Gusinsky v. Barclays PLC et al

Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc, Barclays PLC, Robert Diamond and Marcus A. P. Agius
Plaintiff: Vladimir Gusinsky
Case Number: 1:2012cv05329
Filed: July 10, 2012
Court: New York Southern District Court
Office: Foley Square Office
County: XX Out of State
Presiding Judge: Shira A. Scheindlin
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 20, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 97 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (Renewed). filed by Marcus A. P. Agius, Barclays Capital Inc, John Varley, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays PLC. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motio n is DENIED in its entirety. A status conference will be held on October 30, 2014, at 4:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (See Order.) (Status Conference set for 10/30/2014 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.) (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/20/2014) (ajs)
May 13, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER re: 61 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, filed by Marcus A. P. Agius, Christopher Lucas, Barclays Capital Inc, John Varley, Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays PLC. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to close this motion [Dkt. No. 61] and this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/13/2013) (ja)
June 13, 2013 78 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: 75 MOTION for Reconsideration. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Docket No. 75) and this case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/12/2013) (ja)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gusinsky v. Barclays PLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays PLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Diamond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus A. P. Agius
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vladimir Gusinsky
Represented By: Daniel W. Krasner
Represented By: Gregory Mark Nespole
Represented By: Martin E. Restituyo
Represented By: Robert B. Weintraub
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]