to Intervene. ENDORSEMENT: Motion granted on consent. The clerk is directed to close the motion to intervene. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 1/24/2012) (mro)
January 24, 2012 47 Featured Case STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 1/24/2012) (mro)
January 10, 2012 46 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the parties below, that the time for Plaintiffs to respond to the motion by Defendants for Judgment on the Pleadings Based Upon Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction is hereby extended to January 31, 2012; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that the Defendants will serve any reply papers with respect to such motion on or before February 17, 2012; and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, consistent with the Court's January 2, 2012 "so ordered" endorsement of defendants' counsel's December 29, 2011 1etter to the Court, that oral argument be held on March 2, 2012 at such time as is convenient to the Court. ( Responses due by 1/31/2012.) (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 1/10/2012) (lmb)
January 2, 2012 45 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Harold Baer, Jr. from Joseph Petersen dated 12/29/2011 re: We are attorneys for the defendants in the above-referenced action. We submit this letter pursuant to Rule 5A of Your Honor's Individual Rules of Practice to inform the Court that last night the defendants filed a motion for judgment on the pleadings seeking dismissal of certain of Plaintiffs' claims for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ENDORSEMENT: If all parties to the M/D are in accord I can hear arguments the first 10 days of March and I will be in touch as to your most convenient date - otherwise the motion will be decided without oral argument - let me know on or before Friday 1/6/12. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 1/2/2012) (rjm)
December 30, 2011 44 DECLARATION of Joseph Petersen in Support re: 37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
December 30, 2011 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings.. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph)
December 29, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph E. Petersen to RE-FILE Document 38 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 39 Declaration in Support of Motion. ERROR(S): Documents linked to filing error. Re-File and link ONLY to document # 37 Motion. (ldi)
December 29, 2011 42 Featured Case ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF LAURA G. ABELSON granting 29 Motion for Laura G. Abelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application for Pro Hac Vice GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/29/2011) (lmb)
December 29, 2011 41 Featured Case ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF DANIEL F. GOLDSTEIN granting 30 Motion for Daniel F. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application for Pro Hac Vice GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/29/2011) (lmb)
December 29, 2011 40 Featured Case ORDER FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF PETER JASZI granting 28 Motion for Peter Jaszi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application for Pro Hac Vice GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/29/2011) (lmb) Modified on 12/29/2011 (lmb).
December 29, 2011 39 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Joseph Petersen in Support re: 36 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph) Modified on 12/30/2011 (ldi).
December 29, 2011 38 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Hathitrust. (Petersen, Joseph) Modified on 12/30/2011 (ldi).
December 28, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph E. Petersen to RE-FILE Document 36 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment. Use the event type Declaration in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. Re-File and link ONLY to document # 37 Motion. (ldi)
December 28, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph E. Petersen to RE-FILE Document 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Use the event type Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. Re-File and link ONLY to document # 37 Motion. (ldi)
December 28, 2011 37 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Hathitrust.(Petersen, Joseph)
December 28, 2011 36 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Declaratory Judgment. Document filed by Hathitrust.(Petersen, Joseph) Modified on 12/29/2011 (ldi).
December 28, 2011 35 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Document filed by Hathitrust.(Petersen, Joseph) Modified on 12/29/2011 (ldi).
December 21, 2011 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 34 Stipulation. The document was filed as a duplicate of entry #33 in this case. (djc)
December 21, 2011 33 Featured Case STIPULATION: NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between plaintiffs and defendants as follows:The Individual Defendants are hereby dismissed from the Action with prejudice. The caption in the Amended Complaint is deemed amended to reflect the substitution of the Substituted Defendants in the place and stead of the Individual Defendants. It as agreed among the parties that the operative complaint in the Action is the AmendedComplaint and that the operative answer is the Answer and that the parties shall not be obligated to, nor shall they, serve an amended complaint or answer reflecting the dismissal of the Individual Defendants and/or the substitution of the Substituted Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 12/21/2011) (ama)
December 21, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 29 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 28 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $600.00, paid on 12/12/2011, Receipt Number 1024124,1024125,1024126. (jd)
December 21, 2011 32 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cornell University.(Petersen, Joseph)
December 16, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Joseph E. Petersen to E-MAIL Document No. 31 Stipulation to Judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. This document is not filed via ECF. (ldi)
December 16, 2011 31 FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: New Party: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBSTIUTE PARTIES. Document filed by Hathitrust.(Petersen, Joseph) Modified on 12/19/2011 (ldi).
December 12, 2011 30 MOTION for Daniel F. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Courtney Wheeler.(bwa)
December 12, 2011 29 MOTION for Laura G. Abelson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Courtney Wheeler.(bwa)
December 12, 2011 28 MOTION for Peter Jaszi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Courtney Wheeler.(bwa)
December 12, 2011 27 MOTION to Intervene As Defendants. Document filed by National Federation of the Blind. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Marc Mauer, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Blair Seidlitz, # 3 Exhibit Courtney Wheeler, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Georgina Kleege, # 5 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel F. Goldstein, # 6 Exhibit Defendant Intervenors' Joint Answer and Defenses)(Bernstein, Robert)
December 11, 2011 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Note to Attorney Robert Jay Bernstein to RE-FILE Document 26 Declaration in Support of Motion. Re-File and Attach Declaration in Support of Motion PDF. (db)
December 11, 2011 26 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Daniel F. Goldstein in Support re: 24 MOTION to Intervene As Defendants. Document filed by National Federation of the Blind. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit E to Motion to Intervene as Defendants of National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Courtney Wheeler and Georgina Kleege)(Bernstein, Robert) Modified on 12/12/2011 (db).
December 9, 2011 25 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 24 MOTION to Intervene As Defendants. Filed By National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Courtney Wheeler and Georgina Kleege. Document filed by Georgina Kleege. (Bernstein, Robert)
December 9, 2011 24 MOTION to Intervene As Defendants. Document filed by National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz, Courtney Wheeler, Georgina Kleege. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Dr. Marc Mauer, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of Blair Seidlitz, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Declaration of Courtney Wheeler, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Declaration of Georgina Kleege, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Declaration of Daniel F. Goldstein, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Proposed Joint Answer and Defenses of Defendant Intervenors)(Bernstein, Robert)
December 2, 2011 23 ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint,,,,,,,. Document filed by Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr, Tony Evers, Michael J Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr, Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr, Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White, Charlene Zettel.(Petersen, Joseph)
November 22, 2011 19 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW THEREFORE. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiffs and Defendants, that notwithstanding the numerical limitations of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 33(a)(1) and the subject matter limitations of Rule 33.3(8) of the Local Rules for the United Stats District Courts of the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, Plaintiffs (collectively) and Defendants (collectively) may serve such interrogatories as the serving party deems appropriate, with neither Plaintiffs (collectively) nor Defendants (collectively) serving more than thirty (30) interrogatories on the other. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 11/22/2011) (djc)
November 21, 2011 22 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is added to the Nov. Tralling trial calendar. Non jury. Estimated number of trial days is 4. no additional causes of action or defenses may be asserted after January 1, 2012. the parties consent to proceed before a United States magistrate for all purposes, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 636(c) and Fed. R.Civ. P. 73? should be asserted. A joint pretrial order may be requested when your trial date is set, and will typically need to be submitted to Chambers from 10 days to 2 weeks prior to trial. Sec my Individual Practices for details. the law Clerk assigned to this case is Jackie Joinder of Parties due by 1/1/2012. Motions due by 7/20/2012. Discovery due by 5/20/2012. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 11/19/2011) (js)
November 21, 2011 21 Featured Case PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:The parties do not consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate for all purposes, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73. This case is added to the Nov. Trailing Trial Calendar. Non-jury. Estimated number of trial days is 4. Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 1/1/2012. Motions due by 7/20/2012. Responses due by 7/20/2012. Replies due by 7/20/2012. Discovery due by 5/20/2012. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 11/19/2011) (lmb)
November 21, 2011 20 Featured Case PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties do not consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate for all purposes. Case added to the November trailing Trial Calendar. Non jury 4 day trial. Amended Pleadings due by 1/1/2012. Joinder of Parties due by 1/1/2012. Motions due by 7/20/2012. Discovery due by 5/20/2012. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 11/19/2011) (cd)
November 18, 2011 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Harold Baer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 11/18/2011. (pl)
November 14, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 16 Motion for Ronald L. Raider to Appear Pro Hac Vice. It is hereby Ordered that Ronald L. Raider is admitted pro hac vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for the defendants. ENDORSEMENT: Application for Pro Hac Vice GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 11/14/2011) (mro) Modified on 11/14/2011 (mro).
November 8, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,, in the amount of $200.00, paid on 11/07/2011, Receipt Number 1021190. (jd)
November 7, 2011 16 MOTION for Ronald L. Raider to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr, Tony Evers, Michael J Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr, Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr, Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White, Charlene Zettel.(wb) (pgu).
November 1, 2011 Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2011 at 11:30 AM before Judge Harold Baer. (lmb)
November 1, 2011 17 Letter addressed to Edward Rosenthal from Linda Eckhouse, Judicial Assistant to the Honorable Harold Baer, Jr. dated 11/1/2011 re: The Pre-Trial Conference (PTC) on the above case has been rescheduled. The new date and time is Friday, November 18, 2011, at 11:30 A.M. Please notify your adversary.(lmb)
November 1, 2011 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph E. Petersen on behalf of Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr, Tony Evers, Michael J Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr, Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr, Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan (Petersen, Joseph)
October 31, 2011 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nelson E. Roth on behalf of Cornell University (Roth, Nelson)
October 28, 2011 13 STIPULATION: that the time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the First Amended Complaint be and is hereby extended to and including December 2, 2011. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/28/2011) (pl) Modified on 10/28/2011 (pl).
October 20, 2011 CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,, 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,, 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,, 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,, in the amount of $800.00, paid on 10/18/2011, Receipt Number 1019471,1019472,1019473,1019475. (jd)
October 20, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 7 Motion for Allison Scott Roach to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application for Pro Hac Vice GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/20/2011) (ft)
October 20, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 6 Motion for W. Andrew Pequignot to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application for Pro Hac Vice GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/19/2011) (ft)
October 20, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting 5 Motion for Alex S. Fonoroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application for Pro Hac Vice GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/19/2011) (ft)
October 20, 2011 9 Featured Case ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 8 Motion for Joseph M. Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Application for Pro Hac Vice GRANTED. The Clerk is instructed to close this motion. (Signed by Judge Harold Baer on 10/19/2011) (ft)
October 19, 2011 NOTICE of Conference: Pretrial Conference set for 11/17/2011 at 12:00 PM, in Chambers, Room 2230, before Judge Harold Baer. (cd)
October 18, 2011 8 MOTION for Joseph M. Beck to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr, Tony Evers, Michael J Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr, Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr, Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White, Charlene Zettel.(bcu) (pgu).
October 18, 2011 7 MOTION for Allison Scott Roach to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr, Tony Evers, Michael J Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr, Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr, Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White, Charlene Zettel.(bcu) (pgu).
October 18, 2011 6 MOTION for W. Andrew Pequignot to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr, Tony Evers, Michael J Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Angelo Loukakis, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr, Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr, Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White, Charlene Zettel.(bcu) (pgu).
October 18, 2011 5 MOTION for Alex S. Fonoroff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr, Tony Evers, Michael J Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr, Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr, Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White, Charlene Zettel.(bcu) (pgu).
October 6, 2011 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint,, against Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr, Tony Evers, Michael J Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr, Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr, Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White, Charlene Zettel.Document filed by Helge Ronning, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Jack R. Salamanca, Roxana Robinson, the Writers' Union of Canada, Pat Cummins, Fay Weldon, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Andre Roy, The Authors Guild, Inc., Pat Cummings, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, James Shapiro, Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Danielle Simpson, Angelo Loukakis, The Authors League Fund, Inc, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Erik Grundstrom. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by Pat Cummins, Fay Weldon, Roxana Robinson, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Andre Roy, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Angelo Loukakis, T.J. Stiles, The Authors Guild, Inc., Daniele Simpson, James Shapiro.(mro)
September 16, 2011 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. (sjo)
September 16, 2011 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Harold Baer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sjo)
September 12, 2011 Mailed notice to Register of Copyrights to report the filing of this action. (ama)
September 12, 2011 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Pat Cummins, Angelo Loukakis, Roxana Robinson, Andre Roy, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, The Authors Guild, Inc., Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon.(ama)
September 12, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (ama)
September 12, 2011 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Denny Chin as possibly related to 1:05-cv-8136. (ama)
September 12, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cornell University, Hathitrust, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Trustees Of Indiana University. (ama)
September 12, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Cornell University, Hathitrust, The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, The Regents Of The University Of Michigan, The Regents of the University of California, The Trustees Of Indiana University. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number xxxx)Document filed by Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, James Shapiro, The Authors Guild, Inc., Angelo Loukakis, Roxana Robinson, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, The Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Andre Roy, Pat Cummins, Fay Weldon.(ama)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: The Authors Guild, Inc. et al v. Hathitrust et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: the Writers' Union of Canada
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Cummings
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Grundstrom
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helge Ronning
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack R. Salamanca
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Simpson
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Authors League Fund, Inc
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sveriges Forfattarforbund
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Authors Guild, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Australian Society Of Authors Limited
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Cummins
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Loukakis
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxana Robinson
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Roy
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shapiro
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniele Simpson
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.J. Stiles
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fay Weldon
Represented By: Jeremy Seth Goldman
Represented By: Edward Henry Rosenthal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund Manydeeds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Pointer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Pruitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Sherven
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Spector
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Mark Tyler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose F. Vazquez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David G. Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Cast
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick A. Shoulders
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaryEllen Kiley Bishop
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Cole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip N. Eskew, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cora J Griffin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Reilly, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derica W. Rice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William H. Strong
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C. Blum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Crane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William De La Pena
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Gould
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Island
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Odessa Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Kieffer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry L. Lansing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Lozano
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hadi Makarechian
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Marcus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Mireles, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman J. Pattiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Reiss
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Ruiz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Tang Schilling
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Varner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Wachter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Zettel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Bartell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark J. Bradley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith V. Crain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Drew
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Evers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Falbo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hathitrust
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regents Of The University Of Michigan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Regents of the University of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trustees Of Indiana University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornell University
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Donovan Darlow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence B. Deitch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise Ilitch
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia P. Maynard
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Fischer Newman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew C. Richner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Martin Taylor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine E. White
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]