UMG Recording, Inc. v. Escape Media Group, Inc. et al Featured Case

Record label UMG Recording, Inc. sues Gooveshark, and a number of the company's executives, for copyright infringement, accusing the defendants of uploading roughly 100,000 recordings to the online music service, without payment or licensing use of the artists' works.

Plaintiff: LaFace Records, LLC, Warner Bros. Records Inc., Arista Music, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recording, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Zomba Recording L.L.C., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc. and Arista Records LLC
Defendant: Escape Media Group, Inc., Samuel Tarantino, Joshua Greenberg, Paul Geller, Benjamin Westermann-Clark, John Ashenden, Chanel Munezero and Nikola Arabadjiev
 
Case Number: 1:2011cv08407
Filed: November 18, 2011
 
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: NewYork
Presiding Judge: Thomas P. Griesa
 
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2012 51 ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Escape Media Group, Inc., Joshua Greenberg, Samuel Tarantino.(Giger, Matthew)
April 30, 2012 50 ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark.(Rosenthal, Edward)
April 23, 2012 49 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/6/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 23, 2012 48 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 4/6/2012 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/17/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 20, 2012 47 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER, Nikola Arabadjiev answer due 4/30/2012; John Ashenden answer due 4/30/2012; Escape Media Group, Inc. answer due 4/30/2012; Paul Geller answer due 4/30/2012; Joshua Greenberg answer due 4/30/2012; Chanel Munezero answer due 4/30/2012; Samuel Tarantino answer due 4/30/2012; Benjamin Westermann-Clark answer due 4/30/2012. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/30/2012) (cd)
April 20, 2012 46 MEMO ENDORSED: granting 45 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Attorney Joseph John McFadden terminated. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/20/2012) (cd)
April 13, 2012 45 MOTION for Joseph J. McFadden to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Escape Media Group, Inc., LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recording, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Zomba Recording L.L.C..(McFadden, Joseph)
April 12, 2012 44 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Alison Irene Stein on behalf of Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recording, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Zomba Recording L.L.C.. New Address: Jenner & Block LLP, 919 Third Avenue, 37th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10022, (212) 891-1622. (Stein, Alison)
April 11, 2012 43 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 4/6/2012 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 11, 2012 42 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 4/6/2012 before Judge Thomas P. Griesa. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 9, 2012 41 Featured Case ORDER: Defendants move to dismiss the complaint under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for failure to state claim upon which relief can be granted. Individual defendants Joshua Greenberg, Paul Geller, Benjamin Westermann-Clark, Chanel Munezero, and Nikola Arabadjiev further move to dismiss the complaint against them under Fed R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) for lack of personal jurisdiction. For the reasons stated on the record at the hearing held on April 6, 2012, defendants' motions are denied. This order resolves the motions listed as document numbers 8, 19, and 22 on the docket. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/9/2012) (mro)
April 6, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Oral Argument held on 4/6/2012. Defendants' three motions to dismiss are denied in open court. (cd)
March 23, 2012 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Joshua Greenberg. (Giger, Matthew)
March 23, 2012 39 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Escape Media Group, Inc., Joshua Greenberg, Samuel Tarantino. (Giger, Matthew)
March 23, 2012 38 REPLY AFFIRMATION of Matthew H. Giger in Support re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Escape Media Group, Inc., Joshua Greenberg, Samuel Tarantino. (Giger, Matthew)
March 23, 2012 37 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unreported Decisions (Part 1), # 2 Appendix Unreported Decisions (Part 2))(Rosenthal, Edward)
March 23, 2012 36 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Nikola Arabadjiev in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Rosenthal, Edward)
March 23, 2012 35 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Benjamin Westermann-Clark in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Rosenthal, Edward)
March 23, 2012 34 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Paul Geller in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Rosenthal, Edward)
March 23, 2012 33 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Chanel Munezero in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Rosenthal, Edward)
March 14, 2012 32 DECLARATION of Gianni P. Servodidio in Opposition re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint., 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recording, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Zomba Recording L.L.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Servodidio, Gianni)
March 14, 2012 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recording, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Zomba Recording L.L.C.. (Servodidio, Gianni)
March 14, 2012 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recording, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Zomba Recording L.L.C.. (Servodidio, Gianni)
March 14, 2012 29 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recording, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Zomba Recording L.L.C.. (Servodidio, Gianni)
March 14, 2012 28 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps)
March 13, 2012 27 Featured Case STIPULATED INTERIM PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 3/13/2012) (ab)
March 12, 2012 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marisa L. Sarig on behalf of Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark (Sarig, Marisa)
March 9, 2012 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Irene Stein on behalf of Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recording, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Zomba Recording L.L.C. (Stein, Alison)
March 2, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Telephone Conference held on 3/2/2012. (mro)
March 1, 2012 24 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Brett Thomas Perala on behalf of Escape Media Group, Inc., Joshua Greenberg, Samuel Tarantino. New Address: Rosenberg & Giger P.C., 488 Madison Avenue, 10th Floor, New York, NY, US 10022, 212-705-4829. (Perala, Brett)
February 29, 2012 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Escape Media Group, Inc., Joshua Greenberg, Samuel Tarantino. (Giger, Matthew)
February 29, 2012 22 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Escape Media Group, Inc., Joshua Greenberg, Samuel Tarantino.(Giger, Matthew)
February 29, 2012 21 DECLARATION of Joshua Greenberg in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Joshua Greenberg. (Perala, Brett)
February 29, 2012 20 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Joshua Greenberg. (Perala, Brett)
February 29, 2012 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by Joshua Greenberg.(Perala, Brett)
February 29, 2012 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brett Thomas Perala on behalf of Escape Media Group, Inc., Joshua Greenberg, Samuel Tarantino (Perala, Brett)
February 29, 2012 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Jacob Rosenberg on behalf of Escape Media Group, Inc., Joshua Greenberg, Samuel Tarantino (Rosenberg, John)
February 29, 2012 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew H. Giger on behalf of Escape Media Group, Inc., Joshua Greenberg, Samuel Tarantino (Giger, Matthew)
February 29, 2012 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Escape Media Group, Inc..(Giger, Matthew)
February 29, 2012 14 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unreported Decisions (part 1), # 2 Appendix Unreported Decisions (part 2), # 3 Appendix Unreported Decisions (part 3))(Rosenthal, Edward)
February 29, 2012 13 DECLARATION of Benjamin Westermann-Clark in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Rosenthal, Edward)
February 29, 2012 12 DECLARATION of Paul Geller in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Rosenthal, Edward)
February 29, 2012 11 DECLARATION of Nikola Arabadjiev in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Rosenthal, Edward)
February 29, 2012 10 DECLARATION of Chanel Munezero in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Rosenthal, Edward)
February 29, 2012 9 DECLARATION of Marisa Sarig in Support re: 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (part 2))(Rosenthal, Edward)
February 29, 2012 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Paul Geller, Chanel Munezero, Benjamin Westermann-Clark.(Rosenthal, Edward)
February 3, 2012 7 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER, Escape Media Group, Inc. answer due 2/29/2012; Joshua Greenberg answer due 2/29/2012; Samuel Tarantino answer due 2/29/2012. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/3/2012) (cd)
January 31, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas P. Griesa: Status Conference held on 1/31/2012. (jfe)
January 24, 2012 6 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and among the parties hereto, through their undersigned counsel, that the time within which Defendants Paul Geller, Benjamin Westermann-Clark, John Ashenden, Chanel Munezero. and Nikola Arabadjiev shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in this matter shall be extended up to and including 2/29/2012. Nikola Arabadjiev answer due 2/29/2012; John Ashenden answer due 2/29/2012; Paul Geller answer due 2/29/2012; Chanel Munezero answer due 2/29/2012; Benjamin Westermann-Clark answer due 2/29/2012. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/24/2012) (ft)
December 27, 2011 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Escape Media Group, Inc. served on 12/21/2011, answer due 1/11/2012. Document filed by Atlantic Recording Corporation; LaFace Records, LLC; UMG Recording, Inc.; Warner Bros. Records Inc.; Zomba Recording L.L.C.; Arista Music; Arista Records LLC; Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.; Sony Music Entertainment. (Bart, Andrew)
December 16, 2011 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Corporation for Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, Zomba Recording L.L.C.; Corporate Parent Vivendi S.A.. a publicly held French company for UMG Recording, Inc.. Document filed by Arista Music, Arista Records LLC, Atlantic Recording Corporation, Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., LaFace Records, LLC, Sony Music Entertainment, UMG Recording, Inc., Warner Bros. Records Inc., Zomba Recording L.L.C..(Bart, Andrew)
December 15, 2011 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Escape Media Group, Inc., Paul Geller, Joshua Greenberg, Chanel Munezero, Samuel Tarantino, Benjamin Westermann-Clark.Document filed by UMG Recording, Inc., Atlantic Recording Corporation, Zomba Recording L.L.C., Elektra Entertainment Group Inc., Arista Records LLC, LaFace Records, LLC, Warner Bros. Records Inc., Arista Music, Sony Music Entertainment. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by UMG Recording, Inc. (mro) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/20/2011: # 1 ex a, # 2 ex b, # 3 ex c, # 4 ex d, # 5 ex e, # 6 ex f, # 7 ex g, # 8 ex h, # 9 ex i) (ama).
November 18, 2011 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Vivendi S.A. for UMG Recording, Inc.. Document filed by UMG Recording, Inc..(rdz) (ama).
November 18, 2011 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
November 18, 2011 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. (rdz)
November 18, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (rdz)
November 18, 2011 1 COMPLAINT against Nikola Arabadjiev, John Ashenden, Escape Media Group, Inc., Paul Geller, Joshua Greenberg, Chanel Munezero, Samuel Tarantino, Benjamin Westermann-Clark. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401022354)Document filed by UMG Recording, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(rdz) Modified on 11/22/2011 (rdz).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: UMG Recording, Inc. v. Escape Media Group, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaFace Records, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Represented By: Joseph John McFadden
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warner Bros. Records Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Represented By: Joseph John McFadden
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Music
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Represented By: Joseph John McFadden
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sony Music Entertainment
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Represented By: Joseph John McFadden
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UMG Recording, Inc.
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Represented By: Joseph John McFadden
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Recording Corporation
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Represented By: Joseph John McFadden
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zomba Recording L.L.C.
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Represented By: Joseph John McFadden
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Represented By: Joseph John McFadden
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arista Records LLC
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Bart
Represented By: Joseph John McFadden
Represented By: Gianni P. Servodidio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escape Media Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Tarantino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Greenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Geller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Westermann-Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ashenden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chanel Munezero
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nikola Arabadjiev
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]